Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRIEDMAN v. U.S. SECRET SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2006cv02125
Date Filed2006-12-14
Date Closed2014-01-05
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffDONALD M. FRIEDMAN
Case DescriptionDonald Friedman, a state prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Secret Service for records concerning directed energy weapons. The agency failed to respond and Friedman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. SECRET SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [56]
Opinion/Order [87]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Richard Roberts, while upholding the adequacy of the search conducted by the Secret Service and other agencies in response to Donald Friedman's request for information about direct-energy weapons, with which he contended the government had been torturing him for years, has also found that many of the exemption claims made by various agencies are not sufficiently supported. Friedman made his requests in 2006 and filed suit in 2007. As a result, many of the agencies' affidavits supporting their exemption claims dated back to 2007. Friedman claimed that because the agencies had tortured him for years their affidavits supporting their search could not be trusted. But Roberts noted that "the Secret Service's supporting declarations are accorded a presumption of good faith, and plaintiff's conjecture as to covert activity within the agency to prevent FOIA disclosures does not rebut his presumption." Roberts also dismissed Friedman's suggestion that the agency search the computers of various vehicles equipped with direct-energy weapons. The Secret Service said it had no such vehicles and Roberts observed that "vehicles and other equipment are not records under the FOIA, and the Secret Service was under no obligation to search them or to search their contents." Roberts approved the exemption claims of both the Secret Service and the Air Force concerning their withholding of several technical reports under Exemption 1 (national security). He found the agencies' Exemption 2 (internal practices and procedures) claims were no longer valid since Milner. Although Raytheon Company had claimed that several pages of records that originated with the company were protected by Exemption 4 (confidential business information), Roberts indicated that "while Raytheon articulates a rationale for withholding information under Exemption 4, the Secret Service offers no explanation of its own reasons for withholding information from the Raytheon records under any of the exemptions. For this reason, the Court defers consideration of all the exemptions claimed with respect to the Raytheon documents." Several agencies had withheld any personal information appearing in the records under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Roberts rejected such a broad application. He pointed out that "plaintiff's request is designed primarily to obtain information about directed energy weapons and electromagnetic radiation-emitting devices. He does not seek information about a particular individual, and none of the responsive records was retrieved using the name of or any identifying information about a particular person. In this case, information about third parties happens to have been found in the responsive records and does not appear to contain personal or intimate information about these third parties. For example, the names of government employees and servicemembers and their work telephone numbers are withheld. Such information ordinarily is not considered 'similar files' for purposes of Exemption 6. Nor is correspondence subject to redaction under Exemption 6 'solely because it identifies government employees.'" Roberts also questioned the agencies' Exemption 7 (law enforcement records) claims. Acknowledging that a law enforcement agency's claims of Exemption 7 were entitled to deference, he noted that "deference does not amount to blind acceptance of the agency's assertions. This is not the typical case where the requester sought records about his own criminal prosecution. . .Here it appears that the Secret Service relies on its status as a law enforcement agency to withhold records that it deems 'of a research nature,' and thus may not be related directly to a law enforcement purpose." As to the Justice Department, Roberts indicated that "without a fuller description of the records at issue and more than a conclusory statement of its decision to withhold information, the DOJ fails to demonstrate that the information withheld falls within the scope of Exemption 7 generally or that it is exempt from disclosure under Exemption 7(E) (investigatory methods and techniques) specifically."
Issues: Adequacy - Search, Exemption 4 - Confidential business information, Exemption 6 - Invasion of privacy
Opinion/Order [101]
Opinion/Order [114]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2006-12-141COMPLAINT against U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
2006-12-14SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
2006-12-142NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to: Case No. CA-06-169. (jf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
2006-12-143MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
2006-12-144PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
2006-12-145ORDER Directing Monthly Payments in the amount of $ 4.40 be made from Prison Account of Donald M. Friedman; further ordered, granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/23/06. (jf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
2006-12-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/22/06., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. SECRET SERVICE served on 12/22/2006, answer due 2/20/2007., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. U.S. SECRET SERVICE served on 12/22/2006, answer due 2/20/2007 (jf, ) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
2007-01-197MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support Therof by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
2007-02-078AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. SECRET SERVICE filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A thru D)(jf, ) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
2007-02-23MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 7 Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc. The U.S. SECRET SERVICE's answer or other response to the complaint, as amended, is due by 2/28/2007. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/22/07. (ms, ) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
2007-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/28/2007. (lin, ) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
2007-03-029MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
2007-03-0210ERRATA by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN 8 Amended Complaint filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN,. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
2007-03-1511MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support Thereof by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
2007-03-1512Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
2007-04-0213MOTION for Leave to Late File opposition to defendant's motion for 45 day stay by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Opposition)(td, ) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
2007-04-3014MOTION to Stay by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
2007-05-0115ORDER denying 11 defendant's Motion to Stay, and granting plaintiff's 13 Motion for Leave to File his opposition to defendant's motion to stay. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/30/07. (ms, ) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
2007-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 5/6/2007. (lin, ) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
2007-05-0316NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
2007-05-0317MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion or Proposed Order by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
2007-05-1818NOTICE of Filing Proposed Schedule Pursuant to the Court's May 1, 2007 Order by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
2007-05-1819Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion or Proposed Order , 14 MOTION to Stay filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
2007-05-2320NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
2007-05-3021ORDER granting 9 nunc pro tunc defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file an Answer, denying 14 defendant's Motion to Stay, granting 17 nunc pro tunc defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, and setting schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/29/07. (ms, ) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
2007-06-1122MOTION for Re-service by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (tg, ) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
2007-06-2823NOTICE to the Court Regarding Re-Service on Plaintiff of Defendant's Proposed Briefing Schedule by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
2007-06-2924NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
2007-07-1125NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by Kenneth Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. SECRET SERVICE Substituting for attorney Beverly Russell (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
2007-08-2726NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
2007-08-2727MOTION to Compel by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf, ) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
2007-08-3128MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
2007-09-2229ORDER denyinging as moot 22 plaintiff's motion re-service and granting 28 defendant's motion to amend the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/21/07. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/22/2007)
2007-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2007.,Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/26/2007.,Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2007.,Response to motion to compel due by 9/28/07; Reply due by 10/26/2007. (lin, ) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
2007-09-2830MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Dispositive Motion by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
2007-10-0231ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA to Motion for Extension by U.S. SECRET SERVICE 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Dispositive Motion filed by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) Modified on 10/3/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 10/02/2007)
2007-10-0232MOTION (Corrected) to Amend Briefing Schedule by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (nmw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
2007-10-03NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 31 was entered in error as an errata and has been refiled as Docket Entry 32 MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule. (nmw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
2007-10-2233MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
2007-10-24MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 30 Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/23/07. (ms, ) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
2007-10-2634MOTION for Extension of Time for reservice by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
2007-10-26NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (See Docket Entry 34 to view document). (jf, ) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
2007-11-0935ORDER granting the parties' unopposed 33 34 Motions for Extensions of Time, denying as moot defendant's 32 Motion to Amend/Correct, and setting new filing deadlines for motions, oppositions, and replies. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/9/07. (ms, ) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
2007-11-1636NOTICE OF RESERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
2007-11-2737MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
2007-12-0438ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) Modified on 12/6/2007 (ztd, ). (Entered: 12/04/2007)
2007-12-0439Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION to Compel filed by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (See Docket Entry 40 to view document). (nmw, ) Modified on 12/6/2007 (nmw, ). Modified link on 12/10/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 12/05/2007)
2007-12-04NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading attaching the motion as the main document. (td, ) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
2007-12-0640MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
2007-12-20MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 37 Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/20/07. (ms, ) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
2007-12-2041Order advising plaintiff to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment by 1/22/2008, or Court may deem the motion conceded. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/20/07. (ms, ) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
2008-01-0342MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment and defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (td, ) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
2008-01-28MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's unopposed 42 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and his opposition to defendant's motion is due by February 4, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/25/08. (ms, ) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
2008-01-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/4/2008 (lin, ) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
2008-02-0443MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
2008-02-0444NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
2008-02-15MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's unopposed 43 Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc, and his opposition to defendant's motion shall be filed by March 7, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/15/08. (ms, ) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
2008-02-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/7/2008 (lin, ) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
2008-03-1045MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 27 MOTION to Compel, and 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
2008-03-17MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Compel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/17/08. (ms, ) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
2008-03-31MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's unopposed 45 Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc, and his opposition shall be filed by 3/28/08. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/28/08. (ms, ) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
2008-04-0146MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to defendants' motion for summary judgment by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
2008-04-17MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc, and his opposition to defendant's summary judgment motion is due by May 30, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/17/08. (ms, ) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
2008-05-0247Memorandum in opposition to re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. "Let this be filed" by Judge Richard W. Roberts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf, ) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
2008-05-0248NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (See Page #41 of Docket Entry 47 to view document). (jf, ) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
2008-05-0249MOTION for in camera review of records by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. "Let this be filed" Judge Richard W. Roberts. (See Docket Entry 47 to view document) (jf, ) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
2008-05-2250First MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
2008-06-10MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed 50 Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc, and the Reply shall be filed by July 2, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/9/08. (ms, ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
2008-06-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 7/2/2008. (lin, ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
2008-07-0151Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
2008-07-03MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's consent 51 motion for an extension of time is granted, and defendant's reply shall be filed by August 1, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/2/08. (ms, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
2008-07-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 8/1/2008. (lin, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
2008-07-3152MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
2008-08-20MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed 52 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its Reply is due by September 2, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/19/08. (ms, ) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
2008-08-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 9/2/2008. (lin, ) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
2008-09-0153MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/01/2008)
2008-09-1654REPLY to opposition to motion re 49 MOTION for in camera review of records, 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig W. Ulmer)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
2008-09-1855ERRATA by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
2008-11-2456ORDER denying without prejudice defendant's 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice plaintiff's 49 Motion in camera review; granting nunc pro tunc defendant's 53 Motion for Extension of Time, and ordering defendant to file a renewed summary judgment motion within 45 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/21/08. (ms, ) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
2009-01-0757First MOTION for Extension of Time to Renew Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
2009-01-12MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed 57 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its renewed summary judgment motion is due by February 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/9/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
2009-02-0658MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renew Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
2009-02-09MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed 58 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its renewed motion for summary judgment is due by February 24, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/9/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
2009-02-2059MOTION for Extension of Time to Renew Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
2009-02-24MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed 59 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its renewed summary judgment motion is due by March 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/24/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
2009-03-0660MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
2009-03-1761MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
2009-04-02MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed 60 Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/1/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
2009-04-02MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 61 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its renewed summary judgment motion shall be filed by April 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/1/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
2009-04-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 4/14/2009. (zlin, ) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
2009-04-1362MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
2009-04-2163MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
2009-05-0464MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
2009-05-05MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 62 63 Motions for Extension of Time are granted. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/5/2009. (ms, ) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
2009-05-1865MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renew Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
2009-05-2666MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renew Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
2009-06-10MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed 64 65 66 Motions for Extensions of Time are granted, and its renewed motion for summary judgment is due by June 12, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/10/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
2009-06-1167MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
2009-06-2968MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
2009-07-2069MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
2009-08-12MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 67 68 69 Motions for Extensions of Time are granted, and its renewed motion for summary judgment is due by August 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/11/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
2009-08-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 8/20/2009. (hs) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
2009-08-1970MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
2009-09-0371MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
2009-09-08MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 70 Motion for an Extension of Time is granted. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/8/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
2009-09-1472RENEWED MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit 1-4, # 3 Exhibit 5-10)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) . (Entered: 09/14/2009)
2009-09-18MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 71 Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/18/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
2009-09-1873Order advising plaintiff to respond to defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment by 10/16/2009, or the Court will treat the motion as conceded. Defendant shall file its reply, if any, by 10/30/09. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/18/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
2009-09-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 10/16/2009, Defendant's Reply due by 10/30/2009. (hs) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
2009-10-1974MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 RENEWED MOTION for Summary Judgment by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
2009-11-02MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and his opposition to 72 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 11/6/2009. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/30/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
2009-11-0675Memorandum in opposition to re 72 Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
2009-11-0676MOTION for Order related to the defendant's misuse of the (c)(1) exclusion, for in camera review of all records by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
2009-11-1877First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
2009-12-04MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 77 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its Reply is due by December 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/4/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
2009-12-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply due by 12/22/2009. (hs) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
2009-12-2178MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
2010-01-07MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 78 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its Reply is due by January 19, 2010. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/6/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
2010-01-07Set/Reset Deadlines Defendant's Reply due by 1/19/2010. (hs) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
2010-01-1979MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
2010-01-2780MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
2010-02-1281MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
2010-03-0582REPLY to opposition to motion re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
2010-03-09MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 79 80 81 Motions for an Extension of Time to file a Reply, to which plaintiff did not consent, are granted. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/8/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
2010-09-1083MOTION for more expeditious treatment of the aforecaptioned case by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
2011-03-3084ORDER denying 76 plaintiffs Motion for Order Related to AgencysMisuse of FOIA (c)(1) Exclusion and Motion for In Camera Review of All Agency Records. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/30/11. (ms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
2011-12-2385MOTION for immediate relief by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
2012-04-2686NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
2013-02-1587MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. #72]; denying plaintiff's Motion for Order Related to the Defendant=s Misuse of the (c)(1) Exclusion, and Motion for In Camera Review of All Records [Dkt. #76]; and granting plaintiff's Motion for More Expeditious Treatment of the Aforecaptioned Case [Dkt. #83] and Motion for Immediate Relief [Dkt. #85]. Not later than April 1, 2013, defendant shall file a renewed motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/14/13. (ms, ) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
2013-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Renewed Summary Judgment motion due by 4/1/2013. (hs) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
2013-04-0188First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
2013-04-05Case directly reassigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Judge Richard W. Roberts no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
2013-04-25MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 88 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its renewed motion for summary judgment is due by June 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/24/13. (ms, ) Modified on 4/29/2013 (ms, ). (Entered: 04/25/2013)
2013-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Summary Judgment motion due by 6/4/2013. (gdf) Modified on 4/29/2013 (ms, ). (Entered: 04/25/2013)
2013-06-0389Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Dispositive Motion by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
2013-06-05MINUTE ORDER: The defendant's consent 89 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its renewed motion for summary judgment is due by July 16, 2013. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/4/13. (ms, ) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
2013-06-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Summary Judgment motion due by 7/16/2013. (gdf) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
2013-07-1690MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
2013-07-17MINUTE ORDER granting 90 Motion for Extension of Time. Renewed motion for summary judgment due by 8/30/2013. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/17/2013. (lckbj1,) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
2013-08-2991MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
2013-08-30MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's motion for extension of time 91 , to which plaintiff does not consent, is granted. Its renewed motion for summary judgment is due by September 30, 2013. No further extensions of time will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/30/13. (ms, ) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
2013-09-1992Mail Returned as undeliverable. sent to Donald M. Friedman; Type of Document Returned: Minute Order filed on 8/30/13; Resent to address: 340 Travis Blvd, Ste 2, Fairfied, CA 94533-3836. (gdf) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
2013-09-3093Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment , MOTION to Stay by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
2013-10-01MINUTE ORDER granting 93 Motion to Stay in light of lapse of appropriations. For good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED. Counsel for Defendant shall notify the Court as soon as Congress has appropriated funds for the Department of Justice; at that point, the Court will enter an order resetting the applicable deadlines, which will be extended day-for-day with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/1/2013. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
2013-10-1794Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
2013-10-1895Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
2013-10-18MINUTE ORDER. Defendant has provided notice that appropriations for funding the Department of Justice and U.S. Secret Service have been restored. (ECF No. 94.) Pursuant to the Court's order of October 1, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is no longer stayed. Upon consideration of Defendant's 95 Motion for Extension of Time to file a renewed motion for summary judgment, it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its renewed motion for summary judgment on or before October 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/18/2013. (lckbj3) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
2013-10-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Summary Judgment motion due by 10/22/2013. (gdf) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
2013-10-2296MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Renewed) by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit A-C)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
2013-10-2397Order advising plaintiff to respond by 11/22/2013 to Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/23/13. (ms, ) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
2013-10-2898Mail Returned as undeliverable sent to Donald M. Friedman. Type of Document Returned: Minute Order filed on 10/18/13; Resent at new address: 340 Travis Blvd, Ste 2, Fairfied, CA 94533-3836. (gdf) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
2013-10-2999Mail Returned as undeliverable. sent to Donald M. Friedman; Type of Document Returned: Order, Document 97 filed on 10/23/13; Resent at new address: 340 Travis Blvd, Ste 2, Fairfield, CA 94533-3836. (gdf) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
2013-11-25100MOTION to Continue by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
2013-12-05MINUTE ORDER: "[T]he court may, for good cause, extend the time... if a request is made, before the original time... expires." Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(A). Because plaintiff does not show good cause for an extension of time for the filing of his opposition to defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment, his 100 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/4/13. (ms, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
2013-12-31103MOTION for Extension of Time, MOTION for Reconsideration by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
2014-01-02101MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/2/14. (ms, ) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
2014-01-02102ORDER denying 96 without prejudice defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing this complaint and civil action. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/2/14. (ms, ) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
2014-01-17104ORDER vacating January 2, 2014 Memorandum and Dismissal Order [ECF Nos. 101-102], reopening case, directing defendant to re-serve its motion on plaintiff at his current address of record by Jan. 24, 2014, and granting plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to Feb. 24, 2014, to file his opposition to Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 97]. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/17/14. (ms, ) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
2014-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/17/2014. (gdf) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
2014-01-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to the Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/24/2014. (gdf) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
2014-03-04105Memorandum in opposition to re 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Renewed) filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
2014-03-04106MOTION for Order, MOTION for in camera review of records, MOTION for Reconsideration by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
2014-03-18107First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
2014-03-27MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 107 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its Reply is due by April 11, 2014. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/27/14. (ms, ) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
2014-03-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 4/11/2014. (gdf) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
2014-04-11108REPLY to opposition to motion re 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Renewed) filed by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
2014-04-11109Memorandum in opposition to re 106 MOTION for Order MOTION for in camera review of records MOTION for Reconsideration filed by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff