Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWood v. FBI, et al
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2002cv02058
Date Filed2002-11-20
Date Closed2007-02-05
JudgeJudge Janet Bond Arterton
PlaintiffAlexander Wood
DefendantFBI
DefendantDept of Justice
DefendantNotice
United States Court of Appeals
TERMINATED: 04/24/2006
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2002-11-201COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # H007889 (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 11/21/2002)
2002-11-20SUMMONS(ES) issued for FBI, Dept of Justice (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 11/21/2002)
2002-12-092MOTION by FBI, Dept of Justice to Extend Time until 01/20/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
2002-12-09ENDORSEMENT [2-1] motion to Extend Time until 01/20/03 to respond to Complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
2002-12-093SUMMONS Returned Executed on 12/6/02 as to FBI (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/10/2002)
2002-12-094SUMMONS Returned Executed on 12/6/02 as to Dept of Justice (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/10/2002)
2002-12-125APPEARANCE of Attorney for FBI, Dept of Justice -- Patrick F. Caruso (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/12/2002)
2003-01-216ANSWER to Complaint by FBI, Dept of Justice (Warner, R.) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
2003-01-247Notice to counsel regarding 26(f). Report of Conference due 2/13/03 ( signed by Clerk ) (Warner, R.) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
2003-02-108AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by FBI, Dept of Justice : amends [6-1] answer by Dept of Justice, FBI (Warner, R.) (Entered: 02/12/2003)
2003-02-149NOTICE of status and proposed briefing schedule by FBI, Dept of Justice (Warner, R.) (Entered: 02/20/2003)
2003-03-1010OBJECTION by Alexander Wood re: [9-1] notice by Dept of Justice, FBI (Villano, P.) (Entered: 03/11/2003)
2003-03-12ENDORSEMENT granting, to 5/13/03 [9-1] notice, set Dispositive Motions due by 6/12/03 ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Torday, B.) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
2003-03-2511NOTICE of receipt of additional release of documents from FBI by Alexander Wood (Warner, R.) (Entered: 03/25/2003)
2003-04-1512MOTION by Alexander Wood to Withdraw [10-1] objection by Alexander Wood (Warner, R.) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
2003-04-17ENDORSEMENT granting [12-1] motion to Withdraw [10-1] objection by Alexander Wood withdrawing [10-1] objection ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Warner, R.) (Entered: 04/21/2003)
2003-05-1213MOTION by FBI, Dept of Justice to Extend Time until 7/25/03 to respond to dispositive motions (Falcone, K.) Modified on 07/18/2003 (Entered: 05/13/2003)
2003-05-15ENDORSEMENT granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time until 5/28/03 to file Vaughn Declarations and until 7/25/03 to respond to dispositive motions, reset Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/03 ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Warner, R.) (Entered: 05/15/2003)
2003-05-2814NOTICE of filing declaration of Joseph S. Beck by Dept of Justice (Warner, R.) (Entered: 05/29/2003)
2003-05-2815NOTICE of filing declaration of Carol L. Keeley by FBI (Warner, R.) (Entered: 05/29/2003)
2003-05-2816Exhibits by FBI to [15-1] notice - declaration of Carl L. Keeley by FBI (Warner, R.) (Entered: 05/29/2003)
2003-05-2817NOTICE of filing of release - section 1 (Bates Nos. 1 through 405) by FBI (Warner, R.) (Entered: 05/29/2003)
2003-05-2818NOTICE of filing of release - section 2 , section 1A and referrals by FBI (Warner, R.) (Entered: 05/29/2003)
2003-06-2619MOTION by FBI, Dept of Justice for Summary Judgment (Brief Due 7/17/03 ) (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
2003-06-2620STATEMENT of Material Facts by FBI, Dept of Justice regarding [19-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
2003-06-2621MEMORANDUM by FBI, Dept of Justice in support of [19-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [20-1] facts statement (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
2003-06-2622MOTION by FBI, Dept of Justice For an In Camera Examination (Brief Due 7/17/03 ) (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
2003-06-2623MEMORANDUM by FBI, Dept of Justice in support of [22-1] motion For an In Camera Examination (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
2003-06-2624MOTION by Alexander Wood for Partial Summary Judgment (Brief Due 7/17/03 ) (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
2003-06-2625STATEMENT of Material Facts by Alexander Wood regarding [24-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
2003-06-2626MEMORANDUM by Alexander Wood in support of [24-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [25-1] facts statement (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
2003-07-2227ORDER granting [22-1] motion For an In Camera Examination ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Warner, R.) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
2003-07-2228MOTION by FBI, Dept of Justice to Extend Time by 5 days to file respond to motion for in camera inspection (Warner, R.) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
2003-07-2229RESPONSE by FBI, Dept of Justice to [22-1] motion For an In Camera Examination by Dept of Justice, FBI (Warner, R.) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
2003-07-25ENDORSEMENT granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time by 5 days to file respond to motion for in camera inspection ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Villano, P.) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
2003-07-2530MOTION by Dept of Justice, FBI for Reconsideration of [27-1] order dated 7/22/03 re: [22-1] motion For an In Camera Examination (Brief Due 8/15/03 ) (Warner, R.) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
2003-07-2531MEMORANDUM by FBI, Dept of Justice in support of [30-1] motion for Reconsideration of [27-1] order dated 7/22/03 re: [22-1] motion For an In Camera Examination (Warner, R.) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
2003-07-2532STATEMENT of Material Facts, Local Rule 56(a)(2) by FBI regarding [30-1] motion for Reconsideration of [27-1] order dated 7/22/03 re: [22-1] motion For an In Camera Examination (Warner, R.) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
2003-07-2533MEMORANDUM by FBI, Dept of Justice in opposition to [24-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Alexander Wood (Warner, R.) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
2003-07-2534MOTION by Alexander Wood for Continuance and discovery pursuant to federal rule 56(f) (Warner, R.) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
2003-07-2535MEMORANDUM by Alexander Wood in support of [34-1] motion for Continuance and discovery pursuant to federal rule 56(f) (Warner, R.) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
2003-07-2536STATEMENT of Material Facts by Alexander Wood regarding [34-1] motion for Continuance and discovery pursuant to federal rule 56(f) (Warner, R.) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
2003-07-2537MEMORANDUM by Alexander Wood in opposition to [19-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Dept of Justice, FBI (Warner, R.) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
2003-08-0738REPLY by Alexander Wood to response to [24-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Alexander Wood (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
2003-08-0739MOTION by Alexander Wood to Strike [19-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Dept of Justice, FBI, as it relates to [32-1] facts statement by FBI (Brief Due 8/28/03 ) (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
2003-08-0740MEMORANDUM by Alexander Wood in support of [19-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Rodko, R.) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
2003-08-0841MOTION by Alexander Wood to Extend Time to 8/13/03 to file plaintiff's second motion to strike (Depino, F.) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
2003-08-0842RESPONSE by Alexander Wood to [22-1] motion For an In Camera Examination by Dept of Justice, FBI (Depino, F.) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
2003-08-0843SECOND MOTION by Alexander Wood to Strike [32-1] facts statement by FBI (Brief Due 8/29/03 ) (Depino, F.) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
2003-08-0844MEMORANDUM by Alexander Wood in support of [43-1] motion to Strike [32-1] facts statement by FBI (Depino, F.) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
2003-08-12ENDORSEMENT granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to 8/13/03 to file plaintiff's second motion to strike ( signed by Mag. Judge Joan G. Margolis ) (Depino, F.) (Entered: 08/13/2003)
2003-08-1545MEMORANDUM by FBI, Dept of Justice in opposition to [34-1] motion for Continuance and discovery pursuant to federal rule 56(f) by Alexander Wood (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 08/15/2003)
2003-08-1846NOTICE of Correction by Alexander Wood, FBI (Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
2003-08-2647Third MOTION by Alexander Wood to Strike [32-1] facts statement by FBI (Warner, R.) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
2003-08-2648MEMORANDUM by Alexander Wood in support of [47-1] motion to Strike [32-1] facts statement by FBI (Warner, R.) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
2003-08-2849MEMORANDUM by Alexander Wood in opposition to [43-1] motion to Strike [32-1] facts statement by FBI by Alexander Wood (Depino, F.) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
2003-08-2850MEMORANDUM by FBI, Dept of Justice in opposition to [47-1] motion to Strike [32-1] facts statement by FBI by Alexander Wood (Depino, F.) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
2003-08-2951MOTION by Alexander Wood to Extend Time to oppose defendants' motion for summary judgment (Depino, F.) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
2003-08-2952NOTICE of Filing of Second Declaration of Alexander Wood by Alexander Wood (Depino, F.) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
2003-09-0453ORDER granting [51-1] motion to Extend Time to oppose defendants' motion for summary judgment ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Warner, R.) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
2003-09-0454REPLY by Alexander Wood to response to [34-1] motion for Continuance and discovery pursuant to federal rule 56(f) by Alexander Wood (Warner, R.) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
2003-09-1555RESPONSE by Alexander Wood to opposition to [39-1] motion to Strike [19-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Dept of Justice, FBI, as it relates to [32-1] facts statement by FBI by Alexander Wood (Depino, F.) (Entered: 09/15/2003)
2003-09-1656MEMORANDUM by FBI, Dept of Justice in opposition to [47-1] motion to Strike [32-1] facts statement by FBI by Alexander Wood (Warner, R.) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
2003-09-1757REPLY by Alexander Wood to response to [43-1] motion to Strike [32-1] facts statement by FBI by Alexander Wood (Warner, R.) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
2003-09-2558REPLY by Alexander Wood to response to [47-1] motion to Strike [32-1] facts statement by FBI by Alexander Wood (Warner, R.) (Entered: 09/25/2003)
2003-10-0959Reply by Alexander Wood to defendants' notice of status dated 9/29/03 (Warner, R.) (Entered: 10/09/2003)
2003-10-1460NOTICE of filing 3rd Declaration by Alexander Wood (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 10/15/2003)
2004-03-1661NOTICE of providing chambers with memo by FBI, Dept of Justice (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
2004-03-3162ENDORSEMENT ORDER Vacating 27 Order re 22 Motion for In Camera Examination, granting 30 Motion for Reconsideration & denying 22 Motion for In Camera Examination. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/31/04. (Pesta, J.) Modified on 4/1/2004 (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 04/01/2004)
2004-03-3163RULING granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 34 Motion to Continue, denying 43 Motion to Strike, denying 39 Motion to Strike, denying 47 Motion to Strike . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/31/04. (Attachments: # 1 continued ruling) (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
2004-03-3164JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against plaintiff. Signed by Clerk on 3/31/04. (Pesta, J.) Modified on 4/1/2004 (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 04/01/2004)
2004-04-01DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION: Modified Judge on document 62 Endorsement Order (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
2004-04-0665MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Judgment by Alexander Wood.Responses due by 4/27/2004 (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
2004-04-0666Memorandum in Support re 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Judgment filed by Alexander Wood. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
2004-04-1467MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Judgment, MOTION for Reconsideration 63 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Alexander Wood.Responses due by 5/6/2004(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 04/15/2004)
2004-04-1468Memorandum in Support of 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Judgment, MOTION for Reconsideration of 63 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alexander Wood. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 04/15/2004)
2004-04-21DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION modified incorrect filing date on 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Judgment, MOTION for Reconsideration 63 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Alexander Wood. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
2004-04-2669Memorandum in Opposition to 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Judgment filed by FBI, Dept of Justice. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
2004-05-0370Sealed Document. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 05/03/2004)
2004-05-0571Memorandum in Opposition to 67 MOTION to Amend 64 Judgment & MOTION for Reconsideration re 64 Judgment, filed by FBI, Dept of Justice. (Pesta, J.) Modified on 5/6/2004 (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 05/06/2004)
2004-05-1472REPLY to Response to 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Judgment, 63 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Continue, Order on Motion to Strike, MOTION for Reconsideration re 64 Judgment, 63 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,Order on Motion to Continue,Order on Motion to Strike, filed by Alexander Wood. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 05/14/2004)
2004-12-1773RULING granting 65 Motion to Correct 64 Judgment, denying 67 Motion for Reconsideration or to amend 64 Judgment . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/17/04. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
2004-12-1774CORRECTED JUDGMENT in accordance to 63 Ruling . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/15/04. (Pesta, J.) Modified on 12/17/2004 (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 12/17/2004)
2005-02-0775NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 74 Corrected Judgment by Alexander Wood. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number N014634.Certified copy of docket and copy of NOA mailed to USCA. (Attachments: # 1 continued)(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 02/08/2005)
2005-02-08Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 75 Notice of Appeal. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 02/08/2005)
2005-02-1876NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 74 Corrected Judgment by FBI. Certified copy of docket and copy of NOA mailed to USCA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
2005-03-0277Acknowledged Receipt of Notice Of Appeal at USCA on 2/25/05 re 76 Notice of Appeal by USA. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 03/03/2005)
2005-03-0378Acknowledged Receipt of ROA at USCA on 2/23/05 re 75 Notice of Appeal: USCA Number: 05-0795-cv (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
2005-03-0779Acknowledged Receipt of Notice of Appeal at USCA on 2/22/05 re 75 Notice of Appeal: (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
2005-09-20Certified and mailed document #70 to US Court of Appeals re 76 Notice of Appeal, 75 Notice of Appeal. USCA Number: 05-795 (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
2006-04-2480MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) dated 5/30/06 AFFIRMING in part, REVERSING in part & REMANDING 76 Notice of Appeal filed by FBI 75 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexander Wood, (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
2006-08-28Appeal Record Returned re: 76 Notice of Appeal, 75 Notice of Appeal (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
2007-02-0581JUDGMENT entered in favor of FBI, Dept of Justice against Alexander Wood in accordance with Mandate. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/07. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff