Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2013cv01363
Date Filed2013-09-10
Date Closed2014-03-19
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch requested any records concerning the working agreement between the State Department and Huma Abedin. After the agency failed to respond, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2013-09-101COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3461240) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Atty General, # 4 Summons State Dep't)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
2013-09-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
2013-09-10Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md, ) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
2013-09-103ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED (3) as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Summons 3rd, # 3 Notice of Consent, # 4 Consent Form)(md, ) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
2013-09-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/16/2013. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
2013-10-085NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Wechsler on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
2013-10-086Consent MOTION to Stay Date to Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
2013-10-09MINUTE ORDER granting 6 consent motion to stay date to respond to complaint in light of the government shutdown. The government shall notify the Court as soon as Congress has appropriated funds for the Department of State, shall request that the stay be lifted, and shall set forth a proposed new date for the defendant to respond to the complaint commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 9, 2013. (lcegs1) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
2013-10-10Case Stayed (mac) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
2013-10-187STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
2013-10-22MINUTE ORDER. In light of the end of the government shutdown, this case is no longer stayed. Defendant shall file its response to the complaint by no later than November 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 22, 2013. (lcegs4) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
2013-10-298NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bekesha on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
2013-10-309ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
2013-12-0310ORDER FOR MEET AND CONFER REPORT. Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 12/30/2013. Meet & Confer Statement due by 1/13/2014. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/03/13. (mac) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
2013-12-2711MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
2013-12-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Meet and Confer Statement, the parties are directed to comply with the following briefing schedule: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than March 21, 2014. Plaintiff's opposition shall be filed by no later than April 21, 2014. If Plaintiff chooses to file a cross-motion, it shall be combined with the opposition and filed on the same date. Defendant's reply, and if applicable, combined opposition shall be filed by no later than May 21, 2014. Plaintiff's reply, if applicable, shall be filed by no later than June 4, 2014. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 27, 2013. (lcegs1) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
2013-12-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment motion due by 3/21/2014. Plaintiff's Opposition to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment or cross motion due by 4/21/2014. Defendant's Reply or combined opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/21/2014. Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/4/2014. (mac) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
2014-03-1412STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar