Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCANNING et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2013cv00831
Date Filed2013-06-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffGEORGE CANNING
PlaintiffJEFFREY STEINBERG
PlaintiffSAE PRODUCTIONS, INC.
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [46]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Randolph Moss has ruled that the State Department properly withheld records concerning Presidential Study Directive 11, a 2010 memo from the President to senior foreign policy advisors discussing national security topics related to the Middle East and North Africa, as well as records pertaining to the Muslim Brotherhood under Exemption 1 (national security) and Exemption 5 (deliberative process privilege) in response to a request by George Canning. Moss found that records referred to the CIA had been properly withheld under Exemption 1 and that redactions made under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) to records referred to USAID were also appropriate. However, Moss found that State had not provided sufficient justification for classifying two email attachments after receiving Canning's FOIA request and instructed the agency to justify its delegation of authority. Canning argued that PSD-11 and related records were not properly classified because PSD-11 had been discussed with the media. Unconvinced, Moss noted that "unquestionably, some information about the Administration's foreign policies in the Middle East and North Africa was not classified, and there is no indication that the cited discussions went beyond such information." He added that "there is no indication here that the government has officially disclosed or acknowledged PSD-11's contents. Even assuming that government officials discussed the policies resulting from PSD-11 with the media, an official disclosure of information 'similar' to the exempted information is not enough." Because the agency had upgraded the classification of two email attachments while responding to Canning's request, Moss agreed that the agency was required to follow § 1.7(d) of Executive Order 13526, which required that such decisions be made on a "document-by-document basis with the personal participation or under the direction of" the Under Secretary of State for Management. Canning challenged whether that decision could be delegated. While Moss found the delegation was appropriate, he pointed out that the agency had failed to show that the Under Secretary was involved in the review process. He noted that "although the Under Secretary 'directed' that [a deputy assistant secretary] act as the classifying official, the declarations do not indicate whether the Under Secretary was 'apprised of actions taken under [that] authority; so that he could exercise oversight of those actions. Absent some opportunity for actual oversight by the Under Secretary, the Court concludes that there would be no meaningful difference between acting at the Under Secretary's direction and acting pursuant to a delegation of his authority" Moss ordered the agency to explain that the provisions of § 1.7(d) had been properly complied with. Canning argued that State's affidavits could not serve as a basis for why records were withheld by the CIA and USAID. But Moss noted that "to be sure, agencies must provide the reviewing court with sufficient information to justify their withholding decisions. In some situations, that may require additional declarations from other agencies. But Plaintiffs do not identify any information essential to the Court's review that can only be obtained from CIA or USAID officials. [State's affidavit], moreover, did not merely relay withholding determinations made by another agency without providing an explanation for those determinations." USAID had withheld identifying information about local organizations that had received U.S. support under Exemption 6. Moss questioned whether the information qualified as "similar" under the exemption. However, he concluded the exemption applied, noting that "the Department and USAID are far better positioned than Plaintiffs or the Court to determine whether, on these facts, disclosure would lead to the identification of particular individuals in those countries."
Issues: Exemption 1 - Properly classified, Exemption 1 - Harm to national security, Search - Referral, Exemption 6 - Invasion of privacy
Opinion/Order [84]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2013-06-041COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616056837) filed by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrc, ) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
2013-06-04SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zrc, ) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
2013-06-242RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/12/2013. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/12/2013.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/12/2013., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/12/2013 (jf, ) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
2013-07-123NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Renee Freeny on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-124ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-12MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than August 12, 2013. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 12, 2013. (lcegs4) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2013 (clv, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-12NOTICE: Minute Order entered 7/12/13 was mailed to GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG at the address of Court Record. (clv, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-315NOTICE of Change of Address by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG (jf, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
2013-08-126STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
2013-08-13MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 6 joint status report, in which the parties state that they are continuing to search for responsive records and to discuss narrowing the scope of certain requests, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than August 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 13, 2013. (lcegs4) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
2013-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2013. (mac) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
2013-08-307STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
2013-08-30MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 7 joint status report, in which the parties state that they are continuing to search for responsive records and to discuss narrowing the scope of certain requests, it is hereby ordered that the parties file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than September 20, 2013. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 30, 2013. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
2013-09-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/20/2013. (mac) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
2013-09-208STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
2013-09-24MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' 8 joint status report, in which they state that they are continuing to narrow the issues and that the government is searching for responsive records, it is hereby ordered that the parties file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than October 18, 2013. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 24, 2013. (lcegs4) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
2013-10-189STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
2013-10-22MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' 9 joint status report, in which they state that they are continuing to narrow the issues and that the government is searching for responsive records, it is hereby ordered that the parties file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than December 6, 2013. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 22, 2013. (lcegs4) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
2013-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Individual Recommendation or Status Report due by 12/6/2013. (mac) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
2013-10-23NOTICE: Minute Order dated 10/22/13 mailed to GEORGE CANNING and JEFFREY STEINBERG at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
2013-12-0610STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
2013-12-0911CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 10 Status Report . (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
2013-12-11MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' 10 joint status report, in which they state that they are continuing to narrow the issues and that the government is searching for responsive records, it is hereby ordered that the parties file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than January 10, 2014. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 11, 2013. (lcegs4) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
2013-12-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Individual Recommendation or Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2014. (mac) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
2014-01-1012STATUS REPORT (Filed Jointly) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
2014-01-13MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' 12 joint status report, in which they state that the government is continuing to search for responsive records, it is hereby ordered that the parties file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than February 21, 2014. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on Janaury 13, 2014. (lcegs4) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
2014-01-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report or Individual Recommendation due by 2/21/2014. (mac) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
2014-01-13NOTICE: Minute Order dated 1/13/14 mailed to GEORGE CANNING and JEFFREY STEINBERG. (mac) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
2014-02-2113STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
2014-02-21MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' 13 joint status report, in which they state that the government is continuing to search for responsive records, it is hereby ordered that the parties file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than March 14, 2014. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 21, 2014. (lcegs4) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
2014-02-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Individual Recommendation of Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2014. (mac) (Entered: 02/23/2014)
2014-02-23NOTICE: Minute Order dated 2/21/14 mailed to GEORGE CANNING and JEFFREY STEINBERG at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 02/23/2014)
2014-03-1414STATUS REPORT (Filed Jointly) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
2014-03-1415CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 14 Status Report . (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
2014-03-21MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' 14 joint status report, in which they state that the government is continuing to search for responsive records, it is hereby ordered that the parties file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than June 6, 2014. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 21, 2014. (lcegs4) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
2014-03-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/6/2014. (mac) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
2014-03-21NOTICE: Minute Order dated 3/21/14 mailed to GEORGE CANNING and JEFFREY STEINBERG at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
2014-06-0616STATUS REPORT (Filed Jointly) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-12MINUTE ORDER adopting the joint proposal for further proceedings set forth in 16 the parties' joint status report. By no later than August 8, 2014, the defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment and Vaughn Index for Counts I-III of plaintiffs' complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross motion for summary judgment, if any, by no later than September 15, 2014. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and combined opposition to plaintiffs' cross motion, if any, by no later than October 14, 2014. Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of any cross motion by no later than November 7, 2014. The parties shall file a joint status report, including recommendations for further proceedings, regarding Count IV by no later than December 5, 2014. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 12, 2014. (lcegs4) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
2014-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Motion For Summary Judgment And Vaughn Index due by 8/8/2014. Plaintiff's Opposition And Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 9/15/2014. Defendant Reply In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment And Combined Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 10/14/2014. Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Any Cross Motion due by 11/07/2014. Joint Status Report due by 12/05/2014. (mac) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
2014-06-12NOTICE: Minute Order dated 6/12/14 mailed to GEORGE CANNING and JEFFREY STEINBERG at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
2014-08-0117Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
2014-08-05MINUTE ORDER granting 17 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file its motion for summary judgment. By no later than August 27, 2014, the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment and Vaughn index for Counts I-III of plaintiffs' complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross motion for summary judgment, if any, by no later than October 6, 2014. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and combined opposition to plaintiffs' cross motion, if any, by no later than November 4, 2014. Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of any cross motion by no later than December 1, 2014. The parties shall file a joint status report, including recommendations for further proceedings, regarding Count IV by no later than December 22, 2014. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 5, 2014. (lcegs7) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
2014-08-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/27/2014. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/6/2014. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and combined opposition to plaintiffs' cross motion due by 11/4/2014. Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of any cross motion due by 12/1/2014. Joint Status Report due by 12/22/2014 (tcr) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
2014-08-2518Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
2014-08-27MINUTE ORDER granting 18 defendant's unopposed second motion for extension of time to file its motion for summary judgment. By no later than August 28, 2014, the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment and Vaughn index for Counts I-III of plaintiffs' complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross motion for summary judgment, if any, by no later than October 7, 2014. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and combined opposition to plaintiffs' cross motion, if any, by no later than November 4, 2014. Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of any cross motion by no later than December 1, 2014. The parties shall file a joint status report, including recommendations for further proceedings, regarding Count IV by no later than December 22, 2014. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 27, 2014. (lcegs7) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
2014-08-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Motion For Summary Judgment due by 8/28/2014. Defendant Vaughn Index For Counts 1-111 Of Plaintiff's Complaint due by 8/28/2014. Plaintiff Opposition And Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 10/7/2014. Defendant Reply In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgement And Combined Opposition To Plaintiffs Cross Motion due by 11/42014. Plaintiff Reply In Support Of Cross Motion due by 12/1/2014. Joint Status Report due by 12/22/2014. (mac) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
2014-08-27NOTICE: Minute Order dated 8/27/14 mailed to GEORGE CANNING and JEFFREY STEINBERG at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
2014-08-2819MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David Sanborn, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John F. Hackett, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Hackett Declaration, # 4 Statement of Facts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
2014-09-3020ORDER directing plaintiffs to respond to 19 defendant's motion for summary judgment by no later than October 7, 2014. If plaintiffs do not respond by that date, the Court may treat the motion as conceded and grant defendant's motion for summary judgment. Plaintiffs are directed to read this Order in its entirety upon receipt. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 30, 2014. (lcegs7) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-10-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/7/2014. (mac) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
2014-10-01NOTICE: 20 Order mailed to GEORGE CANNING and JEFFREY STEINBERG at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
2014-10-1521NOTICE of Filing by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan signed on 10/08/2014 (jf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
2014-10-1522MOTION for in camera review by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan signed on 10/09/2014 (jf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
2014-10-1523MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan signed on 10/08/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration First, # 2 Declaration Second)(jf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
2014-10-2324Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 22 MOTION for in camera review. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan signed on 10/08/2014, 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
2014-10-23MINUTE ORDER granting 24 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond. The defendant's response to 22 plaintiffs' motion for in camera review and its combined reply in support of 19 motion for summary judgment and opposition to 23 plaintiffs' cross motion, shall be filed by no later than November 14, 2014. Plaintiffs' reply to 22 their motion for in camera review and their reply in support of 23 cross motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than December 11, 2014. The parties shall file a joint status report, including recommendations for further proceedings regarding Count IV, by no later than December 22, 2014. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 23, 2014. (lcegs7) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
2014-10-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Motion For In Camera Review due by 11/14/201. Plaintiff's Reply To Their Motion For In Camera Review due by 12/11/2014. Joint Status Report due by 12/22/2014. (mac) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
2014-10-24NOTICE: Minute Order dated 10/23/14 mailed to GEORGE CANNING and JEFFREY STEINBERG at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
2014-11-1425Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of John Hackett, # 2 Statement of Facts Response, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
2014-11-1426Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION for in camera review. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan signed on 10/08/2014 filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
2014-11-1927Vaughn Index (Supplemental) . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Third) of John Hackett)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-11-2028CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 27 Vaughn Index . (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
2014-11-21Case randomly reassigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
2014-12-1129MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 22 MOTION for in camera review, 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by JEFFREY STEINBERG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
2014-12-2230STATUS REPORT (filed jointly) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
2014-12-2232REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 MOTION for in camera review. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan signed on 10/08/2014 filed by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(rdj) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
2014-12-2233REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(rdj) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
2014-12-2234Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(rdj) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
2014-12-2235Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
2014-12-2236Amended MOTION in camera review by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
2014-12-2331CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 30 Status Report . (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
2015-01-0237Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 36 MOTION in camera review by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 01/02/2015)
2015-01-2338Memorandum in opposition to re 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 36 MOTION in camera review filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
2015-01-26ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF ERROR re 38 Memorandum in Opposition; emailed to kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please refile document, 3. Counsel IS INSTRUCTED to docket the Motion as a separate entry. ACTION REQUIRED (zrdj, ) Modified on 1/26/2015 (rdj). (Entered: 01/26/2015)
2015-01-26NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Notice of QC, was entered in error; counsel DID NOT commit an error. NO ACTION NEEDED. (rdj) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
2015-01-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 29 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted and Plaintiff's replies to ECF Nos. 22 and 23 are DEEMED TIMELY FILED. Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 37 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted, and Defendant's responses to ECF Nos. 35 and 36 are DEEMED TIMELY FILED. It is ORDERED that the next joint status report will be due on or before June 23, 2015, as proposed in the parties' December 22, 2014, joint status report 30 . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on January 27, 2015. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
2015-01-27Set/Reset Deadline: Joint Status Report due on or before 6/23/2015. (kt) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
2015-02-0439REPLY to opposition to motion re 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 36 MOTION in camera review filed by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG. (rdj) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
2015-03-3040STATUS REPORT (Filed jointly) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
2015-06-2341STATUS REPORT (Filed Jointly) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-08-2442STATUS REPORT (Filed Jointly) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
2015-09-0343NOTICE Regarding Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - MOTION FOR DESIGNATION OF COORDINATING JUDGE)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-0444NOTICE of Court Order in Miscellaneous Case No. 15-1188 by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 43 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - ORDER IN MISCELLANEOUS CASE NUMBER 15-1188)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0445Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that a telephonic status conference is set for 1:00 p.m. on September 21, 2015, at which time the Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Kristin Thompson, will call the parties. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on September 16, 2015. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-16Set/Reset Hearing: A Telephone Conference is set for 9/21/2015, at 1:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-21Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 9/21/2015. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-09-21MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status conference, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before November 20, 2015, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) the status of the production of documents responsive to the second portion of Plaintiffs' FOIA request; and (2) any updates with respect to the Department's search of emails from former Secretary Clinton and certain other former employees. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on September 21, 2015. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-09-21Set/Reset Deadlines: On or before 11/20/2015, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report. (kt) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-09-3046MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 19 ; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 ; denying Plaintiffs' Second Motion For Partial Summary Judgment 35 and Motions For In Camera Review 22 36 . Defendant is directed to supplement the record within 60 days. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on September 30, 2015. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
2015-10-13MINUTE ORDER: In light of the denial of the Defendant's Motion for Designation of Coordination Judge (No. 1:15-mc-01188, Dkt. 41), the Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion for Designation of Coordination Judge 45 is DENIED as moot. Pursuant to the Court's order of September 21, 2015, it is ORDERED that on or before November 20, 2015, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) the status of the production of documents responsive to the second portion of Plaintiffs' FOIA request; and (2) any updates with respect to the Department's search of emails from former Secretary Clinton and certain other former employees. Pursuant to the Court's memorandum opinion and order filed on September 30, 2015 46 , it is further ORDERED that the Defendant may supplement the record with information addressing the issues identified in the memorandum opinion within 60 days of the date on which it was filed, i.e. November 29, 2015. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/13/2015. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
2015-10-13Set/Reset Deadlines: On or before 11/20/2015, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report; The Defendant may supplement the record with information addressing the issues identified in the memorandum opinion within 60 days of the date on which it was filed, i.e. 11/29/2015. (kt) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
2015-11-2047Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
2015-11-2448RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 46 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,, filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Margaret P. Grafeld)(Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
2015-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 47 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before March 21, 2016, apprising the Court of their continued progress in this case and proposing any further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/30/2015. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-11-30ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Department of State shall complete its production of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request on or before January 20, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report apprising the Court of the status of production and identifying any further issues remaining in the case on or before February 5, 2015. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/30/2015. (lcrdm3, ) Modified on 11/30/2015,Minute Order entered in wrong case (kt). (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-11-30Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 3/21/2016. (kt) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-12-0749RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 46 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2015-12-1050Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Further Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2015-12-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 50 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Further Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 49 on or before January 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/10/2015. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2015-12-11Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Further Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 49 on or before 1/8/2016. (kt) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
2016-01-0851RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Further Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Freeny, Kyle) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-02-1752NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Rohit Dwarka Nath on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Kyle R. Freeny (Nath, Rohit) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
2016-03-2153Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Nath, Rohit) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
2016-03-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 53 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 25, 2016. Further briefing in this case is stayed pending that status report, which shall included a proposed schedule, if necessary, to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/22/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-03-22Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 7/25/2016. (kt) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-05-0354NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by James O. Bickford on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Rohit D. Nath (Bickford, James) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
2016-07-2555Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 55 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 8, 2016. Further briefing in this case is stayed pending that status report, which shall included a proposed schedule, if necessary, to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/26/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 8/8/2016. (kt) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-08-0856Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 56 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 29, 2016. Further briefing in this case is stayed pending that status report, which shall include a proposed schedule, if necessary, to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/9/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 8/29/2016. (kt) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-2957Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-08-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 57 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 29, 2016. Further briefing in this case is stayed pending that status report, which shall include a proposed schedule, if necessary, to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/30/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-30Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 9/29/2016. (kt) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-09-3058Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 58 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 28, 2016. Further briefing in this case is stayed pending that status report, which shall include a proposed schedule, if necessary, to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/3/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 10/28/2016. (kt) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-2859Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 59 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 2, 2016. Further briefing in this case is stayed pending that status report, which shall include a proposed schedule, if necessary, to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/30/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/30/2016)
2016-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 12/2/2016. (kt) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-12-0260Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 60 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 6, 2017. Further briefing in this case is stayed pending that status report, which shall include a proposed schedule, if necessary, to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/3/2016. (lcrdm1, ) Modified on 12/5/2016 to add "Minute Order" in front of entry (kt). (Entered: 12/03/2016)
2016-12-05Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 1/6/2017. (kt) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2017-01-0661Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 61 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 10, 2017. Further briefing in this case is stayed pending that status report, which shall include a proposed schedule, if necessary, to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/6/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-09Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 2/10/2017. (kt) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
2017-02-1062Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 62 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 10, 2017. Further briefing in this case is stayed pending that status report, which shall include a proposed schedule, if necessary, to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/13/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-13Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 3/10/2017. (kt) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-03-1063Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 63 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 28, 2017. Further briefing in this case is stayed pending that status report, which shall include a proposed schedule, if necessary, to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/13/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 4/28/2017. (kt) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-04-2864Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 64 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before May 31, 2017. The status report shall include a proposed schedule, if necessary, to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/1/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 5/31/2017. (kt) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-3165Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-05-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 65 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before June 6, 2017. The status report shall include a proposed schedule governing further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/31/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/6/2017. (kt) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-0666Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 66 , it is hereby ORDERED that parties comply with the following briefing schedule: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before September 29, 2017; Plaintiffs' opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before November 3, 2017; Defendant's opposition and reply shall be filed on or before December 1, 2017; and Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed on or before December 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/6/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment due on or before 9/29/2017; Plaintiffs' opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment due on or before 11/3/2017; Defendant's opposition and reply due on or before 12/1/2017; Plaintiffs' reply due on or before 12/15/2017. (kt) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-2367MOTION to Consolidate Cases by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-1368ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Motion to Consolidate 67 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. The Court hereby ORDERS that SAE Prods., Inc. v. U.S. Dep't of State, 15-cv-1245, be consolidated with Canning, et al. v. U.S. Dep't of State, 13-cv-831. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) (permitting the court to consolidate actions "involv[ing] a common question of law or fact"); Local Civ. R. 40.5(a)(3). The parties to these cases are directed to file all future documents in Canning, No. 13-cv-831, and the Clerk of Court is directed to close the docket in SAE, 15-cv-1245. The Court further ORDERS that the following briefing schedule, previously entered in both cases, remains in effect: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before September 29, 2017; Plaintiffs' oppositions and cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before November 3, 2017; Defendant's opposition and reply shall be filed on or before December 1, 2017; and Plaintiffs' replies shall be filed on or before December 15, 2017. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/13/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-13CASE CONSOLIDATED. Case 15-cv-1245 has been consolidated with 13-cv-831 pursuant to a Court Order entered 07/13/17. From this date forward all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the earlier case, Civil Action No. 13-cv-831. The parties are advised NOT to elect to SPREAD text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails.(zrdj) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-09-2769Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Extension of Time 69 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. The Court's Order setting forth the briefing schedule 68 is hereby AMENDED as follows: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before October 13, 2017; Plaintiffs' oppositions to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before November 17, 2017; Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before December 15, 2017; and Plaintiffs' replies in support of their cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before January 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/27/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before 10/13/2017; Plaintiffs' oppositions to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before 11/17/2017; Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before 12/15/2017; Plaintiffs' replies in support of their cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before 1/5/2018. (kt) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-1270Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment 70 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before October 20, 2017; Plaintiffs' oppositions and cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before November 29, 2017; Defendant's opposition and reply shall be filed on or before December 22, 2017; and Plaintiffs' replies shall be filed on or before January 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/13/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 10/20/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/29/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/22/2017. Plaintiffs' Cross Motion due by 11/29/2017. Response to Cross Motion due by 12/22/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 1/19/2018. (dot) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1671NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-2072NOTICE of filing Declaration and Vaughn Index in Support of Def.'s Mot. Summ. J. by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric F. Stein, # 2 Exhibit Vaughn Index, # 3 Exhibit 2-5, # 4 Exhibit 6-31)(Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-2073NOTICE of filing Declaration of David Hardy in Support of Def.'s Mot. Summ. J. by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy, # 2 Exhibit A)(Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-2174MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/21/2017)
2017-10-2375ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs George Canning and Jeffrey Steinberg shall respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on or before November 29, 2017. If Plaintiffs do not file a response within the time provided, Plaintiffs may not have the opportunity to be heard on the motion and the Court may resolve the case based exclusively on Defendants submission. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/23/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/29/2017. (kt) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-11-2176ERRATA re: Corrected Vaughn Index by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE 72 Notice (Other), filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Department of State Vaughn Index)(Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2778NOTICE of Change of Address by JEFFREY STEINBERG (td) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-2977Memorandum in opposition to re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SAE PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Moss Declaration, # 2 Statement of Facts Response, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-0179Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(td) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-0180Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(td) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-2281REPLY to opposition to motion re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Stein Decl., # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-2282RESPONSE re 79 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Stein Decl., # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-02-1583SURREPLY to re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE CANNING, JEFFREY STEINBERG. "LET IT BE FILED" by Judge Randolph D. Moss (td) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-10-2484MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 74 , is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and the Canning Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 79 , is hereby DENIED. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar