Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv00197
Date Filed2014-02-11
Date Closed2015-07-31
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJason Leopold, an investigative reporter, made a request to the Defense Intelligence Agency for a report that had been cited by Rep. Mike Rogers indicating that Edward Snowden had allegedly stolen 1.7 million intelligence files. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-02-111COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3619087) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
2014-02-11Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (kb) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
2014-02-112ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(kb) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
2014-02-243RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/24/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/26/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
2014-02-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/24/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
2014-03-265ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
2014-03-26MINUTE ORDER: As the requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure are inapplicable to this FOIA case, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed briefing schedule by April 9, 2014. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 26, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
2014-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: joint proposed briefing schedule due by 4/9/2014. (tth) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
2014-03-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed briefing schedule due by 4/9/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
2014-04-096STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
2014-04-09MINUTE ORDER re 6 Joint Status Report: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that motions practice will not commence at this time; it is further ORDERED that that parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before June 9, 2014, and another Joint Status Report on or before November 28, 2014, or within two weeks after the DIA completes processing plaintiff's FOIA request, whichever is sooner; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant will also advise the Court of the DIA's interim production or productions of documents to plaintiff within one week thereafter. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 9, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
2014-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/9/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
2014-06-06Case reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr, ) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-06Case directly reassigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle, as this case was assigned to Judge Chutkan in error. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-09Case reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr, ) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
2014-06-097STATUS REPORT Joint, Second by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
2014-08-088NOTICE of Second Interim Response to Plaintiff's FOIA Request by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
2014-11-219STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
2014-12-0510STATUS REPORT (Joint) and Proposed Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
2014-12-07MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the status report 10 filed by the parties, the following briefing deadlines shall apply: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Due January 23, 2015; Plaintiff's Combined Opposition and Cross-Motion, if any Due February 27, 2015; Defendant's Combined Reply and Cross-Opposition, if any Due March 27, 2015; Plaintiff's Cross-Reply, if any Due April 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/7/14. (DJS) (Entered: 12/07/2014)
2014-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 1/23/2015. Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/27/2015. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/27/2015. Plaintiff's Cross-Reply due by 4/17/2015. (sm) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2015-01-1611Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
2015-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Granting 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant may file its Motion for Summary Judgment on or before January 30, 2015. Plaintiff may file its Opposition and any combined Cross-Motion on or before March 6, 2015. Defendant may file its Reply and combined Cross-Opposition, if any, on or before April 3, 2015. Plaintiff may file his Cross-Reply, if any, on or before April 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/17/15. (DJS) (Entered: 01/17/2015)
2015-01-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 1/30/2015. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/6/2015. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/3/2015. Cross-Reply due by 4/24/2015. (sm) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
2015-01-2812Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
2015-01-29MINUTE ORDER: Granting 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant may file its Motion for Summary Judgment on or before February 9, 2015; Plaintiff may file his Opposition and any combined Cross-Motion on or before March 16, 2015; Defendant may file its Reply and combined Cross-Opposition, if any, on or before April 13, 2015; and plaintiff may file his Cross-Reply, if any, on or before May 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/29/15. (DJS) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
2015-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 2/9/2015. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and any combined Cross-Motion due by 3/16/2015. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and combined Cross-Opposition due by 4/13/2015. Cross-Reply due by 5/4/2015. (sm) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
2015-02-0913MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Alesia Williams, # 3 Declaration of David Leatherwood, # 4 Statement of Facts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
2015-02-1014ERRATA Vaughn Index to Accompany Declaration of Alesia Williams, omitted in error from prior filing by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
2015-03-1615Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Document V-1, # 4 Exhibit Documents V-8 to V-74, # 5 Exhibit Documents V-75 to V-95, # 6 Exhibit Documents V-96 to V-112)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
2015-03-1616Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Document V-1, # 3 Exhibit Documents V-8 to V-74, # 4 Exhibit Documents V-75 to V-95, # 5 Exhibit Documents V-96 to V-112)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
2015-04-0117Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
2015-04-02MINUTE ORDER: Granting 17 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant may file its summary judgment reply and cross-opposition on or before April 27, 2014; and plaintiff may file his Cross-Reply on or before May 18, 2015. Responses due by 4/27/2015. Replies due by 5/18/2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/2/15. (DJS) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
2015-04-2218Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
2015-04-23MINUTE ORDER: Granting 18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant may file its summary judgmentreply and cross-opposition on or before May 25, 2014. Plaintiff may file his Cross-Reply on or before June 15, 2015. THE COURT WILL VIEW FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS WITH DISFAVOR. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/23/15. (DJS) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-04-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/15/2015. (zsm) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-05-2219REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Alesia Williams, # 2 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of David G. Leatherwood, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
2015-05-2220Memorandum in opposition to re 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Alesia Williams, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Williams Decl. - May 15, 2015 Supplemental Release of Documents to Plaintiff, # 3 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of David G. Leatherwood, # 4 Statement of Facts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
2015-05-2221ERRATA Exhibit 1 to ECF No. 19-1, Supplemental Declaration of Alesia Williams (May 15, 2015 Supplemental Release to Plaintiff), Omitted in Error by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE 19 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
2015-07-3122STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Bressler, Steven) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
2015-07-3123ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In light of the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the parties 22 this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/31/15. (DJS) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff