Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER/NATL SECURITY, et al v. DOJ
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2001cv02500
Date Filed2001-12-05
Date Closed2002-08-15
JudgeJudge Gladys Kessler
PlaintiffCENTER FOR NATIONAL SECURITY STUDIES
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
PlaintiffAMERICAN-ARAB ANTI-DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE
PlaintiffAMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAW FOUNDATION
PlaintiffAMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION
PlaintiffAMNESTY INTERNATIONAL USA
PlaintiffARAB-AMERICAN INSTITUTE
PlaintiffASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
PlaintiffCENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
PlaintiffCENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY
PlaintiffCOUNCIL ON AMERICAN ISLAMIC RELATIONS
PlaintiffFIRST AMENDMENT FOUNDATION
PlaintiffHUMAN RIGHTS WATCH
PlaintiffMULTIRACIAL ACTIVIST
PlaintiffNATION MAGAZINE
PlaintiffPEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION
PlaintiffREPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
PlaintiffWORLD ORGANIZATION AGAINST TORTURE USA
PlaintiffNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CRIMINAL DEFENSE LAWYERS
PlaintiffNATIONAL BLACK POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantJEWISH INSTITUTE FOR NATIONAL SECURITY AFFAIRS
DefendantNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CRIMINAL DEFENSE LAWYERS
DefendantNATIONAL BLACK POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.
DefendantPARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE, INC.
DefendantWASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-12-051COMPLAINT filed by plaintiffs CENTER/NATL SECURITY, AMER CIVIL LIBERTIES, ELECTRONIC PRIVACY, AMER-ARAB COMMITTEE, AMERICAN IMMIGRATION, AMER. IMMIG. LAWYERS, AMNESTY INTL USA, ARAB-AMER INSTITUTE, ASIAN AMER LEGAL DEF, CTR FOR CONST RIGHTS, CTR FOR DEMOCRACY, COUNCIL/AMER, FIRST AMEND FOUND, HUMAN RIGHTS WATCH, MULTIRACIAL ACTIVIST, NATION MAGAZINE, PEOPLE/AMER WAY FD, REPORTERS COMMITTEE, and WORLD ORG/TORTURE (bm) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
2001-12-05SUMMONS (3) issued to federal party federal defendant DOJ , and non-parties: U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bm) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
2001-12-052MOTION filed by plaintiffs for Steven R. Shapiro and Lucas Guttentag to appear pro hac vice ( AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERITIES UNION OF THE NATIONAL CAPITAL AREA, 1400 20th Street, NW, Suite 119, Washington, DC 20036, (202) 457-0800) (bm) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
2001-12-053LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by plaintiffs (bm) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
2001-12-104ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler: granting motion for Steven R. Shapiro and Lucas Guttentag to appear pro hac vice ( AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERITIES UNION OF THE NATIONAL CAPITAL AREA, 1400 20th Street, NW, Suite 119, Washington, DC 20036, (202) 457-0800) [2-1] by plaintiffs. (N) (dam) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
2001-12-105AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff CENTER/NATL SECURITY, plaintiff AMER CIVIL LIBERTIES, plaintiff ELECTRONIC PRIVACY, plaintiff AMER-ARAB COMMITTEE, plaintiff AMERICAN IMMIGRATION, plaintiff AMER. IMMIG. LAWYERS, plaintiff AMNESTY INTL USA, plaintiff ARAB-AMER INSTITUTE, plaintiff ASIAN AMER LEGAL DEF, plaintiff CTR FOR CONST RIGHTS, plaintiff CTR FOR DEMOCRACY, plaintiff COUNCIL/AMER ISLAMIC, plaintiff FIRST AMEND FOUND, plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS WATCH, plaintiff MULTIRACIAL ACTIVIST, plaintiff NATION MAGAZINE, plaintiff PEOPLE/AMER WAY FD, plaintiff REPORTERS COMMITTEE, plaintiff WORLD ORG/TORTURE adding plaintiff NATL ASSOC CRIM LAW, NATL BLACK POL ASSOC, PART FOR CIVIL JUST, and amending complaint [1-1] . (cdw) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
2001-12-126JOINT MOTION by plaintiffs, federal defendant for entry of a scheduling order (cdw) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
2001-12-177ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler: granting joint motion for entry of a scheduling order [6-1] by plaintiffs, federal defendant; on or before 1/11/02, the defendant shall provide to plaintiffs a substantive response to plaintiffs' 10/29/01, Freedom of Information Act requests. That response shall include release of such documents or information as defendant determines may be released. The Vaughn index may address categories of material rather than individual documents; on or before 1/11/02, defendant shall file its answer to the complaint and a motion for summary judgment, seeking judgment as to all responsive documents that have not been released; on or before 1/22/02, plaintiffs shall file their response to defendant's motion and (if they are so advised) a cross-motion for summary judgment; if plaintiffs file only a response to defendant's motion for summary judgment, then defendant's reply thereto shall be filed five working days after service of the response; if plaintiffs file a response and a cross-motion, then defendant's reply and opposition shall be filed seven working days after service of the response and cross-motion; if plaintiffs file a cross-motion, their reply in support thereof shall be filed four working days after service of the defendant's opposition thereto; all documents filed pursuant to this order shall be hand-delivered or faxed to opposing counsel; the Court will hear argument on these matters as soon as can be scheduled after conclusion of the above briefing. motion for summary judgment due 1/11/02 ; response to motion for summary judgment due 1/22/02 (N) (dam) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
2002-01-118MOTION filed by federal defendant DOJ for summary judgment exhibits (6) (cdw) Modified on 03/11/2002 (Entered: 01/14/2002)
2002-01-119ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT [5-1] by federal defendant DOJ (cdw) (Entered: 01/15/2002)
2002-01-2210MOTION filed by plaintiffs to stay proceedings on defendant's summary judgment motion pending discovery ; declarations (2), attachments (cdw) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
2002-02-0511NOTICE OF FILING by federal defendant DOJ amended exhibits 5-6 and supplemental exhibits 7-11 which were intended to accompany defendant's motion for summary judgment; exhibits (7); BULKY PLEADING (cdw) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
2002-02-0512RESPONSE by federal defendant DOJ in opposition to motion to stay proceedings on defendant's summary judgment motion pending discovery [10-1] by plaintiffs; declarations (1) (cdw) (Entered: 02/08/2002)
2002-02-1113MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by federal defendant DOJ for leave to file motion for summary judgment nunc pro tunc ; exhibits (2), EXHIBIT (SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION - LODGED AS OF 1/11/02, EXHIBITS TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION) (cdw) Modified on 02/13/2002 (Entered: 02/13/2002)
2002-02-1214ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion for leave to file motion for summary judgment nunc pro tunc to January 11, 2002 [13-1] by DOJ (N) (tth) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
2002-02-1215MOTION filed by plaintiffs to require expedited responses to discovery ; exhibits (2) (cdw) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
2002-02-1216REPLY by plaintiffs in support of motion to stay proceedings on defendant's summary judgment motion pending discovery [10-1] by plaintiffs; exhibits (3) (cdw) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
2002-02-2117MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Gladys Kessler (N) (tth) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
2002-02-2118ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : denying motion to stay proceedings on defendant's summary judgment motion pending discovery [10-1] by plaintiffs (N) (tth) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
2002-03-0419MOTION filed by plaintiffs to extend time to 3/15/02 to file their opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment , and to extend time to file their cross motion for summary judgment (cdw) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
2002-03-0620ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion to extend time to 3/15/02 to file their opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment [19-1] by plaintiffs; plaintiffiffs' response to motion for summary judgment due 3/15/02; cross motions due by 3/15/02; granting motion to extend time to file their cross for summary judgment [19-2] by plaintiffs; response to cross motions by 4/8/02; defendant's reply to motion for summary judgment due by 4/8/02 ; (N) (tth) (Entered: 03/07/2002)
2002-03-1821CROSS MOTIONS by plaintiffs for summary judgment ; (exhibits 58); BULKY PLEADING (cdw) (Entered: 03/21/2002)
2002-03-1822MOTION filed by plaintiffs to extend time to 3/18/02 to file their opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment (cdw) (Entered: 03/21/2002)
2002-03-2023NOTICE OF FILING by plaintiffs; amended exhibit (bm) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
2002-04-0324MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by federal defendant DOJ to extend time to 4/15/02 to file its opposition to plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment and reply in further support of its motion for summary judgment (cdw) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
2002-04-0825ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion to extend time to 4/15/02 to file its opposition to plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment and reply in further support of its motion for summary judgment [24-1] by DOJ response to cross motions due by 4/15/02 ; reply to cross motions due by 4/30/02 ; reply to motion for summary judgment due by <date not set> ; (N) (tth) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
2002-04-1526OBJECTIONS and responses to plaintiff's statement of material facts by federal defendant DOJ to (cdw) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
2002-04-1527REPLY by federal defendant DOJ in support of motion for summary judgment [8-1] by DOJ; exhibits (8) (cdw) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
2002-04-1528RESPONSE by federal defendant DOJ in opposition to cross motion for summary judgment [21-1] by plaintiffs; exhibits (8) (cdw) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
2002-04-1529MOTION filed for WASHINGTON LEGAL , JEWISH INST NATL SEC to file amicus brief ; EXHIBIT (AMICUS BRIEF) (cdw) Modified on 04/17/2002 (Entered: 04/17/2002)
2002-04-1631NOTICE OF FILING by federal defendant DOJ exhibits 14 to defendant's reply in support if its motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (cdw) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
2002-04-1730ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion for WASHINGTON LEGAL , JEWISH INST NATL SEC to file amicus brief [29-1] (N) (tth) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
2002-04-1735AMICUS BRIEF filed by amicus WASHINGTON LEGAL, amicus JEWISH INST NATL SEC in support of defendant's motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment; exhibits (2) (cdw) (Entered: 05/03/2002)
2002-04-3032REPLY by plaintiffs in support of cross motion for summary judgment [21-1] by plaintiffs; exhibits (27) (cdw) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
2002-04-3033RESPONSE by plaintiffs in opposition to motion for summary judgment [8-1] by DOJ; exhibits (27) (cdw) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
2002-05-0334ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : motions hearing on pending motions set for 10:00 5/29/02 ; (N) (tth) (Entered: 05/03/2002)
2002-05-1036NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kate Abbott Martin representing plaintiff CENTER/NATL SECURITY. New address: CENTER FOR NATIONAL SECURITY STUDIES 1120 19th Street, NW, 8th Floor Washington DC 20036 (202) 721-5650. (cdw) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
2002-05-1037ERRATA by plaintiffs to their reply in support of summary judgment regarding first amendment claim (cdw) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
2002-05-29MOTIONS HEARING held before Judge Gladys Kessler; heard and taken under advisement. Reporter: Susan Tyner (tth) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
2002-05-3138ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler: directing that all aprrties may, if they wish, submit to the Court any supplemental memoranda, not to exceed a total of seven pages, on any of the issues raised during the hearing by 6/7/02; government shall submit any updated information on the numbers ofdetainees that it represented it could provide to the Court during the motions hearing (N) (jwd) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
2002-06-0739MOTION filed by federal defendant DOJ to extend time to 6/14/02 to respond to court's 5/31/02 order (mpt) (Entered: 06/10/2002)
2002-06-1140ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion to extend time to 6/14/02 to respond to court's 5/31/02 order [39-1] by DOJ to 6/14/02 (N) (tth) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
2002-06-1441MEMORANDUM (SUPPLEMENTAL) by plaintiffs; exhibits (9) (cdw) (Entered: 06/18/2002)
2002-06-1442RESPONSE by federal defendant DOJ to the Court's order of 5/31/02 [38-1]; attachments (cdw) (Entered: 06/20/2002)
2002-06-1943NOTICE OF FILING by plaintiffs of additional exhibits; exhibits (2) (bm) (Entered: 06/21/2002)
2002-06-2844NOTICE OF FILING (SECOND) by plaintiffs additional exhibits ; exhibits (2) (cdw) (Entered: 07/02/2002)
2002-06-2845TRANSCRIPT of motions hearing filed for date(s) of 5/29/02. Reporter: Susan Page Tyner (cdw) (Entered: 07/02/2002)
2002-08-0246MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Gladys Kessler (N) (dam) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
2002-08-0247ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting cross motion for summary judgment [21-1] by plaintiffs, denying motion for summary judgment [8-1] by DOJ; with respect to the dates of arrest, detention, and release as well as the location of arrest and detention, defendant's motion is granted, and plaintiff's motion is denied; with respect to the names of detainees' lawyers, defendant's motion is denied, and plaintiffs' motion is granted; defendant shall disclose the names of the detainees' attorneys within fifteen (15) days; the defendant's search for information is response to plaintiffs' request for policy directives was inadequate. Defendant must conduct a new search within thirty (30) days. (N) (dam) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
2002-08-0848NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by federal defendant DOJ from order [47-1], entered on: 8/2/02. No fees paid - Govt. Copies mailed to counsel. (cdw) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
2002-08-0849MOTION filed by federal defendant DOJ for stay pending appeal (cdw) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
2002-08-0850MOTION filed by federal defendant DOJ to expedite consideration of defendfant's motion for stay pending appeal (cdw) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
2002-08-09TRANSMITTED PRELIMINARY RECORD on appeal [48-1] by DOJ to U.S. Court of Appeals (cdw) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
2002-08-1251ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler: granting motion to expedite consideration of defendfant's motion for stay pending appeal [50-1] by DOJ; parties shall file their papers in accordance with the dates they have agreed upon. (N) (tth) (Entered: 08/12/2002)
2002-08-1252STIPULATED ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : plaintiffs' opposition to defendant's motion to stay pending appeal due 5:00 8/13/02 ; reply to motion due 8/14/02 ; (N) (tth) (Entered: 08/12/2002)
2002-08-1354RESPONSE (OPPOSITIONS) by plaintiffs to motion for stay pending appeal [49-1] by DOJ (cdw) (Entered: 08/15/2002)
2002-08-13USCA # 02-5254 assigned for appeal [48-1] by DOJ (cdw) (Entered: 08/15/2002)
2002-08-1455REPLY by federal defendant DOJ in support of its motion for stay pending appeal [49-1] by DOJ (cdw) (Entered: 08/16/2002)
2002-08-1553ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler: granting motion for stay pending appeal [49-1] by DOJ (N) (tth) (Entered: 08/15/2002)
2002-08-1956ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler: the Memorandum Opinion, attached as Appendix A is the correct and official version of the opinion. (N) (tth) (Entered: 08/20/2002)
2002-09-2057NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiffs CENTER/NATL SECURITY, AMER CIVIL LIBERTIES, ELECT. PRIV./CENTER, AMER-ARAB COMMITTEE, AMERICAN IMMIGRATION, AMER. IMMIG. LAWYERS, AMNESTY INTL USA, ARAB-AMER INSTITUTE, ASIAN AMER LEGAL DEF, CTR FOR CONST RIGHTS, CTR FOR DEMOCRACY, COUNCIL/AMER ISLAMIC, FIRST AMEND FOUND, HUMAN RIGHTS WATCH, MULTIRACIAL ACTIVIST, NATION MAGAZINE, PEOPLE/AMER WAY FD, REPORTERS COMMITTEE, WORLD ORG/TORTURE, NATL ASSOC CRIM LAW, NATL BLACK POL ASSOC, PART FOR CIVIL JUST from order [47-1] , entered on: 8/2/02. $5.00 filing fee and $100.00 docketing fee paid. copies mailed to counsel (cdw) Modified on 09/23/2002 (Entered: 09/23/2002)
2002-09-20USCA # 02-5300 assigned for appeal [57-1] by plaintiffs (cdw) (Entered: 09/26/2002)
2002-09-23TRANSMITTED PRELIMINARY RECORD on appeal [57-1] by plaintiffs to U.S. Court of Appeals (cdw) (Entered: 09/23/2002)
2003-08-2258CERTIFIED COPY of judgment filed in USCA dated 6/17/03, on appeal [57-1], affirming in part the judgment of USDC , and reversing in part the judgment of USDC , and remanding for further proceedings. USCA # 02-5300 (cp) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
2003-08-2259CERTIFIED COPY of Order filed in USCA dated 6/17/03, referencing appeal [48-1], affirming in part the judgment of USDC , and reversing in part the judgment of USDC , and remanding for further proceedings. USCA # 02-5254 (cp) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
2003-08-2860ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : to submit to the Court, no later than 9/15/03, a statement of their positions as to what, if any, issues remain to be decided by this Court. (N) (dot) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
2003-09-1161RESPONSE by plaintiffs, federal defendants, to order 8/28/03 [60-1] (rje) (Entered: 09/12/2003)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff