Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEBREW v. ATWOOD et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2010cv00650
Date Filed2010-04-27
Date Closed2012-09-05
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffDARRELL JAMES DEBREW
DefendantATWOOD Bureau of Prisons Trust Fund Manager
DefendantALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS For Bureau of Prisons
DefendantHARLEY G. LAPPIN Director of Bureau of Prisons
DefendantALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS
DefendantBUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantBUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY Low Security Correctional Institution
DefendantMID-ATLANTIC REGION Federal Bureau of Prisons
AppealD.C. Circuit 12-5361
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [22]
Opinion/Order [24]
Opinion/Order [44]
Opinion/Order [57]
Opinion/Order [93]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-04-271COMPLAINT against ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
2010-04-27Summons (7) Issued as to ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION. (dr) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
2010-04-272MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (dr) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
2010-04-273PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (dr) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
2010-04-274MOTION for Injunction, Class Action Status, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (dr) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
2010-04-275VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 12/06/2010.....ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $87.00 from Prison Account of Darrell James DeBrew; further Ordered, granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 04/21/2010. (See Order for full Details) (dr) Modified on 12/7/2010 (dr). (Entered: 04/28/2010)
2010-05-056SUMMONS Returned Executed BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 5/5/2010, answer due 6/4/2010; HARLEY LAPPIN served on 5/5/2010, answer due 6/4/2010. (dr) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-207SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney, served on 5/12/2010, answer due 6/11/2010, U.S. Attorney General, served on 5/12/2010, answer due 6/11/2010. (dr) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
2010-05-268SUMMONS Returned Executed as to ATWOOD, served on 5/25/2010, answer due 6/24/2010. (dr) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
2010-06-029SUMMONS Returned Executed BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY served on 4/30/2010, answer due 6/1/2010; MID-ATLANTIC REGION served on 5/3/2010, answer due 6/2/2010. (td, ) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
2010-06-1110NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Adebonojo on behalf of ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
2010-06-1111First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
2010-06-14MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' first 11 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their Answer or other response to the Complaint is due by July 30, 2010. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/13/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
2010-06-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/30/2010. (tb, ) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
2010-07-2912MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
2010-08-06MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 12 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their Answer or other response to the complaint is due by August 27, 2010. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/6/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
2010-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/27/2010. (tb, ) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
2010-08-2413MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
2010-08-25MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 13 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their Answer or other response to the complaint is due by September 10, 2010. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/25/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
2010-09-1014MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
2010-09-13MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 14 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their answer or other response to plaintiff's amended complaint is due by September 24, 2010. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/10/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
2010-09-2415MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
2010-09-2416MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
2010-09-2717Order advising plaintiff to respond by 10/27/2010 to defendants' motion to reconsider the April 27, 2010 Order granting plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, or the Court may deem motion conceded. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/27/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
2010-09-27MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 16 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their Answer or other response to the Complaint is due 21 days after the disposition of Defendants' Motion to Reconsider the Court's April 27, 2010 Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/27/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
2010-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 10/27/2010 (tr) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
2010-10-2718RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 17 Fox/Neal Order, re 15 MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW. (dr) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
2010-11-1819MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
2010-11-19MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 19 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their reply is due not later than November 24, 2010. No further extensions of time will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/19/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
2010-11-1920NOTICE of Change of Address by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (rdj) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
2010-11-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 11/24/2010. (tb, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
2010-11-2421REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, filed by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
2010-12-0622MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/6/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
2010-12-0623ORDER granting 15 defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, vacating the Order [Dkt. #5] which had granted plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, and directing plaintiff to pay the $350 filing fee within 45 days of this Order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/6/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
2011-01-2726MOTION to Rule Filing Fee Filed Pursuant to Mailbox Rule by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (dr) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
2011-01-2824VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 2/23/2011.....MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/28/11. (ms, ) Modified on 2/24/2011 (dr). (Entered: 01/28/2011)
2011-01-2825VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 2/23/2011.....ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's 4 Motion for Injunction, Class Action Status and Appointment of Counsel, and dismissing this action without prejudice to refiling upon payment in full of the filing fee. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/28/11. (ms, ) Modified on 1/31/2011 to edit duplicate link (dr). Modified on 2/24/2011 (dr). (Entered: 01/28/2011)
2011-02-01Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 4616036163 (dr) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
2011-02-2327ORDER denying 26 as moot plaintiff's Motion to Rule Filing Fee Filed Pursuant to Mailbox Rule, vacating the January 28, 2011 Memorandum Opinion and Dismissal Order, reopening this action, and directing defendants to file their Answer or other response to the complaint by April 15, 2011. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/23/11. (ms, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
2011-02-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/15/2011. (tb, ) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
2011-03-0728MOTION to Proceed with Litigation by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (dr) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
2011-03-09MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Proceed with Litigation is DENIED as moot. The Court already has vacated the January 28, 2011 Memorandum Opinion and Dismissal Order, and this case has been reopened. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/9/11. (ms, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
2011-04-0729MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
2011-04-1430MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
2011-04-15MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 29 30 Motions for Extension of Time are granted, and the Answer or other response to the Complaint is due by April 22, 2011. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/15/11. (ms, ) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
2011-04-2231MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
2011-04-2532Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded re 31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/30/2011. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/25/11. (DJMAC, ) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
2011-05-1933MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (dr) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
2011-05-20MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and his response to defendants' motion to dismiss or for summary judgment is due by 6/29/2011. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/20/11. (ms, ) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
2011-05-2734MOTION for Summary Judgment by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (dr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2011: # 1 Exhibit 1-22) (dr) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
2011-05-2735RESPONSE re 31 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW. (See Docket Entry 34 to view Document). (dr) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
2011-05-2736MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (dr) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
2011-05-2737MOTION to Stay until all Freedom of Information Act Requests are Fulfilled by Bureau of Prisons by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (dr) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
2011-06-0938First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions to Stay, Amend, and for Summary Judgment and a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
2011-06-10MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 38 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and defendants shall file their opposition to plaintiff's motions for summary judgment, to amend the complaint, and to stay proceedings, not later than July 6, 2011. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/10/11. (ms, ) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
2011-07-0639Memorandum in opposition to re 37 MOTION to Stay, 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint,, 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
2011-07-0640REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION. (See Docket Entry 39 to view document). (dr) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
2011-07-2541SUPPLEMENT to re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(dr) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
2011-07-2542MOTION to Change Venue by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (dr) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
2011-07-2543MEMORANDUM to re 4 MOTION for Injunction, Class Action Status MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW. (dr) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
2012-03-1944MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/19/12. (ms, ) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
2012-03-1945ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 31 Motion to Dismiss 31 or for Summary Judgment; denying plaintiff's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment, 36 Motion to Amend the complaint, 37 Motion to Stay, and 42 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/19/12. (ms, ) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
2012-04-0246MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Change Venue, 44 Memorandum & Opinion by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (dr) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
2012-04-1947First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
2012-04-20MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 47 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their renewed motion for summary judgment is due by May 15, 2012. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/20/12. (ms, ) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
2012-04-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 5/15/2012. (tb, ) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
2012-05-1448MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
2012-05-15MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 48 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their renewed motion for summary judgment is due by May 31, 2012. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/15/12. (ms, ) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
2012-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Summary Judgment motions due by 5/31/2012. (tb, ) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
2012-05-3049MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
2012-05-31MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 49 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their renewed motion for summary judgment is due by June 11, 2012. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/30/12. (ms, ) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
2012-06-1150MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit A)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
2012-06-1351Order advising plaintiff to respond due by 7/12/2012 to defendants' 50 renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/12/12. (ms, ) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
2012-06-2552RESPONSE re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW. (dr) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
2012-06-2553MOTION for Summary Judgment by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW. (See Docket Entry 52 to view document) (dr) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
2012-07-0554First MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Renew Motion for Summary Judgment by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
2012-07-12MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 54 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and the Reply is due by August 17, 2012. No further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/11/12. (ms, ) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
2012-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 8/17/2012. (tb, ) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
2012-08-1755MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
2012-08-21MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Aug. 21, 2012, to file a Reply is granted. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/21/12. (ms, ) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
2012-08-2156REPLY to opposition to motion re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALL FORMER TRUST FUND MANAGERS, ALL PAST BOP DIRECTORS, ATWOOD, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BUTNER LOW FEDERAL FACILITY, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MID-ATLANTIC REGION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
2012-09-0457MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/31/12. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
2012-09-0458ORDER denying 46 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; ; denying 53 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 50 defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/31/12. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
2012-09-1159SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW. "Leave to File Granted," Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/11/2012. (dr) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
2012-11-0860NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 58 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 57 Memorandum & Opinion by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW. Fee Status: IFP. Parties have been notified. (dr) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
2012-11-0961Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee was not paid because it was filed In Forma Pauperis re 60 Notice of Appeal. (dr) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
2012-11-14USCA Case Number 12-5361 for 60 Notice of Appeal filed by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW. (dr) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
2013-01-0463MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW. (kb, ) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
2013-01-0962ORDER of USCA as to 60 Notice of Appeal filed by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW ; USCA Case Number 12-5361. ORDERED that the motion to appeal in forma pauperis be referred to the district court for resolution in the first instance. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case be held in abeyance pending further order of the court. (kb) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
2013-01-10MINUTE ORDER: Because DeBrew is not eligible to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), see DeBrew v. Atwood, No. 10-0650, 2010 WL 5055821, at *2 (D.D.C. Dec. 6, 2010), the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal 63 is denied. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/10/13. (ms, ) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
2013-01-1164Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 60 Notice of Appeal ;USCA Case Number 12-5361. (dr) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
2013-05-17USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 4616056495 re 60 Notice of Appeal filed by DARRELL JAMES DEBREW (rdj) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
2013-05-1765Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 60 Notice of Appeal ; (rdj) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff