Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLARDNER v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2003cv00874
Date Filed2003-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffGEORGE LARDNER, JR.
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY
DefendantJOHN DOE Agencies 1-5
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [99]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Royce Lamberth has ruled that the FBI conducted an adequate search for records pertaining to organized crime figures Sam Giancana and Aniello Dellacroce in response to a voluminous request from journalist George Lardner. However, Lamberth also found that because of the large number of subsequent disclosures from the agency's representative sampling of 150 records the agency was required to reprocess them further. Lardner argued that, while there were references to Giancana throughout the records provided, there was no discrete file specifically pertaining to him. Further, Lardner indicated that the National Archives had told him it had 21 file boxes of material on Giancana in its Kennedy Assassination Records Collection. Rejecting Lardner's challenge, Lamberth observed that "Lardner suggests, without support, that additional responsive records must exist. Mere speculation as to the existence of records not located as a result of the agency's search does not undermine the adequacy of the search. Additionally, Lardner's affidavit that the National Archives has a voluminous collection of records on Giancana does not create a justifiable inference that the FBI possesses the same records and is withholding them. Lardner does not specify which offices these records originated from or their respective dates. However, Lardner's initial FOIA request specifically sought pre-1960 records and was addressed to the FBIHQ office. Therefore, without additional information regarding the records contained in the 21 boxes, Lardner fails to present sufficient evidence that these records would indeed contain responsive documents to his request." Lardner also challenged the FBI's conclusion that some records were missing. But Lamberth noted that "although missing files are understandably frustrating to Lardner, the adequacy of a FOIA search is generally determined not by the fruits of the search, but by the appropriateness of the methods used to carry out the search." Saying that the agency's current Vaughn index was "in a word, inadequate," Lamberth explained that "in re-processing the sample documents for preparation of the Vaughn index, the FBI determined that information previously withheld out of concern for privacy did not warrant continued exclusion. The FBI provides no additional justification in any of [its] declarations as to why these documents were suddenly deemed proper for release. . .While the fact that 'some documents in a sample become releasable with the passage of time does not, by itself, indicate any agency lapse,' here the sheer magnitude of the additional releases indicates that the sample is not an accurate illustration of the whole." Lamberth also noted that a number of documents had been redacted under the circumvention prong of Exemption 2, which had been rejected by the Supreme Court in Dept of Navy v. Milner. He pointed out that "in light of the Milner decision, a reprocessing of the responsive documents is justified to allow the FBI to release additional information previously withheld solely under Exemption 2."
Issues: Adequacy - Search
Opinion/Order [110]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Royce Lamberth has rejected reporter George Lardner's motion that he reconsider his earlier ruling concerning the adequacy of the FBI's search for records pertaining to mobsters Sam Giancana and Aniello Dellacroce. Lardner argued the agency had told him it had located 1,790 pages on Giancana in its JFK Assassination Records collection at the National Archives. Lardner inferred from this that the agency probably had retained copies of those records itself. But, Lamberth agreed with the FBI that the agency never said the 1,790 pages at NARA referred to Giancana. As a result, he pointed out that "in the present case, the record reflects that the documents that Lardner seeks 'are open to the public and researchers many access the original documents [at NARA].' Although the FBI should have released these documents to Lardner in a timely fashion, since they are now publicly accessible, plaintiff has the ability to review the records." Lardner also argued the agency had publicly confirmed that Dellacroce was an FBI informant and that it was improperly invoking a Glomar response to deny that fact. However, Lamberth pointed out that "the FBI did not release any information regarding Dellacroce's status as an informant, nor can plaintiff cite to any evidence in the record that would support his argument. Indeed, plaintiff asks this Court to 'determine whether' [informant] T-3 is in fact Dellacroce and would thereby qualify as an FBI informant. Lardner fails to appreciate that, mere speculation, or deduction on his part, does not constitute official acknowledgment on the part of an agency." Lardner also complained the agency had provided photocopies of photographs. Lamberth indicated that "plaintiff's argument failsâ€"an agency satisfies its obligations under FOIA if it provides records in any format. Here, the FBI provided photocopies of the records plaintiff requested, thus fulfilling plaintiff's FOIA request."
Issues: Adequacy - Search
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-04-111COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 150.) , filed by GEORGE LARDNER JR..(bcs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
2003-04-11SUMMONS Issued (5) as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY ; FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bcs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
2003-04-152Preliminary Electronic Case Filing Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on April 15, 2003. (FL, ) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
2003-05-273NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Sheri Goldfluss on behalf of JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
2003-05-274Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 motion in response to Complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
2003-06-02Order re 4 granting defendants' consent motion for enlargement of time. Defendants shall have up to and including June 26, 2003, in which to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on June 2, 2003. (FL, ) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
2003-06-255Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
2003-06-26Order granting re 5 defendants' consent motion for enlargement of time. Defendants shall have up to and including July 11, 2003, in which to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on June 26, 2003. (FL, ) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
2003-07-106Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
2003-07-14Minute order granting re 6 defendants' consent motion for enlargement of time. Defendants shall have up to and including July 25, 2003, in which to move, answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on July 14,2003. (FL, ) (Entered: 07/14/2003)
2003-07-257MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
2003-07-30Minute order granting re 7 defendants' consent motion for enlargement of time. Defendants have up to and including August 8, 2003, in which to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on July 30, 2003. Official paperless order(FL, ) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
2003-08-078Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
2003-08-12Minute order granting re 8 defendants' consent motion for enlargement of time. Defendants have up to and including September 3, 2003, in which to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on August 12, 2003. Official paperless order(FL, ) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
2003-09-029Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
2003-09-04Minute order re 9 granting defendants' consent motion for enlargement of time. Defendants have up to and including September 24, 2003, in which to move, answer or otherwise respond the complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on September 4, 2003. Official paperless order(FL, ) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
2003-09-2410ANSWER to Complaint Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive Relief by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
2003-10-1411Order for Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Conference set for 12/5/2003, at 10:15 am before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on October 14, 2003. (FL, ) (Entered: 10/14/2003)
2003-10-21NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Scheduling Conference of 12/5/2003 reset for 1/16/2004 10:15 AM in Courtroom 14 before Henry H. Kennedy. (dcn, ) (Entered: 10/21/2003)
2004-01-1412MOTION for Vaughn Index , Etc. by GEORGE LARDNER JR.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14 )(Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/14/2004)
2004-01-16Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy : Initial Scheduling Conference held on 1/16/2004. Status Report due by 2/23/2004. Oral joint motion to stay defendants response, granted; defendant to submit proposed order electonically by 1/22/04.(Court Reporter Donald Jacobsen (Miller Reporting).) (zdcn, ) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
2004-01-2113NOTICE by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 01/21/2004)
2004-01-2514SCHEDULING ORDER (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 01/25/2004)
2004-02-2315STATUS REPORT Joint Report to the Court by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order Concerning Further Proceedings)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 02/23/2004)
2004-02-24MINUTE ORDER re 15 Status Report filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION: The court hereby approves and adopts the parties' stipulation and proposed order concerning further proceedings in this case, docketed February 23, 2004. Consequently, the parties shall proceed with this litigation in accordance with the schedule set forth in the stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
2004-02-2416ERRATA by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 )(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
2004-03-1517Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the FBI's Status Report Regarding Documents Referred and the FBI's Report as to the Time Period Required to Process Investigative Records by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
2004-03-1918STATUS REPORT by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 )(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
2004-05-1819ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
2004-05-1920MOTION for Order Requiring Prompt Disclosure, Etc. by GEORGE LARDNER JR.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James H. Lesar# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
2004-05-24MINUT ORDER: granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report nunc pro tunc March 17, 2004. (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
2004-05-2821STIPULATION re 20 MOTION for Order Requiring Prompt Disclosure, Etc. and Proposed Order by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
2004-06-23MNUTE ORDER: denying 20 Motion for Order Requiring Prompt Disclosure of the 34,0000 pages of records that are responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests as motion is moot in light of the parties' May 28, 2004, stipulation which is approved by the court. (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
2005-04-1122Order denying as moot 12 plaintiff's motion for Vaughn Index. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on April 11, 2005. (FL, ) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
2006-06-0623Order for Status Report re 15 and 21 . Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on June 6, 2006. (FL, ) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
2006-07-0624STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
2006-07-07MINUTE : The court adopts, and the parties shall be governed by, the proposed schedule set forth in the status report (#24) filed July 6, 2006. (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
2006-11-0625Consent MOTION Enlargement of the Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
2006-11-07Minute order granting 25 defendants' consent motion for enlargement of time schedule. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on November 7, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
2006-11-07Time Schedule 25 : Defendant serves sample Vaughn index by November 21, 2006.Plaintiff reviews index and the parties confer on narrowing their differences by December 5, 2006. Defendant's summary judgment brief shall be filed December 29, 2006. Plaintiff's opposition and/or cross-motion is due by February 9, 2007. Defendant's reply (and opposition to any cross-motion) is due by March 5, 2007. Plaintiff?s reply, if any, is due by March 24, 2007. (FL, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
2006-11-2126Second MOTION Enlargement of the Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
2006-12-0527NOTICE of Service of Vaughn Declaration and Index by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
2006-12-29MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Defendant's consent Motion to enlarge scheduling order. The parties shall be governed by the deadlines set forth in the proposed order that accompanies the motion. SO ORDERED. (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 12/29/2006)
2007-01-1028Consent MOTION to Stay the Briefing Schedule and for Entry of Deadline for the Filing of Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
2007-01-16Minute order granting 28 defendants' consent motion for stay of briefing schedule and for entry of deadline for the filing of proposed schedule for further proceedings. The parties' obligation to file and brief dispositive motions is stayed. By January 26, 2007, the parties shall confer and file a proposed schedule, or, if the parties cannot agree, each party may file a proposed schedule. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on January 16, 2007. (FL, ) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
2007-01-2629STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
2007-02-0530Status Report Order. The parties shall submit a status report and/or proposed schedule for further proceedings in this case by May 25, 2007. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on February 5, 2007. (FL, ) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
2007-02-05Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/25/2007. (tj, ) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
2007-05-2531STATUS REPORT by GEORGE LARDNER, JR, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
2007-05-3032Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 30, 2007. (FL, ) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
2007-07-1333NOTICE of Service of Revised Vaughn Declaration by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
2007-09-1034Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing of Dispositive Motion by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
2007-09-11Minute order granting 34 defendant's consent motion for enlargement of briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 11, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
2007-09-11Briefing Schedule 34 : Defendants motion for summary judgment is due October 14, 2007; plaintiffs opposition and/or cross-motion is due by November 14, 2007; defendants reply (and opposition to any cross-motion) is due by December 5, 2007; and plaintiffs reply, if any, is due by December 26, 2007. (FL, ) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
2007-09-1935NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by Diane M. Sullivan on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE Substituting for attorney Peter S. Smith (Sullivan, Diane) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
2007-10-0436Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a dispositive motion by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Sullivan, Diane) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
2007-10-09Minute order granting 36 defendants' consent motion for an enlargement of time. Defendants shall have up to and including November 20, 2007, to file a dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on October 9, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
2007-10-15Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 11/20/2007. (tj ) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
2007-11-1937NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by John G. Interrante on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE Substituting for attorney Diane M. Sullivan (Interrante, John) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
2007-11-1938Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a motion for summary judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
2007-11-20Minute order granting 38 defendants' consent motion for enlargement of the briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on November 20, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
2007-11-20Revised briefing schedule re 38 : Defendants motion for summary judgment is due January 4, 2008; plaintiffs opposition and/or cross-motion is due February 4, 2008; defendants reply (and opposition to any cross-motion)is due February 25, 2008; and(4) plaintiffs reply, if any, is due March 17, 2008. (FL, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
2007-12-05Defendants motion for summary judgment is due January 4, 2008; plaintiffs opposition and/or cross-motion is due February 4, 2008; defendants reply (and opposition to any cross-motion)is due February 25, 2008; and(4) plaintiffs reply, if any, is due March 17, 2008.(tj, ) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
2008-01-0439Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
2008-01-07MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Defendants' Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion shall be filed on or before March 4, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 7, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
2008-01-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Summary Judgment motion due by 3/4/2008. (NP) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
2008-03-0440Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
2008-03-05MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, defendants' motion for summary judgment is due on or before April 18, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 5, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
2008-04-1741Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
2008-04-21MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, defendants' motion for summary judgment is due on or before June 17, 2008; plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion is due on or before July 29, 2008; defendants' reply and opposition to cross-motion is due on or before August 29, 2008; and plaintiff's reply is due on or before September 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 21, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
2008-04-21Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due on or before June 17, 2008; plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion is due on or before July 29, 2008; defendants' reply and opposition to cross-motion is due on or before August 29, 2008; and plaintiff's reply is due on or before September 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 21, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
2008-05-0842NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE Substituting for attorney John G. Interrante (Owens, Cindy) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
2008-05-2343Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,, file Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Owens, Cindy) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
2008-05-2744ORDER granting 43 defendant's consent motion to amend the 5/30/07 scheduling order. Motions for summary judgment to be submitted by 7/17/08; Oppositions due by 9/1/08; Reply due by 9/22/08. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 5/27/08. (tj ) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
2008-05-27Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 7/17/2008; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2008; Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 9/22/2008. (tj ) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
2008-07-1545Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 44 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct order granting defendant's consent motion to enlarge time for filing a Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Owens, Cindy) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
2008-07-16MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Defendants' Consent Motion to Amend the Court's May 27, 2008 Minute Order. Accordingly, summary judgment motions are due on July 31, 2008; oppositions are due on September 29, 2008; and replies are due on October 17, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 16, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
2008-07-3046Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file the parties' dispositive motions by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Owens, Cindy) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
2008-08-04MINUTE ORDER granting 46 the Parties' Joint Motion for an Extension of Time and to Amend the Court's July 16, 2008 Minute Order. Accordingly, summary judgment motions are due on October 15, 2008; oppositions are due on November 17, 2008; and replies are due on December 15, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 4, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
2008-10-1447MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
2008-11-1048Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
2008-11-12MINUTE ORDER granting 48 Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time. Accordingly, the parties' motions for summary judgment are due on November 24, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 12, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
2008-11-1849Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motions for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
2008-11-19MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Two-Day Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due on November 26, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 19, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
2008-11-2450MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit IRS Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Hardy Declaration)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
2008-11-2651MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit Lesar Decl., # 6 Appendix Local Rule 7l1(h))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
2008-12-0352Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions and Replies by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
2008-12-03MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Revised Briefing Schedule for Oppositions and Replies. Accordingly, the parties' oppositions are due on January 5, 2009, and the parties' replies are due on January 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 3, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
2008-12-3153Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Revise Briefing Schedule by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
2009-01-02MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule for Oppositions and Replies. Accordingly, oppositions are due on January 12, 2009, and replies are due on January 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 2, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
2009-01-0854Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Revise Briefing Schedule by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
2009-01-09MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Revised Briefing Schedule for Oppositions and Replies. Accordingly, the parties' oppositions are due on January 26, 2009; and the parties' replies are due on February 9, 2009. Counsel should not expect the court to grant any further request to revise the briefing shedule even if such request is unopposed. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 9, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
2009-01-2355Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
2009-01-26MINUTE ORDER granting 55 Consent Motion for a Stay of Proceedings. Accordingly, this matter shall be stayed for 90 (ninety) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 26, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
2009-04-1756Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
2009-04-20MINUTE ORDER granting 56 Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Status Report. Accordingly, defendants' status report is due May 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 20, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
2009-05-1557STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Status Declaration)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
2009-05-2858MOTION to Compel Release of Records FBI Transferred to NARA but Retains Copies Of by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
2009-06-1159Memorandum in opposition to re 58 MOTION to Compel Release of Records FBI Transferred to NARA but Retains Copies Of filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
2009-06-1260REPLY to opposition to motion re 58 MOTION to Compel Release of Records FBI Transferred to NARA but Retains Copies Of filed by GEORGE LARDNER, JR. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
2009-07-0261STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
2009-07-0262NOTICE of Filing of Declaration in support of 7/2/09 status report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE re 61 Status Report (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of 7/2/09 Status Report)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
2009-08-1463STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
2009-08-1864NOTICE of Filing of Declaration in support of 8/14/09 status report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of 8/14/09 Status Report)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
2009-10-0265STATUS REPORT October 2009 by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
2009-10-0566ORDER directing the Federal Bureau of Investigation to file its renewed motion for summary judgment no later than October 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 5, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
2009-10-2067Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
2009-10-21MINUTE ORDER granting 67 Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 21, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
2009-12-1868Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Breifing Schedule by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
2009-12-21MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 68 Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule because the movant did not comply with Local Civil Rule 7(c), which requires that "[e]ach motion and opposition... be accompanied by a proposed order." Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 21, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
2009-12-2369Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing Schedule by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
2009-12-31MINUTE ORDER granting 69 Renewed Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. Accordingly, the briefing schedule is extended to February 9, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 31, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
2010-02-1670Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing Schedule by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
2010-02-17ORDER granting 70 Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule Nunc Pro Tunc. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 17, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
2010-04-0871Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to and to Set Schedule by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
2010-04-12MINUTE ORDER granting 71 Joint Motion to Set Schedule and ORDERING that the parties submit a joint status report on or before June 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 12, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
2010-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/7/2010 (ztr) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
2010-06-0772STATUS REPORT Joint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration FBI Declaration)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
2010-06-10MINUTE ORDER adopting the joint proposal set forth in 72 the parties' joint status report. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 10, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
2010-08-1273STATUS REPORT Joint and Proposed Breifing Schedule by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
2010-08-13MINUTE ORDER. This court adopts and the parties shall be bound by the briefing schedule they propose and that is set forth in 73 their Joint Status Report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 13, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
2010-08-2774Vaughn Index. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Part 2 of Hardy Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
2010-09-2775Supplemental Memorandum re 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplement filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration IRS - Goldman, # 2 Declaration DEA - Little)(McBarnette, Andrea) Modified event title on 9/28/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 09/27/2010)
2010-09-28MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 28, 2010. (lchhk3) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
2010-10-2276Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to FBI's Supplement to its Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
2010-10-29MINUTE ORDER granting 76 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to FBI's Supplement to Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, plaintiff's response is now due by November 8, 2010, and defendant's reply is now due by December 15, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 29, 2010. (lchhk3) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
2010-11-1077Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Supplemental Motion for Summaray Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
2010-11-15MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 77 Plaintiff's Motion for Further Extension of Time. The movant did not comply with LCvR 7(m), which imposes a duty on counsel to confer with opposing counsel before filing any nondispositive motion and to "include [in the motion] a statement that the required discussion occurred, and a statement as to whether the motion is opposed." Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 15, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
2010-11-1578Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
2010-11-15MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 78 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for a Further Extension of Time. Accordingly, plaintiff's response to defendants' supplemental motion for summary judgment is due on December 6, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 15, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
2010-12-0479Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/04/2010)
2010-12-07MINUTE ORDER granting 79 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time. Accordingly, plaintiff's response to defendant's supplemental motion for summary judgment is due on December 14, 2010. No further extensions of this date will be granted. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 7, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
2010-12-1480Supplemental Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Lardner Declaration)(Lesar, James) Modified event title on 12/15/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 12/14/2010)
2010-12-1481Supplemental Memorandum in opposition to re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE LARDNER, JR. (See Docket Entry 80 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
2010-12-2082NOTICE re 80 of Filing of Corrected Supplemental Cross-Mootion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Corrected Supplemental Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Attachment A--Indices Search Form, # 3 Exhibit Attachment B--JUdgment in Lardner v. DOJ, # 4 Exhibit Attachment C--NOF of Memphis Commercial Appeal Article on Withers, # 5 Affidavit Supplemental Lardner Declaration)(Lesar, James) Modified to add link on 12/21/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 12/20/2010)
2011-01-1883Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and to Extend Briefing Schedule by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
2011-01-19MINUTE ORDER granting 83 Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. Accordingly, defendants' opposition to plaintiff's supplemental motion for summary judgment and reply in support of defendants' supplemental motion for summary judgment are due on January 25, 2011. It is further ordered that plaintiff's reply is due on February 11, 2011. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 19, 2011. (NP) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
2011-01-2584Memorandum in opposition to re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
2011-01-2585REPLY to opposition to motion re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
2011-01-2586AFFIDAVIT re 84 Memorandum in Opposition, 85 Reply to opposition to Motion Declaration of David Hardy by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
2011-02-1087Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
2011-02-11MINUTE ORDER granting 87 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Accordingly, plaintiff's reply in support of the supplemental cross-motion for summary judgment is due on February 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 11, 2011. (NP) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
2011-02-1488REPLY to opposition to motion re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE LARDNER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Attachment A, # 2 Appendix Attachment B, # 3 Appendix Attachment C, # 4 Appendix Attachment D, # 5 Appendix Attachment E, # 6 Appendix Attachment F, # 7 Appendix Attachment G, # 8 Affidavit Second Supplemental Lardner Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Lesar, James) (Attachment 12 and 13 replaced on 2/15/2011 to correct upside down pages). Modified on 2/15/2011 (znmw, ). (Various Exhibits Illegible) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
2011-02-1689NOTICE of Filing of Signed Second Supplemental Declaration of George Lardner by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
2011-03-2290NOTICE of Filing of Milner Decision by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
2011-08-2291NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Tricia D. Francis on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Andrea McBarnette (Francis, Tricia) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
2011-11-0192NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Andrea McBarnette on behalf of All Defendants. Substituting for attorney Tricia D. Francis. (McBarnette, Andrea) Modified event title on 11/2/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 11/01/2011)
2011-11-1893ORDER for supplemental briefing on the effect of Milner v. Department of Navy, 131 S.Ct. 1259 (2011). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on November 18, 2011. (lchhk1) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
2011-11-2194Case reassigned to Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge Henry H. Kennedy no longer assigned to the case. (ds) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
2011-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: FBI shall submit a brief by 1/16/2012. Mr Lardner response to that brief by 2/3/2012. (gdf) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
2012-01-0695MOTION to Stay Litigation on FBI"s New Stance in Light of Milner v. Dep't of Navy by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
2012-02-0396RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 93 Order and Defendant's Motion for Leave to Stay Proceedings filed by GEORGE LARDNER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/04/2012)
2012-02-17MINUTE ORDER. The Court will hear oral argument on defendant's motion to stay litigation on the FBI's new stance in light of Milner v. Dep't of Navy 95 at 3 pm on Thursday, February 23, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on February 17, 2012. (lchhk1) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
2012-02-21Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
2012-02-23Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Motion Hearing held on 2/23/2012. Motion to Stay Litigation on FBI"s New Stance in Light of Milner v. Dep't of Navy by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION heard and denied. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
2012-02-2497ORDER denying 95 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on February 24, 2012. (lchhk1) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
2012-04-0498ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 58 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 4, 2012. (lcrcl2/intrcl2) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
2012-04-0499MEMORANDUM AND OPINION disposing of 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 58 Motion to Compel; and 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 4, 2012. (lcrcl2/intrcl2) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
2012-04-24100STATUS REPORT Joint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
2012-04-26101ERRATA re 100 Status Report by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Status Report)(McBarnette, Andrea) Modified on 4/27/2012 to add linkage (rdj). (Entered: 04/26/2012)
2012-05-02102MOTION for Reconsideration re 98 Order Pursuant to Rules 52(b) and 59(b) by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rule 56(f) Lardner Decl.)(Lesar, James) Modified on 5/3/2012 to add linkage (rdj). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
2012-05-14103Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
2012-05-14MINUTE ORDER granting 103 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File. The defendant shall file an opposition to the plaintiff's motion for reconsideration by May 30, 2012. The plaintiff shall file his reply by June 25, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on May 14, 2012. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
2012-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition due by 5/30/2012. Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/25/2012. (rje) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
2012-05-30104Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
2012-05-31MINUTE ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time to extend briefing schedule by one day. Defendant's opposition is due May 31, 2012 and plaintiff's reply is due June 25, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on May 31, 2012. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
2012-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition due by 5/31/2012. Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/25/2012. (rje, ) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
2012-05-31105Memorandum in opposition to re 102 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rules 52(b) and 59(b) filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
2012-06-04106AFFIDAVIT re 105 Memorandum in Opposition by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
2012-06-25107Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideratin by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
2012-06-26MINUTE ORDER granting 107 Motion for Extension of Time to file. Plaintiff must file his reply no later than June 27, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on June 26, 2012. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
2012-06-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/27/2012. (hs) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
2012-06-27108REPLY to opposition to motion re 102 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rules 52(b) and 59(b) Motion for Reconsideration filed by GEORGE LARDNER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration June 2012 Lardner Decl, # 2 Declaration June 2012 Lesar Decl)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
2012-07-13109ORDER denying 102 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 13, 2012. (lcrcl3/intrcl6) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
2012-07-13110MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 13, 2012. (lcrcl3/intrcl6) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
2012-08-01111STATUS REPORT - Joint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
2013-05-07112ORDER requiring parties to submit a joint status report within fourteen days of today's date. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/7/2013. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
2013-05-21113STATUS REPORT - Joint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
2013-07-22114NOTICE of Change of Address by James H. Lesar (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
2013-07-22115STATUS REPORT Joint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
2013-12-20116MOTION for Leave to File In Camera Ex Parte by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
2015-06-23117NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Andrea McBarnette and Cindy S. Owens (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff