Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUrban Radio I, L.L.C. v. Federal Communications Commission
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2008cv05176
Date Filed2008-06-05
Date Closed2009-05-05
JudgeJudge Robert P. Patterson
PlaintiffUrban Radio I, L.L.C.
DefendantFederal Communications Commission
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2008-06-051COMPLAINT against Federal Communications Commission. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 653207) Document filed by Urban Radio I, L.L.C.(db) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2008: # 1 Exhibit) (mbe). (Entered: 06/05/2008)
2008-06-05Case Designated ECF. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
2008-06-05Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
2008-06-052RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Urban Radio, L.L.C., ICBC Broadcast Holdings, Inc., Inner City Media Corporation and Inner City Broadcasting Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Urban Radio I, L.L.C.(db) (mbe). (Entered: 06/05/2008)
2008-06-05SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Communications Commission. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
2008-06-303AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Federal Communications Commission on 6/10/08. Service was accepted by Donna Monroe, Gen. Clerk, II. Service was made by Hand. Document filed by Urban Radio I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Service on U.S. Attorney in New York, # 2 Affidavit re Service on U.S. Attorney in Washington, D.C.)(Irish, Corrine) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
2008-07-074ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson from Wendy H. Waszmer dated 7/3/08 Counsel requests a 30-day extension of time, from July 7, 2008 until August 4, 2008 to respond to plaintiffs complaint in this case. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendants time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 8/6/08. So ordered. Federal Communications Commission answer due 8/6/2008. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 7/7/08) (mme) . (Entered: 07/07/2008)
2008-07-215MOTION for Charles D. Tobin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, w/ attch Affidavit in support. Document filed by Urban Radio I, L.L.C..(pl) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
2008-07-28CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 7/21/08, Receipt Number 657194. (Quintero, Marcos) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
2008-08-046ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Federal Communications Commission.(Waszmer, Wendy) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
2008-08-047ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CHARLES D. TOBIN granting 5 Motion for Charles D. Tobin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 8/4/08) (mme) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
2008-08-04Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (mme) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
2008-09-10Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert P. Patterson: Pretrial Conference held on 9/10/2008. (cd) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
2008-09-258ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson from Wendy H. Waszmer dated 9/24/2008 re: The FCC proposes the following revised briefing schedule, as follows: FCC's motion for summary judgment due 10/10/2008; plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment due 11/7/2008 ; FCC's reply and opposition to plaintiffs cross-motion due 11/21/2008 ; plaintiffs reply in support of cross-motion due 12/12/2008. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 9/25/2008) (jpo) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
2008-10-109MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Federal Communications Commission.(Waszmer, Wendy) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
2008-10-1010MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Federal Communications Commission. (Waszmer, Wendy) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
2008-10-1011DECLARATION of HILLARY S. DE NIGRO in Support re: 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Federal Communications Commission. (Waszmer, Wendy) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
2008-10-1012DECLARATION of WILLIAM KNOWLES-KELLETT in Support re: 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Federal Communications Commission. (Waszmer, Wendy) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
2008-10-1013DECLARATION of PATRICIA T. QUARTEY in Support re: 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Federal Communications Commission. (Waszmer, Wendy) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
2008-10-1014RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Federal Communications Commission. (Waszmer, Wendy) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
2008-11-0715CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Urban Radio I, L.L.C.. Responses due by 11/21/2008(Irish, Corrine) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
2008-11-0716MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 15 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment., 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Memorandum in Opposition . Document filed by Urban Radio I, L.L.C.. (Irish, Corrine) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
2008-11-0717DECLARATION of Leighton T. Brown in Support re: 15 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Urban Radio I, L.L.C.. (Irish, Corrine) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
2008-11-0718DECLARATION of Charles R. Naftalin in Support re: 15 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment., 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Urban Radio I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Irish, Corrine) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
2008-11-0719RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Urban Radio I, L.L.C.. (Irish, Corrine) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
2008-11-2120REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment. , and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Federal Communications Commission. (Waszmer, Wendy) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
2008-11-2121DECLARATION of WILLIAM KNOWLES-KELLETT (SECOND DECLARATION) in Support re: 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Federal Communications Commission. (Waszmer, Wendy) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
2008-12-1222REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 15 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Urban Radio I, L.L.C.. (Irish, Corrine) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
2009-01-2327LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson from Corrine A. Irish dated 1/23/09 re: Counsel represents the Plaintiff in this Freedom of Information Act Litigation, which is on the Courts calendar for oral argument on February 19th on the parties cross-motion for summary judgment. In advance of that argument, counsel brings to the Court attention a directive, entitled Memorandum for the Heads of Executive Departments and Agencies, issued by President Barack Obama on January 21, 2009. (mme) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
2009-02-1923ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson from Wendy H. Waszmer dated 2/19/09 re: Counsel for Defendant FCC write on behalf of both parties to request a two-week adjournment of the oral argument currently scheduled for 2/20/09, at 10:00 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Argument adjourned to 3/18/09 at 4PM. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 2/19/09) (tro) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
2009-03-1324ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson from Wendy H. Waszmer dated 3/13/2009 re: Requesting an adjournment of the oral argument scheduled for March 18, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Oral argument March 18, 2009 is adjourned sine die. The parties are to advise the Court by March 27, 2009 whether a settlement has been reached. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 3/13/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
2009-03-2725ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson from Wendy H. Waszmer dated 3/27/09 re: Counsel requests an additional week, until April 3, 2009, to continue their discussions prior to the scheduling of any oral argument. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 3/27/09) (mme) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
2009-04-0326ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson from Brian M. Feldman dated 4/3/09 re: The Government respectfully requests an additional week and a half, until April 15, 2009, to continue discussions with Plaintiff prior to the scheduling of any oral argument. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 4/3/09) (db) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
2009-04-1628LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson from Brian M. Feldman dated 4/15/09 re: Counsel for the Defendant Federal Communications Commission write respectfully to advise the Court on the status of the parties' settlement negotiations in this matter. The parties will inform the Court promptly if the stipulation cannot be finalized. Document filed by Federal Communications Commission.(tro) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
2009-05-0529STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The FCC shall pay to Plaintiff, subject to the reinstatement provision of paragraph 3 below, the sum of $30,000 in attorneys' fees and litigation costs, pursuant to 5 U.S.C 552(a)(4)(E) which sum plaintiff agrees to accept as full payment of any attorneys' fees and costs that Plaintiff has incurred or will incur in connection with this action. The FCC shall make such payment, subject to the reinstatement provision of paragraph 3. Plaintiff hereby dismisses with prejudice, subject to the reinstatement provision of paragraph 3 below, any and all claims is no has or may hereafter acquire against the FCC or the United States of America, or any department, agency, officer, or employee of the FCC and/or the United States, related to or arising out of the Indecency Request or the Sponsorship Identification Request at issue in this action, or any subsequent FOIA request seeking the records sought by the Indecency Request or the Sponsorship Identification Request at issue in this action. All other provisions as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 5/4/09) (js) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff