Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBANGOR PUBLISHING COMPANY v. LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Maine
CityBangor
Case Number1:2003cv00114
Date Filed2003-06-24
Date Closed2004-03-10
JudgeJUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL
PlaintiffBANGOR PUBLISHING COMPANY
DefendantUS DEPT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-06-241COMPLAINT against US DEPT OF LABOR Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 47172., filed by BANGOR PUBLISHING COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 10/22/2003) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(drm, ) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
2003-06-242Summons Issued as to US DEPT OF LABOR. (drm, ) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
2003-07-163AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by BANGOR PUBLISHING COMPANY. US DEPT OF LABOR served 6/30/2003.Answer due by 8/29/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - First page only #(2) Certified Mail Return Receipt)(err, ) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
2003-08-264Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by US DEPT OF LABOR. (bld, ) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
2003-08-26ENDORSEMENT OF ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer due by 9/19/2003. By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (gbc, ) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
2003-09-237ORDER/ENDORSEMENT mooting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (bld) (Entered: 09/30/2003)
2003-09-245MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by US DEPT OF LABOR. (bld, ) (Entered: 09/26/2003)
2003-09-296MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint to October 3, 2003 by US DEPT OF LABOR. (jgw, ) (Entered: 09/29/2003)
2003-09-298ORDER/ENDORSEMENT granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer due by 10/3/2003. By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (bld) (Entered: 09/30/2003)
2003-10-039ANSWER to Complaint by US DEPT OF LABOR.(COLLINS, DAVID) (Entered: 10/03/2003)
2003-10-0610SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/9/2004. Motions due by 2/17/2004. Ready for Trial on 5/4/2004. By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (err, ) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
2004-02-0311Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK : Telephone Conference held. Report to follow. (cwp, ) (Entered: 02/03/2004)
2004-02-0312REPORT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE OF COUNSEL AND ORDER Motions due by 3/1/2004. By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (jgw, ) (Entered: 02/03/2004)
2004-03-0913STIPULATION of Dismissal by BANGOR PUBLISHING COMPANY. (KUBETZ, BERNARD) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
2004-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines : Purge Deadline: 5/10/2004 as US Agency a party.(jgw, ) (Entered: 04/13/2004)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff