Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSHAPIRO et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2013cv01139
Date Filed2013-07-26
Date Closed2014-06-13
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2013-07-261COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3415106) filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO, JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons USDOJ)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
2013-07-26Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (md, ) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
2013-07-292ELECTRONIC SUMMONS Issued (2) as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Notice of Consent, # 3 Consent Form)(md, ) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
2013-07-313(WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY NO. 12 ). . . . .MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Shapiro FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Postal Service confirmation, # 3 Exhibit 3 - FBI Acknowledgment letter, # 4 Exhibit 4 - News articles, # 5 Exhibit 5 - News article, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Website statistics, # 7 Declaration Ryan Noah Shapiro, # 8 Statement of Facts, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/10/2013 (td, ). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-07-314RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/31/2013. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/30/2013. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-07-315RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/31/2013. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-08-126NOTICE of Appearance by Javier M. Guzman on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
2013-08-137MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
2013-08-148Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
2013-08-149REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
2013-08-20MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court having considered the Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, as well as the briefs submitted in connection with that motion, and the Court finding good cause to grant the defendant's requested relief, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint and motion for partial summary judgment on or before September 9, 2013. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8-20-2013. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
2013-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or respond to complaint by 9/9/2013, (mpt, ) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
2013-09-0910ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
2013-09-0911RESPONSE re 3 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Argall Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
2013-09-1012NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO re 3 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
2013-11-26MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before December 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/26/2013. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
2013-12-2113MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/21/2013)
2014-01-06MINUTE ORDER Imposing Briefing Schedule. In light of the parties' Joint Proposed Schedule it is ORDERED that the following briefing schedule shall apply: (1) the defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment and Vaughn index on or before February 24, 2014; (2) the plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before March 24, 2014; (3) the defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before April 7, 2014; (4) and the plaintiff's reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before April 21, 2014. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference at a time to be determined by the Clerk. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/6/2014. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
2014-01-07Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Vaughn Index and Summary Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2014, Cross Motions due and Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion due by 3/24/2014, Reply to Summary Judgment Motion and Opposition to Cross Motion due by 4/7/2014. Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/21/2014. Status Conference set for 7/31/2014 09:15 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mpt) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
2014-02-2114Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
2014-02-21MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time of Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. For good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time of Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the schedule is modified as follows: (1) the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before March 10, 2014; (2) the plaintiff shall file their opposition to the defendant's motion and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 7, 2014; (3) the defendant shall file a reply in support of its motion and an opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion on or before April 12, 2014; (4) the plaintiff shall file a reply in support of their cross-motion on or before May 5, 2014. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/21/2014. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
2014-02-25Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Summary Judgment motions due by 3/10/2014. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motions due by 4/7/2014. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Cross Motions due by 4/12/2014. Reply to Cross Motions due by 5/5/2014. (mpt) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
2014-03-1015MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Hardy Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - F, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
2014-04-0716Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
2014-04-08MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Upon consideration of the plaintiffs' Consent Motion for an Extension of Time, in light of the parties' consent, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and the plaintiffs shall file their response to the defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before April 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/8/2014. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
2014-04-0817Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
2014-04-1818Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
2014-04-22MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply nunc pro tunc. For good cause shown and in light of the parties consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Rely in Support of Summary Judgment is GRANTED. It is furhter ORDERED that the Defendant's Reply in Support of Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before May 5, 2014. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/22/2014. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
2014-04-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply in Support of Summary Judgment due by 5/5/2014. (tg, ) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
2014-05-0519REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
2014-05-0720NOTICE of Filing Army Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 19 Reply to opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
2014-05-0721Consent MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
2014-05-08MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File. Upon consideration of the Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Leave to File Surreply, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and the plaintiffs may file a surreply to the defendant's motion for summary judgment limited to addressing the issues raised in the Second Hardy Declaration and/or the Kamroski-Poppen Declaration. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/8/2014. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
2014-06-0522Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment Surreply by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
2014-06-0523ERRATA correcting proposed order by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment Surreply filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Corrected)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
2014-06-05MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. In accordance with the proposed Order submitted within 23 , in light of the parties' consent, and for good cause shows, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs' Consent Motion for an Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED and the plaintiffs shall filed their surreply on or before June 12, 2014. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/5/2014. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
2014-06-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Surreply due by 6/12/2014. (mpt, ) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
2014-06-1224Consent MOTION to Stay by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
2014-06-13MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Consent Motion to Stay. For good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the parties Consent Motion to Stay is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this case is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file joint status reports every 30 days, apprising the Court of the status of this case and whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/13/2014. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff