Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHALL et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2004cv00814
Date Filed2004-05-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffROGER HALL
PlaintiffSTUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.
PlaintiffACCURACY IN MEDIA
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantCAROL HRDLICKA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [46]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Henry Kennedy has ruled that there is no indication that the fee estimate given to Roger Hall for responding to his request for information at POWs and MIAs in Vietnam was improper and that he cannot challenge the propriety of a similar estimate in an overlapping but separate FOIA suit currently before another judge. Hall had previously litigated similar requests submitted in 1994 and 1998 before Judge Paul Friedman. In that action, the CIA estimated costs would be about $11,000. Because Hall had committed to only paying $1,000, Friedman, in November, 2003, found he had constructively abandoned his case. However, in February 2003, during the litigation before Friedman, Hall made a second broader request to the CIA. Hall filed suit again in May 2004 and the CIA responded to the request in June 2004, estimating a cost of $606,950. After deciding it could not respond to two subsections of Hall's request, the CIA revised its fee estimate to $40,466 and requested a deposit of $20,000. Hall asked Kennedy to order the CIA to provide an accounting of its fee estimate. After reviewing the record, Kennedy declined, noting that "Hall's challenge to the current fee request rests largely on what he views to be an excessively large estimate. This challenge is undermined by the fact that Hall failed to acknowledge that he had requested information about 1700 individuals, not 47 as he claimed. Moreover, there is no credible evidence that the current fee estimate -- $40,466 �" is inflated or inaccurate, nor is there evidence that the decrease in the fee estimate in this action, as explained in the CIA's June letter, was for any improper reason." Because there had not yet been a search in this case, Kennedy said an accounting would be premature. He pointed out that "it is possible that an accounting may be appropriate at a later date, if, for example, the actual cost of the search for documents responsive to plaintiffs' 2003 FOIA request ends up being inexplicably different than the current fee estimate or if the documents produced suggest that the costs for the search were improperly inflated."
Issues: Fees
Opinion/Order [88]
Opinion/Order [137]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Henry Kennedy has ruled that the CIA has not shown that it conducted an adequate search for records concerning POW/MIAs from the Vietnam War. The agency claimed that Roger Hall's request to search for records of 44 POW/MIAs for whom h had obtained next-of-kin authorizations for release, as well as another 1,700 names for whom families had given general authorization of public disclosure, was too vague because it would likely produce some records that were about individuals other than those on the lists. Kennedy noted that "the Agency has conceded that a search is possible. And it has not explained why it could verify the identity of individuals whose names appear in its records by date and place of birth but not, for example, social security number. If such an explanation exists, the CIA must provide it in a supplemental declaration. Otherwise, it must search for and disclose any non-exempt records which, based on the information Hall and [Accuracy in Media] have provided and the details contained in the records themselves, it can verify pertain to an individual on plaintiffs' lists." Kennedy also indicated that the CIA was responsible for making sure that referrals made to other agencies two years earlier were indeed processed. He said that "the time Hall and AIM have waited for the records has been significantly increased by these referrals, so the referral process here constitutes improper withholding." While Kennedy accepted the agency's rationale for invoking Exemption 1 (national security), he pointed out that the agency had withheld some documents that were more than 25 years old. Noting that there were exceptions to the 25-year rule for automatic declassification, he observed that "the records at issue here may well fall into one or more of these categories, but the CIA has not made such an assertion. The CIA should address this issue in its supplemental filing to this Court pursuant to this opinion." The agency had claimed that the attorney-client privilege allowed it to withhold some records under Exemption 5 (privileges). Kennedy found that the agency had broadly identified the recipients of such information as "CIA officers." He indicated that "the Agency has not provided any additional information about the responsibilities of the officers to which it refers. Therefore, the Court cannot determine whether the officers are individuals who, by virtue of their authority to represent the Agency, are entitled in their communications with attorneys to protections of the attorney-client privilege. The CIA must either disclose records withheld pursuant to the attorney-client privilege or indicate in its supplemental filings, in sufficient detail, why withholding is proper as to each document for which it relies on the privilege."
Issues: Adequacy - Search
Opinion/Order [187]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Royce Lamberth has ruled that the CIA has so far failed to conduct an adequate search for records pertaining to prisoners of war or soldiers missing in action from the Vietnam War as part of a multi-part request submitted by Roger Hall. One of Hall's requests asked for responsive records on 1,711 names, each of whom was an alleged Vietnam War POW/MIA. The agency claimed such a search was too burdensome, although it later agreed to search for 31 names for which Hall furnished further identifying information. Lamberth found the agency's claim unpersuasive and noted that "the CIA is not asked to determine responsiveness on name alone�"if the record is regarding an individual as a POW or MIA, it is responsive. Therefore, the CIA's argument that 'it is extremely difficult or impossible to determine responsiveness based on name alone' carries little weight. Also, the CIA does not state that responsiveness would be impossible for all documents, just that it may be impossible to determine for some documents. That would mean that some responsive records, perhaps even a vast majority, could be determined to be responsive." He added that "the CIA has remained silent on the issue of estimating the man-hours involved, even after plaintiffs raised the issue. This Court will not find a search unduly burdensome on conclusory statements alone." Lamberth was no more convinced by the agency's lengthy description of how it would have to search through boxes of records. He noted that "despite the CIA's detailed tutorial on how to get a file out of a box, again it fails to provide the Court with an estimate of how many man-hours are necessary to fulfill the search. The Court will not find a search unduly burdensome simply because of the level of description shown and the number of steps used to describe looking into a box." Hall argued the agency had failed to search for any responsive records that had ever been submitted to Congress. However, the agency contended the request encompassed any search it ever conducted pertaining to POW/MIAs. Lamberth pointed out that "the CIA appears to have used the language from a [previous] 2009 Order [in the case]�"which appears to misquote Hall's 2003 letter request�"to excuse them from the full extent of plaintiff's' FOIA request." Since "the CIA has made no claims that it is unable to conduct the search in question," Lamberth instructed the agency to do so. The agency had told Hall that he was responsible for following up on records referred to other agencies for direct response. Considering that claim, Lamberth pointed out that "the CIA's response is not only baffling, but the failure to produce the documents amounts to an improper withholding." He indicated that "because the CIA is responsible for responsive records, even when those records originated with other agencies, this Court holds that the CIA must take immediate affirmative steps to be sure that each referral is being processed, which it shall describe in its supplemental filing." Lamberth rejected many of Hall's challenges to the agency's search. He pointed out that a search was inadequate when limited to those locations "most likely" to contain responsive records, but, here, the agency had satisfied its burden of proof by showing the searches were based on whether the locations were "likely" to contain responsive records. He agreed with Hall "where specific records, photographs, or attachments are reference in CIA documents, it is no longer 'mere speculation' that the files exist." He observed that "the fact that the CIA maintained and controlled the documents that reference other documents, many of them attachments, provides support for the proposition that the CIA maintains and controls those missing records." Lamberth upheld the agency's Exemption 1 (national security) and Exemption 3 (other statutes) claims. He also agreed that discussions between FOIA staff and agency attorneys pertaining to Hall's request were protected by Exemption 5 (privileges). But he disagreed with the agency that various names could be withheld under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). He agreed with the agency that further identifying information could be withheld, but noted that "the CIA has failed to respond to [Hall's] argument, either by explaining that no deceased individual's names have been withheld, or by explaining why the privacy interest still exists for those deceased, some supposedly for several decades. Therefore, in regard to the names�"not including the names of CIA employees, which were granted summary judgment under exemption 3�"of individuals themselves, and withheld photographs, the Court denies summary judgment to the CIA for the exemption 6 claims and grants summary judgment to plaintiffs."
Issues: Adequacy - Search
Opinion/Order [236]
Opinion/Order [291]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2004-05-191COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Filing fee $ 150.) , filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC..(bcs, ) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
2004-05-24SUMMONS Issued (3)as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bcs, ) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
2004-05-242LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests for ACCURACY IN MEDIA, INC. (jf, ) (Entered: 05/25/2004)
2004-05-253NOTICE of Appearance by Uldric L. Fiore Jr. on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 05/25/2004)
2004-05-254NOTICE of Appearance by John Harrison Clarke on behalf of ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Clarke, John) (Entered: 05/25/2004)
2004-06-185MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint Motion to Stay Proceedings, or in the Alternative, To Dismiss Without Prejudice, and Memorandum in Support by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Def Ex 1 -- FOIA Request 02-07-03# 2 Exhibit Def Ex 2 -- Agency Acknowledgment 03-13-03# 3 Exhibit Def Ex 3 -- Agency Response 06-15-04# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 06/18/2004)
2004-07-016Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Establish Briefing Schedule by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
2004-07-07Minute order granting 6 plaintiffs' consent motion to establish briefing schedule for defendant's motion to stay proceedings, or, in the alternative, to dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 7, 2004. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 07/07/2004)
2004-07-07Briefing Schedule 6 : Plaintiffs, Roger Hall and Studies Solutions Results, Inc. have up to and including July 30, 2004, within which to respond to defendant's motion to stay proceedings or, in the alternative, to dismiss this action without prejudice. Defendant's reply to plaintiffs' response shall be due on or before August 20, 2004. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 07/07/2004)
2004-07-07Set Deadlines: Responses due by 8/20/2004 to defendants motion to stay. (rew, ) (Entered: 07/07/2004)
2004-07-307First MOTION statutory fee waiver by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
2004-07-308REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint Motion to Stay Proceedings, or in the Alternative, To Dismiss Without Prejudice, and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint Motion to Stay Proceedings, or in the Alternative, To Dismiss Without Prejudice, and Memorandum in Support filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
2004-07-3013RESPONSE to defendant's 5 MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice or, in the alternative, to Stay filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (jf, ) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
2004-08-039Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 First MOTION statutory fee waiver by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
2004-08-0310MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
2004-08-0311MOTION to Produce Certain Categories of Records by ROGER HALL. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2--JHL-Dyer (021015)# 3 Exhibit Exh. 3--Notice of Corrected Calculation of Search Fees# 4 Exhibit Exh. 4--JHL-Herman (031126)# 5 Exhibit Exh. 5--Zaid-Herman (031126)# 6 Exhibit Exh. 6--Zaid-Herman (040729))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
2004-08-0312MOTION Waiver of Search Fees and Copyinng Costs by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Att. !--Lesar-Dyer (030207))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
2004-08-04Minute order granting 10 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file opposition to defendant's motion to stay proceedings or to dismiss out-of-time. Plaintiffs' opposition to defendant's motion to stay proceedings or, in the alternative, to dismiss without prejudice is accepted for filing. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on August 3, 2004. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 08/04/2004)
2004-08-04Minute order granting 9 defendant's consent motion for an enlargement of time to file its opposition to plaintiff's Accuracy in Media's motion for statutory fee waiver. Responses due by 8/20/2004; replies due by 8/31/2004. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on August 3, 2004. Official paperless order (FL, ) Modified on 8/4/2004 (FL, ). (Entered: 08/04/2004)
2004-08-1714Memorandum in opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Waiver of Search Fees and Copying Costs filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (nmw, ) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
2004-08-1715Memorandum in opposition to motion re 11 MOTION to Produce Certain Categories of Records filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (nmw, ) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
2004-08-2016Memorandum in opposition to motion re 7 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff Accuracy in Media's Motion for a Statutory Fee Waiver filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
2004-08-2017MOTION to Dismiss by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
2004-08-2018REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Stay Proceedings, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
2004-08-2019Memorandum in opposition to motion re 7 Statutory Fee Waiver filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Please see Document No. 17 for scanned image). (nmw, ) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
2004-08-2520Memorandum in opposition to motion re 7 fee waiver and motion to dismiss filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 08/25/2004)
2004-08-2521REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 statutory fee waiver filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Please see Document No. 20 for scanned image). (nmw, ) (Entered: 08/26/2004)
2004-08-3122Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to def's Opp. to Mot. to Produce and Mot. for Fee Waiver by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/31/2004)
2004-09-02Minute order granting 22 plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to (1) defendant's opposition to motion of Roger Hall to require defendant to produce certain categories of records forthwith, and (2) defendant's opposition to motion of plaintiff Studies Soluitons Results, Inc. for a waiver of copying fees and search costs. Plaintiffs, Roger Hall and Studies Solutions Results, Inc., shall have up to and including September 7, 2004, within which to reply to defendant's opposition to plaintiffs' motions, npt. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 2, 2004. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 09/02/2004)
2004-09-0723REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff Acuracy in Media's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 09/07/2004)
2004-09-0724Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Def's Oppositions to Mot. to Req. Prod. of Records and Waive Fees (040907) by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/07/2004)
2004-09-10MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Def's Oppositions to Mot. to Req. Prod. of Records and Waive Fees (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 09/10/2004)
2004-09-1025REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 Production of Records and Waiver of Fees filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Att. 1--Strickland-English (990524)# 2 Exhibit Att. 2--Mem. Op. and Order (020722)# 3 Exhibit Att. 3--Joint Report (020823)# 4 Exhibit Att. 4--Lesar-Dyer (021015)# 5 Exhibit Att. 5--Order (030116)# 6 Exhibit Att. 6--Joint Report (030131)# 7 Exhibit Att. 7--Memorandum Opinion (031113)# 8 Exhibit Att. 8--Opinion (040422)# 9 Exhibit Att. 900Lesar-Herman (031126)# 10 Exhibit Att. 10--Zaid (040729)# 11 Exhibit Att. 11--Notice of Corrected Calculation of Search Fees (030402))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/11/2004)
2004-09-1026MOTION for Leave to File Replies Out-of-Time by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/11/2004)
2004-09-13Minute order granting 26 plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file replies to defendant's opposition to (1) motion of Roger Hall to require production of certain categories of records, and (2) motion of Roger Hall and SSRI for a waiver of search and copying fees. Plaintiff's motion to require production of certain categories of records and Motion of Roger Hall and SSRI for a waiver of search and copying fees are accepted for filing. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 13, 2004. (FL, ) (Entered: 09/13/2004)
2005-02-0227NOTICE of Change of Address by John Harrison Clarke (Clarke, John) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
2005-02-0228Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply to defendant's reply to opposition to motion to dismiss by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Sur-reply to defendant's reply to opposition to motion to dismiss)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
2005-02-02Minute order granting 28 plaintiff, Accuracy In Media's unopposed motion for leave to file sur-reply to defendant's reply to opposition to motion to dismiss. Plaintiff Accuracy In Media's sur-reply to defendant's reply to opposition to moiton to dismiss is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on February 2, 2005. (FL, ) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
2005-02-0229SURREPLY to re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (lc, ) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
2005-04-1330Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on April 13, 2005. (FL, ) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
2005-04-14Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/24/2005 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (rew, ) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
2005-04-19Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/24/2005 at 9:45 AM is OFF and reset for 5/27/2005 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (rew, ) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
2005-04-2131Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
2005-04-26Minute order granting 31 defendant's consent motion for an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Defendant has up to and including June 16, 2005, within which to answer, move, or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on April 26, 2005. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
2005-04-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/16/2005. (rew, ) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
2005-05-0232MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's April 13, 2005 Order and Motion for Accounting by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Att. 1# 2 Att. 2# 3 Att. 3# 4 Att. 4# 5 Att. 5# 6 Att. 6)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
2005-05-1333Memorandum in opposition to motion re 32 Defendant's Opposition to the Motion of Plaintiff Roger Hall for Partial Reconsideration of this Court's April 13, 2005 Memorandum Opinion and Order filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Def. Exh. 1 -- CIA Ltr 06-15-04# 2 Exhibit Def. Exh. 2 -- CIA Ltr 05-11-05# 3 Exhibit Def. Exh. 3 -- Att 2 Feb 7, 2003 FOIA Req)(Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
2005-05-1334Memorandum in opposition to motion re 32 Defendant's Opposition to the Motion of Plaintiff Roger Hall For an Accounting of Time and Costs of Searches filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Def. Exh. 1 -- CIA Ltr 06-15-04# 2 Exhibit Def. Exh. 2 -- CIA Ltr 05-11-05# 3 Exhibit Def. Exh. 3 -- Att 2 Feb 7, 2003 FOIA Req)(Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
2005-05-1635NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
2005-05-2536REPLY to opposition to motion re 32 Partial Refonsideration filed by ROGER HALL. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
2005-05-2537REPLY to opposition to motion re 32 Accounting filed by ROGER HALL. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
2005-05-2638NOTICE of Filing by ROGER HALL (Attachments: # 1 Att.A--Lesar-Koch (May 23, 2005)# 2 Att. B--Lesar-Koch (May 24, 2005))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
2005-05-2739WITHDRAWN per Notice filed 5/27/2005.....AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCYfiled by ACCURACY IN MEDIA.(nmw, ) Modified on 5/31/2005 (lc, ). (Entered: 05/27/2005)
2005-05-2740NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by ACCURACY IN MEDIA re 39 Amended Complaint (Clarke, John) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
2005-05-27Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy : Status Conference held on 5/27/2005. Further Status Conference set for 8/11/2005 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (Court Reporter Jon Hundley (Miller Reporting).) (rew, ) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
2005-05-3141Order re [defendant's unopposed oral motion for an extension of time] that defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint, or any amended complaints that may be filed, within twenty (20) days after the court resolves the pending motions. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 31, 2005. (FL, ) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
2005-07-1942MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by CAROL HRDLICKA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Brief)(lc, ) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
2005-07-25Minute order denying 42 motion for leave to file brief as amicus curiae in support of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 25, 2005.Official paperless order(FL, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
2005-08-0143NOTICE of Filing by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 )(Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
2005-08-08Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/11/2005 at 9:30 AM is OFF and reset for 9/28/2005 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (rew, ) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
2005-09-2644NOTICE Amended Complaint by ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Clarke, John) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
2005-09-26Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/28/2005 at 4:30 AM is OFF and reset for 1/10/2006 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (rew, ) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
2005-09-2645AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCYfiled by ACCURACY IN MEDIA.(lc, ) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
2006-01-06Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/10/2006 AT 9:30 AM is OFF and reset for 3/9/2006 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (rew, ) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
2006-01-2546Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on January 25, 2006. (FL, ) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
2006-01-2547Order denying 32 plaintiff's motion for partial reconsideration. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' amended complaint within twenty days of the docketing of this order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on January 25, 2006. (FL, ) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
2006-02-14Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/9/2006 at 9:30 AM is OFF and reset for 4/25/2006 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (rew, ) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
2006-02-1448ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Related document: 45 Amended Complaint filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA,.(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
2006-04-20Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/25/2006 AT 9:45 AM is OFF and reset for 4/26/2006 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. At the request of the defendant. (rew, ) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
2006-04-26Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy : Status Conference held on 4/26/2006. Counsel to file joint report and briefing schedule by 5/26/2006. Further Status Conference set for 7/6/2006 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (rew, ) (Entered: 04/26/2006)
2006-05-2649STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
2006-05-27MINUTE ORDER: The proposed briefing schedule set forth in the parties' joint report filed May 26, 2006 (#49), is adopted by the court and is SO ORDERED. Further, the status conference scheduled for July 6, 2006, is cancelled and is rescheduled to convene on December 21, 2006 at 9:45 a.m. (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 05/27/2006)
2006-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2006. Plaintiff's Response to Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2006. Defendant's Reply due by 10/31/2006. Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/15/2006. (rew, ) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
2006-07-06Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/6/06 has been reset for 12/21/2006 09:45 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (adc) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
2006-08-2950Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositve Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
2006-09-06Minute order granting 50 defendant's consent motion for extension of time to file a dispositive motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 30, 2006, to file a dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 6, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
2006-09-07Reset Deadlines: Defendant's dispositive motions are due on or before 9/30/2006. (tj) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
2006-09-2851Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
2006-09-29Minute order granting 51 defendant's consent motion for extension of time to file a dispositive motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 23, 2006, to file a dispositive motion. Any reply shall be filed by the deadlines set forth in LCvR 7. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 29, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
2006-09-29Deadline set: Dispositive Motions due by 10/23/2006. (tj ) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
2006-10-2052Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Dispositive Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
2006-10-20Minute order granting 52 defendant's consent motion for extension of time to file a dispositive motion. Defendant shall have an additional seven (7) days until October 30, 2006, to file a dispositive motion. Any reply shall be filed by the deadlines set forth in LCvR 7. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 20, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
2006-10-2453MOTION for Protective Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Discovery Requests# 2 Exhibit 2006 Cover Letters)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
2006-10-3054MOTION to Dismiss and for Partial Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Scott A. Koch# 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 # 13 # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Vaughn Index (item 6))(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
2006-10-3055MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (see docket entry #54 for document images) (lc, ) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
2006-11-06VACATED pursuant to Minute Order filed 11/7/2006.....MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Motion for Protective Order (Kennedy, Henry) Modified on 11/8/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 11/06/2006)
2006-11-0756Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Opposition to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
2006-11-07Minute order granting 56 plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time to oppose defendant's motion for a protective order and motion to vacate court's November 6, 2006 minute order granting motion for protective order. Plaintiffs Roger Hall and Studies Solutions Results, Inc. shall have up to and including November 13, 2006, to oppose defendant's motion for a protective order. The court's November 6, 2006, minute order granting motion for protective order is vacated. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on November 7, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
2006-11-1357MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to 54 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC., ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (Lesar, James) Modified on 11/14/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 11/13/2006)
2006-11-1358Memorandum in opposition to re 53 MOTION for Protective Order filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1# 2 Exhibit Exh. 2# 3 Exhibit Exh. 3# 4 Exhibit Exh 5# 5 Exhibit Exh. 4# 6 Exhibit Exh. 6# 7 Exhibit Exh. 7)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
2006-11-1459MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for a Protective order Out-of-Time by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Opposition to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
2006-11-14Minute order granting 57 plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time to respond to defendant's motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on November 14, 2006. Official paperless order(FL, ) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
2006-11-14Discovery Schedule 57 : If the court grants defendant's pending motion for a protective order, plaintiffs' opposition shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days after the order granting the motion. If the court denies the motion, plaintiffs shall file an opposition within twenty-one (21) days after the completion of the discovery requested by plaintiffs on October 3, 2006. (FL, ) Modified on 11/14/2006 (FL, ). (Entered: 11/14/2006)
2006-11-14Minute order granting 59 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file opposition to defendant's motion for a protective order out-of-time. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on November 14, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
2006-11-1560Order of Reference 53 to United States Magistrate Judge John Facciola. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on November 15, 2006. (FL, ) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
2006-11-2261Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of 53 Motion for a Protective Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) Modified on 11/24/2006 (zlc, ). (Entered: 11/22/2006)
2006-11-27Minute order granting 61 defendant's consent motion for extension of time to file a reply in support of defendant's motion for a protective order. Defendant shall have an additional two (2) weeks until December 8, 2006, to file a reply in support of its motion for a protective order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on November 27, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
2006-11-27Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall have until December 8, 2006 to file a reply in support of its motion for a protective order. (tj ) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
2006-11-29CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for motion for protective order #53. (jsc) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
2006-12-0162ORDER re referral to Judge Facciola for the motion for a protective order 53 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 12/1/06. (SP, ) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
2006-12-0663MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
2006-12-12MINUTE ORDER granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 12/11/06.(lcjf1, ) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
2006-12-14Reset Hearings: Status Conference currently scheduled for 12/21/06 is OFF and rescheduled for 5/11/2007 @ 11:30 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj ) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
2006-12-2864REPLY to opposition to motion re 53 MOTION for Protective Order filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
2007-01-1165MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/17/07 to file a supplemental memorandum regarding defendant's protective order by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jeb, ) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
2007-01-11MINUTE ORDER denying 65 Motion for Extension of Time because the motion does not indicate that the movant discussed the anticipated motion with opposing counsel to determine whether there is any opposition to the relief sought, as required by LCvR 7.1(m). This denial is without prejudice to the filing of a new motion that complies with the rules of this court. (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
2007-01-1666MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for a protective order by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.; (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit- Response to Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion for a Protective Order# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(jeb, ) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
2007-01-17Minute order granting 66 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file response to defendant's reply to plaintiffs' opposition to defendant's motion for a protective order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on January 17, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
2007-01-1767SURREPLY to re 53 MOTION for Protective Order filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (zlc, ) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
2007-04-1168ORDER granting 53 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 4/11/07. (lcjf1, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
2007-04-3069Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 54 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC., ACCURACY IN MEDIAMotions referred to John M. Facciola. (Lesar, James) Modified on 5/1/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 04/30/2007)
2007-05-02Minute order granting 69 plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss and for partial summary judgment. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including May 8, 2007, to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss or for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 2, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
2007-05-02Reset Deadlines: Reply to Dispositive Motions extended to 5/8/2007. (ztj ) (Entered: 05/04/2007)
2007-05-0770Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 54 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Parial Summary Judgment by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC., ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Lesar, James) Modified on 5/8/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 05/07/2007)
2007-05-08Minute order granting 70 plaintiffs' unopposed motion for two-day tension [sic] of time to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss and for partial summary judgment. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including May 10, 2007, to file a response to defendant's motion to dismiss or for partial summary judgment. Defendant's reply is due May 31, 2007. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 8, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
2007-05-08Reset Hearings: Status Conference currently scheduled for 5/11/07 @ 11:30am is OFF and RESCHEDULED for 8/3/2007 @ 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (ztj, ) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
2007-05-1071NOTICE of Change of Address by John Harrison Clarke (Clarke, John) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
2007-05-1072Cross-MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and opposition to motion to dismiss by ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts # 2 Statement of genuine issue# 3 proposed Order# 4 Exhibit FOIA Request# 5 Exhibit PNOK Releases# 6 Exhibit PNOK-list of 1700# 7 Exhibit CIA FOIA response# 8 Exhibit FOIA Adminisrative Appeal# 9 Exhibit CIA acknowledge of Admin Appeal)(Clarke, John) Modified on 5/11/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 05/10/2007)
2007-05-1073MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion of Plainiffs Roger Hall and SSRI for Partial Summary Judgment and Other Relief by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Roger Hall# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2)(Lesar, James) Modified on 5/11/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 05/10/2007)
2007-05-1074Memorandum in opposition to re 54 MOTION to Dismiss and for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (To view document, please see docket entry 72 ) (lc, ) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
2007-05-1275NOTICE of Filing by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Local Rule 7.1(h) Statement# 2 Proposed Order)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/12/2007)
2007-05-21Reset Deadlines: Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2007. (ztj, ) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
2007-05-2476Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Dispostive Motions by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
2007-05-30Minute order granting 76 defendant's consent motion for extension of time to oppose dispositive motions. Defendant shall have up to and including July 30, 2007, to file oppositions to plaintiffs' dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 30, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
2007-05-30Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall have up to and including July 30, 2007, to file an opposition to plaintiffs' dispositive motions. (ztj, ) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
2007-07-2477MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Hall's Declaration, In Part by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Momeni, Mercedeh) Modified on 10/18/2007 (ldc, ). Modified on 11/21/2007 (ldc, ). (Entered: 07/24/2007)
2007-07-3078Order referring 77 to United States Magistrate Judge John Facciola. Defendant shall file a combined opposition and reply regarding the pending dispositive motions ten (10) days after the resolution of the motion to strike. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 30, 3007. (FL, ) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
2007-07-30CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for resolution of Motion to Strike 77 . (jeb, ) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
2007-08-0179ORDER re referral to Judge Facciola for the motion to strike 77 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 8/1/07. (SP, ) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
2007-08-01Reset Hearings: Status Conference currently scheduled for 8/3/07 is OFF and rescheduled for 11/2/2007 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj ) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
2007-08-0680Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose 77 Defendant's Motion to Strike Declaration of Roger Hall by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) Modified on 8/7/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 08/06/2007)
2007-08-09MINUTE ORDER granting 80 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file their opposition to defendant's motion to strike the declaration of Roger Hall. The opposition is due on or before August 21, 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 8/9/07. (lcjf1, ) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
2007-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/21/2007 (ldc, ) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
2007-08-1981Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose 77 Motion to Strike Declaratrion of Roger Hall by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) Modified on 8/20/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 08/19/2007)
2007-08-20MINUTE ORDER granting 81 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Further Extension to (sic) Time to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Roger Hall. Opposition shall be due September 4, 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 8/20/07. (lcjf1, ) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
2007-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/4/2007 (ldc, ) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
2007-09-0482Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Strike by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
2007-09-0683Memorandum in opposition to re 77 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Hall's Declaration, In Part by filed by CAROL HRDLICKA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Att. 1--Affidaviat of Barry Toll# 2 Exhibit Attachment 2--Innman Deposition# 3 Exhibit Attachment 3--Sullivan Deposition# 4 Exhibit Att. 4--Briefing Books# 5 Exhibit Att. 5--Duck Soup# 6 Exhibit Att. 6# 7 Exhibit Att. 7--Nhom Marrott# 8 Exhibit Att. 8--Nhom Marrott# 9 Exhibit Att. 8--Sejna Deposition# 10 Exhibit Att. 9--Sejna documents# 11 Exhibit Att. 11--Handwritten notes on Feb 1981 mtg.# 12 Exhibit Att. 12--Order of Battle# 13 Exhibit Att. 13--Docs. Showing DOD collaboration# 14 Exhibit Att. 14--Docs. showing DOD collaboraation# 15 Exhibit Att. 15--LeBoutillier Decl.# 16 Exhibit Att. 16--Moorer Depositino# 17 Exhibit Att. 17--Murphy Deposition# 18 Exhibit Att. 18--IPWICH# 19 Exhibit Att. 19--Reed Deposition# 20 Exhibit Att. 20--Sprague-Mathews# 21 Exhibit Att. 21--MACVSOG docs.# 22 Exhibit Att. 22--Nhom Marrott background# 23 Exhibit Att. 23--# 24 Exhibit Att. 24--# 25 Exhibit Att. 25--Brightwood# 26 Exhibit Att. 26--Hendon# 27 Exhibit Att. 27--Red McDaniel# 28 Exhibit Att. 28--Doc. on POLLARD# 29 Exhibit Att. 29--Status of POWs in Laos# 30 Exhibit # 31 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Roger Hall# 32 Declaration Doublas Declaration# 33 Exhibit Exh. 31--Depositon of Terry Reed)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
2007-09-10MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 82 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Strike the Declaration of Roger Hall. Opposition shall be due on or before September 6, 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 9/7/07. (lcjmf1, ) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
2007-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/6/2007 (ldc, ) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
2007-09-1284Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
2007-09-13MINUTE ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 9/13/07. (SP, ) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
2007-10-1685Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Hall's Declaration, In Part by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
2007-10-18MINUTE ORDER granting 85 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 83 Opposition to MOTION to Strike. Reply due by 11/16/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 10/18/07. (lcjmf1) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
2007-11-01Reset Hearings: Status Conference currently scheduled for 11/2/07 @ 10am is VACATED and rescheduled for 1/25/2008 @ 11:30 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj ) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
2007-11-1686REPLY to opposition to motion re 77 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Hall's Declaration, In Part filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
2007-11-21NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Motion #77 was stricken in error. This entry has now been corrected. The motion is no longer stricken. (ldc, ) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
2008-01-24Reset Hearings: Status Conference currently scheduled for 1/25/08 @ 11:30 is VACATED and rescheduled for 4/4/2008 @ 11:15 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj ) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
2008-03-1087ORDER granting 77 Defendant's Motion to Strike, In Part, Plaintiff Hall's Declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 3/10/08. (lcjmf1) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
2008-03-1088MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 77 Defendant's Motion to Strike, In Part, Plaintiff Hall's Declaration. An Order accompanies this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 3/10/08. (lcjmf1) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
2008-03-2289Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Reconsideration of Magistrate's March 10, 2008 Decision by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/22/2008)
2008-03-25MINUTE ORDER granting 89 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to Move for Reconsideration of Magistrate's Ruling. Accordingly, plaintiffs have up to and including March 31, 2008 to move for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 25, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
2008-03-3190Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Def's Opp. to Mot. for Reconsideration by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
2008-04-01MINUTE ORDER granting 90 Unopposed Motion of Plaintiffs Roger Hall and Studies Solution Results, Inc. for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Facciola's Ruling. Accordingly, plaintiffs' motion is due on or before May 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 1, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
2008-04-02Reset Deadlines: plaintiffs motion for reconsideration to be filed by 5/14/2008. (tj ) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
2008-04-03Reset Hearings: Status Conference currently scheduled for Friday, April 4, 2008 @ 11:15am is VACATED and rescheduled for Friday, August 8, 2008 @ 10:30am in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (zj ) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
2008-05-0891Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
2008-05-12MINUTE ORDER granting 91 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for a Further Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration. Accordingly, plaintiffs's motion for reconsideration is due on or before May 21, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 12, 2008. (NP) Modified on 5/13/2008 (nmw, ). (Entered: 05/12/2008)
2008-05-2092ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Facciola's Ruling by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) Modified on 5/21/2008 (jf, ). (Entered: 05/20/2008)
2008-05-2193MOTION for Extension of Time to File Mot. for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Facciola's Ruling by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
2008-05-21NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 92 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Facciola's Ruling was entered in error and re-filed as # 93 with corrected pages.(jf, ) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
2008-05-22MINUTE ORDER granting 93 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for a Further Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration. Accordingly, plaintiffs shall file their motion for reconsideration on or before June 3, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 22, 2008. (NP) Modified on 5/23/2008 (nmw, ). (Entered: 05/22/2008)
2008-06-0394Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Facciola's Memorandum Opinion by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
2008-06-04MINUTE ORDER granting 94 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for a One-Day Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 4, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
2008-06-0495MOTION for Reconsideration of Memorandum Opinion of Magistrate Judge John Facciola by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents, # 2 Affidavit Revised Hall Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 4 Exhibit Attafchment 2, # 5 Exhibit Attachment 3, # 6 Exhibit Attachment 4, # 7 Exhibit Attachment 5, # 8 Exhibit Attachment 6, # 9 Exhibit Attachment 7, # 10 Exhibit Attachment 9, # 11 Exhibit Exh. 3, # 12 Exhibit Exh. 4, # 13 Exhibit Exh. 5, # 14 Exhibit Exh. 6, # 15 Exhibit Exh. 7, # 16 Exhibit Exh. 8, # 17 Exhibit Exh. 9, # 18 Exhibit Exh. 10, # 19 Exhibit Exh. 11, # 20 Exhibit Exh. 12, # 21 Exhibit Exh. 15, # 22 Exhibit Exh. 18, # 23 Exhibit Exh. 19, # 24 Exhibit Exh. 21, # 25 Exhibit Exh. 23-A, # 26 Exhibit Exh. 23-B, # 27 Exhibit Exh. 24, # 28 Exhibit Exh. 26, # 29 Exhibit Exh. 28, # 30 Exhibit Exh. 32, # 31 Exhibit Exh. 33, # 32 Exhibit Exh. 34, # 33 Exhibit Exh. 35, # 34 Exhibit Exh. 36-A, # 35 Exhibit Exh. 36-B, # 36 Exhibit Exh. 36-C, # 37 Exhibit Exh. 37, # 38 Exhibit Exh. 38, # 39 Exhibit Exh. 39, # 40 Exhibit Exh. 40, # 41 Exhibit Exh. 41, # 42 Affidavit Affidavait of Joseph Douglas, Jr., # 43 Affidavit Affidavit of Carol Hrdlicka, # 44 Affidavit Affidavit of Larry J. O'Daniel, # 45 Affidavit Second Affidavait of Cong. Bill Hendon)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
2008-06-1196NOTICE of Filing of Revised Declaration of Roger Hall by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Revised Hall Declaration)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
2008-06-1797Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 95 MOTION for Reconsideration of Memorandum Opinion of Magistrate Judge John Facciola by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
2008-06-18MINUTE ORDER granting 97 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 18, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
2008-06-2598Memorandum in opposition to re 95 MOTION for Reconsideration of Memorandum Opinion of Magistrate Judge John Facciola filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
2008-07-0899Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Reconsider by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
2008-07-09MINUTE ORDER granting 99 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time within which to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Accordingly, plaintiffs' reply is due on July 16, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 9, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
2008-07-17100Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
2008-07-18MINUTE ORDER granting 100 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time Within Which to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Accordingly, plaintiffs' reply is due July 21, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 18, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
2008-07-22101Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
2008-07-22MINUTE ORDER granting 101 Unopposed Motion for a Two-Day Extension of Time within which to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Accordingly, plaintiffs' reply is due on July 23, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 22, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
2008-07-23102Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Oppositin to Motion for Reconsideratin by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
2008-07-24MINUTE ORDER granting 102 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time within which to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration. Accordingly, plaintiff's reply is due on August 11, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 24, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
2008-07-31NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference currently scheduled for 8/8/08 is VACATED and rescheduled for 11/14/2008 @ 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj ) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
2008-08-06103ORDER that no further extensions of time will be granted with respect to plaintiffs' reply in support of its motion for reconsideration 102 . Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 6, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
2008-08-11104REPLY to opposition to motion re 95 MOTION for Reconsideration of Memorandum Opinion of Magistrate Judge John Facciola filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
2008-08-12105NOTICE of Filing by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lesar Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 8)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
2008-08-29106ORDER denying 95 plaintiff's objections to the memorandum opinion and order docketed by United States Magistrate Judge John Facciola on March 10, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 29, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
2008-08-29107ORDER denying without prejudice 54 , 55 , 72 , 73 all pending motions to dismiss and/or for summary judgment that have been filed by all parties, and directing the parties to subject a proposed briefing schedule by September 12, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 29, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
2008-09-12108MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
2008-10-20109MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DiMaio Decl.)(Momeni, Mercedeh) Modified on 10/21/2008 to enhance docket text (tr). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
2008-10-20110MOTION to Dismiss by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (tr)(See Docket Entry 109 to view document) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
2008-10-21111ERRATA Filing of Exhibits by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 110 MOTION to Dismiss, 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit July 13, 2007 Letter (Exh. A), # 2 Exhibit Sept. 28, 2007 Letter (Exh. 1 of DiMaio Decl.), # 3 Exhibit DiMaio Vaughn (Exh. 2, Part 1), # 4 Exhibit DiMaio Vaughn (Exh. 2, part 2), # 5 Exhibit DiMaio Vaughn (Exh. 2, Part 3), # 6 Exhibit DiMaio Vaughn (Exh. 2, Part 4))(Momeni, Mercedeh) Modified on 10/22/2008 to enhance docket text (tr). (Entered: 10/21/2008)
2008-11-14NOTICE: The status hearing currently scheduled for today (11/14/08) @ 11am is now CANCELED.(tj ) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
2008-12-03112Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions and Replies by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
2008-12-03MINUTE ORDER granting 112 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Oppositions to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, plaintiffs' cross-motions and oppositions to defendant's summary judgment motion are due on December 9, 2008.Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 3, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
2008-12-09113Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Clarke, John) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
2008-12-10MINUTE ORDER granting 113 Plaintiff's Motion for Further Extension of Time. Accordingly, plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment is due on December 17, 2008; and defendant's reply is due on Janaury 19, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 10, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
2008-12-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' cross motions due by 12/17/2008. Defendant's reply due by 1/19/2009. (gdf) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
2008-12-17114Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Administrative Record)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
2008-12-17115Memorandum in opposition to re 110 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (tr)(See Docket Entry 114 to view document) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
2008-12-18116MOTION for Leave to File Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment One-Day Late by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Local Rule 7.1(h) Statement, # 3 Exhibit Attachment A--Keenan Opinion, # 4 Exhibit Attachment B--Shanberg Letter, # 5 Affidavit 2d Revised Hall Decl., # 6 Appendix Appendix A--PNOK Chart, # 7 Exhibit Attachment 7, # 8 Exhibit Attachment 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 7-A, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 7-B, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 7-C, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 7-D, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 8-D, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 8-B, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 11-A, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 11-B, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 11-C, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 12-E, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 18-B, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 18-C, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 23-A, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 23-B, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 32, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 35, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit 36-A, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit 36-B, # 35 Exhibit Exhibit 36-C, # 36 Exhibit Exhibit 37, # 37 Exhibit Exhibit 38-A, # 38 Exhibit Exhibit 38-B, # 39 Exhibit Exhibit 38-C, # 40 Exhibit Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit Exhibit 41, # 42 Affidavit Hall Rule 56(f) Affidavit, # 43 Affidavit Douglass Affidavit, # 44 Affidavit Hrdlicka Affidavit, # 45 Affidavit O'Daniel Affidavit, # 46 Affidavit Second Affidavit of Cong. Billy Hendon)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
2008-12-18117ERRATA by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judmgment)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
2008-12-19MINUTE ORDER granting 116 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File One Day Late. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 19, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
2009-01-14118MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Recent Filings by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
2009-02-09119Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 114 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment 117 by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
2009-02-09MINUTE ORDER granting 118 Partial Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, Defendant's responses to plaintiffs' filings are due February 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 9, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
2009-02-10MINUTE ORDER granting 119 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responses to plaintiffs' filings are due on February 24, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 10, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
2009-02-24120REPLY to opposition to motion re 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response to AIM, # 2 Statement of Facts Response to Hall)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
2009-02-24121Memorandum in opposition to re 114 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (tr)(See Docket Entry 120 to view document) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
2009-03-02122Joint MOTION to Stay by ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Executive Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
2009-03-16123Memorandum in opposition to re 122 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
2009-03-16124MOTION to Compel by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (tr)(See Docket Entry 123 to view document) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
2009-03-24125REPLY to opposition to motion re 122 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings, Etc. filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC., ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AG Holder Memorandum)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
2009-04-08126ORDER granting in part and denying in part 122 Plaintiffs Joint Motions for (1) a Stay of All Proceedings Except with Respect to Referrals, and (2) an Order Requring the CIA to Provide a List of Referrals and to Release Nonexempt Referrals or Portions Thereof Within 90 Days. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 8, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
2009-07-06127NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by David Cotter Rybicki on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney AUSA Mercedeh Momeni (Rybicki, David) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
2009-07-07128MOTION for Order Requiring Defendant to Submit Status Report by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC., ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment: OIP Guidance)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
2009-07-08MINUTE ORDER denying 128 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Requiring Defendant to File a Status Report without prejudice because movant did not comply with LCvR 7(m), which imposes a duty on counsel to confer with opposing counsel before filing any nondispositive motion and to "include in [the] motion a statement that the required discussion ocurred, and a statement as to whether the motion is opposed." Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 8, 2009. (lchhk1) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
2009-07-10129Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Motion for Order Requiring Defendant to Submit Status Report by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC., ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Order Requiring CIA to File Status Report)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
2009-07-27MINUTE ORDER granting 129 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File. Accordingly, plaintiffs may file a corrected motion for an order requiring defendant to submit a status report. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 27, 2009. (lchhk1) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
2009-07-27130Corrected MOTION for Order Requiring Defendant to File A Status Report by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC., ACCURACY IN MEDIA (tr) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
2009-08-07131REPLY to opposition to motion re 130 MOTION for Order to File Status Report filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Rybicki, David) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
2009-08-19132REPLY to opposition to motion re 128 MOTION for Order Requiring Defendant to Submit Status Report on Compliance with President Obama's Order filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
2009-08-23MINUTE ORDER denying 130 Corrected MOTION for Order Requiring Defendant to File A Status Report. (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 08/23/2009)
2009-09-02133Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Opposition to Summary Judgment by ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
2009-09-03MINUTE ORDER granting 133 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memoranda. Accordingly, plaintiffs' reply to defendant's opposition to dispositive motions is due September 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 3, 2009. (lchhk1) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
2009-09-14134Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
2009-09-15MINUTE ORDER granting 134 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time Within Which to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, plaintiffs' reply is due on September 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 15, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
2009-09-16135REPLY to opposition to motion re 119 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 114 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment 117 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 114 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment 117 filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AIM Material Facts and CIA Response)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
2009-09-16136REPLY to opposition to motion re 116 MOTION for Leave to File Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment One-Day Late filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2, # 3 Affidavit Kaiser Decl.)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
2009-11-12137MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 109 CIA's Renewed Motion to Dismiss and for Partial Summary Judgment, 117 Hall's renewed Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, an Order Authorizing Plaintiffs to Take Discovery, an Order Instructing Defendant to Conduct Additional Searches, and Orders for Certain Other Relief, and 114 AIM's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and for Other Relief. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 12, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
2009-11-17Motions terminated: 110 Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss and 124 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 17, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
2009-12-01138Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Proposed Case Management Plan & Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rybicki, David) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
2009-12-04MINUTE ORDER granting 138 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Proposed Case Management Plan & Briefing Schedule to Govern Further Proceedings. Accordingly, the parties' joint proposed case management plan and briefing schedule to govern further proceedings is due on December 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 4, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
2009-12-18139Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Case Management Plan and Briefing Schedule by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
2009-12-28140Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report & Briefing Schedule to Govern Further Proceedings by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rybicki, David) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
2010-01-04141ORDER granting 140 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Proposed Management Plan and Briefing Schedule to Govern Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 4, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
2010-01-04MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 139 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Case Management Plan and Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 4, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
2010-01-08142MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement CIA FOIA Annual Report FY 2008)(Rybicki, David) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
2010-01-08143NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiffs' Case Management Report and Briefing Schedule by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
2010-01-26MINUTE ORDER. Counsel for plaintiffs shall submit their proposed briefing schedule to govern further proceedings in this case no later than January 29, 2010. Counsel shall also send their proposed order to Kennedy_Chambers@dcd.uscourts.gov in a word-processing (non-pdf) format. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 26, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
2010-01-30144NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Order by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/30/2010)
2010-02-16145VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 2/17/2010.....CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN and BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 16, 2010. (NP) Modified on 2/18/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 02/16/2010)
2010-02-17MINUTE ORDER VACATING 145 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN and BRIEFING SCHEDULE, docketed on February 16, 2010, because it was ENTERED IN ERROR. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 17, 2010. (NP) Modified event title on 2/18/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 02/17/2010)
2010-02-17146Corrected CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 17, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
2010-08-11147Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's November 11, 2009, Memorandum Opinion & Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rybicki, David) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
2010-08-12MINUTE ORDER granting 147 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's November 11, 2009 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Accordingly, defendant's filing is due on August 23, 2010. It is further ordered that plaintiffs shall respond to defendant's supplemental filing within thirty (30) days of its submission to the Court. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 12, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
2010-08-23148Supplemental MEMORANDUM re 137 by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Williams Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B, Tisdale Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C, Hudson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D, Smith Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E, Janosek Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F, Harney Declaration, # 7 Declaration Cole Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Cole Decl. Exh. A, # 9 Exhibit Cole Decl. Exh. B, # 10 Exhibit Cole Decl. Exh. D, # 11 Exhibit Cole Decl. Exh. E, # 12 Declaration Nelson Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. A, # 14 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. B, # 15 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. C, # 16 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. D, # 17 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. E, # 18 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. F, # 19 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. G, # 20 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. H, # 21 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. I, # 22 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. J, # 23 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. K, # 24 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. L, # 25 Exhibit Nelson Decl. Exh. M)(Rybicki, David) Modified event title and link on 8/24/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/23/2010)
2010-08-23149MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cole Declaration Exhibit C by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rybicki, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
2010-08-24150NOTICE of Filing of Cole Declaration Exhibit C by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 148 Memorandum,,, (Rybicki, David) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
2010-08-30151MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cole Declaration Exhibit C by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rybicki, David) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
2010-09-01MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 151 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Exhibit C of the Cole Declaration until August 24, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 1, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
2010-09-01Motion terminated: 149 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Exhibit C of the Cole Declaration is terminated because it was entered in error and refiled as 151 . Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 1, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
2010-09-01154NOTICE of Cole Declaration Exhibit C by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 150 Notice (Other) (Attachments: (Main Document is Exhibit C 1-4) # 1 Exhibit C 5-8, # 2 Exhibit C 9-12, # 3 Exhibit C 13-16)(dr) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
2010-09-01155LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY 154 Notice (Other) filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: (Main Document is Exhibit C 17-20) # 1 Exhibit C 21-24, # 2 Exhibit C 25-28)(dr) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
2010-09-21152Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Supplemental Filing by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
2010-09-22MINUTE ORDER granting 152 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Supplemental Filing. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 22, 2010. (lchhk3) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
2010-10-26153Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to CIA's Supplemental Filing in Response to Courts Nov. 12, 2009 Order by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
2010-10-26MINUTE ORDER granting 153 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to CIA's Supplemental Memorandum. Accordingly, plaintiffs' response is due on December 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 26, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
2010-12-13156MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to CIA's Supplemental Memorandum by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
2010-12-16MINUTE ORDER granting 156 Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time to File Response to CIA's Supplemental Memorandum. Accordingly, plaintiff's response to the CIA's Supplemental Memorandum is due on March 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 16, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
2011-02-01157NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Declaration of Mary Ellen Cole by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Mary Ellen Cole w/ Exhs. A & B)(Rybicki, David) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
2011-03-11158Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to CIA's Supplemental Filing in Response to Court's Nov. 12, 2009 Order by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) Modified filers on 3/14/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 03/11/2011)
2011-03-14MINUTE ORDER granting 158 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Supplemental Memoranda. Accordingly, plaintiff's response is due on March 25, 2011. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 14, 2011. (NP) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
2011-03-24159Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to CIA's Supplemental Memorandum by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
2011-03-24MINUTE ORDER granting 159 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to CIA's Supplemental Memorandum. Accordingly, plaintiff's response is due on April 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 24, 2011. (NP) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
2011-03-31160Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Supplemental Response to Courts November 12, 2009 Order by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
2011-03-31MINUTE ORDER granting 160 Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time to File Response to CIA's Supplemental Memorandum. Accordingly, plaintiff's response is due on April 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 31, 2011. (NP) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
2011-04-07161Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to CIA's Suplemental Memorandum by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
2011-04-11162Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
2011-04-12MINUTE ORDER granting 162 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to CIA's Supplemental Memorandum; denying as moot 161 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to CIA's Supplemental Memorandum. Accordingly, plaintiffs' response is due on April 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 12, 2011. (NP) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
2011-04-18163RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 148 Supplemental MEMORANDUM 137 Order, Memorandum & Opinion filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (Clarke, John) Modified to add link on 4/19/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 04/18/2011)
2011-04-19164MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Response to CIA's Supplemental Response to Court's November 12,2009 Order Out-of-Time by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Plaintts' Response to CIA's Supplemental Response to Court's Nov. 12, 2009 Order, # 2 Affidavit 2011 Hall Declaration)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
2011-04-19165LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) to Plaintiff's Response to CIA's Supplemental Response to Court's Order of November 12, 2009 by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. 164 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Response to CIA's Supplemental Response to Court's November 12,2009 Order Out-of-Time filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Att. 1, # 2 Exhibit Att. 2, # 3 Exhibit Att. 3, # 4 Exhibit Att. 4, # 5 Exhibit Att. 5, # 6 Exhibit Att. 6, # 7 Exhibit Att. 7, # 8 Exhibit Att. 9, # 9 Exhibit Att. 10, # 10 Exhibit Att. 11, # 11 Exhibit Att. 13, # 12 Exhibit Att. 14, # 13 Exhibit Att. 15, # 14 Exhibit Att.16, # 15 Exhibit Att. 17, # 16 Exhibit Att. 18, # 17 Exhibit Att. 19, # 18 Exhibit Att. 20, # 19 Exhibit Att. 21, # 20 Exhibit Att. 22, # 21 Exhibit Att. 23, # 22 Exhibit Att. 24, # 23 Exhibit Att. 25, # 24 Exhibit Att. 26, # 25 Exhibit Att. 27, # 26 Exhibit Att. 28, # 27 Exhibit Att. 30, # 28 Exhibit Att. 31, # 29 Exhibit Att. 32, # 30 Exhibit Att. 33, # 31 Exhibit Att. 34, # 32 Exhibit Att. 35, # 33 Exhibit Att. 36, # 34 Exhibit Att. 37, # 35 Exhibit Att. 38, # 36 Exhibit Att. 39, # 37 Exhibit Att. 40, # 38 Exhibit Att. 41, # 39 Exhibit Att. 42, # 40 Exhibit Att. 43, # 41 Exhibit Att. 44, # 42 Exhibit Att. 45, # 43 Exhibit Att. 46, # 44 Exhibit Att. 47, # 45 Exhibit Att. 48, # 46 Exhibit Att. 49, # 47 Exhibit Att. 50, # 48 Exhibit Att. 51, # 49 Exhibit Att. 52, # 50 Exhibit Att. 53, # 51 Exhibit Att. 54, # 52 Exhibit Att. 55, # 53 Exhibit Att. 56, # 54 Exhibit Att. 57, # 55 Exhibit Att. 58, # 56 Exhibit Att. 29, # 57 Exhibit Att. 59, # 58 Exhibit Att. 60, # 59 Exhibit Att. 61, # 60 Exhibit Att. 62, # 61 Exhibit Att. 63, # 62 Exhibit Att. 64, # 63 Exhibit Att. 65, # 64 Exhibit Att. 66, # 65 Exhibit Att. 67, # 66 Exhibit Att. 68, # 67 Exhibit Att. 69, # 68 Exhibit Att. 70, # 69 Exhibit Att. 71, # 70 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
2011-04-19MINUTE ORDER granting 164 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File to File Response to CIA's Supplemental Memorandum Out of Time. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 19, 2011. (NP) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
2011-04-19166RESPONSE re 148 Supplemental Memorandum filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Hall) (See Docket Entry 165 for Exhibits to this Response).(znmw, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
2011-04-23167NOTICE re 116 of Filing by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Lesar, James) Modified to add link on 4/25/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 04/23/2011)
2011-05-13168Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rybicki, David) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
2011-05-13MINUTE ORDER granting 168 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum. Accordingly, defendant's reply is due on July 17, 2011. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 13, 2011. (NP) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
2011-07-18169REPLY re 163 and 166 to Response to Order of Court (Dkt. 137) by Accuracy in Media & to Response (Dkt. 146) by Roger Hall filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Culver Decl. w/ Exhs. A-F)(Rybicki, David) Modified to add links on 7/19/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 07/18/2011)
2011-09-28170NOTICE of Anticipated Filing of Supplemental Item 4 & Item 5 Documents by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Rybicki, David) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
2011-09-29171NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
2011-11-29172NOTICE of Anticipated Filing of Item 4 and Item 5 Related Documents (Updated) by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 170 Notice (Other) (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
2011-12-15173Case reassigned to Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge Henry H. Kennedy no longer assigned to the case. (ds) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
2012-01-12174NOTICE by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 172 Notice (Other) (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
2012-02-16175NOTICE of Anticipated Filing of Item 4 and Item 5 Related Documents and Status Repoprt by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
2012-02-16176STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
2012-04-05Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/20/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
2012-04-20Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 4/20/2012. Defendant'sSupplemental motion due by 5/15/2012. Plaintiffs' opposition due by 6/15/2012, Defendant's reply due by 7/1/2012. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
2012-05-15177SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 137 Order, Memorandum & Opinion,,,, filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration CIA Supplemental Decl., # 2 Exhibit CIA Exh. A, # 3 Exhibit CIA Exh. B-1 (Vaughn Index), # 4 Exhibit CIA Exh. B-2, # 5 Exhibit CIA Exh. B-3, # 6 Exhibit CIA Exh. B-4, # 7 Exhibit CIA Exh. B-5, # 8 Exhibit CIA Exh. B-6, # 9 Exhibit CIA Exh. B-7, # 10 Exhibit CIA Exhs. C - F, # 11 Declaration NSA Decl., # 12 Exhibit NSA Vaugh Inedx and Exhs., # 13 Declaration DOD Decl., # 14 Exhibit DOD Vaughn Index)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
2012-06-13178ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Def's Mot. to Suppl. Its Items 4 and 5 Response by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) Modified on 6/14/2012 (rdj). (Entered: 06/13/2012)
2012-06-13179ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Def's Mot. to Suppl. Its Items 4 and 5 Response by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) Modified on 6/14/2012 (rdj). (Entered: 06/13/2012)
2012-06-13180Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppoosition to CIA's Supplemental Items 4 and 5 Response to Court'sNovember 12, 2009 Order by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
2012-06-14NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 179 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Def's Mot. to Suppl. Its Items 4 and 5 Response , 178 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Def's Mot. to Suppl. Its Items 4 and 5 Response was entered in error and counsel refile said pleading as docket entry 180 Motion. (rdj) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-06-14MINUTE ORDER granting 180 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file. Plaintiff shall file his response on or before June 20, 2012 and defendant shall file a reply on or before July 6, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on June 14, 2012. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-06-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 6/20/2012 Defendant's Reply due by 7/6/2012. (rje) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-06-20181RESPONSE re 177 Supplemental Memorandum,, by Defendant to Court's November 12, 2009 Order filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
2012-06-20182SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Regarding Dfendant's Response to Suppl Items 4 and 5 Response to Court's Nov. 12, 2009 Order filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Affidavit O'Shea Affidavit, # 7 Declaration Hrdlicka Decl., # 8 Declaration Suppl. Rule 56(f) Hall Decl.)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
2012-07-05183Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's June 20, 2012 Filings, Doc. Nos. 181 and 182 by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
2012-07-10184REPLY in Support of Defendant's May 15, 2012 Filing and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Discovery and In Camera Review filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
2012-07-10185NOTICE of Re-Filing of NSA Declaration by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 177 Supplemental Memorandum,, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Janosek Decl.)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
2012-08-02MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 183 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 2, 2012. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
2012-08-03186ORDER granting in part and denying in part CIA's Motion for summary judgment; granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for summary judgment; denying plaintiffs' Motions for in camera review and discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 3, 2012. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-03187MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 3, 2012. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-23188RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 186 Order, filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration CIA Meeks Declaration, # 2 Declaration DOD Supplemental Tisdale Declaration)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
2012-08-23189RESPONSE re 188 Response to CIA's Proposed Case Management Proposal by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Lesar, James) Modified event title and added link on 8/24/2012 (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/23/2012)
2012-11-23190STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 11/23/2012)
2012-12-05NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 12/19/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
2012-12-05191MOTION for Scheduling Order by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
2012-12-13192MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) , MOTION to Strike 191 MOTION for Scheduling Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
2012-12-13193RESPONSE re 191 MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
2012-12-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 12/19/2012. Status Conference set for 3/19/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje, ) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2013-02-15194STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
2013-03-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 3/19/2013. Status Conference set for 6/19/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (rje, ) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
2013-04-15195TRANSCRIPT of 3/19/13 STATUS HEARING before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Page Numbers: 1-13. Date of Issuance: 4/15/2013. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne; telephone number, 202-354-3186. Court Reporter e-mail address: bryanawayne@yahoo.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2013.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
2013-06-13Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference originally set for 6/19/13 was reset for 7/2/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (mpt, ) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
2013-06-28196STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
2013-07-02Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 7/2/2013. (Court Reporter Chantal Geneus) (tg, ) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
2013-07-12197MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as Production of Records in pdf format by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit 2013 Hall Decl.)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-17198TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Royce C. Lamberth held on July 2, 2013; Page Numbers: 1-18. Date of Issuance: July 3, 2013. Court Reporter Chantal M. Geneus, Telephone number (202) 354-3244, Court Reporter Email Address : chantal.geneus@dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2013.(Geneus, Chantal) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
2013-07-22199NOTICE of Change of Address by James H. Lesar (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
2013-07-29200Memorandum in opposition to re 197 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as Production of Records in pdf format filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Lutz Declaration)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
2013-08-07201Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
2013-08-16202MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Digitization Issue by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
2013-08-22203MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment out of time filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Reply to Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Paul K. Dell, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1--CADRE POW documents, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2--Scudder Decl., # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3--Pres. Obama Openness Directive)(Lesar, James) Modified on 8/22/2013 (jf, ). (Entered: 08/22/2013)
2013-09-09204Consent MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
2013-09-30205ORDER denying 191 Motion for Scheduling Order; denying 192 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 192 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 197 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 201 Motion for Extension of Time to; denying 202 Motion for Extension of Time to; denying 203 Motion for Leave to File; denying 204 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 30, 2013. (lcrcl5) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
2013-11-20206MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply With the Court's Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
2014-02-11207STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
2014-02-18208RESPONSE to CIA's February 11, 2014 Status Report filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
2014-02-28209STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule (Joint) by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
2014-05-13210STATUS REPORT and Proposed Revised Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
2014-05-15211RESPONSE to CIA's Status Report filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
2014-05-23212REPLY to Plaintiff's Response to CIA's Status Report and Proposed Revised Briefing Schedule filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
2014-06-23213Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Vaughn Selections and Retard Briefing Schedule by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
2014-07-23214STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
2014-09-25215ORDER Denying as Moot 206 213 Motions for Extension of Time. The parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order on September 30, 2014. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/25/14. (mpt, ) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
2014-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Submit Proposed Scheduling Order by 9/30/2014. (mpt, ) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
2014-09-30216NOTICE of Filing Proposed Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 215 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-10-07217ORDER Setting Deadlines : Plaintiffs' list of 100 documents selected for inclusion in the sample vaughn index is to be submitted by 10/15/14; if the parties' negotiations to resolve Plaintiffs' demand for an interim award of attorney's fees and costs are unsuccessful, Plaintiffs shall file a motion for an award of attorney's fees and costs by 12/3/14; Defendant's Dispositive Motion to be filed by 12/5/14; Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Dispositive Motion and Plaintiffs' Cross Dispositive Motion due by 2/2/15; Defendant's Reply in Support of its Dispositive Motion and Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross Dispositive Motion due by 3/4/15; Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Cross Dispositive Motion due by 3/24/15; Plaintiffs shall file a Motion to Stay Proceedings by 12/18/14 if the interim fees issue has not been resolved by that date; signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/6/14. (kk) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
2014-11-06218NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Mercedeh Momeni (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
2014-11-20219Joint MOTION to Stay re 217 Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,, by ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Clarke, John) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
2015-01-14220STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
2015-01-26221Joint MOTION for Order Setting Schedule by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
2015-01-27222ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 219 Motion to Stay until January 26, 2015; granting 221 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Plaintiffs' fee petitions shall be filed by February 9, 2015; defendant's response shall be filed by February 23, 2015; and plaintiffs' replies, if any, shall be filed by March 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 27, 2015. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
2015-01-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Fee Petitions due by 2/9/2015, Response due by 2/23/2015, Replies due by 3/6/2015. (mpt) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
2015-02-09223MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lesar Decl., # 2 Affidavit Hrdlicka Decl. (120615), # 3 Affidavit Hall Supplemental Rule 56(f) Decl. (120620))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
2015-02-09224MOTION for Attorney Fees by ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
2015-02-13225NOTICE Notice of Filing of Opinon in CREW v. DOJ (CRC) by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
2015-02-19226Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 223 MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim , 224 MOTION for Attorney Fees by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
2015-02-27227Memorandum in opposition to re 224 MOTION for Attorney Fees , 223 MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Laffey Matrix, # 2 Exhibit Salazar Matrix, # 3 Exhibit Summers Decl, # 4 Exhibit Davy Decl, # 5 Exhibit Malowane Decl, # 6 Exhibit DDC Spreadsheet, # 7 Exhibit SJ Ruling Summary, # 8 Exhibit Example Releases)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
2015-03-09228Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to REply to Defendant Central Intelligence Agency's Opposition to Motion for Interim Award of Attorney's Fees by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-03-17229Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Interim Award of Attorneys' Fees by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
2015-03-23230Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to CIA's Opposition to Mot. for Interim Award of Atty Fees by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
2015-03-30231REPLY to opposition to motion re 230 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to CIA's Opposition to Mot. for Interim Award of Atty Fees filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
2015-03-30232REPLY to opposition to motion re 223 MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Att. A--NSA Stipulation and Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit Att. B--Memorandum Opinion, NSA v. CIA (081104), # 3 Exhibit Att. C--Rosenfeld v. DOJ (121017), # 4 Exhibit Att. D--Holland and Knight PR, # 5 Exhibit Att. E--Davis v. DOJ, July 19, 1993 Transcript, # 6 Exhibit At. F--Davis v. DOJ, Aug. 24, 1993 transcript)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
2015-06-23233ORDER; granting nunc pro tunc 226 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for interim attorney's fees, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/22/2015. (hs) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-06-23234ORDER; granting nunc pro tunc 228 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to file a reply to defendant's opposition to plaintiffs' motion for interim award of attorneys' fee, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/22/2015. (hs) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-06-23235ORDER; granting nunc pro tunc 229 and 230 Plaintiffs' Motions for Extension of Time to File replies to defendant's opposition to award attorneys' fees and costs, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/22/2015. (hs) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-07-15236MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/14/2015. (hs) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-15237ORDER; granting 223 and 224 Motion for Attorney Fees, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/2015. (hs) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-10-20238WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 10/21/2015..... MOTION for Order to Show Cause by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) Modified on 10/22/2015 (znmw). (Entered: 10/20/2015)
2015-10-21239NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. re 238 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Clarke, John) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
2016-01-29240ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 29, 2016. (lcrcl2) Modified on 2/1/2016 (hs). (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-02-12241RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. . (Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-03-22242Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Informal Response to CIA's Draft Vaughn Sample Index and Inventory and to File Joint Report by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-04-28243Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-05-02244ORDER granting 243 Motion for Scheduling Order. It is ORDERED that the defendant will file its motion for summary judgment by June 23, 2016; ORDERED that plaintiffs will file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment (if any) by July 29, 2016; ORDERED that the defendant will file its reply and opposition to defendant's cross-motion (if any) by August 16, 2016; and ORDERED that plaintiffs will file their reply in support of their cross-motion (if any) by August 30, 2016; and it is ORDERED that plaintiffs will file their reply in support of their cross-motion (if any) by August 30, 2016.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/29/2016. (tg) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-06-16245Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-06-20246NOTICE Regarding Consent Motion for Extension of time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 245 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-07-05247ORDER granting 245 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Upon consideration of the defendant's consent motion 245 for an extension of time to file its motion for summary judgment and the response 246 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by July 13, 2016; plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, by August 18, 2016; defendant shall file its reply and opposition to plaintiffs' cross-motion by September 6, 2016; and plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by September 20, 2016. Plaintiffs' prior scheduling motion 242 is moot in light of the Court's Order filed 4/29/16 244 . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/5/2016. (tg) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-13248MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Shiner with Exhibits)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
2016-08-09249Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Def's Mot. for Summary Judgment (160809) by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-15250ORDER granting 249 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment: It is hereby ORDERED, that Plaintiffs' response to defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before September 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/15/2016. (ad) Modified on 8/16/2016 to correct the file date (ad). (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-09-23251Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Def's motion for Summary Judgment by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-10-08252Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defs' Mot. for Summary Judgment (161008) by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/08/2016)
2016-10-15253Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 10/15/2016)
2016-10-17254ORDER granting 251 Motion for Extension of Time to. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/14/2016. (lcrcl3, ) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-17255ORDER granting 252 Motion for Extension of Time to. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/14/2016. (lcrcl3, ) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-18256MOTION for Extension of Time to by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-10-20257MOTION for Extension of Time to Respon to Def's RMSJ (161020) by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-21258MOTION for Summary Judgment by ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Captain Eugene McDaniel, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of James Sanders, # 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark Sauter, # 4 Affidavit Affidavit of Bob Smith, # 5 Statement of Facts, # 6 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to the CIA's Local Rule Statement, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-21259MOTION for Summary Judgment by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James). Added MOTION for In Camera Inspection, MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to Appoint Special Master on 10/24/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-21264Memorandum in opposition to re 248 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (See Docket Entry 258 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-21265Memorandum in opposition to re 248 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (See Docket Entry 259 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-22260NOTICE of Filing of 2016 Roger Hall Dec. by ROGER HALL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhs. 1-37, # 2 Exhibit Exhs. 1-38-76 to Hall Decl., # 3 Exhibit Exhs. 77-114 to Hall Decl., # 4 Exhibit Exhs. 115-148 to Hall Decl.)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/22/2016)
2016-10-22261AFFIDAVIT by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Carol Hrdlicka, # 2 Exhibit 1-10, # 3 Exhibit 11-20, # 4 Exhibit 21-29, # 5 Exhibit 30-40, # 6 Exhibit 41-53)(Clarke, John) Modified event title on 10/24/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 10/22/2016)
2016-10-22262ERRATA by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 23 Se[t/ 92, # 2 Exhibit 23 Sept. 92, # 3 Exhibit 7 Aug. 92, # 4 Exhibit Att. C NSA Inventory)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/22/2016)
2016-10-24263ERRATA re ECF # 262 by ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Att. A--29 Sept. 92 DDI-Bob Taylor, # 2 Exhibit Att. B--7 Aug. 92 MFR Boykin-DDI, # 3 Exhibit Att. C--NSA Inventory & Tabs A & B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-25266ORDER granting 253 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED, that Plaintiff's Motion for an extension of time to October 18, 2016, to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment BE, and hereby IS, GRANTED, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/21/2016. (ad) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-25267ORDER granting 256 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED, that Plaintiff's Motion for an extension of time to October 20, 2016, to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment BE, and hereby IS, GRANTED, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/21/2016. (ad) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-25268ORDER granting 257 Motion for Extension of Time to Respon to Def's RMSJ (161020). It is hereby ORDERED, that Plaintiff's Motion for an extension of time to October 21, 2016, to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment BE, and hereby IS, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/21/2016. (ad) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-11-01269Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 248 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 258 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for In Camera Inspection MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Appoint Special Master by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-18270ORDER granting 269 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 248 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 258 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for In Camera Inspection MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Appoint Special Master: It is hereby ORDERED, that the Defendant shall file its replies, as well as its oppositions to plaintiffs cross-motions, by January 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/17/2016. (ad) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2017-01-30271REPLY to opposition to motion re 248 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Shiner Declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-30272Memorandum in opposition to re 258 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for In Camera Inspection MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Appoint Special Master filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Shiner Decl, # 2 Statement of Facts Response to Plaintiffs' SOF)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-08273Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Opposition to Cross-motions for Summary Judgment by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-16274ORDER granting 273 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/16/2017. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 2/27/2017. (zlsj) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-27275Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for In Camera Inspection MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Appoint Special Master by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-10276Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Opposition to Cross-motions for Summary Judgment by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-10277ORDER granting 276 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Plaintiffs shall have until March 28, 2017 to submit their reply memoranda to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's cross-motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/13/17. (lcrcl1) (Main Document 277 replaced and Modified on 3/13/2017) (zlsj) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-13278ORDER granting 275 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Plaintiffs shall have until March 14, 2017, to submit their Reply Memoranda to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/9/17. (zlsj) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-27279Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Opposition to Cross-motions for Summary Judgment by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-04280Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File replies by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-07281ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc 279 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Opposition to Cross-motions for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 4/4/2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/6/17. (zlsj) Modified on 4/10/2017 (zlsj). (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-07282ORDER granting 280 Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies; Replies due by 4/7/2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/6/17. (zlsj) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-07283MOTION for Extension of Time to File replies by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-08284ERRATA regarding Motion for Extensions of Time by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Motion for One-Day Extension of Time)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/08/2017)
2017-04-10285MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Memorandum in Reply to Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by ACCURACY IN MEDIA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit POW/MIA Select Committee Report Table of Contents, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-10286REPLY to opposition to motion re 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for In Camera Inspection MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Appoint Special Master filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA, ROGER HALL, STUDIES SOLUTIONS RESULTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1--Der Spiegel, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2--Scelso Deposition)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-05-01287ORDER granting 283 Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies and Attachment 1 in 284 Errata Regarding Motion for Extensions of Time. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/28/17. (lsj) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01288ORDER granting 285 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/28/17. (lsj) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01289REPLY to opposition to motion re 258 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ACCURACY IN MEDIA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(znmw) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-08-03290ORDER granting in part and denying and part Motion 248 for Summary Judgment, Motion 258 for Summary Judgment and Motion 259 for Summary Judgment. The parties are further ORDERED to provide the Court with dates of availability during the week of August 21, 2017 for a Status Conference by August 14, 2017. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/2/17. (lsj) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03291MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re Order 290 granting in part and denying and part Motion 248 for Summary Judgment, Motion 258 for Summary Judgment and Motion 259 for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/2/17. (lsj) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-04MINUTE ORDER: The parties are to appear for a Status Conference set for 8/22/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. So ordered by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/4/17. (lsj) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff