Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION et al v. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2005cv00152
Date Filed2005-01-21
Date Closed2009-06-11
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffPEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
DefendantNATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [22]
FOIA Project Annotation: In a case involving the alleged influence of social conservatives over the policies of the National Park Service, Judge Emmet Sullivan has decided that individuals who submitted comments to the Park Service concerning its policy deliberations do not have a protectable privacy interest in disclosure of their names. The case involved a suit filed by People for the American Way and Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility for records pertaining to the Park Service's alleged plan to alter an eight-minute video about the Lincoln Memorial after receiving complaints from conservative groups about footage in the existing video that showed gay rights, pro-choice and anti-war demonstrations. The agency released some records but claimed that others were exempt in full or part under Exemption 5 (deliberative process privilege) or Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). The focus of the Exemption 6 arguments concerned the agency's decision to withhold names, addresses and email addresses of individuals who had submitted comments to the Park Service concerning the tape controversy. Agreeing with two district court decisions " Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Dept of Interior, 53 F. Supp. 2d 32 (D.D.C. 1999) and Lardner v. Dept of Justice, 2005 WL 758267 (D.D. C. 2005) " Sullivan pointed out that "disclosing the mere identity of individuals who voluntarily submitted comments regarding the Lincoln video does not raise the kind of privacy concerns protected by Exemption 6. Moreover, the public interest in knowing who may be exerting influence on NPS officials sufficient to convince them to change the video outweighs any privacy interest in one's name." However, after finding that the names of commenters should be disclosed, he then ruled that phone numbers, addresses and email addresses should be withheld. He pointed out that "generally, there is a stronger case to be made for the applicability of Exemption 6 to phone numbers and addresses. . . Although plaintiffs request that the Court compel defendant to produce all documents withheld pursuant to Exemption 6 in their entirety, it is unclear what the public would learn about agency conduct by the disclosure of personal addresses and phone numbers. Plaintiffs argue for disclosure in order to determine which actors are able to exert power over agency decisions, and neither personal addresses nor phone numbers would assist in this determination." The plaintiffs had used Alliance for Wild Rockies to bolster their case concerning the need for disclosure of addresses. In that case, which involved the reintroduction of grizzly bears into the Bitterroot ecosystem, Judge Stanley Sporkin agreed that disclosure of the addresses of commenters should be disclosed so that the plaintiffs could determine "whether the defendants gave greater weight to comments submitted by residents of the Bitterroot region and the outlying regions than to the comments submitted by those who do not live within close proximity to the Bitterroot region." Finding the circumstances in the present case were distinguishable, Sullivan noted that in Alliance for Wild Rockies "the geographical location of each commenter was particularly relevant." But, he observed, "in the present case, plaintiffs have not indicated any apparent significance attached to the individual commenters' geographical locations. Plaintiffs' FOIA request with regard to these Exemption 6 withholdings is concerned with who is able to exert influence on agency decision not where they live." But even more to the point, Sporkin found that people responding to a Federal Register notice's invitation to submit public comments did not have any privacy rights in their identity. Turning to the matter of email addresses, Sullivan noted that "there is very limited case law dealing with the applicability of Exemption 6 to personal e-mail addresses, and neither of the parties have specifically addressed the issue (both argue for complete disclosure or complete exemption with regard to personal information). It is unclear to the Court what public benefit would be gained by disclosure of personal e-mail addresses that would not be gained by the disclosure of the commenters' names." Because of the paucity of case law on the matter, Sullivan left it to the parties to try to resolve the issue after disclosure of the commenters' names. Most of the exemption claims focused on Exemption 5. Perhaps one of the most disappointing aspects of FOIA for requesters is when they try to learn more about what strikes them as egregious and outrageous behavior on the part of the government only to find that much of the discussion of such behavior is legitimately exempt under the deliberative process privilege. To the extent the privilege protects the deliberative process it protects equally those policy discussions that are both appropriate and outrageous. Sullivan had little trouble finding that many of the claims were proper and that some others did not meet the criteria for claiming the privilege. He went through several examples of both, focusing on specific documents the plaintiffs claimed were not covered. One was an email described as an employee's reaction to a request by MSNBC for a live interview concerning the controversy over the Lincoln Memorial video. The plaintiffs argued that this email did not make any recommendations or express an opinion concerning changes in the video. Sullivan, however, accepted the agency's claim, noting that "a perceived reaction to a television show specifically about the Lincoln Memorial video adequately satisfies both the deliberative and predecisional requirements of Exemption 5. The material is predecisional because it involves a reaction, prompted by another employee's question, to the Lincoln Memorial video issue during the time in which defendant was considering revising the video. It is deliberative because it reflects the consultative process between two of defendant's employees addressing a show dealing with the very issue of the Lincoln Memorial videotape and media involvement." Sullivan ruled the other way concerning a list of Lincoln scholars who could be used as experts to consult with the Park Service on the historical accuracy of the video. Relying on Association of National Advertisers v. FTC, 1976 WL 1294 (D.D.C. 1976), in which the court found that disclosure of the names of experts who had been consulted would not harm the deliberative process, Sullivan observed that "the list of potential Lincoln scholars in this case is factual and simply indicates the names of experts who could be 'consult[ed] on historical accuracy.' The list does not reflect the content of any advice rendered. Defendant has not made it clear to the Court how or why the disclosure of the name of a Lincoln historical scholar as a potential expert would harm the agency decision making process."
Issues: Exemption 5 - Privileges - Deliberative process privilege - Deliberative, Exemption 6 - Invasion of privacy
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2005-01-211COMPLAINT against NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Filing fee $ 150) filed by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(lc, ) Modified on 1/24/2005 (lc, ). (Entered: 01/24/2005)
2005-01-21SUMMONS (3) Issued as to NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, ) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
2005-02-012NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Smith on behalf of NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
2005-02-223Joint MOTION For Schedule by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
2005-02-23MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Joint Motion for Schedule. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if, despite using their best efforts to resolve any dispute, a dispute remains as to any withholding, the parties shall so inform the Court and, at that time, propose a schedule for the briefing of the dispute. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's obligation to file an answer or responsive pleading is stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 23, 2005. (lcegs2) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
2005-02-23Case Stayed (clv, ) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
2005-07-224STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
2005-08-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' July 22, 2005 Status Report, and in light of the current posture of the case, the Clerk is directed to remove this case from the active calendar of the Court, subject to reinstatement upon the request of a party. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 29, 2005. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
2005-10-145Joint MOTION for Entry of Briefing Schedule by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/14/2005)
2005-10-18MINUTE ORDER. Granting 5 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. The parties are hereby directed to comply with the following schedule: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is due by November 18, 2005, Defendant's Cross-Motion and Opposition are due by December 23, 2005, Plaintiffs' Opposition and Reply to Defendant's Cross-Motion are due by January 20, 2006, and Defendant's Reply is due by February 3, 2006. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 18, 2005. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
2005-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Summary Judgment motions due by 11/18/2005. defendant's corss motion and Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/23/2005. Plaintiff's opposition and Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/20/2006. Defendant's reply due by 2/3/06. (clv, ) (Entered: 10/19/2005)
2005-10-256MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen Philip Davidson, and Stephanie Kara Vogel,. :Address- DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary US LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10020. Phone No. - (212) 835-6000. Fax No. - (212) 835-6001 by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen P. Davidson# 2 Declaration of Stephanie K. Vogel# 3 Proposed Order)(Moghadam, Sara) (Entered: 10/25/2005)
2005-10-27ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Stephen Philip Davidson and Stephanie Kara Vogel are granted leave to appear. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 27, 2005. (GK, ) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
2005-11-187ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .MOTION to Compel Production of Information Withheld Under FOIA Exemptions 5 and 6 by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Moghadam, Sara) Modified on 11/21/2005 (td, ). (Entered: 11/18/2005)
2005-11-188MOTION to Compel Production of Information Withheld Under FOIA Exemptions 5 and 6 by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 STATEMENT OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel The Production Of Materials# 2 DECLARATION OF STEPHEN P. DAVIDSON# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E (part 1)# 8 Exhibit E (part 2)# 9 Exhibit F# 10 Exhibit G# 11 Exhibit H# 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Moghadam, Sara) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
2005-11-21NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 7 MOTION to Compel Production of Information Withheld Under FOIA Exemptions 5 and 6 was entered in error and refiled as document no. 8 . (td, ) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
2005-12-229Consent MOTION to Reset the Briefing Schedule by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 12/22/2005)
2005-12-23MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Consent Motion to Reset the Briefing Schedule. The parties shall comply with the following briefing schedule: defendant's cross motion and opposition are due no later than January 6, 2006; plaintiffs' opposition and reply are due no later than February 10, 2006; and defendant's reply, if any, is due no later than February 24, 2006. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 23, 2005. (lcegs2) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
2005-12-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/6/2006. Responses due by 2/19/2006 Replies due by 2/24/2006. (clv, ) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
2006-01-0610Second MOTION to Reset the Briefing Schedule by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
2006-01-09MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Consent Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ordered that defendant's cross motion and opposition are due no later than January 13, 2006, plaintiffs' opposition and reply are due no later than February 17, 2006, and defendant's reply, if any, is due no later than March 3, 2006. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 9, 2006. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
2006-01-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/13/2006. Responses due by 2/17/2006 Replies due by 3/3/2006. (clv, ) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
2006-01-1311Memorandum in opposition to re 8 filed by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
2006-01-1312MOTION for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
2006-02-1313MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Set/Reset Deadlines set in the MINUTE ORDER, regarding Briefing Schedule, signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 9, 2006. by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moghadam, Sara) (Entered: 02/13/2006)
2006-02-14MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. It is hereby ordered that plaintiff's reply and opposition are due no later than March 7, 2006, and defendant's reply, if any, is due no later than March 24, 2006. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 14, 2006. (lcegs2) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
2006-02-14Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set Deadlines/Hearings: Responses due by 3/7/2006 Replies due by 3/24/2006. (clv, ) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
2006-03-0714ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE to DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AS TO WHICH THERE IS NO GENUINE ISSUE AND STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AS TO WHICH THERE EXISTS A GENUINE ISSUE NECESSARY TO BE LITIGATED filed by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Moghadam, Sara) Modified on 3/8/2006 (nmw, ). (Entered: 03/07/2006)
2006-03-0715ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE to the motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant National Parks Service, by RULE 56(f) DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE K. VOGEL filed by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Moghadam, Sara) Modified on 3/8/2006 (nmw, ). (Entered: 03/07/2006)
2006-03-0716Memorandum in opposition to re 12 and STATEMENT OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Moghadam, Sara) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2006 (nmw, ). (Entered: 03/07/2006)
2006-03-0717REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Compel Production of Information Withheld Under FOIA Exemptions 5 and 6 filed by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Please see Document No. 16 for scanned image). (nmw, ) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
2006-03-08NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. 14 and 15 were entered in error as separate Responses and have been added to the Memorandum in Opposition entry (Document No. 16). (nmw, ) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
2006-03-2118Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
2006-03-23MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendant's reply is due no later than March 31, 2006. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 23, 2006. (lcegs2) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
2006-03-3119REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
2006-04-0520NOTICE by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE re 19 Reply to opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cover Letter)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
2007-08-2721ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 12 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; directing parties to file joint report and recommendation for further proceedings by October 15, 2007. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 27, 2007. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
2007-08-2722MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 27, 2007. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
2007-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/15/2007. (clv, ) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
2007-09-1923NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Elmore Haynes on behalf of NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
2007-10-1524Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
2007-10-16MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Status Report. The Parties' Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than October 25, 2007. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 16, 2007. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
2007-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/25/2007. (clv, ) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
2007-10-2525STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Moghadam, Sara) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
2007-10-26MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' request in their Joint Status Report, the Court schedules a status hearing for November 15, 2007 at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 26, 2007. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
2007-10-2626NOTICE OF APPEAL by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
2007-10-29Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 26 Notice of Appeal (jf, ) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
2007-10-30Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/15/2007 11:45 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, ) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
2007-11-01USCA Case Number 07-5355 for 26 Notice of Appeal filed by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (jf, ) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
2007-11-15Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : Status Conference held on 11/15/2007.Status Conference set for 12/6/2007 12:30 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Court Reporter JACKIE SULLIVAN.) (clv, ) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
2007-12-0527Consent MOTION for Change of the Date of the Status Hearing by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
2007-12-05MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Consent Motion to change the date of Status Hearing. The Status Hearing currently scheduled for December 6, 2007 is VACATED and a new status hearing is set for January 9, 2008 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 5, 2007. (lcegs2) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
2007-12-06Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/9/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, ) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
2008-01-09Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : Status Conference held on 1/9/2008.Status Conference set for 2/27/2008 12:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Court Reporter JACKIE SULLIVAN.) (clv, ) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
2008-02-26MINUTE ORDER granting oral consent motion to continue status hearing. The status hearing currently scheduled for February 27, 2008 is VACATED and a new status hearing will be held on April 7, 2008 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 26, 2008. (lcegs2) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
2008-02-26Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/7/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, ) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
2008-04-0328Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Status Hearing Currently Set for April 7 by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
2008-04-04MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The status hearing scheduled for April 7, 2008 is VACATED and a new status hearing shall be held on April 29, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 4, 2008.(lcegs2) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
2008-04-04Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/29/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, ) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
2008-04-30Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 4/30/2008, Status Conference set for 6/19/2008 11:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. OTBP (Court Reporter ANNIE SHAW.) (clv, ) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
2008-06-1230ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 26 Notice of Appeal filed by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. That the appellant's motion to dismiss be granted, and this case is hereby dismissed. (erd) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
2008-06-1829Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold the Next Status Hearing by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
2008-06-20MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Hold Status Hearing. The Court will hold a status hearing in this case on July 17, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 20, 2008.(lcegs2) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
2008-06-24Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/17/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, ) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
2008-07-1431Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct the Status Hearing in this Case by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
2008-07-14MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to Hold Status Hearing. The status hearing scheduled for July 17, 2008 is canceled and a new status hearing is now scheduled for August 19, 2008 at 12:15 p.m. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 14, 2008.(lcegs2) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
2008-07-14Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/19/2008 12:15 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (dot, ) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
2008-08-08MINUTE ORDER, Status Conference set for 10/10/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. THE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED STATUS HEARING DATE OF 8/19/08 IS VACATED.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/8/08. (clv, ) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
2008-10-08MINUTE ORDER In light of the Court's trial schedule, the Court sua sponte vacates the status conference currently set for October 10, 2008 at 11:00 a.m. The status conference shall now be held on November 19, 2008 at 12:15 p.m. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 8, 2008. (lcegs4) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
2008-10-09Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/19/2008 12:15 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zclv, ) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
2008-11-1032Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold the Status Hearing in this Case by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
2008-11-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 32 the parties' joint request for a continuance, the status hearing currently scheduled for November 19, 2008 is canceled. The parties are directed to appear for a status hearing on January 14, 2008 at 12:15 p.m. in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 13, 2008. (lcegs4) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
2008-11-14Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/14/2009 12:15 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, ) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
2009-01-13ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/10/2009 12:30 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. The previously scheduled Status Hearing date of 1/14/09 is vacated/. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/13/09. (clv, ) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
2009-02-0933Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold the Status Hearing in this Case by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
2009-02-09MINUTE ORDER granting 33 defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The status hearing previously scheduled for February 10, 2009 will now take place on March 3, 2009 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 9, 2009. (lcegs4) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
2009-02-10Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/3/2009 12:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, ) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
2009-03-02MINUTE ORDER. The status hearing previously scheduled for March 3, 2009 at 12:00 p.m. will now take place on March 3, 2009 at 11:30 a.m. Please note the time change. The Court regrets any inconvenience to the parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 2, 2009. (lcegs4) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
2009-03-03Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 3/3/2009, Further Status Conference set for 3/18/2009 05:15 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Court Reporter JACKIE SULLIVAN.) (clv, ) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
2009-03-17MINUTE ORDER, Due to changes in the Court's calendar the Status Conference set for 3/18/2009 is now set for 04:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. PLEASE NOTE THE TIME CHANGE.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/17/09. (clv, ) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
2009-03-18MINUTE ORDER : Due to the Court's Calendar, it is necessary that the Status Hearing scheduled for this afternoon be rescheduled. The Status Conference is now set for 4/22/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/19/09. (clv, ) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
2009-04-22MINUTE ORDER: The Status Hearing scheduled for 4/22/09 at 2:30 is cancelled.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/22/09. (clv, ) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
2009-05-0834STIPULATION of Settlement by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
2009-06-1035STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Agreed to by the Parties by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar