Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times v. U.S.D.L.
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2003cv08334
Date Filed2003-10-22
Date Closed2004-08-05
JudgeJudge Shira A. Scheindlin
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
DefendantUnited States Department of Labor
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-10-221COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 489396. (gmo) (Entered: 10/23/2003)
2003-10-222RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by The New York Times . (gmo) (Entered: 10/23/2003)
2003-10-22Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (gmo) (Entered: 10/23/2003)
2003-11-213ANSWER to Complaint by U.S.D.L. (Attorney from the Firm: US Attorney, SDNY) . (cd) (Entered: 11/22/2003)
2003-12-084CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Hon. John Ashcroft, U.S. Department of Justice; Civil Procees Clerk of U.S. Attorney's Office on 10/23/03; and General Counsel U.S. Department of Labor on 11/10/03. Service was made by Mail. (sac, ) (Entered: 12/15/2003)
2003-12-23Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin : Interim Pretrial Conference held on 12/23/2003. (yv, ) (Entered: 02/20/2004)
2003-12-245SCHEDULING ORDER:Defendant's Motions and plaintiff's motion due by 2/27/2004. Defendant's Responses and plaintiff's response due by 3/19/2004. Defendant's sworn statement of a person with knowledge confirming that it has responsive document containing numerical ranking of the workplaces to be served on or before 1/30/04. Defendant shall give Ransom predisclosure notification and issue a final determination to plaintiff by 2/23/04. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/03) (yv, ) (Entered: 01/13/2004)
2004-03-026SCHEDULING ORDER: For good cause shown, the scheduling order in the above -referenced case approved by the Court on 12/23/2003, is hereby amended as follows: Cross Motions due by 3/12/2004. Responses due by 4/16/2004 (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/1/2004) (jsa, ) (Entered: 03/04/2004)
2004-03-128CROSS-MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Summary Judgment. Document filed by The New York Times Company. (db, ) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
2004-03-1211MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Dismiss the complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for summary judgment. Document filed by United States Department of Labor. Return Date set for 4/16/2004 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (db, ) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
2004-03-187STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to Counts 3 & 4 only.... (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 03/16/04) (jf, ) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
2004-04-199MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Summary Judgment. Document filed by The New York Times Company. (db, ) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
2004-04-1910REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Summary Judgment. Document filed by The New York Times Company. (db, ) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
2004-04-1912MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document filed by United States Department of Labor. (db, ) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
2004-04-1913JOINT RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The New York Times Company, United States Department of Labor. (db, ) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
2004-04-1914REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document filed by United States Department of Labor. (db, ) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
2004-04-1915DECLARATION of Miriam McD. Miller in Support re: 11 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document filed by United States Department of Labor. (db, ) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
2004-04-1916DECLARATION of Miriam McD. Miller in Support re: 11 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by United States Department of Labor. (db, ) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
2004-07-3017MEMORANDUM AND OPINION #90417 re:granting 8 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Summary Judgment. filed by The New York Times Company;denying 11 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. filed by United States Department of Labor.The DOL is ordered to provide the TImes with the LWDII rates for the 13,000 employers that received notices from the DOL in 2002 as a result of exceptionally high rates. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motiond (docket numbersrs, 8 and 11 ) and this case; (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 07/29/04) (djc, ) (Entered: 08/04/2004)
2004-07-30Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 17 Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk for preparation of Judgment. (djc, ) (Entered: 08/04/2004)
2004-08-0518CLERK'S JUDGMENT denying defendant's motion for summary judgment, granting plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment, and ordering defendant to provide the plaintiff with the LWDII rates for the 13,000 employers that received notices from the DOL in 2002 as a result of exceptionally high rates. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 8/5/04) (ml, ) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
2004-08-17Mailed notice of Right to Appeal to Attorney(s) of Record: David J Kennedy, David E. McCraw. (snu, ) (Entered: 08/17/2004)
2004-10-0119NOTICE OF APPEAL from 17 Memorandum & Opinion,,, 18 Clerk's Judgment,. Document filed by United States Department of Labor. Copies of Notice of Appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: DAVID E. MCCRAW. USA no appeal filing fee due(pr, ) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
2004-10-01Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 19 Notice of Appeal. (pr, ) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
2004-10-01Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 19 Notice of Appeal. (pr, ) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
2004-12-0920MANDATE of USCA WITHDRAWING APPEAL (Certified Copy) as to 19 Notice of Appeal filed by United States Department of Labor USCA Case Number 04-5322-cv.... the above-captioned appeal shall be, and hereby is, WITHDRAWN pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure without costs or attorney's fees to either party. Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Certified: 12/1/04. (dt, ) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
2004-12-09Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: 20 USCA Mandate Withdrawing Appeal. (dt, ) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff