Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePublic Record Media, LLC v. U.S Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2012cv03065
Date Filed2012-12-07
Date Closed2013-06-06
JudgeJudge John R. Tunheim
PlaintiffPublic Record Media, LLC
DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-12-071COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0864-3381405.) Filed by Public Record Media, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, # 2 Exhibits A-H to Complaint, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Haines, Jonathan) Modified on 12/7/2012 (JMH). Modified text on 12/7/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
2012-12-072TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 12-cv-3065 (JRT/TNL). (JMH) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
2012-12-07FILED IN ERROR-Summons Issued as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JMH) Modified on 12/7/2012 (JMH). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
2012-12-073Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (JMH) Modified text on 12/7/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
2013-01-024DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Public Record Media, LLC re 1 Complaint, to US District Attorney D MN (Haines, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/2/2013 (lmb). (Entered: 01/02/2013)
2013-01-025DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Public Record Media, LLC re 1 Complaint, to US Attorney General (Haines, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/2/2013 (lmb). (Entered: 01/02/2013)
2013-01-036DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Public Record Media, LLC. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 12/21/2012, answer due 2/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service to US Attorney District MN, # 2 Certificate of Service to US Attorney General and DHHS)(Haines, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/3/2013 (lmb). (Entered: 01/03/2013)
2013-01-037SUMMONS Returned Executed by Public Record Media, LLC. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 12/12/2012, answer due 2/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service to US Attorney District MN, # 2 Certificate of Service to US Attorney General and DHHS)(Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
2013-01-078STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Public Record Media, LLC, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Bildtsen, Ann) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
2013-01-079ORDER that Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended to and including January 25, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/7/13. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(kt) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
2013-01-2510ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Bildtsen, Ann) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
2013-01-2811NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR Pretrial Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2013 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/28/13. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(kt) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
2013-02-2012REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Public Record Media, LLC, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.(Bildtsen, Ann) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
2013-02-2613*TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: 11 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR Pretrial Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2013 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. LeungIS NOW SET FOR 2/28/2013 AT 02:30 PM. PLEASE NOTE THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY!!!! PLEASE NOTE THE TIME CHANGE ON YOUR CALENDARS!(kf) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
2013-02-2814Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 2/28/2013. Discussion of pretrial deadlines Pretrial scheduling order will be issued.The Court encouraged the parties to work diligently and to consider possibilities for resolving the matter. (GMW) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
2013-04-0215PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (FOIA CASE) Motions (disp) due by 8/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/2/13. (GMW) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
2013-04-3016STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF CERTAIN DATES IN PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Public Record Media, LLC, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Bildtsen, Ann) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
2013-05-1517AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions (disp) due by 9/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/15/13. (jam) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
2013-05-2018STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT by Public Record Media, LLC, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Bildtsen, Ann) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
2013-06-0519STIPULATION of Dismissal by Public Record Media, LLC, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Haines, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
2013-06-0620ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on June 6, 2013. (HAM) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
2013-06-0721JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal). (lmb) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff