Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2012cv02034
Date Filed2012-12-19
Date Closed2021-06-03
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [82]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-12-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0090-3167383) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-192LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-193NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Alan Fedeli on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Christopher) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-19Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (kb) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-194ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(kb) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2013-01-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/27/2012. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
2013-01-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/27/12. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
2013-01-077RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 12/27/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
2013-01-288ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
2013-01-29NOTICE OF ERROR re 8 Answer to Complaint; emailed to jeffrey.smith5@usdoj.gov, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the Judge initials are RBW not RLW (jf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
2013-01-299Corrected ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
2013-03-1410MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Christopher) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
2013-03-2811NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Peter J. Phipps on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Jeffrey Smith (Phipps, Peter) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
2013-05-1512STATUS REPORT (Joint, Supplemental) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phipps, Peter) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
2013-07-0213STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phipps, Peter) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
2013-11-1514STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phipps, Peter) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
2014-03-1415STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phipps, Peter) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
2014-06-25MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report March 14, 2014 (see ECF No. 15 ), and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that, on or before July 8, 2014, the parties shall file another joint status report informing the Court of the status of this case and/or a proposed briefing schedule for motions to address any remaining disputes. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/25/2014. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
2014-06-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2014 (mpt, ) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
2014-07-0816STATUS REPORT of the Parties by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
2014-07-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report July 8, 2014 (see ECF No. 16 ), and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that, on or before September 8, 2014, the parties shall file another joint status report informing the Court of the status of this case and/or a proposed briefing schedule for motions to address any remaining disputes. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/8/2014. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
2014-09-0817STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phipps, Peter) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
2014-09-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report September 8, 2014, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that if this matter is not voluntarily dismissed on or before October 8, 2014, the parties will, by that date, file a Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule to address outstanding issues to be addressed through summary judgment briefing. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 9, 2014. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
2014-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Briefing Scheduled due by 10/8/2014. (mpt, ) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
2014-10-0818STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Phipps, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
2014-11-0719STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
2014-11-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice, and in light of the parties' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 7, 2014. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
2015-05-0120NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marsha Stelson Edney on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Peter Phipps (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
2015-05-0121Joint MOTION to Reopen Case under 60(b)(2) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
2015-05-08ORDER granting 21 Motion to Reopen Case. Upon consideration of the Joint Motion to Reopen Case Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b)(2), and in light of the parties' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 8, 2015. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
2015-08-1322STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
2015-08-18MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Plaintiff's Status Report 22 and the representations therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference at a date and time to be determined by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 18, 2015. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
2015-08-19Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/3/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mpt) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-09-0223NOTICE regarding Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
2015-09-03Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 9/3/2015 Further Status Conference set for 2/24/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (mpt) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-0324ORDER. In accordance with the Court's oral rulings at the status conference, held on this same date, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff shall submit a proposed preservation order for the Court's review by the close of business on September 4, 2015. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall submit a response to the plaintiff's proposed preservation order, including its own proposal for a preservation order, if any, by the close of business on September 9, 2015. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on February 24, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 3, 2015. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-0425NOTICE of ORDER in MISCELLANEOUS CASE NUMBER 15-1188 by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0426NOTICE of Proposed Order for Preservation of Records by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. re 24 Order,, (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0827TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on September 3, 2015; Page Numbers: 1 - 30. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 2023543246, Court Reporter Email Address : jcathryn55@yahoo.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 9/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2015.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
2015-09-0928RESPONSE re 26 Notice of Proposed Order and Objections to Proposed Order filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
2015-09-0929REPLY re 28 Response to Document Defendant's Objections to Proposed Preservation Order filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
2015-09-1130ORDER. As the Court alluded to at the September 3, 2015 status conference, it does not intend to issue a Preservation Order--to the extent one is even necessary--that duplicates other Preservation Orders already in place, as a result of the multitude of other Freedom of Information Act cases before other members of this Court that bear at least some relation to the instant case before the Court. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall work jointly to compile and submit all Preservations Orders that have been issued by any other member of this Court, if any, that could affect the scope of any Preservation Order issued by the Court, on or before September 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 11, 2015. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
2015-09-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Preservations Orders due by 9/16/2015. (mpt) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-1631NOTICE of Filing (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 30 Order,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-25Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/1/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mpt) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
2015-09-30MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' communications with the Court, wherein certain representations about defense counsel were made, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference, scheduled for October 1, 2015, at 10:30 a.m., is CONTINUED until a date and time to be determined by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 30, 2015. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
2015-10-01Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 10/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mpt) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
2015-10-0732NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Berman on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Berman, Marcia) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
2015-10-07Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 10/7/2015. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (mpt) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
2015-10-0733PRESERVATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 7, 2015. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
2016-02-1834Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-19MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Motion to Continue. Upon consideration of the Joint Motion to Reschedule Status Conference, and in light of the parties' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the February 24, 2016 Status Conference is CONTINUED until March 31, 2016, at 10:45 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 19, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-02-19Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 2/24/2016, at 9:30 AM, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 3/31/2016, at 10:45 AM, in Courtroom 16, before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (ad) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-03-31Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 3/31/2016. Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 5/6/2016. Status Conference set for 5/19/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-05-0635MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-19Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 5/19/2016. Scheduling Order to issue via chambers. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-1936ORDER. In accordance with the Court's oral rulings at the status conference, held on this same date, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file its motion for discovery on or before May 27, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall oppose the plaintiff's motion on or before June 10, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall reply to the defendant's opposition on or before June 17, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference and hearing on the discovery motion on June 24, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 19, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions for discovery due by 5/27/2016, Response due by 6/10/2016, Reply due by 6/17/2016. (hs) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-2737MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 5, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-06-1038RESPONSE re 37 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d) filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-1739REPLY to opposition to motion re 37 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 3)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-06-2140ORDER denying 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 37 Motion for Discovery. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is stayed, pending the completion of discovery in civil action nos. 13-CV-1363 and 14-CV-1242. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the June 24, 2016 hearing on the plaintiff's motion is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file a status report no later than every forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order, so that the Court can periodically assess whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 21, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Main Document 40 replaced on 6/21/2016) (zhs). (Entered: 06/21/2016)
2016-08-0541Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file a status report on or before September 19, 2016, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 8, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2016 (hs) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-09-1942Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before November 3, 2016, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 21, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-09-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/3/2016 (hs) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-11-0343Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before December 19, 2016, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 4, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2016 (hs) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-12-1944ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) Modified on 12/20/2016 (jf). (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-20NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 44 Status Report was entered in error at the request of counsel and will refile with corrected document.(jf) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-2045Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-22MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before February 2, 2017, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 22, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/2/2017 (hs) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-02-0246Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before March 13, 2017, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 3, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-03-1347Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before April 27, 2017, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 13, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/27/2017 (hs) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-04-2748Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before June 16, 2017, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 27, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/16/2017 (hs) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-06-1649Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before July 31, 2017, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 16, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2017 (hs) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-07-3150Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before September 14, 2017, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 1, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report on or before 9/14/2017. (gdf) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-09-1451Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before October 30, 2017, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 14, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2017 (hs) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-10-3052Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-31MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before December 14, 2017, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 31, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2017 (hs) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-12-1453Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before February 8, 2018, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 15, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2018 (hs) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2018-02-0854Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before March 26, 2018, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 12, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/26/2018 (hs) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-03-2655Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before May 10, 2018, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 26, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2018 (hs) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-05-1056Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before June 25, 2018, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 14, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/25/2018. (hs) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-06-2557Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file an additional status report on or before October 30, 2018, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, ECF No. 40, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 26, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2018 (hs) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-09-2658NOTICE of Change of Address by Marsha Stelson Edney (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-10-3059Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 59 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before January 2, 2019, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 1, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/2/2019 (hs) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2019-01-0260Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 60 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before February 18, 2019, in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order, so that the Court can periodically address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 15, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2019 (hs) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-1561Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 61 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's June 21, 2016 Order. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 17, 2019, the parties shall file an additional joint status report, so that the Court can address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 21, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2019 (hs) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-07-1562Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 62 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's July 21, 2016 Order. It is further ORDERED that, on or before September 3, 2019, the parties shall file an additional joint status report, so that the Court can address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 16, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2019 (hs) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-09-0363Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 63 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case REMAINS IN EFFECT in accordance with the Court's July 21, 2016 Order. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 30, 2020 the parties shall file an additional joint status report, so that the Court can address whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 3, 2019. (lcrbw2) Modified on 9/3/2019 (hs). (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2020 (hs) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2020-01-3064Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-01-3165ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this matter is LIFTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before March 10, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file its (1) combined opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment or (2) renewed motion for discovery on or before March 31, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its combined opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before April 21, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before May 5, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference on August 11, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., which will serve as a target date for the resolution of the parties' summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 31, 2020. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Cross Motions due by 4/21/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 5/5/2020. Motions due by 3/31/2020. Summary Judgment motions due by 3/10/2020. Status Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-03-1066MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-3167MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 5, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-03-31MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and consistent with the Court's January 31, 2020 scheduling Order, ECF No. 65, it is hereby ORDERED that the remaining summary judgment briefing deadlines are VACATED pending further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for August 11, 2020, is VACATED pending further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a hearing on the plaintiff's motion for discovery on June 18, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 31, 2020. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-03-31Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-04-0368MOTION for Extension of Time to file opposition brief and to reschedule hearing by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edney, Marsha). Added MOTION to Continue on 4/3/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 68 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition Brief and to Reschedule Hearing, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its opposition to the plaintiff's motion for discovery on or before April 30, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its motion for discovery on or before May 8, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for June 18, 2020, is CONTINUED to July 7, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 9, 2020. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/09/2020)
2020-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to the plaintiff's motion for discovery due by 4/30/2020, plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its motion for discovery by 5/8/2020. Status Conference reset for 7/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 04/09/2020)
2020-04-3069Memorandum in opposition to re 67 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d) filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-05-0870REPLY to opposition to motion re 67 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d) and Exhs. 1 to 3 filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-08NOTICE OF ERROR re 70 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to cfedeli@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please do not refile. In future, Exhibits should be filed using the Attachment field. (ztth, ) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-06-03MINUTE ORDER. In light of Chief Judge Howell's May 26, 2020 Order, In re: Further Extension of Postponed Court Proceedings in Standing Order 20-9 and Limiting Court Operations in Exigent Circumstances Created by the COVID-19 Pandemic, Standing Order No. 20-29 (BAH), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for the motion hearing currently scheduled for July 7, 2020, via teleconference by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 3, 2020. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/03/2020)
2020-06-0471NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Attorney Chris Fedeli terminated. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-07-0672NOTICE of Appearance by Ramona Raula Cotca on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-07Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2020. Plaintiff's 67 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d); Heard and Taken Under Advisement. Written Scheduling Order to issue from Chambers. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-1773ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that on or before August 14, 2020, the plaintiff shall file its opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that on or before September 4, 2020, the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference on December 4, 2020, at 11:00 a.m., which will serve as a target date for the resolution of the parties' summary judgment motions. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 17, 2020. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/14/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/4/2020. Status Conference set for 12/4/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-2774TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on July 7, 2020; Page Numbers: 1 - 26. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 345-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the tr anscript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2020.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-08-1475Memorandum in opposition to re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Statement of Facts and Plaintiff's Statement of Facts filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ramona R. Cotca, # 2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-3176NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michael Leon Drezner on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Marsha Edney (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-3177Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-09-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 77 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on or before September 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 1, 2020. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply in support of Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2020. (hs) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-1878REPLY to opposition to motion re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Second Declaration of Eric Stein)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-11-0279NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bekesha on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-24MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending motion for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for December 4, 2020, is CONTINUED to March 5, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 24, 2020. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-24Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 3/5/2021 at 02:30 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2021-02-2380Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-02-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 80 Unopposed Motion to Continue Status Conference, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for March 5, 2021, is CONTINUED to April 29, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 26, 2021. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-02-26Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 4/29/2021 at 02:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-03-3181ORDER. For the reasons to be set forth in the Memorandum Opinion to be issued by the Court within the next sixty days, absent extraordinary circumstances, the Court will grant the defendant's motion for summary judgment. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the 66 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this Order is not a final Order subject to appeal. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 31, 2021. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-04-22MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Court's March 31, 2021 Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for April 29, 2021, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 22, 2021. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
2021-06-0282MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 2, 2021. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/02/2021)
2021-06-0283ORDER. In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion issued on this same date, it is hereby ORDERED that the 66 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that summary judgment is ENTERED for the defendant. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 2, 2021. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar