Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. V. UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2006cv00310
Date Filed2006-02-22
Date Closed2009-02-27
JudgeChief Judge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Secret Service for records concerning all White House visitors' logs showing entries and exits by lobbyist Jack Abramoff. Judicial Watch also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [53]
Opinion/Order [55]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Royce Lamberth has issued a series of opinions in consolidated suits brought by CREW and Judicial Watch for access to White House visitors' logs, finding that the Secret Service has so far failed to conduct an adequate search of its records and that its Glomar response covering its Sensitive Security Records is inappropriate and not supported by either Exemption 2 (internal practices and procedures), Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques), or Exemption 7(F) (harm to safety of individual). The agency maintains two systems of records pertaining to access to the White House Complex and the Vice President's Residence. Lamberth found the agency had conducted an adequate search of its Access Control Records because it had been able to search those records for the entire relevant time. Lamberth rejected Judicial Watch's claim that the search was inadequate because it had not uncovered several publicly acknowledged visits by former lobbyist Jack Abramoff. Lamberth pointed out that "despite plaintiff's claims that it is 'astounding' and 'preposterous' that defendant's ACR search would not have uncovered other Abramoff visits, the fact that other records were not produced does not in and of itself show that defendant's search was not reasonable." However, he found the agency had not searched the Workers and Visitors Entry System records because it had contended that such records were presidential records and not agency records. Under an existing agreement, the agency had deleted the WAVES records after a short period of time and transferred them to the White House. Lamberth had already rejected that argument and the D.C. Circuit had found the agency record issue was not currently appealable and sent the case back to Lamberth. As a result, Lamberth indicated that "the transferred and deleted WAVES records are under the Secret Service control and thus are 'agency records' subject to FOIA. Accordingly, for defendant's search to be considered 'reasonable,' it must have included all WAVES records within the relevant time period, rather than only those in defendant's possession at the time plaintiff's request was received." The agency also identified its Sensitive Security Records, which include more in-depth background checks based on a variety of factors, as possibly containing responsive records. However, the agency provided a "neither confirm nor deny" response. Rejecting the Glomar response, Lamberth noted that "it is hard to imagine how knowledge that SSRs exist for certain individuals could be used to piece together the reasons why those SSR investigations were triggered." Lamberth rejected the Exemption 2 claim, pointing out that "any visitor for whom an SSR record is created has innumerable characteristics"family and other relationships, educational and employment history, and psychological profile, just to name a few"such that it is inconceivable that their names, dates of visits and persons visited would allow one to deduce what triggered the SSR checks (even if one has outside knowledge of the relevant people and facts)."
Issues: Adequacy - Search, Determination - Glomar response
Opinion/Order [57]
Opinion/Order [59]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2006-02-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Filing fee $ 250) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(tg, ) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
2006-02-222LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (tg, ) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
2006-02-22Summons (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, ) Modified on 2/23/2006 (tg, ). (Entered: 02/23/2006)
2006-03-163NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Orfanedes on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
2006-03-164"WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER 4/25/2006"--- MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Farrell (Exhibit of Statement of Facts)(Orfanedes, Paul) Modified on 4/25/2006 (rje, ). (Entered: 03/16/2006)
2006-03-285First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, First MOTION for Order Setting Response Date for Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
2006-03-296ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant to file responses to the complaint and to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment on or before April 19, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on March 29, 2006. (lcjgp1) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
2006-04-197STIPULATION and Agreed Order by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
2006-04-258JOINT STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER: Plaintiff withdraws its pending motion for summary judgment. Defendant shall produce any and all documents responsive to plaintiff's 1/20/2006 Freedom of Information Act request without redactions or claims of exemption by 5/10/2006. Defendant shall have until and including 05/15/2006 to file any answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on 4/25/06. (rje) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
2006-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer or responsive pleading to the complaint due by 5/15/2006. (rje) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
2006-05-019NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Aldrich on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Di Liberto, Meredith) Modified on 5/2/2006 (tg, ). (Entered: 05/01/2006)
2006-05-1510MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or First Responsive Pleading by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
2006-05-16MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before May 16, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on May 16, 2006. (lcjgp1) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
2006-05-1611ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Compel Defendant United States Secret Service to Comply with this Court's Order and for Sanctions by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Di Liberto, Meredith) Modified on 5/17/2006 (nmw, ). (Entered: 05/16/2006)
2006-05-1612MOTION to Compel and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Defendant United States Secret Service to Comply with this Court's Order and for Sanctions by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
2006-05-1613ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Sandberg, Justin) Modified on 5/17/2006 (nmw, ). (Entered: 05/16/2006)
2006-05-1614MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Filing Corrected to include declaration by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
2006-05-17NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. 11 and 13 were entered in error and have been refiled as Docuement Nos. 12 and 14, respectively. (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
2006-05-3015Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
2006-05-31MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses to 14 MOTION to Dismiss and 12 MOTION to Compel due on or before June 9, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on May 31, 2006. (lcjgp1) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
2006-06-0116Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION to Compel and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Defendant United States Secret Service to Comply with this Court's Order and for Sanctions filed by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
2006-06-0717Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Filing Corrected to include declaration , 12 MOTION to Compel and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Defendant United States Secret Service to Comply with this Court's Order and for Sanctions /Reply in Support of Motion to Compel filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
2006-06-1318MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
2006-06-15ORDER granting 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Reply due one or before June 23, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on June 15, 2006. (lcjgp1) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
2006-06-2319MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Filing Corrected to include declaration by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
2006-06-27MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc Defendant's 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Reply due on or before June 30, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on June 27, 2006.(lcjgp1) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
2006-06-3020MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
2006-07-0721ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Reply due on or before July 7, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on July 6, 2006. (lcjgp1) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
2006-07-0722REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Filing Corrected to include declaration filed by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
2006-07-0723MEMORANDUM re 12 MOTION to Compel and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Defendant United States Secret Service to Comply with this Court's Order and for Sanctions filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
2006-07-1224MOTION to Strike 23 Memorandum, (Or, In the Alternative, Motion For Leave To Reply) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
2006-07-1225MOTION for Leave to Reply by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (tg, ) (See docket number 24 for scanned document) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
2006-07-1326Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A Response to Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
2006-07-1327ORDER denying 24 Motion to Strike Defendant's July 7, 2006 Amendment, granting 25 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to the Amendment. Response due on or before July 24, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on July 13, 2006.(lcjgp1) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
2006-07-1328ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File. Surreply due on or before July 24, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on July 13, 2006. (lcjgp1) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
2006-07-2429SURREPLY to re 22 Reply to opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
2006-07-2430RESPONSE re 16 Memorandum in Opposition, and Defendant's Amendment to Its Opposition filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
2006-12-1231NOTICE of Filing by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
2007-08-13MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in the process of reviewing a number of cases which have been pending, in some instances, for a considerable period of time. In order to assist the Court with this review, please advise by notice of ECF filing or by letter addressed to Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogans chambers at Room 4012, United States Courthouse, 333 Constitution Ave. N. W., Washington D.C. 20001, no later than September 5, 2007, whether this case has been resolved, become moot, is on appeal, or for any other reason should be closed. If the case should remain in active status, please provide a brief summary of the status of the case, including a listing of any pending motions and indicate as to each motion whether it has become moot or whether it is ripe and requires action by the court. You should include any other information regarding the case that will assist the Court in addressing the outstanding issues. If possible, the parties should submit a joint status report on ECF. If the plaintiff does not respond to this notice on or before September 5, 2007, or indicates that he or she is no longer interested in pursuing the case, the matter may be dismissed by the Court without prejudice. (Signed Chief Judge Hogan on 8/13/07) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
2007-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/5/2007. (adc) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
2007-09-0432STATUS REPORT (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
2007-09-28Case reassigned to Judge Unassigned. Judge John Garrett Penn no longer assigned to the case. (jeb, ) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
2007-10-2533Case Reassigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. Judge Judge John Garrett Penn no longer assigned to the case. (lc, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
2007-10-25MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. The parties' September 4, 2007, joint status report 32 indicates that "Secret Service intends to supplement its filings to reflect recently discovered information relevant to plaintiff's FOIA request." No such supplement has been filed. No later than November 1, 2007, the Secret Service shall show cause why the Court should not treat Plaintiff's motion to compel 12 and Defendant's motion to dismiss 14 as fully briefed and ready for decision. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/25/07. (KD) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
2007-10-25Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Show Cause Order due by 11/1/2007. (cdw) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
2007-11-0134RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE re Order,,. (Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
2007-11-02MINUTE ENTRY ORDER discharging the October 25, 2007 order to show cause. No later than November 30, 2007, Defendant shall file supplemental pleadings or file a notice that no such supplemental pleadings are necessary. In the event that Defendant supplements its pleadings, Plaintiff shall file a response no later than December 14, 2007. Defendant may reply no later than December 21, 2007. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/2/07. (KD) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
2007-11-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Supplemental Pleading due by 11/30/2007. Response due by 12/14/2007, Reply due by 12/21/2007. (tth,) Modified on 11/7/2007 (cdw). (Entered: 11/05/2007)
2007-11-3035MOTION to Consolidate Cases by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
2007-11-3036Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
2007-12-0437Memorandum in opposition to re 35 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
2007-12-0438Memorandum in opposition to re 35 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(nmw, ) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
2007-12-0739MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Material Facts by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 # 2 )(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
2007-12-10MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting 39 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Statement of Material Facts in Support of Defendant's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/10/07. (KD) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
2007-12-1040STATEMENT of Material Facts re 36 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
2007-12-1441Memorandum in opposition to re 36 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment (with Response to Statement of Material Facts) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order)# 2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Deronda K. Grothe)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
2007-12-1442REPLY to opposition to motion re 35 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
2007-12-1743ORDER granting 35 Defendant's Motion to Consolidate Cases. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/17/07. (KD) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
2007-12-17Remark. Case consolidated with case number 06-833 pursuant to Order filed 12/17/2007. All pleadings shall be filed ONLY in case number 06-310. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-00310-RMC, 1:06-cv-00833-ESH(tg, ) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
2007-12-2144REPLY to opposition to motion re 36 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
2007-12-2145Case Reassigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge Rosemary M. Collyer no longer assigned to the case. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
2008-01-0346AMENDED CONSOLIDATION ORDER amending order 43 by correcting a typographical error; the erroneous reference to case number 06-833 has been changed to case number 06-883. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 01/03/2008. (lcrcl1, ) Modified on 1/3/2008 (lcrcl1, ). (Entered: 01/03/2008)
2008-01-04Remark. Case consolidated with case number 06-883 pursuant to Amended Consolidation Order filed 1/3/2008. All pleadings shall be filed ONLY in Lead Case number 06-310. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-00310-RCL, 1:06-cv-00883-RCL (tg, ) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
2008-01-1047RESPONSE to Document 75 in Case No. 06-883 filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2# 2 Statement of Facts Response# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
2008-01-1448Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
2008-01-1549ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/15/2008. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
2008-01-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply due by 1/25/2008. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-00310-RCL, 1:06-cv-00883-RCL(rje) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
2008-01-2550REPLY to opposition to motion (Document 75, Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed in Case Number 06-883) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Sandberg, Justin) Modified to correct linkage on 1/28/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 01/25/2008)
2008-04-1851NOTICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
2008-06-1352NOTICE of Filing by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
2008-09-3053MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/08. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
2008-09-3054ORDER denying 12 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/08. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
2008-09-3055MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/08. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
2008-09-3056ORDER denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/08. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
2008-09-3057MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/08. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
2008-09-3058ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion 45 in No. 06-883 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/08. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
2008-09-3059MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/08. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
2008-09-3060ORDER denying Motion 75 in No. 06-883 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/08. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
2008-09-3061ORDER denying Motion 71 in No. 06-883 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/08. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
2008-10-3162NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brad P. Rosenberg on behalf of all defendants Substituting for attorney Justin Sandberg (Rosenberg, Brad) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
2008-11-2563ORDER for joint status reports. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/25/08. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
2008-12-1064STATUS REPORT (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
2008-12-1065STATUS REPORT (Joint) by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
2009-01-1466STATUS REPORT (Joint) by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
2009-01-1467STATUS REPORT (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
2009-02-1868STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
2009-02-1969STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
2009-02-27MINUTE ORDER granting 68 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/27/09. (rje) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
2009-02-27MINUTE ORDER granting 69 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/27/09. (rje) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar