Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOGLESBY, et al v. ARMY, et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:1987cv03349
Date Filed1987-12-11
Date Closed2013-09-26
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffCARL OGLESBY
TERMINATED: 01/05/2012
PlaintiffARON DIBACCO
PlaintiffBARBARA WEBSTER
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES
AppealD.C. Circuit 13-5353
AppealD.C. Circuit 14-5026
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [257]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly has concluded Carl Oglesby's 1987 FOIA suit for records concerning the government's post-World War II connection with German General Reinhard Gehlen, whose Nazi spy ring was allegedly allowed to continue after the War, by ruling that the CIA and the Army conducted adequate searches. Oglesby had since died, but the court allowed his domestic partner and daughter to replace him as plaintiffs. In its second decision in the case, Oglesby v. Department of Army, 79 F.3d 1172 (D.C. Cir. 1996), the D.C. Circuit found that the Army and the CIA had not shown that they conducted an adequate search. On remand, the agencies renewed their motion for summary judgment in 1997. But before any further court consideration, President Bill Clinton signed the Nazi War Crimes Disclosure Act in 1998 requiring the declassification and disclosure of records on Nazi war crimes. Although the Gehlen was not considered a Nazi war criminal, the CIA pledged to acknowledge its intelligence relationship with him. As a result, a 2,100 page Army file was disclosed, as was an additional 2,100 pages from CIA files concerning Gehlen. Subsequently, the CIA declassified its relationship with the Gehlen Organization, resulting in a need to reprocess its records. The court received a status report in 2001, but neither party provided any further court documentation until a December 2011 motion to replace Oglesby as the plaintiff. Oglesby attacked the adequacy of the CIA's search by noting that the agency had indicated in 2000 that it expected to find responsive records outside the scope of the Nazi War Crimes Disclosure Act. But Kollar-Kotelly explained that "this statement was based on CIA's initial, narrow interpretation of its obligations under the NWCDA insofar as the CIA believed it would not be required to produce documents relating to General Gehlen under the NWCDA because General Gehlen is not considered a war criminal. In 2005, the CIA elected to review and declassify information regarding all Nazis (not just war criminals), including operational files concerning those Nazis." Oglesby argued the CIA had failed to release any records pertaining to a meeting with General Gehlen at Fort Hunt. Oglesby offered two recent articles indicating Fort Hunt had been used as a detention center for German scientists. But Kollar-Kotelly observed that "neither article supports the contention that documents regarding the specific meeting identified in Mr. Oglesby's request exist, and fall far short of creating a genuine issue of fact with respect to the adequacy of the CIA's search for documents." To comply with the NWCDA, the Army transferred classified intelligence and counterintelligence records from the Intelligence and Security Command Investigative Records Repository to the National Archives for processing. Oglesby asserted that the Army's records transfer to NARA was suspicious. But Kollar-Kotelly pointed out that "here, the Army's transfer of documents is anything but suspicious. The NWCDA specifically ordered that agencies make relevant documents available to the public at the National Archives and Records Administration. The Army did not transfer only those documents potentially responsive to Oglesby's request, rather it transferred all combat and operational files related to World War II." She added that "the fact that the Army produced over 1,420 pages of information to Oglesby prior to 1997 and did not transfer the IRR files to NARA until nearly sixteen years after the receipt of Oglesby's request undermines any suggestion that the transfer was motivated by a desire to avoid complying with the Army's statutory obligations under the FOIA."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Proper Party, Adequacy - Search
Opinion/Order [348]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly has finally resolved 30-year-old FOIA litigation brought by Carl Oglesby for records concerning General Reinhard Gehlen, who ran a Nazi spy ring during World War II and was allowed by the Allies to continue his network in West Germany for ten years after the war, wrapping up the final items identified by the D.C. Circuit in its most recent remand concerning the processing of Army records held by the National Archives. Oglesby filed suit against the Department of the Army and various other agencies in 1987. Although the district court ruled against him, the 1998 signing of the Nazi War Crimes Disclosure Act breathed new life into his request, forcing agencies to reprocess the records under the standards of the NWCDA. The case went back and forth to the D.C. Circuit three times. Oglesby himself died in 2011 and his daughter and domestic partner took over the litigation. During its last review of the case, the D.C. Circuit concluded that the government was required to make determinations for 2,863 pages of digitized Army records at the National Archives. At the time of Kollar-Kotelly's ruling, only 10 redacted pages remained in dispute. Aron DiBacco argued that the Army had not conducted an adequate search because it had not explained the disappearance of some records and had only processed the 2,863 pages rather than the 9,000 pages that allegedly existed. The Army told Kollar-Kotelly that it had no idea what had happened to records that had been removed decades ago. She pointed out that "the relevant question remains, as in all FOIA cases, merely whether the Army has conducted an adequate search for responsive records" and added that "if the documents replaced by these 'Replacement Sheets' still exist, and if they are in fact responsive to Oglesby's FOIA requests, the Army presumably would have found them in its searches, which it declared covered all 'locations that might contain responsive records.' This is all FOIA requires of the Army." She observed that the "the files referenced in [the D.C. Circuit's opinion]. . .and the only records at issue here, consisted only of digitized files. Digitized files constituted only a small portion of the overall universe of Army records that were transferred to NARA and the 9,000 records referenced by Plaintiff apparently were not limited to digitized files." Rejecting Oglesby's substantive and procedural challenges to the Exemption 1 redactions, Kollar-Kotelly indicated a provision of the executive order required agencies to justify the need for continued classification for records beyond 25-years to the Information Security Oversight Office. She noted the provision "does not require that this information be given to Plaintiffs or any other individuals who request the exempted documents."
Issues: Adequacy - Search, Exemption 1 - Properly classified
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

1987-12-111COMPLAINT filed, exhibits (37); summons issued (yep) Modified on 04/28/1998 (Entered: 12/14/1987)
1988-02-092STIPULATION filed and fiated by Judge Norma H. Johnson defendants shall answer the complaint on or before 2/22/88 (N) (gld) (Entered: 02/10/1988)
1988-02-243ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson setting status hearing for 10:30 a.m., on 3/18/88 ; directing counsel to comply with certain requirements (N) (gld) (Entered: 02/25/1988)
1988-02-244STIPULATION filed and fiated by Judge Norma H. Johnson defendants shall answer the complaint on or before 2/25/88 (N) (gld) (Entered: 02/25/1988)
1988-02-255ANSWER for defendant NATL. ARCHIVES, defendant NATL. SEC. AGENCY, defendant CIA, defendant DOJ, defendant DOS, defendant ARMY, to the complaint (gld) (Entered: 02/26/1988)
1988-03-18STATUS HEARING before Judge Norma H. Johnson : defendants' dispositive motions filing deadline 4/18/88 , plaintiff's response to motions deadline 5/18/88 , defendants' reply to response to motions due 6/10/88 reporter Gloria Williams (ab) (Entered: 03/23/1988)
1988-04-186STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : defendants' dispositive motion filing deadline extended to 5/17/88 , plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion deadline extended to 6/14/88 , defendants' reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion deadline extended to 6/28/88 (N) (ab) (Entered: 04/19/1988)
1988-05-197STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : defendants' dispositive motion filing deadline extended to 5/31/88 , plaintiff's opposition to dispositive motion deadline extended to 6/28/88 , defendants' reply to plaintiff's opposition to motion deadline extended to 7/12/88 (N) (ab) (Entered: 05/19/1988)
1988-05-258ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant ARMY, defendant DOS, defendant DOJ, defendant CIA, defendant NATL. SEC. AGENCY, defendant NATL. ARCHIVES by Patricia D. Carter, Patricia D. Carter and the withdrawal of Deborah A. Robinson as counsel for defendants CD/N (gld) (Entered: 05/26/1988)
1988-05-279MOTION by defendant ARMY, defendant DOS, defendant DOJ, defendant CIA, defendant NATL. SEC. AGENCY, defendant NATL. ARCHIVES to extend time to 6/24/88 to file dispositive motion (gld) (Entered: 05/31/1988)
1988-06-0710ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion by defendants to extend [9-1] dispositive motions filing deadline to 6/24/88 (N) (ab) (Entered: 06/09/1988)
1988-06-2411MOTION by defendant ARMY, defendant DOS, defendant DOJ, defendant CIA, defendant NATL. SEC. AGENCY, defendant NATL. ARCHIVES to dismiss , for summary judgment ; Affidavit of Robert J. Walsh, Jr.; Declarations of Lee E. Carle, Lee S. Strickland, Frank M. Machak, and Angus B. Llewellyn; Exhibits (gld) (Entered: 06/27/1988)
1988-07-0812MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 8/5/88 to oppose or respond to defendants motion to dismiss or for summary judgment (gld) (Entered: 07/11/1988)
1988-07-1313ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 8/5/88 to oppose or respond to defendants motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [12-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (date of 6/13/88 changed to 7/13/88 to reflect proper file date) (gld) Modified on 10/19/1990 (Entered: 07/14/1988)
1988-08-0514MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY for continuance and for additional vaughn indices ; Declaration of James H. Lesar (gld) (Entered: 08/08/1988)
1988-08-1115MEMORANDUM (supplemental) by defendant in support of motion to dismiss [11-1] by defendant, motion for summary judgment [11-2] by defendant; Declaration of Gary W. Winch (gld) (Entered: 08/12/1988)
1988-08-1216MEMORANDUM by defendant ARMY, defendant DOS, defendant DOJ, defendant CIA, defendant NATL. SEC. AGENCY, defendant NATL. ARCHIVES in opposition to motion for additional vaughn indices [14-2] by CARL OGLESBY (date of 3/12/88 changed to 8/12/88 to reflect proper file date) (gld) Modified on 10/19/1990 (Entered: 08/15/1988)
1988-08-2417MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 9/2/88 to respond to defendants opposition to motion for additional Vaughn Indices (gld) (Entered: 08/24/1988)
1988-09-0218REPLY by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to memorandum in opposition to motion for additional Vaughn Indices [16-1] by defendant (gld) (Entered: 09/07/1988)
1988-09-0219MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY for leave to amend complaint [1-1] (gld) (Entered: 09/07/1988)
1988-09-2020SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in support of opposition to motion for additional Vaughn Indices and in support of motion to dismiss [16-1] by defendant (gld) (Entered: 09/21/1988)
1988-12-1621ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion for leave to amend complaint [1-1] [19-1] by CARL OGLESBY, denying motion for additional vaughn indices [14-2] by CARL OGLESBY, denying motion for continuance [14-1] by CARL OGLESBY ; plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment due by 12/29/88 (N) (ab) (Entered: 12/20/1988)
1988-12-2922MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 1/27/89 to respond to defendants motion to dismiss (gld) (Entered: 01/03/1989)
1989-01-1023ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 1/27/89 to respond to defendants motion to dismiss [22-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motions deadline 1/27/89 (N) (ab) (Entered: 01/12/1989)
1989-01-2724MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 2/3/89 to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, for summary judgement (ajr) (Entered: 01/30/1989)
1989-01-3125ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 2/3/89 to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, for summary judgement [24-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motions deadline response to motion due 2/3/89 (N) (ab) (Entered: 02/02/1989)
1989-02-0326MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 2/7/89 to oppose motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment (gld) (Entered: 02/06/1989)
1989-02-0727ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 2/7/89 to oppose motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment [26-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motion... due by 2/7/89 (N) (ab) (Entered: 02/07/1989)
1989-02-0728MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 2/9/89 to oppose motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment (gld) (Entered: 02/08/1989)
1989-02-0929ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 2/9/89 to oppose motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment [28-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motions deadline response to motion due 2/9/89 ; plaintiff to file no further motions for enlargement of time to oppose the pending motion of defendants (N) (ab) (Entered: 02/10/1989)
1989-02-1030MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY for leave to file motion for partial summary judgment, compel further searches, and for partial reconsideration ; EXHIBIT (MOTION) (gld) (Entered: 02/13/1989)
1989-02-1431ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion for leave to file motion for partial summary judgment, compel further searches, and for partial reconsideration [30-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (ab) (Entered: 02/16/1989)
1989-02-1432MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY for partial summary judgment , to compel further searches , and for partial reconsideration of Court's Order of 12/16/89 ; Attachments (gld) (Entered: 02/21/1989)
1989-02-2433MOTION by defendant NATL. ARCHIVES, defendant NSA, defendant CIA, defendant DOJ, defendant DOS, defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY to extend time to 3/24/89 to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (gld) (Entered: 02/27/1989)
1989-02-2434MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to compel medical records (gld) (Entered: 02/27/1989)
1989-03-0135ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 3/24/89 to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment [33-1] by defendant response to motions deadline response to motion due 3/24/89 (N) (ab) (Entered: 03/03/1989)
1989-03-2536MOTION by defendant to extend time to 3/28/89 to respond to motion for partial summary judgment (gld) (Entered: 03/27/1989)
1989-03-2837MEMORANDUM by defendant NATL. ARCHIVES, defendant NSA, defendant CIA, defendant DOJ, defendant DOS, defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY in opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [32-1] by CARL OGLESBY, motion to compel further searches [32-2] by CARL OGLESBY, motion for partial reconsideration of Court's Order of 12/16/89 [32-3] by CARL OGLESBY and third supplemental memorandum in support of motion to dismiss or, in the alternative for summary judgment; Attachments (gld) (Entered: 04/03/1989)
1989-03-2938ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 3/28/89 to respond to motion for partial summary judgment [36-1] by defendant (N) (gld) (Entered: 04/03/1989)
1989-04-0339MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 4/21/89 to respond to opposition to motion for partial summary judgment (gld) (Entered: 04/05/1989)
1989-04-1040ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 4/21/89 to respond to opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [39-1] by CARL OGLESBY; no further extensions (N) (gld) (Entered: 04/11/1989)
1989-04-2141REPLY by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to memorandum in opposition to motions for partial summary judgment [37-1] by defendant; Exhibit (gld) (Entered: 04/24/1989)
1989-05-2242MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Norma H. Johnson (N) (ab) (Entered: 05/22/1989)
1989-05-2243ORDER and JUDGMENT by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion for summary judgment [11-2] by defendant, denying motion for partial summary judgment [32-1] by CARL OGLESBY, denying motion to compel further searches [32-2] by CARL OGLESBY; entering judgment in favor of defendants (N) (ab) (Entered: 05/22/1989)
1989-07-2044NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY from order [43-1] entered 5/22/89; $100.00 docketing fee and $5.00 filing fee paid. Copies mailed to Patricia D. Carter and James H. Lesar. (gld) (Entered: 07/21/1989)
1989-07-21TRANSMITTED PRELIMINARY RECORD on appeal [44-1] by CARL OGLESBY to U.S. Court of Appeals (gld) (Entered: 07/21/1989)
1989-08-01USCA # 89-5219 assigned for appeal [44-1] by CARL OGLESBY (ela) (Entered: 08/01/1989)
1990-10-19TRANSMITTED RECORD ON appeal [44-1] by CARL OGLESBY to U.S. Court of Appeals USCA# 89-5219 (kk) (Entered: 10/19/1990)
1990-10-19RECEIPT ACKNOWLEDGED for record delivered to USCA; USCA# 89-5219 (kk) (Entered: 11/11/1990)
1991-01-2845CERTIFIED COPY of judgment filed in USCA on 12/4/90 Vacating Judgment of USDC and REMANDING case for further findings with regard to appellee, U.S. Department of State and Vacating and REMANDING with instructions with regard to all other appellees, all in acordance with the Opinion for the Court. OPINION; appeal [44-1] by CARL OGLESBY USCA# 89-5219 (ela) (Entered: 01/28/1991)
1991-01-28Case Reopened (ab) (Entered: 02/01/1991)
1991-02-22RECORD ON APPEAL returned from U.S. Court of Appeals (2) volumes; appeal [44-1] by CARL OGLESBY USCA# 89-5219 (ela) (Entered: 02/22/1991)
1991-08-2046MOTION by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY for leave to file amended complaint, EXHIBIT (1) (lpp) (Entered: 08/21/1991)
1991-12-1847ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion for leave to file amended complaint, [46-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (cjp) (Entered: 12/23/1991)
1991-12-1848AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY adding amending complaint [1-1] (lpp) Modified on 12/30/1991 (Entered: 12/26/1991)
1991-12-2749MOTION filed by defendants to extend time to 1/31/91, to respond to Amended Complaint (lpp) (Entered: 12/30/1991)
1991-12-3150ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 1/31/91, to respond to Amended Complaint [49-1] by defendant answer to amended complaint due 1/31/92 (N) (lpp) (Entered: 01/03/1992)
1992-01-3051MOTION filed by defendant NATL. ARCHIVES, defendant NSA, defendant CIA, defendant DOJ, defendant DOS, defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY to extend time to 2/3/92, to respond to the amended complaint (lpp) (Entered: 02/03/1992)
1992-02-0352ANSWER by defendants to amended complaint (lpp) (Entered: 02/05/1992)
1992-02-03CALENDARED (lpp) (Entered: 02/05/1992)
1992-02-1153ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 2/3/92, to respond to the amended complaint [51-1] by defendant amended complaint due 2/3/92 (N) (lpp) (Entered: 02/18/1992)
1992-02-18SCHEDULING NOTICE: status hearing set for 2:30 2/28/92 (ab) (Entered: 02/18/1992)
1992-02-28STATUS HEARING before Judge Norma H. Johnson : defendants to file motion for summary judgment by 6/1/92 ; plaintiff to file response to motion for summary judgment by 7/1/92 reporter: G. Williams (ab) (Entered: 02/28/1992)
1992-06-0154MOTION filed by defendant NATL. ARCHIVES, defendant NSA, defendant CIA, defendant DOJ, defendant DOS, defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY to extend time to 7/31/92 to respond to the amended complaint; attachment (status report) (jeb) Modified on 06/04/1992 (Entered: 06/04/1992)
1992-06-0455ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 7/31/92 to respond to the amended complaint; attachment (status report) [54-1] by defendant (N) (bjl) (Entered: 06/05/1992)
1992-07-27SCHEDULING NOTICE: status hearing set for 3:00 8/28/92 (ab) (Entered: 07/27/1992)
1992-07-3056MOTION filed by defendant's to extend time to 10/16/92 in which to file dispositive motions (dmb) (Entered: 07/31/1992)
1992-07-3057MOTION filed by defendant to dismiss the State Department, The National Security Agency, and the National Archives from this case or in the alternative for summary judgment ; exhibits (3), attachments (dmb) (Entered: 07/31/1992)
1992-08-0458MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion to dismiss the State Department, The National Security Agency, and the National Archives from this case [57-1] by defendant, motion for summary judgment [57-2] by defendant (dmb) (Entered: 08/06/1992)
1992-08-1059ORDER by Judge Stanley S. Harris : granting motion to extend time to 10/16/92 in which to file dispositive motions [56-1] by defendant; defendant ARMY to file dispositive motion by 8/17/92 ; defendant FBI to file dispositive motion by 9/4/92; defendant CIA to file dispositive motion by 10/16/92 (N) (ab) (Entered: 08/11/1992)
1992-08-1760NOTICE OF FILING by defendants of errata page (dmb) Modified on 03/09/1998 (Entered: 08/18/1992)
1992-08-1761MOTION filed by defendant to dismiss the Department of the Army or , in the alternative for summary judgment ; exhibit (4) (dmb) (Entered: 08/18/1992)
1992-08-28STATUS HEARING before Judge Norma H. Johnson : counsel to present order to Court. Reporter: G. Williams (ab) (Entered: 08/31/1992)
1992-09-0162ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : directing defendant CIA to file a report to the Court with certain information within 30 days (N) (ab) (Entered: 09/01/1992)
1992-09-0463MOTION filed by defendant's to extend time to 9/25/92 in which to file a dispositive motion on behalf on the FBI (dmb) (Entered: 09/09/1992)
1992-09-1164ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 9/25/92 in which to file a dispositive motion on behalf on the FBI [63-1] by defendant dispositive motions due 9/25/92 ; plaintiff to respond to all defendants' motions at the same time, within 30 days after the last one is filed (N) (ab) (Entered: 09/14/1992)
1992-09-2565MOTION filed by defendant to dismiss as to defendant DOJ , , or, in the alternative for summary judgment attachment Exhibits (10) (dcn) Modified on 09/28/1992 (Entered: 09/28/1992)
1992-10-0166STATUS REPORT by defendant CIA in response to the Court's order of 09/01/92; attachment (1) (kmk) (Entered: 10/02/1992)
1993-01-1567MOTION filed by defendant to extend time to 1/29/93 to file a dispositive motion on behalf of CIA (dcn) (Entered: 01/19/1993)
1993-01-2268ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 1/29/93 for defendant CIA to file dispositive motion [67-1] by defendant; dispositive motion due 1/29/93 (N) (ab) (Entered: 01/22/1993)
1993-01-2969MOTION filed by defendant to dismiss the CIA , or, in the alternative for summary judgment (dmb) (Entered: 02/01/1993)
1993-02-0270MOTION filed by plaintiff(s) CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 3/11/93, to oppose or otherwise respond to defendants' motions for summary judgment (lpp) (Entered: 02/03/1993)
1993-02-0571ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 3/11/93 to oppose or otherwise respond to defendants' motions for summary judgment [70-1] by CARL OGLESBY; response to dispositive motions due 3/11/93 (N) (ab) (Entered: 02/05/1993)
1993-03-0572MOTION filed by plaintiff(s) CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 3/26/93 within which to oppose or otherwise respond to defendants' motins for summary judgment (dmb) (Entered: 03/11/1993)
1993-03-1073ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 3/26/93 within which to oppose or otherwise respond to defendants' motins for summary judgment [72-1] by CARL OGLESBY; response to dispositive motions due by 3/26/93 (N) (ab) (Entered: 03/12/1993)
1993-03-2474MOTION filed by plaintiff(s) CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 4/16/93 within which to oppose or otherwise respond to defendants' motions for summary judgment (dmb) (Entered: 03/25/1993)
1993-03-2675ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 4/16/93 within which to oppose or otherwise respond to defendants' motions for summary judgment [74-1] by CARL OGLESBY; response to dispositive motions due by 4/16/93 (N) (ab) (Entered: 03/26/1993)
1993-04-1576MOTION filed by plaintiff(s) CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 4/26/93, to oppose or otherwise respond to defendants' motions for summary judgment (lpp) (Entered: 04/16/1993)
1993-04-2177ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 4/26/93 to oppose or otherwise respond to defendants' motions for summary judgment [76-1] by CARL OGLESBY; response to dispositive motions due by 4/26/93 (N) (ab) (Entered: 04/21/1993)
1993-04-2378MOTION filed by plaintiff(s) CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 5/3/93 within which to oppose , or otherwise respond to defenants' motion for summary judgment (dmb) (Entered: 04/26/1993)
1993-04-2979ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 5/3/93 within which to oppose dispositive motions [78-1] by CARL OGLESBY; response to dispositive motions due by 5/3/93 (N) (ab) (Entered: 04/30/1993)
1993-05-0480MOTION filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 5/12/93 in which to oppose or otherwise respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment (pob) (Entered: 05/05/1993)
1993-05-0681ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 5/12/93 in which to oppose or otherwise respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment [80-1] by CARL OGLESBY; response to motions for summary judgment due 5/12/93 (N) (ab) (Entered: 05/07/1993)
1993-05-1482MOTION filed by plaintiff(s) CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 5/18/93 to respond to motions for summary judgment (dcn) (Entered: 05/14/1993)
1993-05-1783ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 5/18/93 to respond to motions for summary judgment [82-1] by CARL OGLESBY; response to motion for summary judgment due 5/18/93 (N) (ab) (Entered: 05/17/1993)
1993-05-2684MOTION filed by plaintiff(s) CARL OGLESBY for leave to file response to defendants' motions for summary judgment out of time exhibit (plaintiff's motions for partial summary judgment) (jeb) (Entered: 05/27/1993)
1993-06-0485ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion for leave to file response to defendants' motions for summary judgment out of time [84-1] by CARL OGLESBY; response to motion for summary judgment due 6/4/93 (N) (ab) (Entered: 06/04/1993)
1993-06-0492MOTION filed by plaintiff(s) CARL OGLESBY for partial summary judgment (lpp) (Entered: 07/30/1993)
1993-06-2586MOTION filed by defendants to extend time to 7/16/93 to file opposition to motion for partial summary judgment and reply to oppositiion to defendants motion for summary judgment (dcn) (Entered: 06/29/1993)
1993-06-3087ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 7/16/93 for defendants to respond to palintiff's motion for partial summary judgment [86-1] by defendants; response to motion for summary judgment due 7/16/93 (N) (ab) (Entered: 06/30/1993)
1993-07-1688MOTION filed by defendant to extend time to 8/27/93 in which to file two supplemental declarations in support of their opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. (pm) (Entered: 07/19/1993)
1993-07-1689RESPONSE by defendants NSA, NATL. ARCHIVES, DOS, DOJ, CIA, and U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY in opposition to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, further searches, discovery, and supplemental Vaughn Indices; attachment. (bm) (Entered: 07/19/1993)
1993-07-2090ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 8/27/93 in which to file two supplemental declarations in support of their opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. [88-1] by defendants; response to brief due by 8/27/93 (N) (ab) (Entered: 07/20/1993)
1993-07-2191Declaration of John F. Pereira. (bm) (Entered: 07/22/1993)
1993-08-2793SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by defendants' in opposition to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment , further searches, discovery, and supplemental vaughn indices; ; declarations (2) (dmb) Modified on 09/02/1993 (Entered: 09/01/1993)
1993-09-0994MOTION filed by plaintiff(s) CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 9/17/93 within which to respond to defendant's supplemental memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, further searches, discovery, and supplemental vaughn indices (dmb) (Entered: 09/10/1993)
1993-09-1495ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 9/17/93 within which to respond to defendant's supplemental memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, further searches, discovery, and supplemental vaughn indices [94-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (adc) (Entered: 09/14/1993)
1993-09-1796MOTION filed by plaintiff(s) CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 9/20/93 within whick to respond to defendant's supplemental memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, further searches, discovery, and supplemental Vaughn indices (pm) (Entered: 09/20/1993)
1993-09-2098RESPONSE by plaintiff(s) CARL OGLESBY to supplemental memorandum in opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [92-1] by CARL OGLESBY . (adc) (Entered: 09/28/1993)
1993-09-2197ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 9/20/93 within whick to respond to defendant's supplemental memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, further searches, discovery, and supplemental Vaughn indices [96-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (adc) (Entered: 09/22/1993)
1994-03-2299MOTION filed by defendant to stay case until 4/15/94 to permit NSA to conduct another search. (bjl) (Entered: 03/23/1994)
1994-03-23100ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to stay case until 4/15/94 to permit NSA to conduct another search. [99-1] by defendants (N) (adc) (Entered: 03/24/1994)
1994-04-15101STATUS REPORT by defendant NSA; declaration of Robert F. Killen (dmb) (Entered: 04/18/1994)
1994-06-24102NOTICE OF FILING by defendants of supplemental release (adc) (Entered: 06/27/1994)
1994-06-30103SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM of material facts by the National Security Agency (clv) (Entered: 07/01/1994)
1994-11-02104MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Norma H. Johnson (N) (adc) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
1994-11-02105ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : denying motion for partial summary judgment [92-1] by CARL OGLESBY, granting motion to dismiss and/or [69-1] for summary judgment [69-2] by defendants. It is further ordered that judgment be, and hereby is, entered in favor of defendants. (N) (adc) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
1994-12-28106NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY from order [105-1], entered on: 11/3/94, Filing Fees $5.00 and Docketing Fees $100.00 Paid, Copies to: James H. Lesar and Patricia D. Carter. (lpp) (Entered: 12/30/1994)
1995-01-04USCA # 94-5408 assigned for appeal [106-1] by CARL OGLESBY (lpp) (Entered: 01/05/1995)
1996-05-24107CERTIFIED COPY of judgment filed in USCA dated 3/26/96, on appeal [106-1], appeal [44-1] , affirming the judgment of USDC in part. , and remanding for further proceedings in part. USCA # 94-5408 (cjp) (Entered: 05/28/1996)
1996-06-10Case Reopened (adc) (Entered: 06/10/1996)
1996-06-10SCHEDULING NOTICE: status hearing set for 2:15 p.m. on 7/19/96 before Judge Norma H. Johnson . (adc) Modified on 06/10/1996 (Entered: 06/10/1996)
1996-06-27SCHEDULING NOTICE: status hearing rescheduled for 2:00 7/22/96 before Judge Norma H. Johnson . (adc) (Entered: 06/27/1996)
1996-07-22STATUS HEARING held before Judge Norma H. Johnson : defendant's response due 12/2/96. Reporter: Gordon Slodysko (adc) (Entered: 07/23/1996)
1996-07-22108ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant NSA, defendant NATL. ARCHIVES, defendant DOS, defendant DOJ, defendant CIA, defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY by Sherri Lanette Evans (adc) (Entered: 07/25/1996)
1996-12-10109MOTION (CONSENT) filed by defendant NSA, defendant CIA, defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY to modify schedule for filing declarations nunc pro tunc (lkn) (Entered: 12/11/1996)
1996-12-11110ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to modify schedule for filing declarations nunc pro tunc [109-1] by U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY, CIA, NSA (N) (adc) (Entered: 12/13/1996)
1997-01-23111SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL for defendant, substituting Charles Francis Flynn for Sherri Evans Harris. (lkn) (Entered: 01/24/1997)
1997-01-27112NOTICE OF FILING by defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY, of declaration of Lawrence J. Baskir (lkn) (Entered: 01/28/1997)
1997-01-27113NOTICE OF FILING by defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY, of declaration of Russell A. Nichols (lkn) (Entered: 01/28/1997)
1997-02-28114MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by defendant CIA to extend time to 3/4/97 to file its Vaughn declarations (lkn) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
1997-02-28115NOTICE OF FILING by defendant NSA, of declaration of Gary L. Grantham;Attachments. (lkn) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
1997-03-04116ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 3/4/97 to file its Vaughn declarations [114-1] by CIA (N) (adc) (Entered: 03/04/1997)
1997-03-04117NOTICE OF FILING by defendant CIA, of declaration of William H. McNair; Declaration (1). (lkn) (Entered: 03/05/1997)
1997-03-04118NOTICE OF FILING by defendant CIA, of declaration of Lee S. Strickland; Declaration (1), attachment (1). (lkn) (Entered: 03/05/1997)
1997-05-12119ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : that the parties file written status reports indicating the status of this case not later than 5/26/97; these reports shall discuss the steps the parties intend to take to resolve this matter, including whether they intend to file a dispositive motion. (N) (adc) (Entered: 05/13/1997)
1997-05-23120STATUS REPORT by defendants, pursuant to Court Order dated 5/12/97 (mlp) (Entered: 05/27/1997)
1997-05-27121STATUS REPORT by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY (mlp) (Entered: 05/28/1997)
1997-05-28122ORDER by Judge Norma H. Johnson : defendants motion for summary judgment due 9/15/97 (N) (adc) (Entered: 05/30/1997)
1997-09-15123NOTICE OF FILING by defendants the second declaration of William H. McNair. (adc) (Entered: 09/16/1997)
1997-09-15124NOTICE OF FILING by defendants the third declaration of Russell Nichols. (adc) (Entered: 09/16/1997)
1997-09-15125NOTICE OF FILING by defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY the second declaration of Russell A. Nichols (adc) (Entered: 09/16/1997)
1997-09-16126NOTICE OF FILING by defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY the fourth declaration of Russell A. Nichols. (adc) (Entered: 09/17/1997)
1997-09-22127MOTION filed by defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY, defendant CIA, defendant NSA to extend time to 9/25/97 to file motion for summary judgment (dot) (Entered: 09/23/1997)
1997-09-25128ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 9/25/97 to file motion for summary judgment [127-1] by NSA, CIA, U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY (N) (adc) (Entered: 09/26/1997)
1997-09-25129MOTION filed by defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY, defendant CIA, defendant NSA for summary judgment (dot) (Entered: 09/26/1997)
1997-09-29130MOTION (unopposed) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 11/10/97 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment (dot) (Entered: 09/30/1997)
1997-10-07131ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 11/10/97 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment [130-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (adc) (Entered: 10/07/1997)
1997-11-10132MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to and including 12/15/97 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment (lkn) (Entered: 11/12/1997)
1997-11-13135ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to and including 12/15/97 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment [132-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (dam) (Entered: 12/22/1997)
1997-12-11133(UNOPPOSED) MOTION filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 1/15/97 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment (tth) (Entered: 12/12/1997)
1997-12-17134ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 1/15/97 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment [133-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motion for summary judgment due 1/15/98 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 12/18/1997)
1998-01-16136MOTION filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 2/15/98 to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment (tlh) (Entered: 01/20/1998)
1998-01-16137NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James Hiram Lesar representing plaintiff CARL OGLESBY . New address: 918 F Street, N.W., Suite 605, Washington DC 20004 (202) 393-1921. (adc) (Entered: 01/20/1998)
1998-01-23138MOTION filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY for an interim award of attorneys' fees , and suggestion that the motion be referred to a magistrate judge ; attachments (2); declartion (1) (tlh) (Entered: 01/26/1998)
1998-01-23139ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff CARL OGLESBY by Daniel S. Alcorn as co-counsel. (adc) (Entered: 01/28/1998)
1998-01-27140ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 2/15/98 to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment [136-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motion for summary judgment due 2/15/98 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 01/30/1998)
1998-02-03141MOTION filed by defendant to extend time to 3/16/98 to respond to motion for interim award of attorney fees and costs (tlh) (Entered: 02/04/1998)
1998-02-04142ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: granting motion to extend time to 3/16/98 to respond to motion for interim award of attorney fees and costs [141-1] by defendant response to motion(s) due by 3/6/98 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 02/04/1998)
1998-02-13143MOTION (UNOPPSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 2/25/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment (st) (Entered: 02/17/1998)
1998-02-17144ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 2/25/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment [143-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motion for summary judgment due 2/25/98 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 02/19/1998)
1998-02-25145MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 3/16/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment (tlh) Modified on 02/26/1998 (Entered: 02/26/1998)
1998-02-27146ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 3/16/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment [145-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (dam) (Entered: 02/27/1998)
1998-03-06147MOTION filed by defendant NSA, defendant CIA, defendant U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY to extend time to 3/16/98 to respond to plaintiff's motion for interim award of attorney fees and costs (tlh) (Entered: 03/09/1998)
1998-03-10148ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 3/16/98 to respond to plaintiff's motion for interim award of attorney fees and costs [147-1] by U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY, CIA, NSA response to motion(s) due by 3/16/98 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 03/10/1998)
1998-03-16149MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 3/30/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment (tlh) (Entered: 03/18/1998)
1998-03-16150MEMORANDUM by defendant in opposition to motion for an interim award of attorneys' fees [138-1] by CARL OGLESBY (tlh) (Entered: 03/18/1998)
1998-03-19151ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: granting motion to extend time to 3/30/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment [149-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motion for summary judgment due 3/30/98 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 03/19/1998)
1998-03-26152ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : plaintiff's motion for an interim award of attorneys' fees referring REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Magistrate Judge (N) (dam) (Entered: 03/26/1998)
1998-03-26153MOTION (Unopposed) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 4/9/98 to file its reply to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's petition for an interim award of attorney's fees and costs (tlh) Modified on 04/08/1998 (Entered: 03/27/1998)
1998-03-30154ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: granting motion to extend time to 4/9/98 to file its reply to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's petition for an interim award of attorney's fees and costs [153-1] by CARL OGLESBY reply to motion(s) due by 4/9/98; (N) (dam) (Entered: 03/30/1998)
1998-03-30155MOTION filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 4/30/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment (tlh) (Entered: 03/31/1998)
1998-03-31156ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 4/30/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment [155-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motion for summary judgment due 4/30/98 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 03/31/1998)
1998-04-09157MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 4/13/98 to reply to defendants' opposition to plaintiff's motion for interim award of attorney's fees (tlh) (Entered: 04/10/1998)
1998-04-10158ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 4/23/98 to reply to defendants' opposition to plaintiff's motion for interim award of attorney's fees [157-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (dot) (Entered: 04/10/1998)
1998-04-13159MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 4/16/98 to reply to defendats' opposition to motion for interim award of attorney's fees (tlh) (Entered: 04/14/1998)
1998-04-15160REPLY by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY in support of its motion for an interim award of attorneys' fees [138-1] by CARL OGLESBY (tlh) (Entered: 04/16/1998)
1998-04-22161NOTICE OF FILING by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY the original declaration of James H. Lesar (tlh) (Entered: 04/22/1998)
1998-04-24CASE REFERRED to Mag. Judge Deborah A. Robinson (MJ) for report and recommendation (cjp) (Entered: 04/27/1998)
1998-04-28Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson has recused herself from this case and the case now is referred to Magistrate Judge Facciola (ldc) (Entered: 04/28/1998)
1998-04-28CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for report and recommendation (filed 04/24/98) (ldc) Modified on 04/28/1998 (Entered: 04/28/1998)
1998-04-30162MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 5/29/98 to reply to defendant's motion for summary judgment (tlh) (Entered: 05/01/1998)
1998-05-04163ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: granting motion to extend time to 5/29/98 to reply to defendant's motion for summary judgment [162-1] by CARL OGLESBY reply to motion(s) due by 5/29/98 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 05/04/1998)
1998-06-01164MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 6/15/98 to reply to defendants' motion for summary judgment (tlh) (Entered: 06/02/1998)
1998-06-10165ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 6/15/98 to reply to defendants' motion for summary judgment [164-1] by CARL OGLESBY reply to motion for summary judgment due by 6/15/98 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 06/10/1998)
1998-06-15166ENTERED IN ERROR---------------------------------MOTION filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 7/16/98 to reply to defendants' motion for summary judgment (tlh) Modified on 06/29/1998 (Entered: 06/16/1998)
1998-06-15167MOTION filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 7/16/98 within which to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment (adc) (Entered: 06/29/1998)
1998-06-17168ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 7/16/98 within which to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment [167-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (adc) (Entered: 06/29/1998)
1998-07-15169MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 8/8/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment (tlh) (Entered: 07/16/1998)
1998-07-17170ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: granting motion to extend time to 8/8/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment [169-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motion for summary judgment due 8/8/98 ; reply to motion for summary judgment due by 9/8/98 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 07/17/1998)
1998-08-10171MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 8/31/98 to respond to motion for summary judgment (tlh) (Entered: 08/11/1998)
1998-08-12172ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: granting motion to extend time to 8/31/98 to respond to motion for summary judgment [171-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motion for summary judgment due 8/31/98 ; reply to motion for summary judgment due by 9/30/98; (N) (dam) (Entered: 08/12/1998)
1998-08-31173MOTION (CONSENT) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 9/14/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment , and to vacate Court's order of 8/18/98 (tlh) (Entered: 09/01/1998)
1998-09-08174ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 9/14/98 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment [173-1] by CARL OGLESBY response to motion for summary judgment due 9/14/98 ; reply to motion for summary judgment due by 10/14/98 ;, granting motion to vacate Court's order of 8/18/98 [173-2] by CARL OGLESBY It is further ORDERED that no further extensions shall be sought (N) (dam) (Entered: 09/09/1998)
1998-09-08175ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: denying as moot motion to extend time to 4/16/98 to reply to defendats' opposition to motion for interim award of attorney's fees [159-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (dam) (Entered: 09/09/1998)
1998-09-14176CROSS MOTIONS by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY for summary judgment, to compel further searches and for appointment of a special master attachments (tlh) (Entered: 09/15/1998)
1998-10-09177STIPULATION filed and fiated by Judge Thomas F. Hogan; allowing a two week extension for defendants to respond and/or reply to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and memorandum in support thereof. (N) (gew) (Entered: 10/09/1998)
1998-10-14178ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: defendants' motion be, and hereby is, granted; this Court's Order of 9/8/98 be and hereby is, vacated insofar as it provided that no further extensions of time would be granted; the defendants shall have until October 28, 1998 to respond to the cros-motion of rsummary judgment filed by plaintiff; not further extensions shall be sought. (N) (dam) (Entered: 10/14/1998)
1998-10-28179REPLY by defendant to response to motion for summary judgment [129-1] by NSA, CIA, U.S. DEPT. OF ARMY, cross motion for summary judgment, to compel further searches and for appointment of a special master [176-1] by CARL OGLESBY (tlh) (Entered: 10/29/1998)
1998-11-10180MOTION filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 11/13/98 to file his reply to defendants' opposition to his cross-motion for summary judgment. (ks) (Entered: 11/12/1998)
1998-11-12182ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 11/13/98 to file his reply to defendants' opposition to his cross-motion for summary judgment. [180-1] by CARL OGLESBY reply to cross motions due by 11/13/98 ; (N)(dam) Modified on 11/18/1998 (Entered: 11/18/1998)
1998-11-13181MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 11/17/98 to respond to defenddants' motion for summary judgment. (tlh) (Entered: 11/17/1998)
1998-11-16183ORDER by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : granting motion to extend time to 11/17/98 to respond to defenddants' motion for summary judgment. [181-1] by CARL OGLESBY reply to cross motions due by 11/17/98 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 11/18/1998)
1998-11-17184RESPONSE by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY in opposition to cross motion for summary judgment, to compel further searches and for appointment of a special master [176-1] by CARL OGLESBY . (tlh) (Entered: 11/18/1998)
1998-11-17185MOTION filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to vacate Court's order of 11/12/98 , and unopposed motion to extend time to reply to defendants' opposition to plaintiffs cross-motion for summary judgment. (tlh) (Entered: 11/18/1998)
1998-11-19186NOTICE OF FILING by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY of an opinion of Judge James Robertson in civil action 96-2306. (tlh) (Entered: 11/20/1998)
1999-03-24187REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola (pao) (Entered: 03/25/1999)
1999-04-06188MOTION filed by defendant to extend time to 4/26/99 to file objections to Magistrate Judge's 03/24/99 report and recommendation (tb) (Entered: 04/07/1999)
1999-04-07189ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: granting motion to extend time to 4/26/99 to file objections to Magistrate Judge's 03/24/99 report and recommendation [188-1] by CIA, DOJ, DOS, NATL. ARCHIVES, NSA (N) (dam) (Entered: 04/07/1999)
1999-04-26190MOTION filed by defendant to extend time to 4/28/99 to file objection to the Magistrate Judge's 03/24/99 report and recommendation (tb) (Entered: 04/27/1999)
1999-04-28191ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 4/28/99 to file objection to the Magistrate Judge's 03/24/99 report and recommendation [190-1] by defendants; that no further extensions shall be sought. (N) (dot) (Entered: 04/28/1999)
1999-04-29192MOTION filed by defendant to stay this Court's review of plaintiff's motion for an interim award of attorneys' fees (lkn) (Entered: 04/30/1999)
1999-04-29193OBJECTIONS by defendant to report & recommendation [187-1] (lkn) (Entered: 04/30/1999)
1999-05-13194MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to extend time to 5/20/99 to respond to defendant's motion to stay court's review of plaintiff's motion for interim award of attorneys' fees and defendant's objection to Magistrate Judge Report (tb) (Entered: 05/14/1999)
1999-05-18195ORDER by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : granting motion to extend time to 5/20/99 to respond to defendant's motion to stay court's review of plaintiff's motion for interim award of attorneys' fees and defendant's objection to Magistrate Judge Report [194-1] by CARL OGLESBY; no further extensions shall be sought. (N) (dot) (Entered: 05/18/1999)
1999-05-21196RESPONSE by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY in opposition to motion to stay this Court's review of plaintiff's motion for an interim award of attorneys' fees [192-1] by defendants; exhibits (4) (jf) (Entered: 05/23/1999)
1999-05-21197RESPONSE by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to report & recommendation [187-1] dated 03/24/99 (jf) (Entered: 05/23/1999)
1999-06-03198MOTION filed by defendant to extend time to 6/7/99 to file reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to stay and reply to plaintiff's oppositoin to defendants' objections to the magistrate judge's report and recommendation (lkn) (Entered: 06/04/1999)
1999-06-04199ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 6/7/99 to file reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to stay and reply to plaintiff's oppositoin to defendants' objections to the magistrate judge's report and recommendation [198-1] by defendants; no further extension shall be sought. (N) (dot) (Entered: 06/04/1999)
1999-06-07200MOTION filed by defendant to extend time to 6/8/99 to file reply to motion to stay and reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's objections to the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation (tb) (Entered: 06/08/1999)
1999-06-08201ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : granting motion to extend time to 6/8/99 to file reply to motion to stay and reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's objections to the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation [200-1] by defendants. (N) (dot) (Entered: 06/09/1999)
1999-06-08202REPLY by defendants to motion to stay this Court's review of plaintiff's motion for an interim award of attorneys' fees [192-1] by defendants (tb) Modified on 06/09/1999 (Entered: 06/09/1999)
1999-06-08203REPLY by defendants to response to objection [197-1] by CARL OGLESBY . (tb) (Entered: 06/09/1999)
1999-06-28204NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James Hiram Lesar representing plaintiff CARL OGLESBY . New address: 1003 K Street, NW, Suite 204, Washington, DC 20001 (202) 393-1921. (tb) (Entered: 06/29/1999)
1999-08-06CASE referral ended as of 3/24/99 for Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola (pao) (Entered: 08/06/1999)
1999-08-24205NOTICE OF FILING by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY of decision of United States Court of Appeals; Attachments. (lkn) (Entered: 08/25/1999)
2000-08-17206MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson : denying motion for an interim award of attorneys' fees [138-1] by CARL OGLESBY (N) (dam) (Entered: 08/17/2000)
2000-09-20207NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION of William H. McNair by defendants; attachment (tb) (Entered: 09/21/2000)
2000-10-04208ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: that parties file written reports indicating the status of the case not later than 10/30/00. Responses, if any, shall be due no later than 11/9/00. These reports shall discuss the steps parties believe are required to resolve this case. (N) (dam) (Entered: 10/05/2000)
2000-10-30209STATUS REPORT by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY (jf) (Entered: 10/31/2000)
2000-10-30210MOTION filed by defendant to extend time for a two-day extension to file status report (cdw) (Entered: 10/31/2000)
2000-10-31211STATUS REPORT by defendants (tb) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
2000-11-07212RESPONSE by defendant to status report [209-1] by CARL OGLESBY (tb) (Entered: 11/09/2000)
2000-11-09213REPLY by plaintiff CARL OGLESBY to response to status report [211-1] by defendants . (ks) (Entered: 11/13/2000)
2000-11-17214ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: that the government file a written report indicating the status of this case no later than 12/11/00. Plaintiff's shall file a response, if any, no later than 12/21/00. All parties shall appear in Courtroom 4 for a status hearing. status hearing set for 3:00 1/11/01 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 11/17/2000)
2000-12-11215STATUS REPORT by defendant (tb) (Entered: 12/13/2000)
2001-01-09STATUS HEARING before Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson: Held. Reporter: Gordon Slodysko (dam) (Entered: 01/09/2001)
2001-02-05216STATUS REPORT by defendants (tb) (Entered: 02/08/2001)
2001-04-25217TRANSCRIPT of status hearing filed for date(s) of 1/9/01 Reporter: Gordon Slodysko (cdw) (Entered: 05/01/2001)
2001-12-05218NOTICE by defendants to Court concerning mail service at US Attorney's Office (cdw) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
2002-07-09219NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James Hiram Lesar representing plaintiff CARL OGLESBY . New address: 1003 K Street, NW Suite 640 Washington DC 20001 (202) 393-1921. (cdw) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
2005-07-20220NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel S. Alcorn (Alcorn, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2005)
2006-12-05221NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES Substituting for attorney Lisa Goldfluss (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
2007-03-29222NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Robin Michelle Meriweather on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES Substituting for attorney Marina Utgoff Braswell, Patricia Daniells Carter, Charles Francis Flynn, Sherri Evans Harris, and Deborah Ann Robinson (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
2009-11-16223NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel S Alcorn (Alcorn, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
2011-12-01224MOTION to Substitute Party under Rule 25(1) by CARL OGLESBY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Att. 1--WashPost obit, # 2 Exhibit Att. 2--The Guardian obit, # 3 Exhibit NY Times obit, # 4 Exhibit Stipulation to Substitute Parties, # 5 Exhibit Att. 5--Magistrate's Report, # 6 Errata Att. 6--Memorandum Order (000817), # 7 Exhibit Att. 7--Order (001117, # 8 Exhibit Att. 8--The Secret Treaty of Fort Hunt)(Lesar, James) Modified on 1/3/2012 (gt, ). (Forwarded to Judge Boasberg as the January 2012 Motions Judge.) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
2011-12-02225NOTICE of Erratum by CARL OGLESBY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
2012-01-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Plaintiff's 224 Motion to Substitute Party, which the government has not opposed, and because the case does not appear to have been terminated, the Court ORDERS that the Motion is GRANTED and Aron DiBacco and Barbara Webster may be substituted as Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/5/2012. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
2012-01-09226NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Fred Elmore Haynes on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY Substituting for attorney Robin M. Meriweather (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
2012-03-28227MOTION to Compel Defendants to Submit Report by CARL OGLESBY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
2012-04-16228Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion, R. 227, for a Status Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
2012-04-23229Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 227 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Submit Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haynes, Fred) Forwarded on 4/24/2012 to Judge Kollar-Kotelly as Motions Judge (ds). (Entered: 04/23/2012)
2012-04-25230ORDER granting 229 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 227 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Submit Report . Response due by 5/3/2012. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/25/12. (dot) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
2012-05-03231Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 227 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Submit Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
2012-05-04232RESPONSE re 231 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 227 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Submit Report Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 227 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Submit Report filed by CARL OGLESBY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
2012-05-16233Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 227 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Submit Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
2012-05-16234Memorandum in opposition to re 227 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Submit Report filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Elizabeth Culver, # 2 Exhibit B - Letter of Michele Meeks)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
2012-05-23235Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Opposition to Motion to ?Require Filing of Status Report by CARL OGLESBY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
2012-05-25236REPLY to opposition to motion re 227 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Submit Report on Progess Since Last Status Report filed by CARL OGLESBY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2, # 3 Exhibit Attachment 3)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
2012-05-30237Case randomly reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Judge Norma Holloway Johnson is deceased. (gt, ) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
2012-05-30MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' 227 Motion to Compel a Status Report, Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED. The Court's and the Parties' time and resources will be best served by briefing dispositive motions. Therefore, by no later than June 13, 2012, the parties shall confer and propose a briefing schedule for Defendants' motion(s) for summary judgment. This deadline is firm. In discussing a proposed schedule, the parties should keep in mind that Defendants shall be required to produce a Vaughn Index with their motion(s). Plaintiffs' 235 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/30/12. (lcckk2) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
2012-06-13238NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
2012-06-14239SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. The parties shall adhere to the following schedule: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due by no later than December 14, 2012; Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by no later than February 15, 2013; Defendants' Reply in Support of their motion and Opposition to Plaintiffs' motion due by no later than March 15, 2013; and Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their motion due by no later than April 15, 2013. The Court has endeavored to give the parties the generous schedule that they have requested, therefore NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS SHALL BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/14/12. (lcckk2) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-12-14240MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - The Part of the Final Report on the Army, # 2 Exhibit B - NARA Declaration (Murphy), # 3 Exhibit C - Army Declaration (Dorris), # 4 Exhibit D - The Part of the Final Report on the CIA, # 5 Exhibit E - CIA Declaration (Lutz), # 6 Exhibit F - NSA Declarations, # 7 Exhibit G - NSA Declaration (Grantham), # 8 Exhibit H - NSA Declaration (Janosek))(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
2013-02-15241Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by substituted plaintiffs, Aron DiBacco & Barbara Webster by CARL OGLESBY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit McNair Decl, # 2 Exhibit Defs' Oct 31,2000 status report, # 3 Exhibit Secret treaty of Ft Hunt by Ogelsby, # 4 Exhibit Petula Dvorak article, A Covert Chapter Opens For Fort Hunt Vets, # 5 Exhibit GWU professor Mandel obit, # 6 Declaration Alcorn Decl, # 7 Declaration Newman Decl, # 8 Declaration Olgesby Decl, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
2013-02-15242Memorandum in opposition to re 240 MOTION for Summary Judgment by substituted plaintiffs Aron BiBacco & Barbar Webster filed by CARL OGLESBY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit McNair Decl, # 2 Exhibit Defs' Oct 31,2000 status report, # 3 Exhibit Secret Treaty of Ft Hunt by Olgesby, # 4 Exhibit Petula Dvorak article:A Covert Chapter Opens For Fort Hunt Vets, # 5 Exhibit GWU Prof Mandel obit, # 6 Declaration Alcorn Decl, # 7 Declaration Newman Decl, # 8 Declaration Olgesby Decl, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
2013-02-20243NOTICE of Delivery to Chambers of Three Publications Referred to in the Remainng Defendants' Renewed Summary Judgment Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
2013-02-21244NOTICE if Filing of IWG Final Report by ARON DIBACCO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit IWG Final Report)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
2013-03-11245MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
2013-03-12MINUTE ORDER granting 245 Motion for Brief Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Respond to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Accordingly, Defendants shall have until and including March 22, 2013, to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Respond to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Plaintiff shall have until and including April 22, 2013, to Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motion due by 3/22/2013; Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/22/2013; and Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/22/2013. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 12, 2013. (SM) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
2013-03-12MINUTE ORDER - Addendum to previous Minute Order granting 245 motion for extension of time to respond/reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: There will be NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS granted for requests "based on caseload." Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 12, 2013. (SM ) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
2013-03-22246REPLY to opposition to motion re 240 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Fred E. Haynes, # 2 Exhibit B -- Second Declaration of Bradley S. Dorris, # 3 Exhibit C -- Declaration of Bert K. Haggett, # 4 Exhibit D -- Second Declaration of Martha M. Lutz, # 5 Exhibit E -- Biographical Sketch of General Gehlen)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
2013-03-22247Memorandum in opposition to re 241 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by substituted plaintiffs, Aron DiBacco & Barbara Webster filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
2013-04-22248REPLY to opposition to motion re 241 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by substituted plaintiffs, Aron DiBacco & Barbara Webster filed by ARON DIBACCO, BARBARA WEBSTER. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit 2d Newman Decl., # 2 Exhibit Att. A, # 3 Att. B)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
2013-04-25249MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Ex Parte Declarations by ARON DIBACCO, CARL OGLESBY, BARBARA WEBSTER (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
2013-05-09250Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 249 MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Ex Parte Declarations by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
2013-05-13MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Upon consideration of the Defendants' 250 Emergency Motion for a Brief Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Directing the Army and CIA to Disclose the Ex Parte Declarations Filed in this Case, the Defendants' motion is DENIED AS MOOT. The Plaintiffs filed the motion to compel on April 25, 2013. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(b) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(a) and 6(d), the Defendants have up to and including May 13, 2013 to file their response to the Plaintiffs' motion to compel. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/13/13. (lcckk2) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
2013-05-13251Memorandum in opposition to re 249 MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Ex Parte Declarations filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Supplemental Declarations of Martha M. Lutz)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
2013-05-23252REPLY to opposition to motion re 249 MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Ex Parte Declarations filed by ARON DIBACCO, BARBARA WEBSTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
2013-07-22253NOTICE of Change of Address by James H. Lesar (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
2013-07-29254MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for an Order Compelling the CIA and the Army to Disclose All Ex Parte Declarations Filed in this Case by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for an Order Compelling the CIA and Army to Disclose All Ex Parte Declarations Filed in this Case, # 2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Martha M. Lutz (Exhibit to the Sur-Reply))(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
2013-07-31255RESPONSE re 254 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for an Order Compelling the CIA and the Army to Disclose All Ex Parte Declarations Filed in this Case filed by ARON DIBACCO, CARL OGLESBY, BARBARA WEBSTER. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-09-26256ORDER. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Defendants' 254 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is GRANTED. The Defendants' 240 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the United States Department of the Army, the Central Intelligence Agency, and the National Security Agency, and against the Plaintiffs on all remaining claims. The Plaintiffs' 241 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and 249 Motion to Compel Disclosure of Ex Parte Declarations are DENIED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/26/13. (lcckk2) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
2013-09-26257MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/26/13. (lcckk2) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
2013-09-26258SURREPLY to re 249 MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Ex Parte Declarations filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(znmw, ) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff