Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRaimondo et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2013cv02295
Date Filed2013-05-21
Date Closed2018-01-12
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffDennis Joseph Raimondo
also known as Justin Raimondo
PlaintiffEric Anthony Garris
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [37]
Opinion/Order [53]
Opinion/Order [61]
Opinion/Order [62]
Opinion/Order [68]
Opinion/Order [90]
FOIA Project Annotation: In the kind of case that was common 20 years ago, but has become rare today, Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley of the Northern District of California has ruled that the FBI has not yet shown that it had a legitimate law enforcement purpose sufficient to withhold records pertaining to Dennis Raimondo, Eric Garris, and their website Antwar.com, but that the agency's law enforcement investigation of the two did not violate the Privacy Act's prohibition on collecting and maintaining information about individuals' exercise of their First Amendment rights. Raimondo and Garris discovered in August 2011 a heavily redacted April 2004 memo indicating that they and their website had been the subject of an FBI threat assessment. They both made separate requests for records about themselves. The FBI responded that it could find no records. Over the next year, Raimondo and Garris clarified that they were looking for records concerning their online publication Antiwar.com. Before the agency responded, Raimondo and Garris filed suit. They also submitted a Privacy Act request asking the agency to expunge records reflecting the exercise of their First Amendment rights. The FBI denied the First Amendment-based expungement request. The two then asked the agency to expunge some information they contended was inaccurate. The agency denied that request as to Raimondo, but issued an Electronic Communication as to the information concerning Garris. Garris appealed that decision, contending the EC did not go far enough in correcting the record. In three interim responses, the FBI reviewed 290 pages, disclosing 26 pages in full and 104 pages in part. The agency withheld 117 pages in full and 43 pages were withheld as duplicates. Corley first noted that the FBI had failed to establish that the records had a rational nexus to a legitimate law enforcement purpose. She pointed out that "the FBI's vague reference to everything from 'civil rights matters' to 'violent criminal threat, domestic terrorism investigations, international terrorism investigations, and counterintelligence investigations' does not adequately identify a law enforcement objective which justifies withholding under Exemption 7. For this reason alone, Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to Exemption 7 and the related Privacy Act violation must be denied." She also rejected each of the agency's claims under subsections of Exemption 7. The FBI had claimed Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding) for the records because third party suspects might be tipped off about investigations. She pointed out, however, that "this does not explain 'how releasing each of the withheld documents would interfere with the government's ongoing criminal investigation.' The FBI's assertions must be sufficiently specific to allow Plaintiffs and the Court to evaluate the claimed exemption." She found the FBI's Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records) claims did not outweigh the public interest articulated by the plaintiffs that "the FBI investigated them due to their political viewpoints and that information regarding the scope of the investigation will illuminate this issue. . .The FBI, however, has failed to provide sufficient information to determine whether the privacy interests outweigh the disclosure interests." She added that the FBI was asserting privacy interests for some information already in the public domain. Questioning the agency's redaction of the names of individuals who had written published articles, Corley observed that "it is unclear what privacy interest, if any, the undisclosed individual could have in protecting his or her name given that the FBI is merely noting that the individual wrote a presumably publicly available article." She also rejected the agency's attempt to withhold three-digit file numbers under Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). She pointed out that "plaintiffs only seek the first three digits of the file numbers�"the category of the offense under investigation�"which further weakens the FBI's argument that disclosure would tip off suspects as to the priority of investigative interest." The FBI submitted a supplemental Vaughn index, which Corley described as being eight times longer than the original index. She sympathized with the plaintiffs' claim that the supplemental index constituted "a last minute paper dump," and indicated that "it is apparent from Plaintiffs' brief that they have not had an adequate opportunity to review and comment on the adequacy of the supplemental declaration or Vaughn Index. Further, in denying the FBI's motion for summary judgment on the FOIA and Privacy Act disclosure claims, the Court has given the FBI guidance as to the level of specificity required. The proper remedy, then, is to have Defendant produce yet another amended Vaughn Index and then have the parties address the adequacy of the new Index." Corley rejected Raimondo and Garris's claim that the threat assessment of Antiwar.com violated subsection (e)(7) of the Privacy Act prohibiting agencies from collecting and maintaining information about the exercise of individuals' First Amendment rights unless it was part of a legitimate law enforcement investigation. Corley explained that in March 2004 an agent in the FBI's Newark Field Office had discovered a copy of the post-9/11 FBI watch list on Antiwar.com as well as a spreadsheet entitled FBI Suspect List. The Newark Office conducted a threat assessment of Antiwar.com using public sources and ultimately recommended the San Francisco Field Office conduct an investigation. The San Francisco Field Office declined to open an investigation. Raimondo and Garris argued that once the investigation was concluded, subsection (e)(7) required the agency to stop maintaining such records. Finding the FBI had not violated subsection (e)(7), Corley noted that "the broader investigation here was into how and why the spreadsheets appeared on Antiwar.com. It is difficult to conceive of how the FBI could have responsibly investigated publication of the spreadsheets without having also reviewed the postings on Antiwar.com." She added that "plaintiffs' concession that the FBI properly reviewed the postings on Antiwar.com and analyzed the watch list, but instance that the FBI erred in 'memorializing and maintaining' the document cannot be reconciled. Such a rule would place the FBI in an untenable position�"agents could investigate national security concerns, but they could not document their investigation if doing so would in any way describe the exercise of an individual's First Amendment rights." She observed that there was no temporal limitation on the preservation of such records and that if such a temporal limitation were to exist, such agencies as the FBI would be inundated with requests to expunge records once an investigation was completed. Corley found the FBI's issuance of an Electronic Communication to field offices explaining that allegations that Garris had threatened to hack the FBI were incorrect provided Garris with more than a sufficient remedy. She indicated that "the EC is more accurate than what Garris seeks because it describes the FBI's error in the first instance�"in other words, it corrects history rather than erases it completely."
Issues: Exemption 7(A) - Interference with ongoing investigation, Exemption 7(C) - Invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records, Exemption 7(E) - Investigative methods or techniques, Exemption 7 - Threshold
Opinion/Order [96]
Opinion/Order [122]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in California has ruled that Dennis Raimondo has not shown that the FBI violated section (e)(7) of the Privacy Act, restricting agencies' ability to collect and maintain information about the exercise of an individual's First Amendment rights, because the information was collected as the result of a legitimate law enforcement function. Raimondo and Eric Garris filed a FOIA suit against the FBI after learning that their antiwar.com website was mentioned in a 2004 threat assessment conducted by the agency. The agency originally told Raimondo and Garris that it had no records, but after their connection to antiwar.com was clarified, the agency found records pertaining to their website. After the FOIA claims were resolved, Raimondo and Garris continued to pursue several Privacy Act claims based on the agency's alleged violation of (e)(7). The remaining claim pertained to the inclusion of antiwar.com in a list of sites mentioning a 2006 Halliburton shareholder meeting; Vice President Dick Cheney had previously been the chairman of Halliburton before he became Vice President. Raimondo argued that the mention implicated their First Amendment rights and should be removed. Raimondo and Garris challenged the affidavit of an FBI special agent, claiming the agent had no personal knowledge of the records. But Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley noted that "while there is some similarity between FOIA and Privacy Act claims, the purpose of the declaration in a Privacy Act action is different. In a Privacy Act action such as this the declaration is relied upon to establish the purpose for the historical document and not just the methodology of a search for documents." Finding that the special agent was qualified to explain the nature of the document, Corley pointed out that the special agent "has adequate personal knowledge to testify why a memo such as the April 2006 Memo would have been prepared." Corley then found the memo was prepared as part of a law enforcement function. She observed that "information as to how broadly information regarding the meeting was shared, and how it was shared, is relevant to determining what law enforcement might expect to occur at the meeting and how it should prepare in advance." Raimondo and Garris also contended that the memo was not "authorized." She indicated that "the memo here was prepared as part of the FBI's collaboration with local law enforcement. The Court is not in a position to parse the way in which the FBI collaborated with local law enforcement and conducted its assessment of the public safety risked involved."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to State a Claim
User-contributed Documents
 Federal Defendant's Answer to Complaint
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2013-05-211COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34611086218.). Filed byDennis Joseph Raimondo, Eric Anthony Garris. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
2013-05-212Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
2013-05-213Certificate of Interested Entities by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo re 1 Complaint (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
2013-05-214ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/21/13. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
2013-05-245SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Joseph Raimondo, Eric Anthony Garris. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 5/21/2013, answer due 7/22/2013. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
2013-05-296SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Joseph Raimondo, Eric Anthony Garris. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 5/23/2013, answer due 7/22/2013. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
2013-06-107CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
2013-06-138CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 6/13/2013) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
2013-06-209Federal Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/20/2013) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
2013-07-0210CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
2013-07-1511CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Bureau of Investigation.. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/15/2013) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
2013-07-3012STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation To Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/30/2013) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
2013-07-3113ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 12 Stipulation To Continue Initial Case Management Conference (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-07-31Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/29/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-08-0114ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 8/1/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
2013-08-2315CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Degner, Marley) (Filed on 8/23/2013) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
2013-08-3016Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/29/2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 8/30/2013). Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (FTR Recording 1:32-1:38) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2013) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
2013-08-3017SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/30/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
2013-10-0818MOTION to Stay filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Responses due by 10/15/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
2013-10-1119RESPONSE (re 18 MOTION to Stay ) Plaintiffs' Statement of Partial Non-Opposition to Defendant's Administrative Motion For Stay filed byEric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laura C. Hurtado in Support of Plaintiffs' Statement of Partial Non-Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
2013-10-1820ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying as moot 18 Motion to Stay (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
2013-11-0721CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 11/7/2013) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
2013-11-1422Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 11/14/2013). (FTR Recording 1:30-1:32) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2013) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
2014-01-1323STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Vacating Summary Judgment Schedule and Setting Status Conference filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/13/2014) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
2014-01-1324ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 23 Stipulation Vacating Summary Judgment Schedule and Setting Status Conference (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
2014-01-13Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
2014-02-0625JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
2014-02-1326Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/13/2014 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 2/13/2014). Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (FTR Recording 1:46-2:05) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
2014-04-0127NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation Defendant's Notice of Unavailability (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/1/2014) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
2014-05-0128STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
2014-05-0229ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 28 Stipulation FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
2014-06-2330Federal Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
2014-07-3131JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 7/31/2014) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
2014-08-0832Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/7/2014 before Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 8/8/2014). Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Recording #2:01 - 2:34.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/8/2014) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
2014-09-1633STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Order Continuing September 25, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/16/2014) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
2014-09-1634ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 33 Stipulation Continuing September 25, 2014 Case Management Conference (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
2014-09-16Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
2014-10-3035JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 10/30/2014) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
2014-11-0736Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/6/2014 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Soctt Corley (Date Filed: 11/7/2014). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/7/2014) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
2014-11-0737ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULES FOR DISCOVERY DISPUTES AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/7/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
2014-11-2038STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/20/2014) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
2014-11-2139ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 38 Stipulated Protective Order (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
2014-12-1140MOTION Extend Deadlines to Complete Discovery Meet and Confer and to File Discovery Motions filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Responses due by 12/15/2014. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/11/2014) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2014-12-1541RESPONSE (re 40 MOTION Extend Deadlines to Complete Discovery Meet and Confer and to File Discovery Motions ) filed byEric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 12/15/2014) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
2014-12-1842ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
2015-01-2243MOTION to Compel filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 3/12/2015. Replies due by 3/19/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laura C. Hurtado, # 2 Exhibit to Hurtado Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 1/22/2015) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
2015-03-0944STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines Related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/9/2015) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-03-1045ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 44 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines Related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
2015-03-10Set/Reset Deadlines as to 43 MOTION to Compel . Responses due by 3/26/2015. Replies due by 4/9/2015. Motion Hearing reset for 4/23/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
2015-03-2646RESPONSE (re 43 MOTION to Compel ) Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/26/2015) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
2015-03-2647AFFIDAVIT re 46 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Michael Steinbach by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/26/2015) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
2015-03-2748AFFIDAVIT re 46 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Jennifer S Wang by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/27/2015) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
2015-03-2749Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Administrative Motion for Defendant to Submit Memorandum and Declaration in Camera and Under Seal filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/27/2015) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
2015-03-3150RESPONSE (re 49 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Administrative Motion for Defendant to Submit Memorandum and Declaration in Camera and Under Seal ) filed byEric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 3/31/2015) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
2015-04-0951REPLY (re 43 MOTION to Compel ) filed byEric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 4/9/2015) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-04-2352Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 4/23/2015 re 43 MOTION to Compel filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2015) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
2015-04-2353ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 43 Motion to Compel (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
2015-06-0454Status Report re 53 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Related document(s) 53 ) (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 6/4/2015) Modified on 6/5/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/04/2015)
2015-06-09Set/Reset Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
2015-06-0955TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 6/9/2015) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
2015-06-2756Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/23/2015, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 9:00 a.m. - 9:37 a.m. = 37 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 55 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2015. (Related documents(s) 55 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 6/27/2015) (Entered: 06/27/2015)
2015-07-0257JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 7/2/2015) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
2015-07-0858TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Federal Bureau of Investigation for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/8/2015) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-0959Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Status Conference held on 7/9/2015. The parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed scheduling order re: motion to quash and motion for summary judgment by July 16, 2015. (FTR Time 9:04-9:17) Plaintiff Attorney: Laura Hurtado; Julia Mass. Defendant Attorney: Jennifer Wang. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2015) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
2015-07-1660Statement re 59 Status Conference, Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 7/16/2015) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
2015-07-1761ORDER granting 60 Proposed Schedule filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/17/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-1762Amended ORDER granting 60 Proposed Schedule filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/17/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-2363MOTION for Protective Order filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 8/13/2015. Replies due by 8/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/23/2015) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
2015-07-2364Declaration of Jennifer S Wang in Support of 63 MOTION for Protective Order filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 63 ) (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/23/2015) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
2015-08-1365RESPONSE (re 63 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byEric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
2015-08-2766REPLY (re 63 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit G)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/27/2015) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
2015-09-1067Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2015 re 63 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter:Rhonda Aquilina) Plaintiff Attorneys: Lara Hurtado; Julia Mass. Defendant Attorney: Jennifer Wang. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2015) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
2015-09-1168ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 63 Motion for Protective Order (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
2015-11-1269MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 12/17/2015. Replies due by 1/28/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/12/2015) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
2015-11-1270AFFIDAVIT in Support re 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declarationof Andrew Campi In Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 69 ) (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/12/2015) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
2015-11-1271Declaration of David M. Hardy in Support of 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N-V, *** EXHIBIT FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** # 4 Exhibit W-AA)(Related document(s) 69 ) (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/12/2015) Modified on 11/13/2015 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2015)
2015-11-1272NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation re 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/12/2015) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-1373Declaration of Jennifer S Wang in Support of 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 69 ) (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/13/2015) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-1374Administrative Motion to File Under Seal & [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Redacted Ex. D, Wang Decl., # 3 Exhibit Part 1 - Unredacted Ex. D, Wang Decl., # 4 Exhibit Part 2, Unredacted Ex. D, Wang Decl., # 5 Exhibit Part 3 - Unredacted Ex. D, Wang Decl., # 6 Exhibit Part 4, Unredacted Ex. D, Wang Decl., # 7 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. AA, Hardy Decl.)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/13/2015) Modified on 11/13/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-1375STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Enlarging Page-Limit for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/13/2015) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-1376ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 75 Stipulation to Enlarge Page-Limit for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-1377MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document ; [Proposed] Order filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer S Wang)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/13/2015) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-1378EXHIBITS re 71 Declaration in Support, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [71-3], filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Related document(s) 71 ) (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/13/2015) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-1679Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 77 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice.)(jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
2015-12-1680STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 17 Scheduling Order Enlarging Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 12/16/2015) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
2015-12-1781ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 80 Stipulation Enlarging Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
2015-12-1782Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/28/2015. Replies due by 2/11/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Hurtado Declaration and Exhibits, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2015) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
2016-01-1983STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadlines Related to the Parties' Cross Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/19/2016) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-2084ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 83 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines Related to the Parties' Cross Motions for Summary Judgment (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-20Set/Reset Deadlines as to 82 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 2/11/2016. Replies due by 3/3/2016. Motion Hearing reset for 3/24/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-02-1185RESPONSE (re 82 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Defendant's Reply In Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/11/2016) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-1186Declaration of David M. Hardy in Support of 85 Opposition/Response to Motion, Supplemental Declaration of David M. Hardy filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Related document(s) 85 ) (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/11/2016) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-1287Declaration in Support of 85 Opposition/Response to Motion, Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer S Wang In Support of Defendant's Reply In Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J-K)(Related document(s) 85 ) (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/12/2016) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-03-0388REPLY (re 82 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byEric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 3/3/2016) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-2489Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 3/24/2016 re 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation and 82 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (FTR Time 2:27-4:13.) Plaintiff Attorneys: Laura Hurtado; Julia Mass; Andrew Bluth. Defendant Attorney: Jennifer Wang. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2016) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
2016-05-1090ORDER RE: CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/10/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-10Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-1091ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 74 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-1392STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/13/2016) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-05-1693ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 92 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-16Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/30/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-1794EXHIBITS re 73 Declaration in Support, 91 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit D, Part 2)(Related document(s) 73 , 91 ) (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/17/2016) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-06-2395JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 6/23/2016) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-2996ORDER RE: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/29/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-08-3097NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Ann Falk (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/30/2016) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-09-0998STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 96 Order Regarding Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 9/9/2016) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-0999ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 98 Stipulation Regarding Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2017-01-23100STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF FOIA CLAIMS WITH THE EXCEPTION OF ATTORNEYS FEES; PROPOSED ORDER filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/23/2017) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-23101ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 100 Stipulation RE SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF FOIA CLAIMS WITH THE EXCEPTION OF ATTORNEYS FEES. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-02-09102MOTION for Leave To File a Motion for Reconsideration Under Civil Local Rule 7-9 re 90 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Reconsideration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 2/9/2017) Modified on 2/21/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/21/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-10103STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 101 Order on Stipulation FURTHER STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF FOIA CLAIMS WITH THE EXCEPTION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES; PROPOSED ORDER filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/10/2017) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-13104ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 103 Further Stipulation Re: Settlement and Dismissal with Prejudice of FOIA Claims with the Exception of Attorney's Fees. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-15105Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting Motion for Leave To File A Motion For Reconsideration Under Civil Local Rule 7-9. Defendant shall file a response to the motion for reconsideration by 3/9/2017. Plaintiff may file a reply by 3/23/2017. Court will take the matter under submission and advise the parties if oral argument is required. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) Modified on 2/21/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-21106STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE RESPONSE DATES REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/21/2017) Modified on 2/22/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-21107ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 106 Stipulation RE RESPONSE DATES REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines as to 102 MOTION for Reconsideration. Responses due by 3/17/2017. Replies due by 3/31/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-03-17108OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re 90 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Rebecca A. Falk in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration)(Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/17/2017) Modified on 3/21/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-31109REPLY (re 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re 90 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, ) In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration filed byEric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Laura Hurtado in support of Motion for Reconsideration)(Mass, Julia) (Filed on 3/31/2017) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-14110STIPULATION Re Settlement of FOIA Attorneys' Fees filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/14/2017) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-07-18111ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion for Reconsideration. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-08-14112STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Statement and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-15113STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Granting 112 Stipulation. October 5, 2017 - Defendant files motion for summary judgment; October 26, 2017 - Plaintiffs file opposition to defendants motion for summary judgment and plaintiffs cross-motion for summary judgment; November 16, 2017 - Defendant files opposition to plaintiffs cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of defendants motion for summary judgment; December 7, 2017 - Plaintiffs file reply in support of plaintiffs cross-motion for summary judgment; December 21, 2017 - Hearing on cross-motions for summary judgment.(lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-10-05114Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 10/26/2017. Replies due by 11/16/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Raul Bujanda, # 2 Declaration B. Grant Mendenhall, # 3 Declaration Jennifer Wang, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Proposed Order)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/5/2017) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-05115NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing by Federal Bureau of Investigation re 114 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/5/2017) Modified on 10/6/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-24116NOTICE of Appearance by Vasudha Talla (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 10/24/2017) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-10-26117OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 114 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SECOND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byEric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS SECOND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF VASUDHA TALLA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SECOND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Vasudha Talla, # 4 Declaration DECLARATION OF ERIC ANTHONY GARRIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 10/26/2017) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-11-16118OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 114 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/16/2017) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-12-07119REPLY in Support (re 114 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment) filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 12/7/2017) Modified on 12/8/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-12120CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that the hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 114 ) currently scheduled for December 21, 2017 is continued to January 11, 2018 at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-12Set/Reset Deadlines as to 114 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing reset for 1/11/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2018-01-11121Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2018 re 114 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation and 117 SECOND Cross-Motion for Summary filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. The motions were argued, submitted, and taken under submission. (FTR Time: 9:01-9:23.) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Vasudha Talla; Julie Mass; Laura Hurtado. Attorney for Defendant: Jennifer Wang. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2018) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-12122ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 114 Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 117 Plaintiffs' Second Cross-motion for Summary Judgment. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-12123JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/12/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff