Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKlein v. U.S. Strategic Command
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2014cv00566
Date Filed2014-02-06
Date Closed2014-02-12
JudgeMagistrate Judge Maria-Elena James
PlaintiffMark Klein
Case DescriptionMark Klein, a free-lance writer and blogger, requested 30-year-old orbital position data for a particular satellite from the U.S. Strategic Command. The agency denied the request under Exemption 1 (national security). Klein appealed the denial and the agency upheld the denial on appeal. Klein then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 1 - Harm to national security

DefendantU.S. Strategic Command
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-02-061COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; (NO PROCESS); against U.S. Strategic Command (Filing fee $ 400.00., Receipt Number 34611093436). Filed byMark Klein. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
2014-02-062Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/6/14. (Attachments: # 1 MEJ Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
2014-02-123NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mark Klein (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff