Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2003cv02216
Date Filed2003-10-29
Date Closed2004-04-30
JudgeJudge Richard W. Roberts
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-10-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Filing fee $ 150.) , filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY.(jf, ) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
2003-10-29SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
2003-10-302LCvR 26.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (jf, ) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
2003-11-103NOTICE of Appearance by Uldric Lutgardt Fiore Jr. on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 11/10/2003)
2003-11-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, SUMMONS Returned Executed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
2003-12-015NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Shapiro on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
2003-12-016ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
2003-12-037ORDER setting initial scheduling conference for 12/17/03 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/3/03. (AKG) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
2003-12-22Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 12/30/2003 09:15 AM before Richard W. Roberts. (lin, ) (Entered: 12/22/2003)
2003-12-228NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Kenneth Haas on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 12/22/2003)
2003-12-23Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/30/2003 09:15 AM before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (lin, ) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
2003-12-249STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 12/24/2003)
2003-12-30Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Roberts : Dispositive motion deadline set for 2/20/04;Scheduling Conference held on 12/30/2003. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace.) (lin, ) (Entered: 12/30/2003)
2004-01-0610SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 2/20/2004. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/5/04. (AKG) (Entered: 01/06/2004)
2004-02-1911First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 02/19/2004)
2004-02-25MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 3/5/04 to file motion for summary judgment. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/25/04. (AKG) (Entered: 02/25/2004)
2004-03-0512Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 03/05/2004)
2004-03-08MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting 12 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 3/19/04 to file its motion for summary judgment. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/8/04. (AKG) (Entered: 03/08/2004)
2004-03-1813Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion For Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 03/18/2004)
2004-03-25MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 4/2/04 to file motion for summary judgment. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/25/04. (AKG) (Entered: 03/25/2004)
2004-04-0214Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 04/02/2004)
2004-04-05MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting 14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 4/16/04 to file motion for summary judgment. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/5/04. (AKG) (Entered: 04/05/2004)
2004-04-1615Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
2004-04-20MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 4/30/04 to file a motion for summary judgment. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/20/04. (AKG) (Entered: 04/20/2004)
2004-04-3016STIPULATION of the Parties To Dismiss With Prejudice by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 04/30/2004)
2004-04-30MINUTE ENTRY ORDER approving the parties' stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/30/04. (AKG) (Entered: 04/30/2004)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff