Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOhio/Oklahoma Hearst-Argyle Television, Inc. v. U.S. Marshals Service et al
DistrictSouthern District of Ohio
CityCincinnati
Case Number1:2008cv00663
Date Filed2008-09-25
Date Closed2008-10-21
JudgeJudge Sandra S Beckwith
PlaintiffOhio/Oklahoma Hearst-Argyle Television, Inc.
doing business as WLWT-TV
DefendantU.S. Marshals Service
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2008-09-25Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 100CIN003136. (mr1, ) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
2008-09-251COMPLAINT against U.S. Marshals Service and U.S. Department of Justice filed by Ohio/Oklahoma Hearst-Argyle Television, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibits A thru E, # 3 Filing Fee Receipt) (mr1, ) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
2008-09-252Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Ohio/Oklahoma Hearst-Argyle Television, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hearst-Argyle Television, Inc. for Ohio/Oklahoma Hearst-Argyle Television, Inc. (mr1, ) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
2008-09-253Plaintiff Ohio/Oklahoma Hearst-Argyle Television, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Statement. (mr1, ) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
2008-09-254Summons Issued as to U.S. Marshals Service and U.S. Department of Justice. (mr1, ) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
2008-09-265NOTICE by Plaintiff Ohio/Oklahoma Hearst-Argyle Television, Inc. of Service of Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statements (Goehler, Richard) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
2008-09-266GENERAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hogan. Signed by Chief Judge Sandra S. Beckwith. (eh1, ) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
2008-10-017Summons Reissued by Clerk as to Defendants U.S. Marshals Service and U.S. Department of Justice. (mtw) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
2008-10-208NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Ohio/Oklahoma Hearst-Argyle Television, Inc. (Goehler, Richard) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff