Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Small Business League v. Department of Defense
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2014cv02166
Date Filed2014-05-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHon. William Alsup
PlaintiffAmerican Small Business League
Case DescriptionThe American Small Business League submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for the master comprehensive subcontracting plan submitted by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told ASBL that because the request would require the agency to search in various locations it would take a considerable amount of time. ASBL appealed the agency's response, arguing that the document was in a single location and did not require consultation with other components. After hearing nothing further from the agency, ASBL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDepartment of Defense
DefendantSikorsky Aircraft Corporation
AppealNinth Circuit 15-15120
AppealNinth Circuit 15-15121
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [8]
Opinion/Order [10]
Opinion/Order [22]
Opinion/Order [23]
Opinion/Order [28]
Opinion/Order [32]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in California has ruled that the Defense Department failed to provide sufficient justification under Exemption 4 (confidential business information) to withhold a comprehensive subcontracting plan submitted by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation required to be submitted to DOD under a 1990 amendment to the Small Business Act. After the agency failed to respond within the statutory deadline, the American Small Business League filed suit. Judge William Alsup ordered the agency to provide Sikorsky's report for in camera review. Rather than provide an unredacted copy with those portions of the report the agency contended were exempt, DOD provided both an unredacted version and a redacted version, accompanied by an affidavit from Sikorsky explaining why disclosure would cause competitive harm. Finding the agency's filings insufficient, Alsup noted that "having reviewed Sikorsky's lodged Comprehensive Subcontracting Plan and [the company's] accompanying declaration, this order finds that the agency has not provided reasonably specific detail to explain why the redacted portions of the lodged document are exempt under Section 55s(b)(4)." Pointing out that Sikorsky's declaration was couched in terms like would and could, Alsup indicated that "that is not enough to grant summary judgment for the agency." The agency also suggested that handwritten signatures and personally-identifying information about Sikorsky employees in their work capacity were protected by Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Rejecting the claim, Alsup noted that "the work contact information for several Sikorsky employees listed in the Comprehensive Subcontracting Plan is already accessible online."
Issues: Litigation - In camera review, Exemption 4 - Competitive harm
Opinion/Order [48]
Opinion/Order [50]
Opinion/Order [63]
Opinion/Order [79]
Opinion/Order [136]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-05-121COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Department of Defense (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 34611095962). Filed byAmerican Small Business League. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2014: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (farS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
2014-05-122Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
2014-05-123Summons Issued as to Department of Defense, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) (farS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
2014-06-024CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge due June 16, 2014. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
2014-06-235SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge due June 30, 2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014) Modified on 6/23/2014 (ls, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/23/2014)
2014-06-306CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Small Business League.. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
2014-06-307CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. The Case Management Conference set for August 14, 2014 is VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
2014-07-018ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/1/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
2014-07-149CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
2014-07-1410SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
2014-08-0811CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Defense.. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 8/8/2014) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
2014-08-1212STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Department of Defense. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 8/12/2014) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
2014-08-1213ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [denying 12 Stipulation].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
2014-08-1414CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Defense. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 8/14/2014) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
2014-08-1415CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 11/6/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment due by 10/2/2014. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/14/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
2014-08-1416Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/14/2014 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 8/14/2014). Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by 10/2/14. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/14/2014) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
2014-08-1817ANSWER to Complaint by Department of Defense. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 8/18/2014) Modified on 8/19/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/18/2014)
2014-10-0318MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Small Business League. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/24/2014. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 10/3/2014) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
2014-10-0319Declaration of Robert Belshaw in Support re 18 Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 10/3/2014) Modified on 10/3/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/03/2014)
2014-10-03Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked.Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 19 Declaration in Support filed by American Small Business League (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
2014-10-1720CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment; Opposition re 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. filed by Department of Defense. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/31/2014. Replies due by 11/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Amy Johnson)(Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 10/17/2014) Modified on 10/17/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/17/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/17/2014)
2014-10-2421REPLY (re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment), OPPOSITION (re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment) filed by American Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 10/24/2014) Modified on 10/24/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/24/2014)
2014-11-0422NOTICE RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/4/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014). (Entered: 11/04/2014)
2014-11-0623ORDER RE REQUESTED DOCUMENT AND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/6/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014). (Entered: 11/06/2014)
2014-11-0624Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2014 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/6/2014) re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Small Business League, 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Department of Defense. (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2014) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
2014-11-2025Supplemental Brief Re FOIA Exemption filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 11/20/2014) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
2014-11-2026Supplemental Brief Corrected filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 11/20/2014) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
2014-11-2027Declaration of Amy Johnson in Support of 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byDepartment of Defense. (Related document(s) 20 ) (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 11/20/2014) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
2014-11-2328ORDER DENYING 18 , 20 CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2014). (Entered: 11/23/2014)
2014-12-0229TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Department of Defense for Court Reporter Margo Gurule. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 12/2/2014) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
2014-12-0230TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Department of Defense for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 12/2/2014) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
2014-12-0231MOTION to Stay re 28 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, and Declaration of Counsel filed by Department of Defense. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/16/2014. Replies due by 12/23/2014. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 12/2/2014) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
2014-12-0332ORDER RE 31 MOTION TO STAY PENDING APPEAL DETERMINATION BY SOLICITOR GENERAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
2014-12-0833Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/6/14, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 30 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2015. (Related documents(s) 30 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 12/8/2014) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-1034Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/14/2014, before Judge WILLIAM H. ALSUP. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number (415)504-4204 or email: margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 29 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2015. (Related documents(s) 29 ) (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
2014-12-1135NOTICE of Appearance by Rex S Heinke for Proposed Defendant-Intervenor Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 12/11/2014) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2014-12-1136MOTION to Intervene filed by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/26/2014. Replies due by 1/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration Amy Johnson)(Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 12/11/2014) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2014-12-1137Proposed Order re 36 MOTION to Intervene by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation. (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 12/11/2014) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2014-12-1138NOTICE by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation Corporate Disclosure Statement (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 12/11/2014) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2014-12-1139NOTICE of Appearance by Rex S Heinke Notice of Appearance of Michael Small for Proposed Defendant-Intervenor Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 12/11/2014) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2014-12-1140Certificate of Interested Entities by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 12/11/2014) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2014-12-1141CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation re 36 MOTION to Intervene , 38 Notice (Other), 35 Notice of Appearance, 39 Notice of Appearance, 40 Certificate of Interested Entities, 37 Proposed Order (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 12/11/2014) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2014-12-1542TRANSCRIPT ORDER by American Small Business League for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 12/15/2014) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
2014-12-2643RESPONSE (re 36 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 12/26/2014) (Entered: 12/26/2014)
2014-12-2944Statement of Non-Opposition re 36 MOTION to Intervene filed byDepartment of Defense. (Related document(s) 36 ) (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 12/29/2014) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2015-01-0245REPLY (re 36 MOTION to Intervene ) filed bySikorsky Aircraft Corporation. (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 1/2/2015) (Entered: 01/02/2015)
2015-01-0546CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 36 MOTION to Intervene . Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
2015-01-1347TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Small, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2015) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-01-2048ORDER GRANTING 36 MOTION TO INTERVENE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
2015-01-2052Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 1/20/2015. re 36 MOTION to Intervene filed by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation. Court Reporter Name e Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorney Robert Belschaw. Defendant Attorney Abraham Simmons.Intervener: Michael Small Attachment minute order.(dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2015) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
2015-01-2149NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Department of Defense. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 28 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) And Representation Statement (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 1/21/2015) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
2015-01-2150ORDER STAYING RULING PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/21/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
2015-01-2151NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 28 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9224490 paid.) And Representation Statement (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 1/21/2015) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
2015-01-2153NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Department of Defense. (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 1/21/2015) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
2015-01-2754TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Small, Michael) (Filed on 1/27/2015) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
2015-01-2955USCA Case Number 15-15120 , for 53 Notice of Appeal filed by Department of Defense, 49 Notice of Appeal filed by Department of Defense, 51 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
2015-02-1756TRANSCRIPT ORDER by American Small Business League for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 2/17/2015) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
2015-02-1957Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-20-2015, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2015. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/19/2015) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
2015-02-2058Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 08/14/2014; 11/06/2014; 01/20/2015 before Judge William Alsup, Transcript due by 3/23/2015. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 2/20/2015) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
2015-02-2059Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 08/14/2014, 11/06/2014, 01/20/2015 before Judge Alsup, (Small, Michael) (Filed on 2/20/2015) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
2015-02-2060Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 08/14/2014, 11/06/2014, 01/20/2015 before Judge Alsup, re 51 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 3/23/2015. (Small, Michael) (Filed on 2/20/2015) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
2015-02-23Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 59 Transcript Designation Form (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-05-0461NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Sabita Jyotindra Soneji (Soneji, Sabita) (Filed on 5/4/2015) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
2015-05-1162NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jessica Michael Weisel (Weisel, Jessica) (Filed on 5/11/2015) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
2016-07-1363REQUEST FOR STATUS UPDATE REGARDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/12/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
2016-07-2764STATUS REPORT REGARDING APPEAL by Department of Defense. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 7/27/2016) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
2017-01-0665USCA Memorandum as to 53 Notice of Appeal filed by Department of Defense, 51 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
2017-01-1966NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Ellen London (London, Ellen) (Filed on 1/19/2017) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-02-2867MANDATE of USCA as to 53 Notice of Appeal filed by Department of Defense (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-0968CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-1569CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Further Case Management Conference After Remand. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2017) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-3070JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Department of Defense. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 3/30/2017) Modified on 3/31/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-04-0671Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/6/2017. Bench Trial set for 12/12/2017 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Total Time in Court 12 minutes. Court Reporter Name JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney Robert Belshaw. Defendant Attorney Ellen London. Attachment minute order.(dl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/6/2017) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-0672CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court adopts the parties' proposed next steps in their joint case management statement going forward, as set out in pages 6 and 7 of the joint statement and proposed order. Discovery is authorized to the extent discussed on the record at the case management conference. Bench Trial set for 12/11/2017 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/6/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-1173TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/06/2017 before Hon. William Alsup by American Small Business League, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2017) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-2074Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/6/17, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 73 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2017. (Related documents(s) 73 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 4/20/2017) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-2075MOTION to Intervene Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/4/2017. Replies due by 5/11/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Answer to Complaint for Injunctive Relief, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Amy M. Johnson ISO Motion to Intervene, # 3 Proposed Order)(Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 4/20/2017) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-2476Statement of Non Opposition to 75 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Department of Defense. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 4/24/2017) Modified on 4/25/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-25Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 76 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Department of Defense Correct event is Statement of Non-Opposition Located at: Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Other Supporting Documents (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-0477Statement of Non-Opposition 75 to Motion to Intervene filed by American Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 5/4/2017) Modified on 5/5/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-3078ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 75 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/30/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-06-0179ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge William Alsup [granting 75 Motion to Intervene]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-08-0980NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Friday (Friday, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/9/2017) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-09-0681MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice John Cuneo ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11690648.) filed by American Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 9/6/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0682MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Charles Tiefer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11690664.) filed by American Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 9/6/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0683ORDER DENYING 81 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0684ORDER DENYING 82 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0785MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice John Cuneo ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11690648.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/06/2017 filed by American Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 9/7/2017) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-0786MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Charles Tiefer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11690664.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/06/2017 filed by American Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 9/7/2017) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-0787ORDER DENYING 85 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-0788ORDER DENYING 86 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-0889MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Charles Tiefer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11690664.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/06/2017 filed by American Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2017) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0890MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice John Cuneo ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11690648.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/06/2017 filed by American Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2017) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-1191MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Charles Tiefert ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11690664.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/06/2017 filed by American Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2017) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1192MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jon Cuneo ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11690648.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/06/2017 filed by American Small Business League. (Belshaw, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2017) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1193ORDER GRANTING 91 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHARLES TIEFER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1194ORDER GRANTING 92 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JONATHAN CUNEO PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1595STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deposition of Martha Crawford filed by Department of Defense. (Friday, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/15/2017) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-1796NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W. Cuneo and Charles Tiefer (Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/17/2017) (Entered: 09/17/2017)
2017-09-1797Letter from Jonathan W. Cuneo to the Hon. WIlliam Alsup . (Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/17/2017) (Entered: 09/17/2017)
2017-09-18ERRONEOUS ENTRY. PLEASE DISREGARD. Electronic filing error for failure to comply with civil local rule 5-1(i)(3) Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deposition of Martha Crawford filed by Department of Defense (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017) Modified on 9/18/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-2098ORDER RE DEPOSITION OF MARTHA CRAWFORD (pursuant to 95 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2199Declaration of Jonathan W. Cuneo in Support of 97 Letter filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Related document(s) 97 ) (Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/21/2017) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-25100ORDER RE 97 LETTER DATED SEPTEMBER 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/25/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-10-02101Letter from Jonathan W. Cuneo . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through F)(Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/2/2017) Modified on 10/10/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-03102ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 101 Letter filed by American Small Business League]. Response due by NOON on 10/6/2017. Two-hour meet-and-confer in Court's jury room from 9:00 AM--11:00 AM 10/10/2017. Discovery Hearing set for 10/10/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/3/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-04103Letter from Rex S. Heinke re Expert Discovery Issues . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jessica M. Weisel, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Shook Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Downey Expert Report)(Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 10/4/2017) Modified on 10/10/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-05104STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 102 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Jointly Requesting Postponement of Meet-and-Confer and Discovery Hearing filed by Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly Friday)(Friday, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/5/2017) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-05105ORDER DENYING 104 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY HEARING by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-05106Discovery Letter Brief filed by Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(London, Ellen) (Filed on 10/5/2017) Modified on 10/10/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-08107Discovery Letter Brief filed by American Small Business League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Supplemental Report of William A. Shook)(Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/8/2017) Modified on 10/10/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/08/2017)
2017-10-10108Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Discovery Hearing held on 10/10/2017. Ruling to issue. Pretrial Conference date and Trial dates vacated. Status Conference set for 11/15/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Total Time in Court: 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Jonathan Cuneo, Robert Belshaw. Defendant's Attorneys: Jessica Weisel, Ellen London, Kimberly Friday. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2017) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-10109ORDER AFTER DISCOVERY HEARING (re 101 103 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/10/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-12110TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/10/2017 before Judge William Alsup by American Small Business League, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/12/2017) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-12111TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 10, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 10/12/2017) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-12112NOTICE by Department of Defense re 109 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Notice of Agency Action (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ellen London, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(London, Ellen) (Filed on 10/12/2017) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-13113*** SEE CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT AT 114 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/10/17, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 111 Transcript Order, 110 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2018. (Related documents(s) 111 , 110 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 10/13/2017) Modified on 10/16/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-16114Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/10/17, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 111 Transcript Order, 110 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2018. (Related documents(s) 111 , 110 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 10/16/2017) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-23115NOTICE by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation re 112 Notice (Other), 109 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings to Respond to Government Action (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 10/23/2017) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-11-02116RESPONSE to re 112 Notice (Other), 115 Notice (Other) by American Small Business League. (Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/2/2017) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-03117NOTICE by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation re 112 Notice (Other), 109 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings re Objections to Government Action and Update re Timing of Resolution of Objections (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 11/3/2017) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-07118NOTICE by Department of Defense re 109 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Notice of Agency Action (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(London, Ellen) (Filed on 11/7/2017) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-13119NOTICE by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation re 112 Notice (Other) re Gov't Release of Information (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 11/13/2017) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-15120Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Status Conference held on 11/15/2017. Defendants to file Motion for Summary Judgment by 12/7/17; Opposition filed by 12/21/17; Reply filed by 1/4/18. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2018 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Government to prepare an order of today's hearing. Total Time in Court: 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Pam Batalo. Plaintiff Attorney: Jonathan W. Cuneo. Defendant Attorney: Ellen London, Kimberly Friday Intervenor: Jessica Weisel (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2017) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-17121TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2017 before Judge William Alsup by American Small Business League, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/17/2017) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-20122Proposed Order re 120 Status Conference,,, Set Hearings,, Summary Judgment Briefing by Department of Defense. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 11/20/2017) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-20123ORDER AFTER STATUS CONFERENCE (approving 122 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/20/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-27124Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/15/17, before Judge Alsup. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 121 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2018. (Related documents(s) 121 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 11/27/2017) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-29125NOTICE by American Small Business League of Partial Withdrawal of Claim (Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/29/2017) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-30126TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Weisel, Jessica) (Filed on 11/30/2017) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-07127Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2018 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 12/21/2017. Replies due by 1/4/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Driver, # 2 Declaration of Martha Crawford, # 3 Exhibit A to Crawford Decl., # 4 Declaration of Ellen London, # 5 Exhibit A to London Decl., # 6 Exhibit B to London Decl., # 7 Exhibit C to London Decl., # 8 Exhibit D to London Decl., # 9 Proposed Order)(London, Ellen) (Filed on 12/7/2017) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-07128NOTICE by Department of Defense re 127 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Ex Parte and In Camera Filing (London, Ellen) (Filed on 12/7/2017) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-21129OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 127 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan W. Cuneo, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Declaration of David Downey, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Declaration of William A. Shook)(Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/21/2017) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-27130AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING DATE FOR 127 JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Motion Hearing reset for 1/17/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Briefing schedule remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017) Modified on 12/27/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-27Set/Reset Deadlines as to 127 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-01-04131REPLY (re 127 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDepartment of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jessica Weisel)(London, Ellen) (Filed on 1/4/2018) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-17132Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 1/17/2018 re 127 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense. Motion taken under submission. Total Time in Court: 1 Hr; 19 Min. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Jonathan Cuneo. Client: Lloyd Chapman, President, American Small Business League. Defendant Attorneys: Ellen London, Kimberly Friday, Rex Heinke. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/17/2018) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-18133TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/17/2018 before Judge William Alsup by American Small Business League, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/18/2018) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-18134TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/17/2018 before Judge William Alsup by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Heinke, Rex) (Filed on 1/18/2018) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-19135Transcript of Proceedings held on January 17, 2018, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 134 Transcript Order, 133 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2018. (Related documents(s) 134 , 133 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-23136ORDER RE 127 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-31137Letter from Department of Defense regarding summary judgment order . (London, Ellen) (Filed on 1/31/2018) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-08138Letter Joint Letter with Proposed Hearing Dates . (Friday, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-12139ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING AND BENCH TRIAL (re 137 138 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/12/2018. Discovery Hearing set for 2/21/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Bench Trial set for 6/11/2018 07:30 AM before Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-13140Letter from Jonathan W. Cuneo requesting that the February 21, 2018 hearing be rescheduled . (Cuneo, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/13/2018) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-14141ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY HEARING (re 140 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/14/2018. Discovery Hearing set for 2/27/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff