Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleO'BRIEN v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv00119
Date Filed2014-01-30
Date Closed2016-09-20
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffALEXA O'BRIEN
Case DescriptionAlexa O'Brien, an investigative reporter, made a request to the State Department for all records concerning contacts between the New York Times and the State Department pertaining to the Wikileaks documents. O'Brien requested a fee waiver, which the agency granted. The agency provided O'Brien with an estimated date of completion of July 2014. O'Brien then filed suit.
Complaint issues: improper withholding, disclosure of all responsive records, attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-01-301COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3606683) filed by ALEXA O'BRIEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons Dept of State, # 4 Summons USAO)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
2014-01-30Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sth, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
2014-01-302ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
2014-02-053RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/5/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/5/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
2014-02-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/12/2014 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
2014-03-145NOTICE of Appearance by John Kenneth Theis on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Theis, John) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
2014-03-146ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Theis, John) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
2014-03-14MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before March 28, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/14/2014. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
2014-03-14Set Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/28/2014. (tj ) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
2014-03-287STATUS REPORT by Alexa O'Brien and by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Theis, John) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
2014-04-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before May 16, 2014, the defendant will file a status report that will provide an estimated date of completion for the production of any responsive, non-exempt records. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/11/2014. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
2014-04-11Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/16/2014 (tj ) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
2014-05-098Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
2014-05-12MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of the defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file a status report on or before June 27, 2014, that will provide a schedule for the production of responsive, non-exempt records. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/12/2014. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
2014-05-16Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/27/2014 (tj) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
2014-06-10Case reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Rudolph Contreras no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr, ) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
2014-06-279STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
2014-07-2110STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
2014-07-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a jointly proposed briefing schedule by 10/17/2014. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/27/14. (lctsc1) (Entered: 07/27/2014)
2014-07-30Reset Deadlines: jointly proposed briefing schedule due 10/17/2014. (tj ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
2014-10-1611STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (JOINT) by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
2014-10-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, the following deadlines shall apply: Defendant's Final Production due Nov. 25, 2014; Defendant's draft Vaughn index due Nov. 25, 2014; Plaintiff's response to draft Vaughn index due Dec. 12, 2014; The Parties' status report due Dec. 23, 2014. To the extent a summary judgment motion is necessary: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due Jan. 23, 2015; Plaintiff's Opposition to Summary Judgment due Feb. 20, 2015; Defendant's Reply in Support of Summary Judgment due Mar. 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/20/14. (DJS) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
2014-10-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's final production and Vaughn Index due by 11/25/2014.Response to Vaughan Index due by 12/12/2014.Status Report due by 12/23/2014. Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/23/2015. Opposition to Summary Judgment due 2/20/15. Reply in support of Summary Judgment due by 3/20/2015. (zsm) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-12-2312STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
2015-01-2013Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
2015-01-24MINUTE ORDER: Granting 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/6/15. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/24/15. (DJS) (Entered: 01/24/2015)
2015-01-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 2/6/2015. (sm) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
2015-02-0614MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Hackett Declaration (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit 1 - Hackett Declaration (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Table of abbreviations), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
2015-02-2315Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing schedule by ALEXA O'BRIEN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-02-24MINUTE ORDER: Granting 15 Consent Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before March 6, 2015. Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before April 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/24/15. (DJS) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
2015-02-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/6/2015. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/6/2015. (sm) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
2015-03-0616Joint MOTION to Vacate Set/Reset Deadlines for Briefing on Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
2015-03-09MINUTE ORDER: Granting 16 Motion to Vacate Deadlines and Stay Briefing. Briefing on Defendant's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment is stayed and all current deadlines are vacated. The parties must file a joint status report by April 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/9/2015. (lctsc2) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/6/2015. (sm) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-04-0617STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
2015-04-07MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Joint Status Report 17 filed by the parties, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by July 6, 2015 and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/7/15. (DJS) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
2015-04-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/6/2015. (sm) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
2015-05-08MINUTE ORDER: Denying 14 without prejudice Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment in light of the stayed briefing schedule. If renewal of the motion becomes necessary, the Defendant may file a motion to renew, along with a jointly proposed schedule for moving forward with the remaining briefs. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/8/15. (DJS) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
2015-07-0618Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by ALEXA O'BRIEN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
2015-07-08MINUTE ORDER: Granting Joint Motion 18 for Extension of Time to File Joint Status. The parties shall file a DETAILED Joint Status Report not later than 7/13/15. Further, a status conference is hereby set for July 21, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2. Future requests for the extension of any deadline by any party (or the parties jointly) must be made at least 48 hours prior to expiration of the deadline, rather than at the eleventh hour as occurred here. The parties are reminded that " out-of-town business travel" and "pretrial obligations," do not constitute good cause. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/8/15. (DJS) Modified on 7/9/2015 (zsm). (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-08Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/21/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/13/2015. (zsm) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
2015-07-1019STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-21Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Status Conference held on 7/21/2015. Status Report due by 9/21/2015. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (zsm) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
2015-09-0320NOTICE Regarding Motion for Designation of a Coordinating Judge by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D.D.C. Case No. 15-mc-1188, ECF No. 1)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-0321(Opposed) MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) Modified text on 9/4/2015 (td). (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-0422NOTICE of Court Order in Miscellaneous Case No. 15-1188 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order in 15-mc-1188)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-2123Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-10-08MINUTE ORDER denying as moot Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge 21 in light of the Order entered by Chief Judge Roberts on October 8, 2015 in case number 1:15-mc-01188, which denied the U.S. Department of State's motion for designation of a coordinating judge in that case. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/8/15. (lctsc2) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
2015-11-2024Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
2015-11-23MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Status Report filed by the parties 24 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by January 15, 2016, along with a proposed schedule and order for moving forward with this action. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/23/15(DJS) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
2015-11-23ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER. Having reviewed the parties' latest Joint Status Report 24 , the court hereby orders the parties to file another joint status report on January 15, 2016 to advise the court on the remaining matters in dispute in this litigation. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/23/15. (lctsc2) Modified on 11/23/2015 (jf). (Entered: 11/23/2015)
2015-11-23NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document re Minute Order, was entered in error as a duplicate entry.(jf) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
2015-11-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/15/2016. (zsm) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
2016-01-1525Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
2016-01-21MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Status Report filed by the parties 25 , it is hereby ordered that Defendant shall provide to Plaintiff (i) the two responsive documents located among the documents provided to Defendant by Cheryl Mills, Huma Abedin, Jacob Sullivan, and Philippe Reines by no later than January 29, 2016; and (ii) the cover letter and purported State Department cables discussed in Item #1 of the Status Report by no later February 12, 2016. The parties shall provide the court with a further status report and proposed order regarding the status of the searching and/or production of the electronic files and Secretary Clinton emails discussed in Items #2 and #3 by no later than April 19, 2016. If the Secretary Clinton emails are publicly released to Defendant's online reading room prior to April 19, 2016, (i) within four weeks of the completion of such public release, Defendant will produce to Plaintiff any non-exempt records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request contained therein; and (ii) the parties will submit a status report and proposed order within three weeks of any such production. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/21/16. (DJS) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-22Set/Reset Deadline: Status Report due by 4/19/2016 (tth) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
2016-04-1826Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-19MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Status Report filed by the parties 26 it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report AND PROPOSED ORDER not later than May 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/19/16. (DJS) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-04-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/16/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-05-1627Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-17MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Status Report filed by the parties 27 , it is hereby ordered that the parties file a status report by June 20, 2016, along with a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/17/16. (DJS) Modified on 5/17/2016 (zsm). (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/20/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-06-2028Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-06-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' status report 28 , it is HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 19, 2016, along with a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/21/16. (DJS) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
2016-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/19/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
2016-08-1929Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-22MINUTE ORDER: Have considered the Joint Status Report filed by the parties 29 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report, along with a proposed order by September 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/22/16. (DJS) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/19/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-09-1930STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by ALEXA O'BRIEN. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-2031ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Dismissing action with prejudice in light of the joint stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/21/16. (DJS) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff