Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCANNING v. DOJ
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2001cv02215
Date Filed2001-10-26
Date Closed2008-12-29
JudgeJudge Gladys Kessler
PlaintiffGEORGE CANNING
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [106]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-10-261COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff GEORGE CANNING; jury demand (td) (Entered: 11/01/2001)
2001-10-26SUMMONS (3) issued to federal party(s) federal defendant DOJ , and non-parties: U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (td) (Entered: 11/01/2001)
2001-10-262NOTIFICATION OF RELATED CASE: Case related to Case No(s): 01-796 GK and 01-1647 GK (td) (Entered: 11/01/2001)
2001-12-123RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint unexecuted as to federal defendant DOJ, and non-parties US Attorney, US Attorney General (cdw) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
2002-05-094MOTION filed by plaintiff GEORGE CANNING for summary judgment ; declarations (1), exhibits (2) (cdw) (Entered: 05/10/2002)
2002-05-215MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by federal defendant DOJ to extend time to 6/21/02 to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (cdw) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
2002-05-246ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion to extend time to 6/21/02 to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [5-1] by DOJ response to motion for summary judgment due 6/21/02; (N) (tth) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
2002-05-317ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for federal defendant DOJ by Claire M. Whitaker (mpt) (Entered: 06/04/2002)
2002-06-2113MOTION filed by federal defendant DOJ to extend time to 6/21/02 (cdw) (Entered: 08/14/2002)
2002-06-268ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler: granting defendant's unopposed motion to extend time to file a response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; response to motion for summary judgment due 6/27/02 (N) (tth) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
2002-06-2710JOINT STATUS REPORT by plaintiff GEORGE CANNING, federal defendant DOJ (cdw) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
2002-07-019ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : denying motion for summary judgment [4-1] by GEORGE CANNING defendant's motion for summary judgment due 8/19/02; response to motion for summary judgment due 9/19/02 reply motion for summary judgment due 10/10/02; (N) (tth) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
2002-08-0911MOTION filed by federal defendant DOJ to extend time to 8/23/02 to propose a revised briefing schedule in lieu of the jointly proposed schedule in order 7/1/02 (mpt) (Entered: 08/12/2002)
2002-08-1212ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion to extend time to 8/23/02 to propose a new scheduling order to the Court [11-1] and Motion for a Stay on behalf of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, pursuant to Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force by DOJ (N) (tth) (Entered: 08/12/2002)
2002-08-2315STATUS REPORT by federal defendant DOJ (td) (Entered: 08/28/2002)
2002-08-2814ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler: motion for summary judgment due 9/9/02, with oppositions and replies filed in accordance with the rules of Court ; parties stipulation with regard to the FBI is approved; the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/02 is cancelled; setting forth additional instructions to counsel. (N) (tth) (Entered: 08/28/2002)
2002-08-2916ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler: motion(s) for summary judgment due 9/9/02, with oppositions and replies filed in accordance with the rules of Court; setting forth additional instructions to counsel. (N) (tth) (Entered: 08/29/2002)
2002-08-2917STIPULATION filed and fiated by Judge Gladys Kessler to set time for selection sample, preparation of Vaughn Index and Motion for Summary Judgment. (N) (tth) (Entered: 08/29/2002)
2002-09-0918MOTION filed by federal defendant DOJ (criminal division) for summary judgment ; exhibits (6) (cdw) (Entered: 09/11/2002)
2002-09-0919MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by federal defendant DOJ to extend time to 9/30/02 to file a dispositive motion on behalf of the EOUSA (cdw) (Entered: 09/11/2002)
2002-09-1120ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion to extend time to 9/30/02 to file a dispositive motion on behalf of the EOUSA [19-1] by DOJ dispositive motions due by 9/30/02 ; (N) (tth) (Entered: 09/11/2002)
2002-09-2621NOTICE by plaintiff GEORGE CANNING of non-opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment concerning FOIA request to the DOJ Criminal Division (cdw) (Entered: 10/01/2002)
2002-09-3023MOTION filed by federal defendant DOJ to extend time to 10/7/02 to file a dispositive motion on behalf of EOUSA (cdw) (Entered: 10/02/2002)
2002-10-0122ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler: granting defendant's motion to file a dispositive motion on behalf of the Executive Office for the United States Attorneys, with any opposition and reply filed in accordance with the rules of this Court; dispositive motions due 10/7/02 ; (N) (tth) (Entered: 10/02/2002)
2002-10-0725MOTION filed by federal defendant DOJ for summary judgment on behals of EOUSA ; exhibits (20) (cdw) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
2002-10-0824ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting unopposed motion for summary judgment [18-1] by DOJ. Judgment is entered on behalf of the defendant with respect to any claims in this Freedom of Information Act litigation relating to records withheld by the Criminal Division of the Department of Justice. (N) (tth) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
2002-10-2226UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by plaintiff GEORGE CANNING to extend time to 10/28/02 to file opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on behalf of EOUSA (cdw) Modified on 10/24/2002 (Entered: 10/24/2002)
2002-10-2327ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion to extend time to 10/28/02 to file opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on behalf of EOUSA [26-1] by GEORGE CANNING response to motion for summary judgment due 10/28/02 ; (N) (tth) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
2002-10-2928MEMORANDUM by plaintiff GEORGE CANNING in opposition to motion for summary judgment on behalf of EOUSA [25-1] by; declarations (1), exhibits; BULKY PLEADING (cdw) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
2002-11-0129UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by federal defendant DOJ to extend time to 11/22/02 to file a reply to its motion for summary judgment on behalf of EOUSA (cdw) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
2002-11-0530ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion to extend time to 11/22/02 to file a reply to its motion for summary judgment on behalf of EOUSA [29-1] by DOJ reply to dispositive motions due by 11/22/02; (N) (tth) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
2002-11-2231REPLY by federal defendant DOJ to response in opposition to motion for summary judgment on behalf of EOUSA [25-1] by DOJ; attachments (1) (cdw) (Entered: 11/26/2002)
2003-10-0132ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : that defendant shall file the withheld documents at issue to the Court, ex parte and under seal, for in camera review no later than Wednesday, October 8, 2003. (N) (dot) (Entered: 10/01/2003)
2004-02-0433NOTICE of Change of Telephone Number by GEORGE CANNING (rje, ) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
2004-03-0934MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part Defendant EOUSA's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/9/04. (lcgk1, ) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
2004-03-0935ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant EOUSA's Motion for Summary Judgment 25 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/9/04. (lcgk1, ) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
2004-03-2336NOTICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE of Filing Document for In Camera Review (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
2004-03-2337MOTION for Leave to File Declaration in Camera by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
2004-03-2338MOTION to Alter and Amend Judgment filed Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 59(e) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Memorandum Opinion & Order in Billington v. DOJ, C.A. 92-0462# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
2004-03-2539RESPONSE to Order 35 to show cause by GEORGE CANNING. (rje, ) (Entered: 04/02/2004)
2004-04-1240MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration in Camera , 38 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 59(e) by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rje, ) (Entered: 04/13/2004)
2004-04-15MINUTE ENTRY -- ORDER granting 40 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File his Opposition to Defendant's March 23, 2004 motions; the opposition shall be filed by April 13, 2004 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/15/04. (CS, ) (Entered: 04/15/2004)
2004-04-1541MOTION for partial disclosure of defendant's in camera filing re 37 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration in Camera , MOTION to Stay proceedings concerning defendant's pendings motion 38 to alter or amend by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Third Declaration of George Canning)(rje, ) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
2004-04-2642Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 MOTION for partial disclosure of defendant's in camera filing re 37 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration in Camera MOTION to Stay re 37 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration in Camera MOTION to Stay re 37 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration in Camera by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/26/2004)
2004-04-27MINUTE ENTRY -- ORDER granting 42 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Disclosure of Defendant's In Camera Filing and for Consequent Stay of Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's Response; Defendant shall have up to and including May 4, 2004 in which to file its response . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/27/04. (CS, ) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
2004-05-0443Memorandum in opposition to motion re 41 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Disclosure of Defendant's In Camera filing and for Consequent Stay of Proceedings filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
2004-05-1744MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendant's Opposition to his motion for partial disclosure and consequent stay by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rje, ) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
2004-05-21MINUTE ENTRY -- ORDER granting 44 the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Opposition Memorandum; Plaintiff has up to and including May 21, 2004 in which to file his response . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/21/04. (CS, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
2004-05-2445REPLY to opposition to motion re 41 for partial disclosure of defendant's in camera filing and for consequent stay filed by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(rje, ) (Entered: 05/27/2004)
2004-05-2446Memorandum in opposition to motion re 38 for reconsideration; (See Document No. 45 for the image of the pleading) filed by GEORGE CANNING. (rje, ) (Entered: 05/27/2004)
2004-07-2747NOTICE of Change of Address by GEORGE CANNING (rje, ) (Entered: 07/28/2004)
2004-11-15MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Declaration in camera; the declaration of the author of the document referred to as Document 11, is accepted for filing in camera . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/15/04. (CS, ) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
2005-01-0348Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Vaughn Index, dispositive motion, opposition and reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 01/03/2005)
2005-01-0349SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in support of his motion for partial disclosure of defendant's in camera filing and for consequent stay of the proceedings pending plaintiff's response from George Canning. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(rje, ) (Entered: 01/04/2005)
2005-01-05MINUTE ORDER granting 48 Defendant's Consent Motion to Extend the due dates relating to the FBI's portion of this Freedom of Information Act; the extended dates are as follows: Defendant shall file a Vaughn Index and motion for summary jjdgment on behalf of the FBI on January 12, 2005; Plaintiff shall file an opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on February 14, 2005 and Defendant shall file a reply to Plaintiff's Oppositoin on February 28, 2005. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/5/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 01/05/2005)
2005-01-1150Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file Vaughn Index and Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
2005-01-12MINUTE ORDER granting 50 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Extend the due dates relating to the FBI's portion of this case; Defendant shall file a Vaughn Index and Motion for Summary Judgment on behalf of the FBI on January 21, 2005; Plaintiff shall file an opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on February 22, 2005; and Defendant shall file a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition on March 7, 2005 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/12/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
2005-01-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2005. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2005. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 3/7/2005. (tth, ) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
2005-01-2151Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
2005-01-25MINUTE ORDER granting 51 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension the due dates relating to the FBI's portion of this case; Defendant shall file a Vaughn index and Motion for Summary Judgment on or before January 28, 2005; Plaintiff shall file an opposition on or before March 1, 2005; Defendant shall file a reply to any opposition on or before March 14, 2005 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/24/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
2005-01-2852MOTION for Summary Judgment relating to Federal Bureau of Investigation records by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Boseker - EOUSA# 2 Declaration of Kathy Hsu - Criminal Division# 3 Declaration of Keith Gehle - FBI# 4 Exhibits A-GG# 5 Exhibit II - FBI records# 6 FBI records contd.# 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) Modified on 2/24/2009 REOPENED PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER 2/23/2009 (tr). (Entered: 01/28/2005)
2005-02-0953On April 15, 2004, Plaintiff Filed a Motion for Partial Disclosure of Defendant's in camera filing and for Consequent Stay of the Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's Response; the accompanying Memorandum of Points and authorities also contained Plaintiff's Oppositoin to Defendant's Motions for Leave to Submit Declaration in camer and to Alter and Amend; because of the confusion that results when parties file motions and oppositions in the same document, it is hereby ORDERED that no opposition to a Motion shall include a new motion; it is furher ORDERED that every Motion must be filed separately and individually . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/9/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
2005-02-0954ORDER granting 38 Defendant's Motion to Stay; the Court's March 9, 2004 ORDER is stayed pending resolution of Defendant's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/9/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
2005-02-1055ORDERED that Defendant shall, by February 24, 2005, file a statement accompanying its Declaration that provides a specific explanation of why each discrete portion must be provided solely ex parte and in camera . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/10/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 02/10/2005)
2005-02-2356Civil Statement in FOIA matter from defendant per order of 2/10/05. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Version of Declaration lodged under seal)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
2005-03-0157ORDER denying as moot 41 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Disclosure of Defendant's in camera filing and granting 41 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings; it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall, by March 10, 2005, respond to Defendant's submission . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/1/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
2005-03-0158MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment relating to Federal Bureau of Investigation records by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rje, ) (Entered: 03/02/2005)
2005-03-02MINUTE ORDER granting 58 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 8, 2005 in which to file his response; Defendant may file its reply on or before March 22, 2005 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/2/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 03/02/2005)
2005-03-0859MOTION for Leave to File a unified memorandum regarding summary judgment, MOTION for Extension of Time to rewrite his memorandum by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rje, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
2005-03-0860MOTION to Stay the case pending the court's ruling on his motion to file a unified memorandum by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rje, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
2005-03-0961MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment relating to Federal Bureau of Investigation records by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rje, ) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
2005-03-10MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff may file his response by March 15, 2005 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/10/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
2005-03-1162RESPONSE to to statement regarding 37 in camera submission filed by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fifth Declaration of George Canning)(rje, ) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
2005-03-1163ERRATA of original pages inadvertently lefted out of the response to defendant's statement regarding in camera submission dated 3/11/05 by GEORGE CANNING. (rje, ) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
2005-03-1764MOTION to Stay the case pending the court's ruling on motion to file a unified memorandum by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rje, ) (Entered: 03/22/2005)
2005-03-22MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay, which was filed on March 8, 2005 and granting 64 Plaintiff's Motion of March 15, 2005 to Stay the Case Pending the Court's Ruling on His Motion to File a Unified Memorandum. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/22/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 03/22/2005)
2005-05-18MINUTE ORDER granting 59 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to File a Unified Memorandum Regarding Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, for an Enlargement of Time to Rewrite His Memorandum; Plaintiff may address his opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, his own Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and his Motion for Supplemental Vaughn indices in a single memorandum and that Plaintiff shall serve and file this memorandum within seven (7) days of his receipt of this Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/18/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
2005-05-2665ORDER granting EOUSA's 37 Motion for Leave to File Declaration in camera, granting in part and denying in part EOUSA's 38 Motion to Alter or Amend; Document 11 is withheld in its entirety and Document 20 shall be released as set forth in the Court's March 9, 2004 Memorandum Opinion . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/26/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
2005-05-2666MEMORANDUM OPINION on EOUSA's Motion for Leave to File Declaration in camera and EOUSA's Motion to Alter or Amend. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/26/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
2005-05-2767CROSS-MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rje, ) Modified on 2/24/2009 (tr) REOPENED PURSUANT TO COURTS ORDER 2/23/2009. (Entered: 06/02/2005)
2005-05-2768MOTION for Supplemental Vaughn Index by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rje, ) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
2005-05-2769Memorandum in opposition to motion re 52 motion for summary judgment filed by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fourth Declaration of George Canning# 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(rje, ) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
2005-05-2770REPLY in support of cross-motion 67 for partial summary judgment, motion 68 for supplemental vaughn index; (SEE DOCUMENTS NOS. 67 AND 68 FOR THE IMAGE OF THE PLEADING) filed by GEORGE CANNING. (rje, ) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
2005-06-1071Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment, motion for supplemental Vaughn index and memorandum in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on behalf of the FBI by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
2005-06-13MINUTE ORDER granting 71 the Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendants shall have up to and including July 22, 2005 in which to file its response to Plaintiff's recent filings . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/13/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
2005-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/22/2005 (CS, ) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
2005-06-2272Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Release "Document 20" by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 06/22/2005)
2005-06-23MINUTE ORDER granting 72 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including August 9, 2005 in which to release documents found in Document 20 to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/23/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
2005-07-2273Second MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to plaintiff's cross motion for partial summary judgment, motion for supplemental Vaughn Index, and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment with regard to the FBI by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
2005-07-2274NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 66 Memorandum & Opinion, 65 Order, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (No fee paid U.S. Govt) (rje, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
2005-07-25Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 74 Notice of Appeal (rje, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
2005-07-25MINUTE ORDER granting 73 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including August 8, 2005 in which to respond to Plaintiff's cross-motion for partial summary judgment, motoin for supplemental Vaughn Index, and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment with regard to the FBI records . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/25/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
2005-08-02USCA Case Number 05-5287 for 74 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE,. (rje, ) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
2005-08-0475Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
2005-08-05MINUTE ORDER granting 75 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay the release of Document 20 pending appeal; Defendant shall have up to and including 15 days after the final resolution of its appeal of this matter to comply with this Court's Order of March 9, 2004, with respect to the release of Document 20 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/5/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
2005-08-0576MOTION to Amend/Correct for Clarification of Order of Release, dated 3/9/04 regarding EOUSA's Document 20 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
2005-08-0877Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file defendant's opposition to plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment, defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion for supplemental Vaughn index, and defendant's reply tp plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment in connection with the FBI records by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
2005-08-09MINUTE ORDER granting 77 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including September 15, 2005 in which to respond to Plaintiff's cross-motion for partial summary judgment, motion for supplemental Vaughn Index, and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment with regard to the FBI records . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/9/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 08/09/2005)
2005-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/15/2005 (CS, ) (Entered: 08/09/2005)
2005-08-29MINUTE ORDER granting 76 Defendant's Motion for Clarification of this Court's Order to Release EOUSA's Document 20; the Court has re-reviewed its instructions on p. 4 of Docket Entry 34 with regard to Document 20 and has determined that third party names and identifying information are protected by Freedom of Information Act Exemption 7(c) and should not be released . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/29/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
2005-08-3178NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Konopka on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Konopka, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
2005-09-1579Memorandum in opposition to motion re 67 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Supplemental Vaughn Indices and Defendant's Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Nancy Steward# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(Konopka, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/15/2005)
2005-09-1580REPLY to opposition to motion re 52 Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Please see Document No. 79 for scanned images). (znmw, ) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
2005-09-2981REPLY to opposition to motion re 67 for partial summary judgment, motion 68 for supplemental vaughn index filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (rje, ) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
2005-10-2082ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 74 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; It is hereby ordered that the motion to dismiss and for remand be granted and that the appeal be dismissed and the case remanded for further proceedings before the District COurt; USCA#05-5287 (jsc) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
2005-12-0783ORDER: The parties shall submit, by December 20, 2005, a Joint Praecipe informing the Court whether they believe any action is necessary in response to the Court of Appeals' October 20, 2005 Order . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/7/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
2005-12-1584STATUS REPORT Parties Joint Praecipe by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Konopka, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
2006-12-0485NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
2007-09-2486NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by Blanche L. Bruce on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Judith A. Kidwell (Bruce, Blanche) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
2009-02-2087MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket by GEORGE CANNING (tr) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
2009-02-23MINUTE ORDER granting 87 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Correct the Docket to reflect that the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment remain pending. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/23/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
2009-03-2088MOTION for an Order Directing the FBI to Re-Review its FIOA Releases for Discretionary Release of Information by GEORGE CANNING (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(tr) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
2009-03-2089MOTION to Stay the Case Pending Completion of the FBI's Re-Review of its FIOA Releases for Discretionary Release of Information by GEORGE CANNING (tr) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
2009-03-2590SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 88 MOTION for Order filed by GEORGE CANNING. (tr) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
2009-04-0291Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 88 MOTION for Order, 89 MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
2009-04-17MINUTE ORDER granting 91 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall up to and including May 11, 2009, in which to file its response to Plaintiff's Motions for an Order Directing the FBI to Re-Review Its FOIA Releases for Discretionary Release of Information and for a Stay During the Pendancy of the Re-Review. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/17/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
2009-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/11/2009 (CL, ) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
2009-05-1192Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motions for an Order Directing the FBI to Re-Review its FOIA Releases for Discretionary Release of Information, and for a Stay During the Pendency of the Re-Review (see Docket ## 88, 89, 90) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
2009-05-1193MOTION to Stay During the Pendency of the Re-Review by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (tr)(See Docket Entry 92 to view document) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
2009-05-12MINUTE ORDER granting 92 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including June 11, 2009, in which to respond to Plaintiff's Motions for an Order Directing the FBI to Re-Review Its FOIA Releases for Discretionary Release of Information, and for a Stay During the Pendency of the Re-Review. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/12/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
2009-05-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/11/2009 (CL, ) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
2009-05-19MINUTE ORDER granting 89 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Case Pending Completion of the FBI's Re-Review of Its FOIA Releases for Discretionary Release of Information. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/19/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
2009-05-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion for Attorneys' Fees due by 6/3/2009. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
2009-12-1494STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bruce, Blanche) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
2009-12-1595ORDER: If Plaintiff has any objection to the Government's conclusion regarding its re-review of Plaintiff's FOIA request under the new AG-FOIA Guidelines, he shall file an appropriate Motion within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/15/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
2010-01-0796RESPONSE re 94 Status Report filed by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 FOIA release attachment)(dr) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
2010-10-0197NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Rudolph Contreras on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Blanche Bruce (Contreras, Rudolph) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
2010-10-1398Letter from George Canning. "Leave to File Granted," Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/13/10. (dr) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
2010-10-2999NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Rudolph Contreras (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
2014-05-05100MOTION for Court to issue its ruling on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment regarding the FBI's FOIA Releases by GEORGE CANNING (td, ) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
2014-05-15101ORDER that by June 1, 2014, the parties shall file a Joint Statement listing, by docket number, all filings the Court should consider in deciding their Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment; the parties' Joint Statement shall also indicate the state of Plaintiff's MOtion for an Order Directing the FBI to Re-Review its FOIA Releases for Discretionary Release of Information. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/15/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
2014-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Statement due by 6/1/2014. (tth) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
2014-06-02102STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff