Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOLSON, et al v. FINANCIAL MANGEMENT
DistrictWestern District of Pennsylvania
CityPittsburgh
Case Number2:2002cv00511
Date Filed2002-03-14
Date Closed2002-03-28
JudgeJudge William L. Standish
PlaintiffTHOMAS OLSON
PlaintiffTRIBUNE REVIEW PUBLISHING COMPANY
DefendantFINANCIAL MANAGEMENT SERVICE
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2002-03-141COMPLAINT with summons issued Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 2872 (aen) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
2002-03-15SUMMONS(ES) issued for FINANCIAL MANGEMENT (aen) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
2002-03-152RETURN OF SERVICE executed on U.S. Attorney on 3/15/02 . Answer due on 5/14/02 . (aen) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
2002-03-153ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mag. Judge Ila J. Sensenich for Pretrial Proceedings. ( signed by Judge William L. Standish on 3/15/02 ) CM all parties of record. (aen) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
2002-03-274Stipulation by THOMAS OLSON, TRIBUNE-REVIEW PUBLI, FINANCIAL MANGEMENT Dismissing case With Prejudice with proposed order. (aen) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
2002-03-28ORDER upon motion granting [4-1] stipulation Dismissing case With Prejudice ( signed by Judge William L. Standish on 3/27/02 ) CM all parties of record. (crw) (Entered: 03/28/2002)
2002-03-28Case closed (crw) (Entered: 03/28/2002)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff