Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRobert v. The Central Intelligence Agency et al
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityCentral Islip
Case Number2:2002cv06788
Date Filed2002-12-31
Date Closed2012-02-15
JudgeJudge Joanna Seybert
PlaintiffCharles Robert, II
also known as Snowflake 5391
DefendantThe Central Intelligence Agency
DefendantThe Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [110]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in New York has ruled that Charles Robert's 2002 suit against the CIA and the Justice Department for records concerning Oliver North's involvement in the Iran-contra affair may continue. However, the court ordered Robert to produce documentary evidence that Robert had requested and been denied records from the CIA in 2000 and 2001. CIA, however, indicated that, according to its records, the only request it had received from Robert was in 2010. Allowing Robert to provide documentary proof of his claims, the court noted that "it is impossible for the Court to determine whether the CIA improperly withheld agency records absent a review of Plaintiff's specific FOIA request and the CIA's alleged response, particularly in light of the CIA's position that Plaintiff failed to file any FOIA requests prior to 2010."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to State a Claim
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2002-12-311COMPLAINT against The Central Intelligence Agency, The Department of Justice ( Filing fee receipt number 8282.) Summons Issued, filed by Charles Robert II. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duong, Susan) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
2003-01-032SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Robert II. The Central Intelligence Agency served on 12/31/2002, answer due 1/20/2003; The Department of Justice served on 12/31/2002, answer due 1/20/2003. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
2003-02-073MOTION to Dismiss pltff's complaint purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) of the F.R.C.P., filed by The Central Intelligence Agency, The Department of Justice. (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 02/21/2003)
2003-02-074MEMORANDUM in Support re 3 MOTION to Dismiss pltff's complaint purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) of the F.R.C.P., filed by The Central Intelligence Agency, The Department of Justice. (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 02/21/2003)
2003-02-275Letter dated 2/24/03 from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert RE: The pltff requests the Court's approval of a modification of the Motion schedule of the dfts whereby the pltff's responding pleadings are to be served on 3/3/03. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
2003-02-27ENDORSED ORDER on 5 Letter. Application for an extension of time until 3/3/03 to file opposition papers is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joanna Seybert on 2/27/03. EOD #5 C/F(Valle, Christine) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
2003-03-066AFFIRMATION of Charles Robert in Opposition Re: 3 MOTION to Dismiss pltff's complaint purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) of the F.R.C.P., filed filed by Charles Robert II. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 03/14/2003)
2003-03-067MEMORANDUM in Opposition Re: 3 MOTION to Dismiss pltff's complaint purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) of the F.R.C.P., filed by Charles Robert II. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 03/14/2003)
2003-03-068AFFIDAVIT of Service - Copy of Memorandum of Law; and Affirmation served on Chief Susan Riley, Office of the U.S. Attorney via U.S. Postal Service on 3/5/03, filed by Charles Robert II. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 03/14/2003)
2003-06-069ORDER - Initial Conference set for 7/17/2003 at 02:00PM before Magistrate-Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Signed by Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 6/6/03. C/M (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 06/17/2003)
2003-07-1510ORDER - Due to a change in this Magistrate's schedule, the conference in this matter previously scheduled for 7/17/03 at 2:00PM, is hereby rescheduled for 8/18/03 at 2:00PM. Signed by Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/15/03. C/F (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
2003-08-1811ORDER; The initial conference scheduled for today is adjourned until further notice . ( Signed by Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/18/03.) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
2003-09-3012MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; granting 3 Motion to Dismiss. Defts' motion to dismiss Pltff's Complaint, purs. to F.R.C.P. 8, is GRANTED. Pltff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice to file an amended complaint, in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, within 10 days from the date hereof. Further, Pltff is directed to file with his amended complaint a letter, no longer than three pages, indicating any other actions maintained in the Eastern District of New York by Pltff, the docket number for each action, the relief sought in each action and the final disposition.( Signed by JudgeJoanna Seybert on 9/30/03.) c/m (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 09/30/2003)
2003-10-0313Letter dated 9/27/03 from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert RE: The pltff renews the request for an oral argument or for a settlement conference prior to 10/14/03. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 10/09/2003)
2003-10-03ENDORSED ORDER on 13 Letter. Application Denied. Signed by Judge Joanna Seybert on 10/3/03. EOD #13 C/M(Valle, Christine) (Entered: 10/09/2003)
2003-10-0714Letter dated 10/6/03 from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert RE: Per Your Honor's Memorandum & Order dated 9/30/03, please find enclosed courtesy copy of the amended complaint. To request that the Court consider scheduling a settlement conference to reveiw the FOIA requested documents in camera and then seal the case file. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
2003-10-0715AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served upon Chief Susan Riley on 10/6/03, filed by Charles Robert II. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
2003-10-0716AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Central Intelligence Agency, The Department of Justice, filed by Charles Robert II.(Valle, Christine) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
2004-01-3017Letter from Charles Robert to Hon. Joanna Seybert, dated 1/26/04 re: To advise the Court that the enclosed Robert VI v. DOJ CV 04-269 (Garaufis, J), complaint has been filed as a related case to Robert IV v. DOJ, cv 02-1101 (Garaufis, J), and Robert V. v. DOJ, CV 03-4324 (Garaufis, J); that the complaint includes the same offer of settlement that has been made in Robert II v. CIA and DOJ, Robert Iv v. DOJ, and Robert V v. DOJ whereby the FOIAs will be withdrawn if AG Ashcroft instructs SSA Commissioner Barnhart and HHS Secretary Thompson to implement the acquiescence policy as explained in the sworn 7/25/85 Congressional testimony of DAAG Kuhl, which was to replace the HS nonacquiescence policy of HHS General Counsel Juan de Real that was to have ended on 6/3/05; and that Chief Susan Riley is AG Ashcroft's counsel in all four cases and has been presented with the same offer of settlements in all of the cases; and to renew pltff's request for a settlement conference. (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 04/14/2004)
2004-04-0118Letter dated 3/13/04 from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert Re: The pltff renews the request for a settlement conference. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 04/15/2004)
2004-04-01ENDORSED ORDER on 18 Letter. Parties are instructed to contact Magistrate Judge Lindsay with regard to scheduling a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joanna Seybert on 4/1/04. EOD #18 C/M(Valle, Christine) (Entered: 04/15/2004)
2004-04-0919REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; The undersigned recommends that this action be stayed until Charles Robert provides the court with a list of all Freedom of Information Act cases he has filed in the Eastern and Southern Districts of New York, including, but not limited to, those cases that he has commenced using the followng names: Charles Robert; Charles Robert II; Charles Robert, II; Charles Robert III; Charles Robert IV; Charles Robert, V; Charles Robert, VI; Ruppert Counsel II; Ruppert Counsel III; Thierman-Ruppert Counsel IV; Stone Counsel, Ratisher-Cricch Counsel and Snowflake 5391. The pltff should also be directed to clarify the identity of each of these pltffs and, if any of these pltffs are in fact Charles Robert, his reason for using an alias. The undersigned further recommends that Mr. Robert be directed to provide a summary of the relief sought in each action. The undersigned will defer any further intervention in this matter until after the District Judge assigned to this case has had an opportunity to review this recommendation. Any objectins to this Report and Recommendation must be filed with the Clerk of the Court with a courtesy copy to the undersigned within 10 days after being served with a copy of this Report. Failure to file objections within this period waives the right to appeal the District Court's Order. ( Signed by Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/9/04. ) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
2004-04-1920OBJECTIONS to 19 Report and Recommendation by Charles Robert II. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 05/05/2004)
2004-04-1921AFFIDAVIT of Service for Objections to Magistrate Report and Recommendation served upon Susan Riley, U.S. Attorney on 4/19/04, filed by Charles Robert II. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 05/05/2004)
2004-04-2322Letter dated 4/22/04 from Susan L. Riley to Magistrate Lindsay Re: To request an enlargement of time to and including 4/26/04, to respond to pltff's Objections to Magistrate's Report and Recommendation. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
2004-04-23ENDORSED ORDER on 22 Letter. Application Granted. Signed by Judge Joanna Seybert on 4/23/04. EOD #22 C/F(Valle, Christine) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
2004-04-2723Letter dated 4/26/04 from Susan L. Riley to Judge Seybert Re: In response to pltff-attorney's request for a settlement conference and pltff's objections to the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Lindsay dated 4/9/04. In addition, to request that the Court consider screening future FOIA cases filed by the pltff. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
2004-04-3025Letter dtd. 4/28/04 from Charles Robert to Hon. J. Seybert stating that rather than granting Chief Riley's request for a stay of the requested settlement conference, the court should conseider ordering a briefing schedule. (See Report and Recommendation, #24 signed by Judge Seybert, 5/12/04) (Barhome, Sydelle) (Entered: 06/15/2004)
2004-05-1224ORDER dtd. 5/12/04 granting 19 Report and Recommendations. Plf is ordered to submit a list of all similar cases which have been brought in the Eastern District of New York, the names of the parties involved, the civil case number, the Judge currently assigned to the matter, the current disposition of the case, the relief sought in the case. Once this information is reviewed, this Court will be able to determine if a consolidation of cases is appropriate. (Due within 30 days of the date of this order, failure to do so will result in a dismissal of this action.. Signed by JudgeJoanna Seybert on 5/12/04. (Barhome, Sydelle) (Entered: 06/15/2004)
2004-06-1426COMPLIANCE WITH THE MAY 12, 2004 ORDER affirming Mag. J. Lindsay's 4/9/04 Report & Recommendatun and supplements the assertions as presented in the plf's 4/19/04 Objections to the Report & Recommendation.(Barhome, Sydelle) (Entered: 06/29/2004)
2004-06-1427AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plf's Compliance Affirmation served on Chief Susan Riley, Office of US Attorney Brooklyn on 6/11/04, filed by Charles Robert II. (Barhome, Sydelle) (Entered: 06/29/2004)
2004-06-1728SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLIANCE by Charles Robert II Re: 24 5/12/04 Order. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
2004-06-1729AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE by Charles Robert II Re: 28 Supplemental Compliance Affirmation served upon Chief Susan Riley via United States Postal Service on 6/16/04. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
2004-11-0230LETTER dtd 10/15/04 from Counsel for Plaintiff to Judge Seybert Regarding Request that the attached October 1, 2004 Declaration of DOJ Counsel for Intelligence Policy James A. baker be included in the Robert II v CIA and DOJ Record. The plaintiff renews his request for a settlement conference (Entered: 11/16/2004)
2005-02-0931Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 2/8/05 Re: To cite cases as authority for this Court to read in camera the "North Notebook" documents that the govt withholds based on FOIA Exemption 1. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 02/10/2005)
2005-03-1633Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 3/10/05 Re: To advise the Court that Judge Garaufis rendered a 3/1/05 Memorandum and Order dismissing the FOIA Robert VII v. DOJ 04cv1961. Pltff will be filing the appeal of the FOIA Exemption 1 decision on 3/31/05. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 06/07/2005)
2005-05-2632Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 5/19/05 Re: The Court is advised that on 5/17/05 at the Second Circuit Court of Appeals pre-argument Robert v. DOJ conference, AUSA Mahoney again rejected the pltff's offer of settlement. Additionally, to request a settlement conference. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
2006-02-1634Letter dated 2/13/06 by Charles Robert, II. Plaintiff renews request for settlement conference. (Nohs, Bonnie) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
2006-02-16Case reassigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco. Judge Joanna Seybert no longer assigned to the case. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
2006-03-07Judge Bianco recused himself. Case returned to Judge Joanna Seybert. Judge Joseph F. Bianco no longer assigned to case. (Vaughn, Terry) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
2006-03-0735ORDER: I recuse myself pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s. 455. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 03/07/2006. (Bianco, Joseph) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
2006-03-0836Letter dated 2/20/06 by Charles Robert supplementing his 34 letter dated 2/13/06 requesting settlement conference. (Nohs, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
2006-03-1437Letter dtd 3/3/06 by Charles Robert, II. to Judge Bianco regarding a request for a conference to discuss whether Your Honor should consider declining the reassignment because of potential recusal issues (Sica, Michele) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
2006-03-1438NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE (c/m w/letters to Plaintiff) (Nohs, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
2006-04-2539Letter dated 4/15/06 from Charles Robert informing Court of Second Circuit affirmance of related case's dismissal. (Nohs, Bonnie) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
2006-05-0440NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE. (c/m with letter to Plaintiff) (Nohs, Bonnie) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
2007-01-2241Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 1/17/07 Re: To inform the Court that the Supreme Court denied the Robert VII v. DOJ, Docket 06-743, petition for a writ of certiorari. Additionally, pltff renews his request for a settlement conference. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
2007-01-2942Letter from Charles Robert, II, to Hon. Joanna Seybert dated 1/26/07 re: request for settlement conference to present accurate facts to the Court and the congressional oversight committees. (Mahon, Cinthia) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
2007-02-2143ORDER re: 42 Letter. Application DENIED. The Court will entertain a future application upon joint request among the parties for a settlement conference. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 2/20/2007. (c/ECF) (Nohs, Bonnie) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
2008-05-1344Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 5/12/08 Re: To inform the Court that Pltff has filed a request with the NARA Public Interest Disclosure Board regarding FOIA requests. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
2008-09-2645Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 9/26/08 Re: Supplement to Pltff's letter of 5/12/08. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
2008-10-1646Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 10/16/08 Re: Supplement to Pltff's 9/26/08 letter. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
2011-11-18Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown added. Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
2011-11-21Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William D. Wall. Case was erroneously reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. (Gapinski, Michele) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
2011-11-21Data entry error. Case returned to Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Magistrate Judge William D. Wall no longer assigned to case. (Gapinski, Michele) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
2011-11-2847Notice of Impending Dismissal. Plaintiff has 15 days from the date of this Order to file an explanation or the case will be dismissed. (c/m to Plaintiff at both addresses) (Nohs, Bonnie) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
2011-12-0948Letter MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavit by 1/13/12; and in response to 11/28/11 Order, by Charles Robert, II. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
2011-12-1249AFFIDAVIT in Opposition Re: 47 Notice of Impending Dismissal by Charles Robert, II. Attachments: # 1 Part 2; # 2 Affidavit of Service. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
2011-12-15ORDER denying 48 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff's request to file a supplemental affidavit is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 12/15/2011. (Karneeb, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
2011-12-1550Letter from Charles Robert to Clerk dated 12/14/11 Re: Letter to Judge Seybert and Corrected Affidavit enclosed for filing. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
2011-12-1551Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 12/14/11 Re: To advise that Plaintiff has filed a "corrected" affidavit to include new chronological Section VV regarding NARA letter. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
2011-12-1552"CORRECTED" AFFIDAVIT in Opposition Re: 47 Notice of Impending Dismissal by Charles Robert, II. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
2012-02-0653Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 2/3/12 Re: Status letter regarding Plaintiff's prosecution plan seeking settlement. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
2012-02-1554ORDER - The Court interprets Plaintiff's letter as a request for a stay pending resolution of the NARA facilitation process. Plaintiff's request for a stay is DENIED. Rather, the Court ORDERS that this case be administratively closed without prejudice subject to reinstatement upon application to this Court. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a status report with the Court by August 15, 2012. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close this case and to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 2/15/12. C/M; C/ECF (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
2012-08-1555Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 8/15/12 Re: Status letter regarding Plaintiff's prosecution plan seeking settlement. (Attachments: # 1 status affidavit, # 2 affidavit of service) (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
2013-03-0456Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 2/28/12 Re: To inform the Court that on 2/26/13 the Supreme Court rendered its Clapper v. Amnesty decision; and that Plaintiff will request a summary judgment pre-motion conference by letter on 3/25/13. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
2013-03-2557Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 3/25/13 Re: To enclose Plaintiff's Local Civil Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts on Motion for Summary Judgment as to undisputed facts. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
2013-03-2558LOCAL RULE 56.1 STATEMENT of Material Facts on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Charles Robert, II. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
2013-04-1059Letter to the Honorable Joanna Seybert in response to Plaintiff's letter dated March 25, 2013 by The Central Intelligence Agency, The Department of Justice (Leonardo-Beckmann, Diane) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
2013-04-1560Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 4/11/13 Re: In response to the 4/10/13 letter from Diane Leonardo, AUSA. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
2013-05-1661Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 5/15/2013 Re: To report that the co-defendants did not provide the plaintiff with the Rule 56.1 counter statement of co-defendants CIA Director Brennan and AG Holder by 5/10/2013. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
2013-07-2262Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 6/22/13 Re: To advise the Court that on 6/22/13, the plaintiff informed the co-defendants' attorney that he has withdrawn the quiet settlement offer. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
2013-07-2263Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 7/22/13 Re: Plaintiff reports as a supplement to his June 22, 2013 letter to the Court, that he sent a letter dated 7/15/2013 to CIA General Counsel Preston, President Obama's DOD General Counsel Nominee, and advised that he would delay sending the plaintiff's "last chance" White Paper (WP) supporting a request that CIA General Counsel Preston recommend that CIA Director Brennan consider taking additional time to reconsider the plaintiff's withdrawn quiet settlement offer. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
2013-08-1564Letter dated 8/15/2013 from plaintiff to Judge Seybert. This letter is a supplement to 7/22/2013 letter 63 . (Padilla, Kristin) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
2013-09-1065Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 9/10/13 Re: For the reasons explained herein, plaintiff has not filed the application for reinstatement of the case because there continues to be a reasonable probability that the co-defendants will reconsider the plaintiff's August 15, 2013 renewed quiet settlement offer. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
2013-10-3066Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 10/30/13 Re: Plaintiff's monthly status report. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
2013-10-3067Letter from Charles Robert undated Re: "October 3, 2013 Review Group Comments by a U.S. citizen who was the target of the E.O. 12333 "FISA exempt" NSA Terrorist Survelllance Program without the FISC's knowledge" (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
2013-12-0568Letter dtd. 12/3/13 from plaintiff to Judge Seybert RE: this is plaintiffs monthly status report that supplements the plaintiffs 10/30/13 status letter (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
2014-01-0369Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 1/3/14 Re: Plaintiff's monthly status report supplementing December 3, 2013 status letter. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
2014-02-1070Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 2/10/14 Re: Plaintiff's monthly status report supplementing January 6, 2014 status letter. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
2014-03-0771Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 3/7/14 Re: Plaintiff's supplemental monthly status report. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
2014-04-0472Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 4/4/14 Re: Plaintiff's monthly status report supplementing March 7, 2014 status letter. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
2014-05-0173Letter MOTION to Reopen Case to reinstate case to active calendar by Charles Robert, II. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
2014-06-1174Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 6/10/14 Re: Plaintiff's monthly status report supplementing Plaintiff's 5/1/14 status letter. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
2014-07-08ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 73 Motion to Reopen Case. Pro se Plaintiff's motion to reinstate this case is GRANTED. Additionally, the Clerk of the Court is directed to TERMINATE the law firm of Kassoff, Robert, Lerner & Robert LLP as counsel for Plaintiff and update the docket to reflect Plaintiff's pro se status, as well as his current address. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Electronic Order to pro se Plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 7/8/2014. (Mascia, Raymond) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
2014-07-10ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 7/10/2014. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-08-1275Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 8/12/14 Re: Plaintiff's monthly status report which supplements Plaintiff's 7/11/14 status letter. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
2014-10-0776Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 10/3/14 Re: Plaintiff's final monthly status letter that supplements 8/12/14 status letter; and to report that Plaintiff's attempt to secure a quiet settlement has failed. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-10-0777Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for Summary Judgment by Charles Robert, II. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-10-0778Letter from Charles Robert dated 10/3/14 Re: Plaintiff's failed quiet settlement offer; facts that occurred after 8/12/14 status letter; and Plaintiff's intent to file Motion for Summary Judgment conference. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-10-2779Letter from Charles Robert to Judge Seybert dated 10/27/14 Re: Plaintiff reports that pursuant to the Motion Practice Rule F(2), co-defendants have not provided Plaintiff with a copy of response. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff