Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSchwartz v. United States Drug Enforcement Administration
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2012cv06229
Date Filed2012-12-19
Date Closed2013-03-19
JudgeJudge Brian M. Cogan
PlaintiffMattathias Schwartz
DefendantUnited States Drug Enforcement Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-12-191COMPLAINT against United States Drug Enforcement Administration Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Mattathias Schwartz. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-19The case of Schwartz v. United States Drug Enforcement Administration , has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. The case number is 12-cv-6229 . PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days . Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-19CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 350, receipt number 0207-5907647 (Oberlander, Lynn) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-202SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 2/1/2013 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/20/2012. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
2012-12-203Summons Issued as to United States Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
2012-12-214SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mattathias Schwartz. All Defendants. (Oberlander, Lynn) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
2013-01-225NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Gullotta on behalf of United States Drug Enforcement Administration (aty to be noticed) (Gullotta, William) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
2013-01-226First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Gullotta, William) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
2013-01-22ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to 1/25/2013. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2013. (Cogan, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
2013-01-257Letter Joint Letter by United States Drug Enforcement Administration (Gullotta, William) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
2013-01-258ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Gullotta, William) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
2013-02-01Minute Entry for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/1/2013. Both sides and plaintiff present. The Court set the following dates: discovery to be completed by 3/12/2013; defendant's summary judgment motion by 3/19/2013; opposition/cross-motion by 4/9/2013; reply, if any, by 4/23/2013. At the time it submits its motion, defendant must provide the Court with a copy of the materials sought by plaintiff's FOIA requests for in camera review. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
2013-03-199First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Gullotta, William) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
2013-03-19ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court having been advised that this matter has settled, the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 30 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents provided that they are submitted within this period. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/19/2013. (Cogan, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff