Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSeattle Times Co v. AT&F
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2002cv02554
Date Filed2002-12-23
Date Closed2003-04-04
JudgeJudge Robert S. Lasnik
PlaintiffSeattle Times Company a Delaware corporation
DefendantBureau of Alcohol Tobacco and Firearms
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2002-12-231COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) Receipt # 850302 (PM) (Entered: 01/01/2003)
2002-12-302RETURN OF SERVICE of summons and complaint executed upon defendant AT&F on 12/24/02 c/o John McKay (VK) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
2002-12-313RETURN OF SERVICE of summons and complaint executed upon defendant AT&F on 12/24/02 c/o Office of the AG (VK) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
2002-12-314RETURN OF SERVICE of summons and complaint executed upon defendant AT&F on 12/24/02 c/o Dept of the Treasury (VK) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
2003-01-22LODGED ORDER: stipulation for extension of time to answer and order thereon (VK) (Entered: 01/23/2003)
2003-01-235STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik extending time to answer complaint to 2/21/03 (cc: counsel, Judge) (VK) (Entered: 01/24/2003)
2003-02-216ANSWER to complaint [1-1] by defendant (VK) (Entered: 02/24/2003)
2003-03-047ORDER RE: INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due 4/15/03 (cc: counsel, Judge) (KERR) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
2003-04-03LODGED ORDER: stipulation and proposed order of dismissal (VK) (Entered: 04/03/2003)
2003-04-048STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik dismissing action with prejudice and without costs; case termed (cc: counsel, Judge, KL) (VK) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff