Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGlobe Newspaper Comp v. National Indian Gami
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2002cv10169
Date Filed2002-01-31
Date Closed2002-09-25
JudgeJudge Mark L. Wolf
PlaintiffGlobe Newspaper Company
DefendantNational Indian Gami
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2002-01-311Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Wolf. Receipt #: 36707 Amount:$ 150.00. Fee Status: pd (ktb) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
2002-01-31Summons issued for National Indian Gaming Commission (ktb) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
2002-01-312Motion by Globe Newspaper Comp for expedited review , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
2002-01-313Memorandum of Law by Globe Newspaper Comp in support of [2-1] motion for expedited review, filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
2002-01-314Motion by Globe Newspaper Comp to compel preparation of a Vaughn Index , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
2002-02-115Judge Mark L. Wolf. Order entered: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(B)(2), deft National Indian Gaming Commission shall, by 2/15/02, respond to pltf Globe Newspaper Company's Motion for Expedited Review and Motion to Compel Preparation of a Vauhn Index. Motion hearing set for 3:30 2/21/02 for [4-1] motion to compel preparation of a Vaughn Index, set for 3:30 2/21/02 for [2-1] motion for expedited review . cc/cl. [EOD Date 2/11/02] (ktb) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
2002-02-156Response by National Indian Gami in opposition to [4-1] motion to compel preparation of a Vaughn Index, [2-1] motion for expedited review, filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
2002-02-217Judge Mark L. Wolf. Order entered. The parties shall, by 2/22/02, confe and report to the court on whether they have resolved any misunderstandings or disputes remaining in the case. If the parties are unabel to resolve the remaoining disputes, they shall, by March 1, 2002, submit memoranda that define each dispute, state their resppective positions concerning each dispute, and cite supporting authorities for their positions. cc/cl. [EOD Date 2/22/02] (ktb) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
2002-02-21Motion hearing re: [4-1] motion to compel preparation of a Vaughn Index Motion hearing held, [2-1] motion for expedited review Motion hearing held (ktb) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
2002-02-218Judge Mark L. Wolf. Clerk's Notes: Re - Motion Hearing. Parties to file a status report as to issues that that remain by cob Friday, March 1, 2002. (ktb) Modified on 02/26/2002 (Entered: 02/25/2002)
2002-03-019Status Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by Globe Newspaper Comp, National Indian Gami , filed, c/s. (ktb) Modified on 03/04/2002 (Entered: 03/04/2002)
2002-03-06Judge Mark L. Wolf. Endorsed Order entered. "Parties shall by May 17, 2002 report on the status of this case and either move for dismissal or propose a schedule for the prompt resolution of this case. cc/cl. [EOD Date 3/6/02] (ktb) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
2002-05-1710Assented to Motion by Globe Newspaper Comp to extend time to May 24, 2002 within which to file status report , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
2002-05-22Judge Mark L. Wolf . Endorsed Order entered granting [10-1] motion to extend time to May 24, 2002 within which to file status report. cc/cl. [EOD Date 5/23/02] (ktb) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
2002-05-2411Joint Status report and Proposed Scheduling Order by Globe Newspaper Comp, National Indian Gaming Commission , filed, c/S. (ktb) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
2002-05-29Judge Mark L. Wolf. Endorsed Order entered. Re Status Report: "Parties shall by 8/12/02 either file a stipylation of dismissal or any motions for summary judgment." cc/cl. [EOD Date 5/31/02] (ktb) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
2002-08-1212Joint motion by Globe Newspaper Comp, National Indian Gami to extend time to 9/6/02 to file summary judgment motions or stipulation of dismissal , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 08/13/2002)
2002-08-15Judge Mark L. Wolf . Endorsed Order entered granting [12-1] joint motion to extend time to 9/6/02 to file summary judgment motions or stipulation of dismissal. "Allowed. The parties shall by 9/6/02, file either a stipulation of dismissal or cross motions for summary judgment." cc/cl. [EOD Date 8/16/02] (ktb) (Entered: 08/16/2002)
2002-09-0613Joint motion by Globe Newspaper Comp, National Indian Gami to extend time for 8/12/02 until 10/7/02 , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 09/09/2002)
2002-09-25Judge Mark L. Wolf . Endorsed Order entered granting [13-1] joint motion to extend time for 8/12/02 until 10/7/02, The parties shall report again by 10/7/02. It is unlikley that any further extension of time will be allowed." cc/cl. Status report due on 10/7/02 . [EOD Date 9/25/02] (ktb) (Entered: 09/25/2002)
2002-09-25Case stayed . (ktb) (Entered: 09/25/2002)
2002-09-25Case closed. (ktb) (Entered: 09/25/2002)
2002-10-0714Joint motion by Globe Newspaper Comp, National Indian Gami to extend time to 10/11/02 to file stipulations of dismissal or motions for summary judgment. , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
2002-10-09Judge Mark L. Wolf . Endorsed Order entered granting [14-1] joint motion to extend time to 10/11/02 to file stipulations of dismissal or motions for summary judgment. . [EOD Date 10/10/02] cc/cl. (ktb) (Entered: 10/10/2002)
2002-10-1815Stipulation of dismissal by Globe Newspaper Comp, National Indian Gami without prejudice, filed. without costs c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 10/21/2002)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff