Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBLOOMBERG, L.P. v. SEC
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2002cv01582
Date Filed2002-08-09
Date Closed2005-04-27
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffBLOOMBERG, L.P.
PlaintiffBALTIMORE SUN COMPANY
PlaintiffCBS BROADCASTING INC.
PlaintiffCHICAGO TRIBUNE COMPANY
PlaintiffCOPLEY PRESS, INC.
PlaintiffGRUNER + JAHR USA PUBLISHING
PlaintiffLOS ANGELES TIMES COMMUNICATIONS LLC
PlaintiffNEWSDAY, INC.
DefendantSECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DefendantBALTIMORE SUN COMPANY
DefendantCBS BROADCASTING INC.
DefendantCHICAGO TRIBUNE COMPANY
DefendantCOPLEY PRESS, INC.
doing business as SAN DIEGO UNION TRIBUNE
doing business as COPLEY NEWS SERVICE
DefendantGRUNER + JAHR USA PUBLISHING
DefendantLOS ANGELES TIMES COMMUNICATIONS LLC
DefendantNEWSDAY, INC.
DefendantREUTERS AMERICA INC
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2002-08-091COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff BLOOMBERG, L.P.; Exhibits (3) (nmr) (Entered: 08/12/2002)
2002-08-09SUMMONS (3) issued to federal party(s) federal defendant SEC, and non-parties: U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (nmr) (Entered: 08/12/2002)
2002-08-092LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by plaintiff BLOOMBERG, L.P. (nmr) (Entered: 08/12/2002)
2002-08-123RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed on 8/9/02 upon federal defendant SEC (nmr) (Entered: 08/13/2002)
2002-08-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed upon U.S. Attorney on 8/9/02 (nmr) (Entered: 08/13/2002)
2002-08-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed upon U.S. Attorney General on 8/9/02 (nmr) (Entered: 08/13/2002)
2002-09-096MOTION filed by federal defendant SEC to extend time for ten (10) days after an amended complaint is filed to answer the amended complaint ; Attachment (1) (nmr) Modified on 09/10/2002 (Entered: 09/10/2002)
2002-09-107ORDER by Judge Richard J. Leon : granting motion to extend time for ten (10) days after an amended complaint is filed to answer the amended complaint, or informs deft., and the Court that it will not amend its Complaint. [6-1] by SEC (N) (whb) (Entered: 09/11/2002)
2002-09-268AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff BLOOMBERG, L.P., amending complaint [1-1]; Exhibits (9). (nmr) (Entered: 09/30/2002)
2002-10-099MOTION filed for BALTIMORE SUN CO, CBS BROADCASTING INC, CHICAGO TRIBUNE CO., COPLEY PRESS, INC., GRUNER + JAHR USA, LA TIMES COMM LLC, NEWSDAY, INC., REUTERS AMERICA INC to intervene as plaintiffs ; EXHIBITS (COMPLAINT, R26A1) (nmr) (Entered: 10/10/2002)
2002-10-1110ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT [8-1] by federal defendant SEC (nmr) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
2002-10-2111RESPONSE by federal defendant SEC in opposition to motion for BALTIMORE SUN CO, CBS BROADCASTING INC, CHICAGO TRIBUNE CO., COPLEY PRESS, INC., GRUNER + JAHR USA, LA TIMES COMM LLC, NEWSDAY, INC., REUTERS AMERICA INC to intervene as plaintiffs [9-1]; Exhibits (2). (nmr) (Entered: 10/23/2002)
2002-10-3112REPLY by movants in support of motion for BALTIMORE SUN CO, CBS BROADCASTING INC, CHICAGO TRIBUNE CO., COPLEY PRESS, INC., GRUNER + JAHR USA, LA TIMES COMM LLC, NEWSDAY, INC., REUTERS AMERICA INC to intervene as plaintiffs [9-1] (nmr) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
2002-11-1313JOINT MOTION by plaintiff BLOOMBERG, L.P., federal defendant SEC for entry of stipulated scheduling order (nmr) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
2002-12-2014MOTION filed by federal defendant SEC to dismiss amended complaint [8-1] , and for summary judgment ; exhibits (13) (mpt) (Entered: 12/23/2002)
2003-01-0315ERRATA by federal defendant SEC of the amended Vaughn index to replace the index attached as Exhibit 6 to the SEC's statement of material facts filed with its summary judgment papers on 12/20/02. (nmr) (Entered: 01/06/2003)
2003-03-3116MOTION filed by plaintiff BLOOMBERG, L.P. to compel discovery ; Declaration (1); Exhibits (11) (nmr) Modified on 04/01/2003 (Entered: 04/01/2003)
2003-04-1617RESPONSE by federal defendant SEC in opposition to motion to compel discovery [16-1] by BLOOMBERG, L.P.; Exhibits (5) (nmr) (Entered: 04/17/2003)
2003-04-2518REPLY by plaintiff BLOOMBERG, L.P. in support of motion to compel discovery [16-1] by BLOOMBERG, L.P. (nmr) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
2003-07-1519ORDER by Judge Richard J. Leon : granting joint motion for entry of stipulated scheduling order [13-1] by SEC, BLOOMBERG, L.P. discovery closes 1/8/02 ; (N) (whb) (Entered: 07/16/2003)
2003-08-01SCHEDULING NOTICE: motion hearing set for 2:30 8/13/03 ; before Judge Richard J. Leon Courtroom 7, Second Floor. (whb) (Entered: 08/01/2003)
2003-08-0820JOINT MOTION by plaintiff BLOOMBERG, L.P., federal defendant SEC to continue 8/13/03 hearing (nmr) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
2003-08-1121ORDER by Judge Richard J. Leon : granting joint motion to continue 8/13/03 hearing [20-1] by SEC, BLOOMBERG, L.P. motion hearing set for 3:00 8/27/03 ; (N) (whb) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
2003-08-27MOTION HEARING before Judge Richard J. Leon, Motion taken under advisement. Parties may supplement the record by 9/8/03. Reporter: Patty Gels (whb) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
2003-09-0822SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by plaintiff BLOOMBERG, L.P. in support of motion to compel discovery [16-1] (jf) (Entered: 09/09/2003)
2003-09-0823SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by federal defendant SEC in support of opposition to motion to compel discovery [17-1] (jf) (Entered: 09/09/2003)
2003-09-1624TRANSCRIPT filed for motion hearing held on date(s) of August 27, 2003. Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels (jf) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
2003-09-2925ORDER by Judge Richard J. Leon : granting motion for BALTIMORE SUN CO, CBS BROADCASTING INC, CHICAGO TRIBUNE CO., COPLEY PRESS, INC., GRUNER + JAHR USA, LA TIMES COMM LLC, NEWSDAY, INC., REUTERS AMERICA INC to intervene as plaintiffs [9-1] (N) (whb) (Entered: 09/30/2003)
2004-03-1026ORDER denying 16 MOTION filed by plaintiff BLOOMBERG, L.P. to compel discovery . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/9/04. (whb) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
2004-04-0627Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by BLOOMBERG, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Statement of Material Facts# 2 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Curley# 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Curley, Thomas) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
2004-04-0628Memorandum in opposition to motion re 14 filed by BLOOMBERG, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts# 2 Declaration of Thomas Curley# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Curley, Thomas) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
2004-04-1429MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Bloomberg's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Karr, Thomas) (Entered: 04/14/2004)
2004-04-16MINUTE ORDER granting 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Bloomberg's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION until 5/4/04. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/16/04. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
2004-05-0430REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 to Dismiss and For Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Bloomberg's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Counterstatement of Material Facts as to which There Is a Genuine Issue)(Karr, Thomas) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
2004-05-0431Memorandum in opposition to motion re 27 Bloomberg's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Counterstatement of Material Facts as to which There Is a Genuine Issue)(Karr, Thomas) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
2004-05-1832REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 summary judgment filed by BLOOMBERG, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Second Declaration of Thomas Curley)(Curley, Thomas) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
2004-07-2933MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's motion (#14) to dismiss and for summary judgment is GRANTED in part, DENIED, in part. Plaintiff's motion (#27) for summary judgment is DENIED. See Memorandum Opinion and Order . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/28/04. (whb) (Entered: 07/29/2004)
2004-10-2734NOTICE of Compliance with July 28, 2004 Order by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit October 26, 2004 Letter to Bloomberg)(Karr, Thomas) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff