Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Dispatch Printin v. National Institute, et al
DistrictSouthern District of Ohio
CityColumbus
Case Number2:2003cv00177
Date Filed2003-02-26
Date Closed2003-10-17
JudgeJudge Algenon L. Marbley
PlaintiffThe Dispatch Printing Company
DefendantNational Institute for Occupational Safety and Health
DefendantUS Dept of HHS
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-02-261COMPLAINT (referred to Mag. Judge Terence P. Kemp ) ( no. pgs: 4 + exh) (sem) (Entered: 02/27/2003)
2003-02-262Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by plaintiff The Dispatch Printin ( no pgs: 1) (sem) (Entered: 02/27/2003)
2003-02-26Filing Fee Paid: on 2/26/03 in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 234896. (sem) (Entered: 02/27/2003)
2003-02-26Summons issued as to defendant National Institute, defendant US Dept of HHS (Commissioner, US Attorney & Attorney General) (sem) (Entered: 02/27/2003)
2003-03-113(AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS) RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant National Institute on 2/28/03 defendant US Dept of HHS (Attornery General & Commissioner on 3/5/03 and the US Attorney on 2/26/03) ( no pgs: 2) (sem) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
2003-03-314ANSWER by dfts' ( no pgs: 4) (sln) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
2003-05-125NOTICE setting this action for Preliminary PTC 3:00 7/22/03 before TPK, room 172, no pgs: 1 (cc: all counsel) (sln) (Entered: 05/12/2003)
2003-07-156Rule 26(f) Report of parties to Magistrate Judge filed by plt, dfts' ( no pgs: 6) (sln) (Entered: 07/16/2003)
2003-07-247Memorandum of First Pretrial Conference by Mag. Judge Terence P. Kemp ; Preliminary pretrial conf was held on 3:00 7/22/03 ; discovery cutoff ddl set for 10/1/03 ;mtn filing ddl set for 11/15/03; 12/03 SW ( no pgs: 3) (cc: all counsel) (sln) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
2003-09-178NOTICE by Plaintiff The Dispatch Printing Company of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant National Institute for Occupational Safety and Health (Tigges, Steven) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
2003-09-179NOTICE by Plaintiff The Dispatch Printing Company of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services (Tigges, Steven) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
2003-09-2410AGREED ORDER -ext granted -Discovery due by 11/14/2003 -Motions due by 1/6/2004. Signed by Judge Terence P Kemp on 9/24/2003. (wh, ) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
2003-10-1711STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff The Dispatch Printing Company. (Tigges, Steven) (Entered: 10/17/2003)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff