Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMORLEY v. UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2003cv02545
Date Filed2003-12-16
Date Closed2014-09-09
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffJEFFERSON MORLEY
DefendantUNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
AppealD.C. Circuit 10-5161
AppealD.C. Circuit 12-5032
AppealD.C. Circuit 14-5230
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [73]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Richard Leon has ruled that the CIA properly withheld most of the records it had on George Efythron Joannides, a deceased CIA operations officer, from Jefferson Morley, editor of washingtonpost.com. Morley had argued that disclosure would shed light on the aftermath of the assassination of President John F. Kennedy. The CIA disclosed three documents in their entirety and parts of 112 documents and indicated that other records were available at the National Archives as part of the Kennedy Assassination Records Collection. After finding that Exemption 1 (national security) and Exemption 3 (other statutes) protected most of the withheld information, Leon also agreed the agency had properly withheld administrative markings under Exemption 2 (internal practices and procedures). Morley argued that the House Select Committee on Assassination had specifically requested the CIA to retain such markings in documents given to the Committee during its investigation so that it would be improper to do so in response to his request. Leon noted, however, that "although there may well be a significant public interest in knowing about 'Lee Oswald's interactions with Cubans, Cuban groups and Cuban operations in general,' plaintiff has failed to provide a scintilla of evidence to show how release of information pertaining to purely personnel rules and practices of the CIA, including administrative routing information, would shed light on alleged activities of Mr. Oswald or the CIA's knowledge thereof. Simply stated, there is no legitimate public interest that would justify disclosure of CIA personnel rules and practices, including administrative routing information." Rejecting Morley's claims that the agency must disclose any records released under the Kennedy Assassination Records Collection Act, Leon pointed out that "even if [ ] materials were previously released under the JFK Act, defendant is under no obligation to produce them pursuant to plaintiff's FOIA request." Leon allowed the agency to withhold personal information about Joannides, his mother and his wife, although all three were dead, under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). In a rather cursory analysis of the effects of death on privacy rights, Leon first relied on Kiraly v. FBI, 728 F.2d 273 (6th Cir. 1984), perhaps the only appellate FOIA decision supporting a right of privacy after death until the issue was re-examined in a series of cases culminating with the Supreme Court's decision in National Archives v. Favish, 541 U.S. 157 (2004). He then relied on the interpretation of Favish by the Department of Justice's Office of Information and Privacy to conclude that the family of the three dead individuals might retain privacy rights without analyzing or explaining what those rights might be. On law enforcement privacy he used Dunkelberger v. Dept of Justice, 906 F.2d 779 (D.C. Cir. 1990), which held that individuals had a privacy interest in not being unduly associated with criminal investigations, to find that Joannides had a privacy interest in his background investigation, a law enforcement procedure of significantly less magnitude.
Issues: Exemption 1 - Harm to national security, Exemption 2 - Personnel practices, Exemption 3 - Statutory prohibition of disclosure, Exemption 6 - Invasion of privacy, Exemption 7(C) - Invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records
Opinion/Order [74]
Opinion/Order [102]
Opinion/Order [103]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Richard Leon has ruled that Jefferson Morley is not entitled to attorney's fees from the CIA for forcing the agency to process further materials it had sent to the National Archives as part of its Kennedy Assassination records. The agency originally told Morley to go to NARA, but ultimately released a handful of documents. On appeal to the D.C. Circuit, the appellate court ruled that the CIA should have searched its operational files and instructed it to search its records that had been transferred to NARA. As a result, the agency disclosed an additional 113 records from the NARA materials, as well as another 293 records from its own files. Morley then petitioned for attorney's fees. Morley argued that his suit was in the public interest because it forced disclosure of more documents about the Kennedy assassination. But Leon noted that "while the Kennedy assassination is surely a matter of public interest, this litigation has yielded little, if any public benefit´┐Ż"certainly an insufficient amount to support an award of attorney's fees." Noting that Morley contended that the public benefit came primarily from the JFK Assassination records that were released, Leon pointed out that "this litigation did not, however, lead to the publication of the Kennedy-assassination documents. Instead, the Kennedy-assassination documents obtained by Morley through this FOIA litigation are identical to the documents which were previously released under the President John F. Kennedy Assassination Records Act of 1992. As such, Morley cannot claim that any of this information 'add[s] to the fund of information that citizens may use in making vital political choices.'" Morley claimed success by getting the documents under FOIA rather than paying what he considered exorbitant copying charges assessed by NARA. But Leon explained that "Morley's using FOIA to sidestep these copying costs and to compel the CIA to search these records did not exactly further the public benefit." Morley also argued that the litigation had made clear that the CIA still had Kennedy assassination-related records that it had not reviewed and released under the JFK Records Act. However, Leon observed that "those documents were properly withheld under FOIA and therefore his argument must fail." Leon also found because Morley received minimal compensation and benefitted from receiving the NARA documents at a lower cost, "these two factors indicate that Morley has a sufficient private interest in pursuing these records without attorney's fees." Finally, Leon found the agency had relied on reasonable legal interpretations and noted that "there is no indication in the record that the CIA has engaged in any recalcitrant or obdurate behavior."
Issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees - Entitlement - Public benefit, Litigation - Attorney's fees - Entitlement - Personal interest, Litigation - Attorney's fees - Prevailing party
Opinion/Order [120]
Opinion/Order [121]
Opinion/Order [129]
Opinion/Order [147]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Richard Leon has once again ruled that journalist Jefferson Morley is not entitled to attorney's fees for his 11-year battle to force the CIA to provide more information on CIA employee George Joannides. Even though the D.C. Circuit had remanded the case twice for reconsideration of the public interest in disclosure of records related to the Kennedy assassination, Leon once again concluded that no public interest was served by the disclosure of some 300 previously undisclosed records pertaining to Joannides. When Morley first requested records from the CIA on what he alleged to be Joannides' role in the Kennedy assassination, the agency referred him to the National Archives, explaining that records on Joannides were part of the publicly available Kennedy Assassination Collection. Morley sued instead. The agency provided 113 records already available at NARA and 524 more records related to Joannides. Morley requested attorney's fees, which Leon denied after finding the records had not increased public understanding of the Kennedy assassination. The case went to the D.C. Circuit for a second time. The D.C. Circuit told Leon to apply the public interest test from another recent Kennedy assassination case, Davy v. CIA, 550 F.3d 1155 (D.C. Cir. 2008), in which the D.C. Circuit had noted that "records 'about individuals allegedly involved in President Kennedy's assassination serve a public benefit.'" Undeterred, Leon rejected Morley's attorney's fees request once again, noting that "the Davy court did not make a broad statement that all records 'about individuals allegedly involved in President Kennedy's assassination' benefit the public. . .The Davy Court's description of the documents at issue does not create a category of records that automatically satisfy the [public interest] factor based on a plaintiff's claims of a relationship to the assassination." Morley argued that newly disclosed records concerning Joannides' travel to New Orleans during the time Lee Harvey Oswald was there and Joannides' receipt of a Career Intelligence Medal for exceptional service when he retired provided further context for linking Joannides to the Kennedy assassination. Leon observed that a footnote in Davy explained that "plaintiffs who obtain information that, while arguably not of immediate public interest, nevertheless enables further research ultimately of great value and interest, such as here the public understanding of a Presidential assassination," should not be foreclosed from fees. But he pointed out that "I do not interpret the Davy Court's footnote as holding that every new piece of information released pursuant to a FOIA request benefits the public because it may, someday, in some way, contribute to research on a matter of public import. The public benefit test requires more than speculation of an unknown potential future benefit."
Issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees - Entitlement - Public benefit
Opinion/Order [168]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-12-161COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Filing fee $ 150.) , filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1# 2 Exhibit #2)(jf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
2003-12-16SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
2004-01-202ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. (Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
2004-01-203Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
2004-01-204ERRATA (Text of Proposed Order to Accompany Docket Entry No. 3) by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
2004-01-235ORDER granting 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/21/04. (whb) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
2004-02-196ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 02/19/2004)
2004-04-097MOTION to Stay Proceedings Under Open America by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert T. Herman# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 04/09/2004)
2004-04-278Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Stay Proceedings by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
2004-04-289NOTICE by JEFFERSON MORLEY of Filing of Erratum and Corrected Proposed Order (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/28/2004)
2004-04-28MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to April 7, 2004 to Respond to Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 04/28/04. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 04/28/2004)
2004-05-0710Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respont to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/07/2004)
2004-05-0811NOTICE by JEFFERSON MORLEY of Erratumand Filing of Corrected Proposed Order (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/08/2004)
2004-05-14MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respont to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/14/04. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 05/14/2004)
2004-05-2112Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
2004-06-0113MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
2004-06-03MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 06/02/04. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 06/03/2004)
2004-06-08MINUTE ORDER granting 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 06/08/04. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 06/08/2004)
2004-06-0914MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/09/2004)
2004-06-1515MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Def's Motion to Stay Proceedings by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/15/2004)
2004-06-16MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 06/14/04. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
2004-06-1816MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/18/2004)
2004-06-2217Memorandum in opposition to motion re 7 Stay of Proceedings filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 "Revelation 19.63," by Jefferson Morley# 2 Att. 2, "The Good Spy," by Jefferson Morley# 3 "The Perfect Man for the Job," by Jefferson Morley# 4 Att. 4--Chart of CIA FOIA Requests# 5 Memorandum of Understanding# 6 Att. 6--Newman Declaration# 7 Att. 7--Second Newman Decl.# 8 Affidavit Decl. of Anna Nelson# 9 Affidavit Decl. of T. Jeremy Gunn# 10 Affidavit Decl. of Judge John Tunheim)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
2004-06-2218MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Def's Mot. for a Stay Out-of-Time by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
2004-06-25ORDER granting 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Def's Motion to Stay Proceedings nunc pro tunc, and granting 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Def's Motion to Stay Proceedings nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 06/25/04. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 06/25/2004)
2004-06-2919ORDER granting 18 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for a Stay Out-of-Time by JEFFERSON MORLEY. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/28/04. (whb) (Entered: 06/29/2004)
2004-07-0120NOTICE by JEFFERSON MORLEY of Errata (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
2004-07-0221Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 07/02/2004)
2004-07-09MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Rply Brief. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 07/08/04. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 07/09/2004)
2004-07-0922REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 for an Open America Stay filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 07/09/2004)
2004-09-02MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion to Stay Proceedings Under Open America by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Defendant shall have up to and including December 2004 to complete the processing of plaintiff's FOIA case request and shall file status reports on September 30, 2004 and December 15, 2004. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/2/2004. (lcrjl1, ) Modified on 9/2/2004 (whb). (Entered: 09/02/2004)
2004-09-3023STATUS REPORT (FIRST) by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
2004-12-1524STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
2005-03-2425MOTION for Protective Order from discovery by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's discovery requests)(Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
2005-04-0826Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Moton for a Protective Order by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
2005-04-1127ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing of Motion Inadvertently Not Filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Extension of Time)(Lesar, James) Modified on 4/12/2005 (nmw, ). (Entered: 04/11/2005)
2005-04-12NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. 27 was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (nmw, ) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
2005-04-1228NOTICE of Filing of Mot. Inadvertently Not Filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
2005-04-1229Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Def's Mot. for Protective Order by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
2005-04-1530Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Def's Mot. for a Protective Order (050414) by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
2005-04-19MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings. The plaintiff shall file a response to defendant's motion to stay proceedings on or before May 18, 2005. It is further ORDERED that 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order is granted nunc pro tunc. It is further ORDERED that 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order is granted. The plaintiff shall file a response to defendant's motion for a protective order on or before April 25, 2005. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 04/19/2005. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
2005-04-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Responses due by 5/18/2005, to defendant motion to stay proceedings, Plaintiff's responses due by 4/25/05 to defendant's mtoion for a protective order. (whb) (Entered: 04/20/2005)
2005-04-2531Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Def's Mot. for Protective Order by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
2005-04-2632Memorandum in opposition to motion re 25 Protective Order filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Second Declaration of Jefferson Morley)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
2005-04-2733NOTICE of Filing of Attachments to Second Morley Declarataion by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A# 2 Attachment B# 3 Attachment C# 4 Attachment D# 5 Attachment E# 6 Attachment F)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
2005-05-04MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Def's Mot. for Protective Order. Plaintiff shall file his response on or before April 26, 2005. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/04/2005. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 05/04/2005)
2005-05-0634Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
2005-05-1135NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/11/2005)
2005-05-18MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in support of its motion for a protective order. It is further ORDERED that defendant shall file any reply brief on or before May 20, 2005. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/18/2005. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
2005-05-2036REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 Motion For A Protective Order filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
2005-07-0637MOTION to Compel Defendant to Answer Discovery Requests by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1--Pl's Admissions# 2 Exhibit Exh. 2--Pl's Interrogatories# 3 Exhibit Exh. 3--Pl's Req. for Prod. of Docs.# 4 Exhibit Exh. 4--Def's Response to Req. for Admissions# 5 Exhibit Exh. 5--Def's Response to Interrogatories# 6 Exhibit Exh. 6--Def's Response to Req. for Prod. of Docs.)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/06/2005)
2005-07-1938Memorandum in opposition to motion re 37 Compel Discovery filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
2005-08-0139ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 37 compel defendant to answer plaintiff's discovery filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 )(Lesar, James) Modified on 8/2/2005 (nmw, ). (Entered: 08/01/2005)
2005-08-02NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. 39 was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (nmw, ) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
2005-08-0240REPLY to opposition to motion re 37 compel defendant to answer discovery filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Atrt. 1--Letter to NY Rview of Books)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
2005-08-1241ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for determination of discovery disputes . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/9/05. (whb) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
2005-08-15CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for Discovery Disputes. (jsc) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
2005-10-1342ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .NOTICE of Filing of Request for Oral Argument by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Request for Oral Argument)(Lesar, James) Modified on 10/14/2005 (td, ). (Entered: 10/13/2005)
2005-10-14NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 42 Notice (Other) was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (td, ) (Entered: 10/14/2005)
2005-10-1843MOTION oral argument by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
2005-10-19Set/Reset Hearing: Status Conference set for Wednesday 11/9/2005 @ 09:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (EW) (Entered: 10/19/2005)
2005-11-0844Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to hold Status Conference by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
2005-11-08MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Consent Motion to Reschedule Status Hearing; Status hearing re-set for 11/16/05 @ 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 11/8/05. (EW) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
2005-11-1545MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts # 2 Declaration of M. Dorn# 3 Vaughn# 4 Dec. Ex. B# 5 Dec. Ex. C# 6 Dec. Ex D# 7 Dec. Ex. E# 8 Dec. Ex. F# 9 Dec. Ex. G# 10 Attatched Case (Burnes)# 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
2005-11-16Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson : Status Hearing held on 11/16/2005. (Court Reporter Pro Typist.) (ldc, ) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
2005-11-1746SCHEDULING ORDER regarding conduct of discoverySigned by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 11/17/05. (jrs) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
2005-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall submit "new" discovery request due by 12/20/2005; defendant shall file any motion for protective order to limit or preclude the new discovery by 1/6/2006; if defendant does not file a motion for protective order, then defendant shall serve its responses to the new discovery requests by 01/20/06. (ldc, ) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
2005-12-0247MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's Ruling by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
2005-12-0748TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/16/05 before Judge Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Court Reporter: Pro-Typists. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, ) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
2005-12-2149MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Def's Mot. for Reconsideration by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/21/2005)
2005-12-23MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 12/23/05. (jrs) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
2005-12-2450Memorandum in opposition to re 47 Def's Mot. for Reconsideration filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Third Declaration of Jefferson Morley# 2 Affidavit Rule 56(f) Declaration of Jefferson Morley# 3 Transcript of November 16, 2005 Status hearing)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/24/2005)
2005-12-2451MOTION for Leave to File Oppositin to Def's Motion for Reconsideration Out-of-Time by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/24/2005)
2005-12-2752NOTICE of Errata by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Corrected DORN declaration)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/27/2005)
2006-01-0653MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Plaintiff's Discovery Requests)# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
2006-01-2054Memorandum in opposition to re 53 Renewed Motion for Protective Order filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No Cloer to Cracking the Kennedy Case# 2 Affidavit of Jefferson Morley Pursuant to Ruler 56(f))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
2006-01-3055REPLY to opposition to motion re 53 filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/30/2006)
2006-02-0656MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 53 Renewed Motion for Protective Order; Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment no later than February 17, 2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 2/6/06. (EW) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
2006-02-2257Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Def's Mot. for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
2006-03-0158Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
2006-03-02MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 57 Motion for Extension of Time and granting nunc pro tunc 58 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. It is further Ordered that plaintiff shall respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment by March 3, 2006. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/2/06. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
2006-03-0759ENTERED IN ERROR.....Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 5 Exhibit 6# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 7# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 8# 8 Exhibit Exhbit 9# 9 Affidavit Fifth Morlely Declaration# 10 Local Rule 7.1(h) Statement# 11 Affidavit Newman Declaration# 12 NewmanDecl., Att. 1# 13 Newman Decl., Att. 2# 14 Newman Decl, Att. 3# 15 Response to Def's 7.1(h) Statemen)(Lesar, James) Modified on 3/8/2006 (jf, ). (Entered: 03/07/2006)
2006-03-0760MOTION for Leave to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Out-of-Time by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
2006-03-08NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 59 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment was entered in error as a premature filing pending on Court's ruling of # 60 (jf, ) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
2006-03-10MINUTE ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Out-of-Time. It is further Ordered that plaintiff file the cross-motion for summary judgment by March 15, 2006. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/10/06. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
2006-03-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross Motion for summary judgment due by 3/15/2006. (whb) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
2006-03-1461NOTICE re: Exhibits in support of Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment 63 by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9# 10 Affidavit Fifth Morley Declaration# 11 Statement of Facts Plaintiff's Local Rule 7.1(h) statement# 12 Affidavit Newman Declaration# 13 Exhibit Neweman Decl., Attachment 1# 14 Exhibit Newman Declaration, Attachment 2# 15 Exhibit Newman Declaration, Attachment 3# 16 Resonse to Defs Satement of Material Facts)(Lesar, James) Modified on 3/15/2006 (jf, ). Modified on 3/15/2006 (jf, ). (Entered: 03/14/2006)
2006-03-1462Memorandum in opposition to re 45 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit Exhbiit 5# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9# 10 Affidavit Fifth Morley Declaration# 11 Statement of Facts Plaintiff's Local Rule 7.1(h) Statement# 12 Affidavit Newman Declaration# 13 Affidavit Newman Declaration, Attachment 1# 14 Affidavit Newman Declaration, Attachment 2# 15 Exhibit Newman Declaration, Attachment 3# 16 Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
2006-03-1463CROSS-MOTION for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (to view document, click on link # 62 ) (jf, ) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
2006-03-2064MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment and Respond to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
2006-03-28MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment and Respond to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. It is further Ordered that Defendant shall file a Consolidated Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by April 19, 2006. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/28/06. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
2006-04-04MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 51 Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration Out-of-Time and denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/4/06. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
2006-04-1865Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Summary Judgment Opposition and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
2006-05-17MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. It is further Ordered that the reply and the response are due by May 19, 2006. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/17/06. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
2006-05-1966MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
2006-05-24MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. It is further Ordered that the Consolidated Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due on May 26, 2006. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/24/06. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
2006-05-2667Memorandum in opposition to re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts)(Peterson, Benton) Modified on 5/30/2006 (jf, ). (Entered: 05/26/2006)
2006-05-2668Memorandum in opposition to re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (to view document, click on link # 67 ) (jf, ) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
2006-06-0769Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
2006-06-16MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 69 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby Ordered that plaintiff's reply is due by June 22, 2006. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/16/06. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
2006-06-2170Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to To Reply to Def's Opp. to Pl's Mot. for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/21/2006)
2006-06-27MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. It is further Ordered that plaintiff's reply is due by June 29, 2006. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/27/06. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
2006-06-3071MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opp. to Cross-Mot. for Summary Judgjment Out-of-Time by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Reply to Opp. to Cross-Mot. for Sum. Judg.# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 6 Affidavit Declaration of G. Robert Blakey)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
2006-07-0772REPLY to opposition to motion re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (jf, ) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
2006-07-08MINUTE ORDER granting 71 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Out-of-Time. It is hereby Ordered that the reply attached to the 71 motion shall be filed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/8/06. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 07/08/2006)
2006-09-2973MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/29/06.(lcrjl1) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
2006-09-2974ORDER entering Final Judgment and DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/29/06.(lcrjl1) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
2006-11-2275NOTICE OF APPEAL by JEFFERSON MORLEY. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1058388. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
2006-11-24Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 75 Notice of Appeal (jf, ) (Entered: 11/24/2006)
2006-11-27USCA Case Number 06-5382 for 75 Notice of Appeal filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY,. (jf, ) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
2008-01-2876NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John C. Truong on behalf of UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Benton G. Peterson (Truong, John) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
2008-02-0177MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 75 Notice of Appeal filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby reversed and the case is remanded in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (USCA No. 06-5382) (zkb) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
2008-02-05Status Conference set for 2/27/2008 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/5/2008. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
2008-02-27Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 2/27/2008, ( Status Report due by 4/29/2008, Status Conference set for 4/30/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.). (Court Reporter Wendy Ricard.) (whb) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
2008-04-2978STATUS REPORT Filed By The Parties by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Truong, John) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
2008-04-30Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 4/30/2008. Briefing schedule proposed in docket entry #79 adopted. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (lin, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
2008-06-0779Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct April 30, 2008 Minute Order by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Truong, John) (Entered: 06/07/2008)
2008-06-24MINUTE ORDER granting 79 Defendant's Consent Motion to Amend April 30, 2008 Minute Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the deadlines set forth in the 4/30/2008 Minute Order are amended as follows: defendant's motion for summary judgment due 7/11/2008; plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment due 8/11/2008; defendant's reply and opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment due 9/12/2008; and plaintiff's reply to cross-motion for summary judgment due 9/26/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/24/2008. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
2008-06-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 8/11/2008. Response to Cross Motions due by 9/12/2008. Reply to Cross Motions due by 9/26/2008. Summary Judgment motions due by 7/11/2008. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/11/2008. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/12/2008. (lin, ) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
2008-07-0280Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct June 24, 2008 Minute Order by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
2008-07-10MINUTE ORDER granting 80 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct June 24, 2008 Minute Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the schedule is amended as follows: defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before 8/11/2008; plaintiff's opposition/cross motion for summary judgment is due on or before 9/26/2008; defendant's reply/opposition is due on or before 10/27/2008; plaintiff's reply is due on or before 11/25/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/10/2008. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
2008-07-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 9/26/2008. Response to Cross Motions due by 10/27/2008. Reply to Cross Motions due by 11/25/2008. Summary Judgment motions due by 8/11/2008. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/26/2008. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/27/2008. (lin, ) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
2008-08-0681Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct July 14, 2008 Minute Order by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
2008-08-0882ORDER granting Defendant's Motion 81 to Amend/Correct the June 24, 2008 Minute order and the entire record herein. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/7/08. (kc) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
2008-08-08Set/Reset Deadlines. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/11/2008. Plaintiff's Opposition/Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/11/2008. Defendant's Reply/Opposition due by 11/11/2008. Plaintiff's Reply due by 12/11/2008. (kc) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
2008-09-0283Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct August 8, 2008 Minute Order by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Truong, John) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
2008-09-05MINUTE ORDER granting 83 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct August 8, 2008 Minute Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule shall be as follows: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due October 14, 2008; Plaintiff's Opposition/Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due November 14, 2008; Defendant's Reply/Opposition due December 14, 2008; Plaintiff's Reply due January 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/05/2008. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
2008-09-05Set/Reset Deadlines. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment motions due by 10/14/2008. Plaintiff's Opposition/Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/14/2008. Defendant's Reply/Opposition due by 12/14/2008. Plaintiff's Reply due by 1/14/2009. (kc) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
2008-10-1084NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
2008-10-1085Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispostive Motion by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
2008-10-14MINUTE ORDER granting 85 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule shall be as follows: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due December 2, 2008; Plaintiff's Opposition/Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due January 22, 2009; Defendant's Reply/Opposition due February 23, 2009; Plaintiff's Reply due March 23, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/14/2008. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
2008-10-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 12/2/2008. Plaintiff's Opposition/Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/22/2009. Defendant's Reply/Opposition due by 2/23/2009. Plaintiff's Reply due by 3/23/2009. (kc) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
2008-11-2686MOTION for Extension of Time to File by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
2008-12-0387ERRATA by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Defednant's Motion)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
2008-12-03MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule shall be extended as follows: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due December 9, 2008; Plaintiff's Opposition/Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due January 29, 2009; Defendant's Reply/Opposition due March 2, 2009; Plaintiff's Reply due March 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/14/2008.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/3/2008. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
2008-12-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/9/2008. Plaintiff's Opposition/Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/29/2009. Defendant's Reply/Opposition due by 3/2/2009. Plaintiff's Reply due by 3/30/2009. (kc) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
2008-12-0988MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
2008-12-0989NOTICE of Bulky Exhibit Filing by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
2009-01-2990ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit President Obama's Executive Order)(Lesar, James) Modified on 2/2/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 01/29/2009)
2009-02-02NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 90 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with corrected document.(jf, ) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
2009-02-0291Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit President Obama's Executive Order)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
2009-02-03MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 91 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall have up to and including 3/30/2009 in which to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/3/2009. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
2009-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines: plaintiff's Response to defendant's motion for summary judgment due by 3/20/2009. (kc) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
2009-03-3192Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Attachment 1--AG Holder's Memorandum)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
2009-04-02MINUTE ORDER granting 92 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's response to defendant's motion for summary judgment is due 7/3/2009. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/2/2009. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
2009-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: plaintiff's Response to defendant's motion for summary judgment due by 7/3/2009. (kc) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
2009-07-1193Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Out-of-Time by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Attachment A--Scelso Deposition, # 3 Exhibit Attachment B--Washington Post article, # 4 Affidavit Blakey Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit Kaiser Declaration, # 6 Affidavit Morley Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Sixth Morley Declaration, Exhibits 1-15, # 8 Exhibit 6th Morley Declaration, Exhibits 16-30, # 9 Exhibit 6th Morley Declaration, Exhibits 31-40, # 10 Exhibit 6th Morley Declaration, Exhibits 41-47, # 11 Exhibit 6th Morley Declaration, Exhibits 48-65, # 12 Exhibit 6th Morley Declaration, Exhibits 49-65, # 13 Statement of Facts Local Rule 7.1(h) Statement)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/11/2009)
2009-07-16MINUTE ORDER granting 93 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Out-of-Time by JEFFERSON MORLEY. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant's opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due 8/10/2009. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/16/2009. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
2009-07-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's opposition to plaintiff's Cross-Motion for summary judgment due by 8/10/2009. (kc) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
2009-07-1694Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
2009-07-1695RENEWED CROSS-MOTION for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf, ) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
2009-07-1796Memorandum in opposition to re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (See Docket Entry 95 to view document). (nmw, ) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
2009-07-22MINUTE ORDER granting 94 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant's opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due 8/17/2009. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/22/2009. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
2009-07-22Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment due by 8/17/2009 (cp, ) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
2009-08-1497Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
2009-08-17MINUTE ORDER granting 97 Consent Motion to Enlarge Time to File Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion to enlarge time is GRANTED and that Defendant's response to Plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment is now due on September 11, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/17/2009. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
2009-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/11/2009. (kc) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
2009-09-1198Memorandum in opposition to re 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 93 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Out-of-Time filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Declaration Supplemental Nelson Declaration, # 3 Statement of Facts)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
2009-09-1799Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
2009-09-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/7/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
2009-09-28Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference originally set for 10/7/2009 is RESCHEDULED for 10/23/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
2009-09-29MINUTE ORDER STAYING CASE. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending the status conference scheduled for October 23, 2009; and it is further ORDERED that no further briefs shall be filed until such time as the Court lifts the stay. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/29/2009. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
2009-09-30100Consent MOTION Reschedule Status Conference by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
2009-10-05MINUTE ORDER granting 100 Defendant's Consent Motion to Reschedule Status Conference Date. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the status conference be rescheduled for November 16, 2009, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/5/2009. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
2009-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference originally set for 10/23/2009 is RESCHEDULED for 11/16/2009 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
2009-10-19Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference originally set for 11/16/2009 is RESCHEDULED for 11/17/2009 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
2009-11-13Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference originally set for 11/17/2009 at 4:00 PM has been rescheduled for 11/23/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
2009-11-20Set/Reset Hearings: The status conference set for November 23, 2009, is RESCHEDULED for December 1, 2009, at 4:00 pm in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard Leon. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
2009-12-01Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 12/1/2009. Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's opposition due by 12/14/2009. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
2009-12-14101REPLY to opposition to motion re 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit 7th Morley Declaration)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
2010-03-31102MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/30/10. (kc ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
2010-03-31103FINAL JUDGMENT, For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion entered this date, it is hereby, ORDERED that defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment 88 is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 95 is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of the defendant, and the case is dismissed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/30/10. (see final judgment.) (kc ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
2010-04-08104Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
2010-04-12MINUTE ORDER granting 104 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Move for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the plaintiff's petition for attorneys' fees and costs is due no later than May 30, 2010. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/9/2010. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
2010-04-14Set/Reset Deadlines: plaintiff's petition for attorneys' fees and costs due by 5/30/2010. (kc ) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
2010-05-27105NOTICE OF APPEAL by JEFFERSON MORLEY re 102 Memorandum Opinion and 103 Final Judgment. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2194061. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Lesar, James) Modified to add links on 5/28/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 05/27/2010)
2010-05-28106Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 105 Notice of Appeal,. (znmw, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
2010-06-01107MOTION for Attorney Fees by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James H. Lesar, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 1--List of Published Cases, # 3 Exhibit Itemization of Time, # 4 Exhibit Chart of Attorney's Fees)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
2010-06-03USCA Case Number 10-5161 for 105 Notice of Appeal, filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (znmw, ) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
2010-06-16108Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Fees by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
2010-06-21MINUTE ORDER granting 108 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the defendant shall have until July 2, 2010, to file its opposition to the plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/18/2010. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
2010-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition due by 7/2/2010. (kc ) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
2010-07-02109Memorandum in opposition to re 107 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
2010-07-09110MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
2010-07-19111REPLY to opposition to motion re 107 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Affidavit Morley Attorney Fee Declaration)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
2010-07-20112NOTICE re 111 of Filing of Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees in Corrected Form by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Reply Brief, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Affidavit Morley Attorney Fees Declaration)(Lesar, James) Modified to add link on 7/21/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 07/20/2010)
2010-07-21MINUTE ORDER granting 110 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/20/2010. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
2010-07-28113NOTICE of Filing of filing of Supplemental Lesar Declaration by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Lesar Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Chart of Fees, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2--Chart of Fees, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3--Itemization of Time)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
2010-09-29114Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proposed Surreply, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
2010-10-04MINUTE ORDER granting 114 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Surreply. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/4/2010. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
2010-10-04115SURREPLY to re 107 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
2010-10-09116Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Surreply by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/09/2010)
2010-10-13MINUTE ORDER granting 116 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Surreply on or before October 18, 2010. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's unopposed motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response to defendant's surreply no later than October 18, 2010. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/13/2010. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
2010-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Surreply due by 10/18/2010. (kc ) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
2010-10-26117ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 116 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Surreply filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Response to CIA's Surreply, # 2 Affidavit Second Supplemental Lesar Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Eighth Morley Declaration)(Lesar, James) Modified on 10/27/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 10/26/2010)
2010-10-27NOTICE OF ERROR re 117 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to jlesar@mindspring.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Entered in Error; Please refile as a MOTION for Leave to File. (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
2010-10-28118Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Surreply Out-of-Time by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Response to Surreply, # 2 Affidavit Eighth Declaration of Jefferson Morley, # 3 Affidavit Second Supplemental Lesar Declaration)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
2010-10-28MINUTE ORDER granting 118 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response to Central Intelligence Agency's Surreply, Time Having Expired. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/28/2010. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
2010-10-28119SURREPLY to re 115 Surreply re 107 Motion for Attorney's Fees filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Eigth Declaration of Jefferson Morley, # 2 Second Supplemental Declaration of James H. Lesar)(znmw, ) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
2011-12-15120MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/14/2011. (kc ) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
2011-12-15121ORDER denying 107 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/14/2011. (see order) (kc ) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
2012-02-09122NOTICE OF APPEAL re 121 ORDER denying 107 Motion for Attorney Fees by JEFFERSON MORLEY. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2824391. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Lesar, James) . (Entered: 02/10/2012)
2012-02-10123Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 122 Notice of Appeal. (jf, ) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
2012-02-13USCA Case Number 12-5032 for 122 Notice of Appeal filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (jf, ) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
2012-06-21124MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to USCA Case Number ; ORDFERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part, vacated in part and remanded. USCA Case Number 10-5161. (mmh) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
2012-07-11125ORDER of USCA as to 122 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY ; USCA Case Number 12-5032. ORDERED that the motion for summary affirmance be denied. (ls, ) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
2012-08-03126ORDER, Ordered that the defendant, within 30 days of the issuance of this Order, shall file an appropriate supplemental declaration, and, if necessary, changes to its Vaughan index, concerning the documents previously withheld under FOIA Exemption 2. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/2/2012. (see order) (kc ) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-31127Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
2012-09-04MINUTE ORDER granting 127 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that defendant shall have up to and including September 18, 2012 to file the appropriate supplemental declaration and Vaughan index. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/4/12. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
2012-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines: defendants supplemental declaration and Vaughn Index due by 9/18/2012. (kc ) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
2012-09-18128NOTICE of Filing Declaration by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 126 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
2013-01-11129MEMORANDUM ORDER. Ordered that the above-captioned case be DISMISSED AS MOOT Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/9/2013. (see memorandum order) (kc ) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
2013-07-22130NOTICE of Change of Address by James H. Lesar (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
2013-08-20Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/26/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc ) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
2013-08-20131Consent MOTION Reschedule Status Conference by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
2013-08-20132MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 122 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY ; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgement of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby vacated and the case is remanded for the District Court to apply the four-factor standard in a manner consistant with Davy, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. USCA Case Number 12-5032. (md, ) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
2013-08-21MINUTE ORDER granting 131 Consent Motion to Reschedule Status Conference Date. It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for 8/26/2013 at 2:30 PM is rescheduled to 9/12/2013 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 08/21/2013. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
2013-08-22Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference originally set for 8/26/2013 is rescheduled for 9/12/2013 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
2013-09-09133NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Alcorn on behalf of JEFFERSON MORLEY (Alcorn, Daniel) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
2013-09-12Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 9/12/2013. Plaintiff's Brief on remand is due by 9/24/2013, Defendant's Opposition is due by 10/15/2013, any Reply from Plaintiff is due by 10/25/2013. (Court Reporter Patty A. Gels) (jth) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
2013-09-25134MOTION for Leave to File Award of Attorney Fees Out-of-Time by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
2013-09-25135MOTION for Attorney Fees by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Att. 1--Joannides Travel Rec., # 2 Affidavit Att. 2--Joannides Travel Doc., # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Morley-Dyer (030704), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2--Hereman-Lesar (031105), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3--Koch-Lesar (041222), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4--AUSA Truong (080428), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5--Nelson-Lesar (080806), # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6--Hardy-Lesar (080818), # 9 Declaration Morley Decl. (130925), # 10 Declaration Lesar Decl. (130925), # 11 Declaration Alcorn Decl. (130924))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
2013-10-01136MOTION to Stay due to lapse in funding , MOTION for Extension of Time to File by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
2013-10-02137RESPONSE re 136 MOTION to Stay due to lapse in funding MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Alcorn, Daniel) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
2013-10-30138Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Attorney Fees by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
2013-11-03MINUTE ORDER granting in part, nunc pro tunc, 136 Motion for Stay and Extension of Time to File Response in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc to the extent it requests an extension for filings affected by the government shutdown; and it is further ordered that the filing deadline for Defendant's response to 135 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees is extended nunc pro tunc by 16 days. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/3/2013. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 11/03/2013)
2013-11-03MINUTE ORDER granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and defendant has up to and including 11/7/2013 to file its response to 135 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/3/2013. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 11/03/2013)
2013-11-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 11/7/2013. (tb, ) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
2013-11-07139Memorandum in opposition re 135 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) Modified event title on 11/8/2013 (znmw, ). (Entered: 11/07/2013)
2013-11-18140REPLY to opposition to motion re 135 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1--JFK Facts article, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2--NARA RIFs on Joannides, # 3 Exhibit Exh. 3--Wind-JHL (110113), # 4 Exhibit Exh. 4 (Megan Rose Oral Argument))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
2013-12-04141MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees, # 2 Exhibit Att. 1--Boston Globe article by Bryan Bender)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
2013-12-05142SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Itemize Additional Attorney Fees filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lesar Decl. on Suppl. Itemization of Attorney's Fees, # 2 Affidavit Alcorn Decl. re Supplemental Itemization)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
2013-12-31143Memorandum in opposition to re 141 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
2014-01-10144REPLY to opposition to motion re 141 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
2014-02-02145NOTICE OF FILING OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY DECIDED AFTER REPLY by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Slip opinion, Eley v. District of Columbia)(Alcorn, Daniel) (Entered: 02/02/2014)
2014-02-02146NOTICE OF FILING OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY- UPDATED by JEFFERSON MORLEY (Alcorn, Daniel) (Entered: 02/02/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff