Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv00327
Date Filed2014-02-27
Date Closed2017-02-23
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold sent a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Jordan Ross Belfort, who was convicted of securities fraud. Belfort is the main character in the current movie, "Wolf of Wall Street," starring Leonardo DiCaprio. Leopold requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing from the FBI, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-02-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3636733) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons USDOJ)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
2014-02-27Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (sth, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
2014-02-282ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
2014-03-113RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/11/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/10/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/11/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
2014-03-274NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell P. Zeff on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Zeff, Mitchell) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
2014-04-105Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeff, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
2014-04-11MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Having considered Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have until June 9, 2014, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 11, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
2014-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/9/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
2014-06-096ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Zeff, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
2014-06-10MINUTE ORDER: As the requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure are inapplicable to this FOIA case, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed briefing schedule by June 24, 2014. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 10, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
2014-06-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/24/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
2014-06-247STATUS REPORT Joint and Proposed Briefing Schedule by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
2014-06-25MINUTE ORDER re 7 Status Report: Upon consideration of the parties' First Status Report and Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' request for a briefing schedule is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the FBI will process all main file references for the investigation of Stratton Oakmont, Inc. at the rate of 1,000 pages per month and release any non-exempt material to Plaintiff on a monthly basis, beginning August 15, 2014, and continuing until all pages have been processed. It is further ORDERED that after all of the non-exempt main file references for the investigation of Stratton Oakmont, Inc. have been processed and released to Plaintiff, the parties shall confer about processing of the remaining material and submit a Second Joint Status Report. It is further ORDERED that the following briefing schedule will govern: Plaintiff will file a Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by August 1, 2014 addressing the issue of whether the FBI may withhold records relating to the living persons Jordan Ross Belfort and Daniel Mark Porush on privacy grounds; Defendant will file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by September 1, 2014; and Plaintiff may file a Reply to Defendant's Opposition by September 15, 2014. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 25, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
2014-07-298NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Cuong Truong on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Mitchell Zeff (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
2014-08-019Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
2014-08-06MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment: On consideration of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary judgment is due by August 8, 2014; Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is due by September 8, 2014; and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment is due by September 22, 2014. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 6, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
2014-08-0810WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO 13 .....MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Excerpts from "Wolf of Wall Street", # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from "Catching the Wolf of Wall Street", # 3 Exhibit C - Letter from Posner, # 4 Exhibit D - Article in The Independent, # 5 Exhibit E - Letter from Yale, # 6 Exhibit F - Indictment, # 7 Exhibit G - FOIA Response from FBI 1, # 8 Exhibit H - FOIA Response from FBI 2, # 9 Statement of Facts, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/15/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 08/09/2014)
2014-09-0511Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Truong, John) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-08MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion For Extension Of Time and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have until October 8, 2014, to file its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 22, 2014, to file his Reply. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 8, 2014. (AG, ) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
2014-09-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/8/2014. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/22/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
2014-09-08Set/Reset Deadlines as to 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial . Responses due by 10/8/2014; Replies due by 10/22/2014. (ztnr, ) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
2014-10-0712Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Truong, John) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
2014-10-08MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion For Extension Of Time and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Consent Motion For Extension Of Time is GRANTED; it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have until October 15, 2014, to file its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and it is FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff shall have until October 29, 2014, to file his Reply. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 8, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
2014-10-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 10/15/2014. Reply due by 10/29/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
2014-10-1413NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by JASON LEOPOLD re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
2014-12-22Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
2015-02-04MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file a Second Status Report on or before February 18, 2015, setting forth (1) the status of production; (2) the expected timetable for completion of production (if not already complete); (3) any outstanding disputes concerning production (if any); and (4) a proposed briefing schedule to resolve any such disputes. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/04/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
2015-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Second Status Report due by 2/18/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
2015-02-1714Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Truong, John) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
2015-02-19MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. It is further ordered that a Joint Status Report is to be filed on or before February 25, 2015. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/19/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
2015-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-02-2515STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed By The Parties by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
2015-02-26MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall meet and confer to set a date and time for a status conference to be held on or before March 12, 2015 in Courtroom 10. The parties shall provide two or more available dates and times to Courtroom Deputy Chashawn White (Chashawn_White@dcd.uscourts.gov), who will set the hearing and notify the parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/26/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
2015-03-04Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/5/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
2015-03-17Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/27/2015 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
2015-03-2616NOTICE of Filing by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Truong, John) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
2015-03-27MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall meet and confer about (1) narrowing the scope of Plaintiff's FOIA request and (2) the prospect of more efficient review and production of FOIA materials, including using search terms to identify disclosable electronic documents. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a status report on or before April 10, 2015, setting forth the outcome of their discussions and the status of production. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/27/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
2015-03-27Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 3/27/2015. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (cdw) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
2015-03-27Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 4/10/2015 (cdw) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
2015-04-1017STATUS REPORT (Joint) by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
2015-04-23MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file a Status Report on or before July 9, 2015. The court directs the FBI, except for good cause, to process the remaining records at a rate of at least 500 pages per month and to make diligent efforts to process the records at a higher rate. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/23/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-04-23Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 7/9/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
2015-07-0918Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
2015-07-09MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Status Report. It is further ordered that the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on or before July 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/09/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
2015-07-09Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/20/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-2019STATUS REPORT (Joint) by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
2015-07-23MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on or before September 21, 2015. In light of the large number of documents still to be processed, the court continues to urge the parties to meet and confer to consider ways to narrow the documents requested and to reduce the time for processing. The next status report should reflect the results of the parties' meet and confer discussions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/23/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
2015-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2015. (zmm) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
2015-09-2120Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-10-20MINUTE ORDER: The court is grateful that the parties' meet-and-confer efforts have reduced the number of potentially responsive documents. The parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before November 2, 2015, updating the court of their progress. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/20/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
2015-10-20Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
2015-11-0221Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
2015-11-03MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before January 4, 2016, updating the court of their progress. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/03/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
2015-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
2016-01-0322Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 01/03/2016)
2016-01-08MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before March 2, 2016, updating the court of their progress. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/08/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-01-08Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
2016-03-0223Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-03MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before May 2, 2016, updating the court of their progress. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/03/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/2/2016. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-05-0224Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-03MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before June 30, 2016, updating the court of their progress. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/03/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
2016-05-03Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-06-3025Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-07-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 25 June 30, 2016, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before August 30, 2016, which updates the court of their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/05/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2016. (mac) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-08-3026Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 26 August 30, 2016, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before October 31, 2016, which updates the court of their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/30/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-30Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-10-3127Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 27 October 31, 2016, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before December 5, 2016, which updates the court of their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/01/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-12-0528Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 28 December 5, 2016, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before February 1, 2017, which updates the court of their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/23/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2016-12-23Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2017-02-0129Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-01MINUTE ORDER: The court appreciates the parties' resolution of the merits of this FOIA matter and their continued efforts to reach agreement on the issue of attorney's fees. The parties have not, however, explained why they require an additional six weeks to attempt to reach agreement on the attorney's fees issue. Accordingly, the court directs the parties to file another Joint Status Report no later than February 22, 2017. Given that this matter has been pending since 2014, the court urges the parties either to settle by that date or propose a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/01/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-2230NOTICE of Settlement and Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Truong, John) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff