Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJay v. US Department of State
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityFt Lauderdale
Case Number0:2014cv60222
Date Filed2014-01-28
Date Closed2014-06-23
JudgeJudge James I. Cohn
PlaintiffKatherine Jay
Case DescriptionKatherine Jay, an attorney and writer concerning international adoptions and child welfare rights, made a request to the Department of State for records concerning international adoption policies. She asked the agency to expedite the processing of her request. Although Jay received expedited treatment for a similar request sent to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, the State Department ultimately denied her request for expedited processing and has still not provided any further response. Jay then filed suit.
Complaint issues: immediate disclosure of all non-exempt records, attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-01-281COMPLAINT against US Department of State. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-6437590, filed by Katherine Jay. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit A Affidavit of Michelle Jackson, # 4 Exhibit B Photos, # 5 Exhibit C Affidavit of Charles Johnson, # 6 Exhibit D Affidavit of John Meske, # 7 Exhibit E FOIA request correspondence)(Williams, Teresa) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
2014-01-282Judge Assignment to Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum (yha) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
2014-01-293Summons Issued as to US Department of State(yha) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
2014-02-044First AMENDED COMPLAINT against US Department of State, filed by Katherine Jay. (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s), # 2 Affidavit Michele Jackson, # 3 Exhibit photos - DRC, # 4 Affidavit Charles Johnson, # 5 Affidavit John Meske, # 6 Exhibit FOIA correspondence)(Williams, Teresa) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
2014-02-055Summons Issued as to US Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (yha) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
2014-02-126Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against US Department of State, filed by Katherine Jay. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Michelle Jackson, # 2 Exhibit photos, # 3 Affidavit Charles Johnson, # 4 Affidavit John Meske, # 5 Exhibit FOIA correspondence)(Williams, Teresa) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
2014-02-267CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katherine Jay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit fedex tracking documentation)(Williams, Teresa) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
2014-02-278ORDER Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference, and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 2/27/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
2014-02-289GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/28/2014. (tjs) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
2014-03-3110First MOTION to Amend/Correct 7 Certificate of Service and Request for Plurias Summons by Katherine Jay. Responses due by 4/17/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s))(Williams, Teresa) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
2014-04-0111ORDER granting 10 Motion for Pluries Summons Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/1/2014. (yha) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
2014-04-0112Summons Issued as to US Department of State (yha) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
2014-05-0213Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 Amended Complaint, 4 Amended Complaint, by US Department of State. Attorney Steven R. Petri added to party US Department of State(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petri, Steven) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
2014-05-0214PAPERLESS ORDER granting 13 Partially Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before May 27, 2014. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 5/2/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
2014-05-2015CLERKS NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to Administrative Order 2014-48. Case reassigned to Judge James I. Cohn for all further proceedings. Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum no longer assigned to case. (mb) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
2014-05-2716Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by US Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petri, Steven) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
2014-05-2817PAPERLESS ORDER granting 16 Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint for Purpose of Continuing Settlement Negotiations. By 6/27/2014, either (1) the parties shall file a notice of settlement, or (2) Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. No further extensions of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 5/28/2014. (sry) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
2014-05-28Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: US Department of State response due 6/27/2014. (sry) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
2014-06-1918Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Voluntary Dismissal and Notice of Settlement by Katherine Jay. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a- settlement agreement, # 2 Exhibit proposed voluntary dismissal)(Williams, Teresa) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
2014-06-2319FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 6/23/2014. (sry) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff