Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTHE NEW YORK TIMES v. PORT AUTHORITY
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityNewark
Case Number2:2003cv03781
Date Filed2003-08-08
Date Closed2003-08-14
JudgeJudge Joel A. Pisano
PlaintiffTHE NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY
DefendantPORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-08-081NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sup Crt of NJ, Bergen Cnty by PORT AUTHORITY w/verified pet of rem, afft of serv, memo in support of judgment, verified cmp, OTSC, amended verified cmp FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 317666 (MD) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
2003-08-112NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( Newark - Judge Pisano - Magistrate Judge Arleo) (NM) (MD) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
2003-08-113Notice of MOTION to remand matter to the Superior Court - BER by THE NEW YORK TIMES, & cert. of service. Motion [3-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (emergent motion filed per Judge Pisano instructions) (mn) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
2003-08-114CERTIFICATION of Bruce S. Rosen on behalf of THE NEW YORK TIMES Re: [3-1] motion to remand matter to the Superior Court - BER (mn) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
2003-08-136Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: J. CARUSO; Minutes of: 8/13/03; The following actions were taken, Hrg. on pltf's appl. for OTSC to remand this matter to State Court for lack of federal jurisdiction. ORDERED appl. granted. ORDERED fees denied. OS. By Judge Joel A. Pisano (DD) (Entered: 08/15/2003)
2003-08-145ORDER remanding action to Superior Court of Bergen County. ( signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano ) (NM) (bl) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
2003-08-14Case closed (bl) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
2003-08-267LETTER ORDER, scheduling conference for 11:00 9/26/03 ; etc. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo ) (NM) (sr) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff