Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY v. COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2003cv02042
Date Filed2003-10-03
Date Closed2004-05-13
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY
DefendantCOURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-10-031COMPLAINT against COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Filing fee $ 150.) , filed by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(mpt, ) (Entered: 10/07/2003)
2003-10-032LCvR 26.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by plaintiff. (mpt, ) (Entered: 10/07/2003)
2003-10-033NOTICE by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY of Rule 7.1 Disclousre Statement (mpt, ) (Entered: 10/07/2003)
2003-10-03SUMMONS (3) Issued as to COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mpt, ) (Entered: 10/07/2003)
2003-10-304NOTICE of Appearance by Edith Margeurita Shine on behalf of COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Shine, Edith) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
2003-11-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General (bcs, ) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
2003-11-068SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY. COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA served on 10/6/2003, answer due 11/5/2003. (bcs, ) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
2003-11-069SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY. on U.S. Attorney served on 10/20/2003, answer due 11/19/2003. (bcs, ) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
2003-11-105Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Brief Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time and Entry of Proposed Briefing Schedule by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shine, Edith) (Entered: 11/10/2003)
2003-11-126ORDER granting 5 motion for enlargement of time and for entry of the proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/12/03. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
2003-11-12Set Deadlines/Hearings: Summary Judgment motions due by 12/10/2003. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/12/2004. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/26/2004. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
2003-12-0910Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shine, Edith) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
2003-12-1011ORDER granting 10 defendant's consent motion to stay until December 17, 2003, and requiring parties to report the status of their negotiations on that date. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/10/03. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
2003-12-1712STATUS REPORT by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Shine, Edith) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
2003-12-18MINUTE ENTRY: Pursuant to the status report filed by plaintiff on December 17, 2003, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than January 15, 2004; and it is further ORDERED that, in addition to the status report, the parties shall submit a joint proposed briefing schedule if further proceedings are deemed necessary. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/18/03. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
2003-12-18AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY: Pursuant to the status report filed by defendant on December 17, 2003, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than January 15, 2004; and it is further ORDERED that, in addition to the status report, the parties shall submit a joint proposed briefing schedule if further proceedings are deemed necessary. This order supersedes the other minute entry issued on this date. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/18/03. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
2004-01-1513NOTICE by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA re Order, Second Status Report (Shine, Edith) (Entered: 01/15/2004)
2004-01-16MINUTE ENTRY: Pursuant to the status report filed by defendant on January 15, 2004, it is hereby ORDERED that, should they deem further litigation necessary, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule by not later than January 22, 2004; and it is further ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed until that date. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 01/16/04. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
2004-01-2214NOTICE by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA re Order, (Shine, Edith) (Entered: 01/22/2004)
2004-01-2215NOTICE by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA re Order, (Shine, Edith) (Entered: 01/22/2004)
2004-01-2216NOTICE by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA re Order, (Shine, Edith) (Entered: 01/22/2004)
2004-01-23MINUTE ENTRY: Upon consideration of 14 - 16 the status report filed by defendant on January 22, 2004, it is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are STAYED until February 13, 2004; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report and, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule by not later than that date. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 01/23/04. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
2004-02-1317NOTICE by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Shine, Edith) (Entered: 02/13/2004)
2004-02-16MINUTE ENTRY: Pursuant to 17 defendant's status report of February 13, 2004, it is hereby ORDERED that procedings in this case are STAYED until March 2, 2004; and it is further ORDERED that a further status report and, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule shall be filed by not later than March 2, 2004. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 02/13/04. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 02/16/2004)
2004-03-0218STATUS REPORT with proposed briefing schedule by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shine, Edith) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
2004-03-0319SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/3/04. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
2004-03-1820ANSWER to Complaint by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Shine, Edith) (Entered: 03/18/2004)
2004-03-26ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ENTRY: On March 18, 2004, defendant filed an answer that raises as an affirmative defense plaintiff's alleged failure to exhaust its administrative remedies with respect to a request under the Freedom of Information Act. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed summary judgment briefing schedule by not later than April 9, 2004. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 03/26/04. (lcjdb2) Modified on 3/26/2004 (bcs, ). (Entered: 03/26/2004)
2004-03-26"NOTICE OF CORRECTED MINUTE ENTRY. The minute entry that was docketed this morning was entered in error and will not be refiled. Please disregard the notice sent." (bcs, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
2004-04-1321Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Shine, Edith) (Entered: 04/13/2004)
2004-04-14MINUTE ENTRY: Upon consideration of 21 defendant's consent motion for an extension of time to file its motion for summary judgment, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file its motion by not later than April 27, 2004. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 04/14/04. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 04/14/2004)
2004-04-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 4/27/2004. (tb, ) (Entered: 04/20/2004)
2004-04-2722MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction In Part, and , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts# 2 Affidavit Barley Declaration# 3 Exhibit Barley Decl., Ex 1# 4 Exhibit Barley Decl., Ex 2.# 5 Exhibit Barley Decl., Ex 3.# 6 Exhibit Barley Decl., Ex 4.)(Shine, Edith) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
2004-05-1323STIPULATION Stipulation of Dismissal by COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Shine, Edith) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff