Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. US DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2003cv02215
Date Filed2003-10-29
Date Closed2004-02-26
JudgeJudge Ellen S. Huvelle
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-10-291COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Filing fee $ 150.) , filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY.(jf, ) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
2003-10-29SUMMONS (3) Issued as to US DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
2003-10-292LCvR 26.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (jf, ) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
2003-11-263RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General US DEPARTMENT OF STATE., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to US DEPARTMENT OF STATE., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. US DEPARTMENT OF STATE, SUMMONS Returned Executed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. US DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
2003-12-014NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Shapiro on behalf of US DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
2003-12-015ANSWER to Complaint by US DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
2003-12-026ORDER that defendant shall file a motion to dismiss or for summary judgment on or before January 14, 2004.. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/2/03. (BL, ) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
2003-12-167ENTERED IN ERROR.....Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by US DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Haas, Alexander) Modified on 12/16/2003 (jf, ). (Entered: 12/16/2003)
2003-12-168Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by US DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
2003-12-16NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY. Document No. 7 was entered in error and counsel was notified not to re-file Proposed Orders as a Motion. (jf, ) Modified on 12/16/2003 (jf, ). (Entered: 12/16/2003)
2003-12-16Minute ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to file motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/16/03. (BL, ) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
2003-12-169**ENTERED IN ERROR**ORDER that the removing defendant within ten (10) days of this Order to show cause why removal is appropriate here.. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/16/03. (BL, ) Modified on 12/16/2003 (BL, ). (Entered: 12/16/2003)
2004-01-0810Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file its motion for summary judgment by US DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 01/08/2004)
2004-01-0811Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for summary judgment with proposed order by US DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 01/08/2004)
2004-01-09Minute ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to file its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 1/9/04. (BL, ) (Entered: 01/09/2004)
2004-02-2612STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by US DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 02/26/2004)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff