Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHOLLAND v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2013cv01059
Date Filed2013-07-11
Date Closed2015-06-02
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffMAX HOLLAND
DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2013-07-111COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3395867) filed by MAX HOLLAND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Atty General, # 4 Summons NARA)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
2013-07-11Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (ls, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-122ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3)Issued as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Consent Notice)(ls, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-123NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bekesha on behalf of MAX HOLLAND (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-244ORDER Establishing Procedures for Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on July 24, 2013. (SM) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
2013-07-295NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Schwei on behalf of NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Schwei, Daniel) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
2013-08-026Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by MAX HOLLAND (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
2013-08-05MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings, the parties' motion is GRANTED. This case is STAYED until February 15, 2014. By no later than February 15, 2014, or ten business days after the Defendant completes review of the documents at issue, whichever comes first, the parties shall file a joint status report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/5/13. (lcckk2) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
2014-02-127Joint MOTION to Stay (Extend) and Joint Status Report by MAX HOLLAND (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
2014-02-128JOINT STATUS REPORT by MAX HOLLAND, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (See Docket Entry 7 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
2014-02-189ORDER granting 7 Motion to Extend Stay and file a Joint Status Report: Proceedings and deadlines in this case are to be stayed through and including 8/15/2014. Parties Joint Status Report and/or Motion due by 8/15/2014. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/17/14. (dot ) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
2014-06-10Case reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr, ) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
2014-08-1510STATUS REPORT (Joint) and Motion to Extend Stay of Proceedings by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwei, Daniel) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
2014-08-16MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Status Report 10 filed by the parties, it is hereby ordered that the proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed through and including February 16, 2015. Parties' Joint Status Report or joint motion to dismiss due by February 16, 2015; Status Report due by 2/16/2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/16/14. (lctsc1) (Entered: 08/16/2014)
2015-02-1311Joint MOTION to Stay and Status Report by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwei, Daniel) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
2015-02-1312JOINT STATUS REPORT by MAX HOLLAND, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (See Docket Entry 11 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
2015-02-18MINUE ORDER: Granting 11 Joint Motion to continue the stay in this action until June 16, 2015. The parties shall file a joint status report not later than June 16, 2015. Additionally, a Status Conference is hereby set for June 18, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. The Court will not entertain a motion to continue the Status Conference absent extraordinary circumstances. REQUESTS FOR ADDTIONAL EXTENSIONS WILL BE VIEWED WITH EXTREME DISFAVOR. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/18/15. (DJS) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
2015-04-13MINUTE ORDER: The current deadlines in this action are hereby rescheduled. The parties' joint status report previously due on June 16, 2015 shall be filed by 4:00 p.m. on Monday June 15, 2015. The scheduling conference previously set for June 18, 2015 is hereby rescheduled for 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday June 16, 2015 in Courtroom 2. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/13/15. (DJS) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
2015-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 6/15/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sm) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
2015-06-0113STIPULATION of Dismissal by MAX HOLLAND. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-06-0214ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In light of the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the parties 13 , this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party to bear its own expenses. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/2/15. (DJS) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff