Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBAUER v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv00830
Date Filed2014-05-20
Date Closed2015-09-29
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffSHANE BAUER
Case DescriptionShane Bauer, an investigative journalist for Mother Jones, made requests to several offices at the Department of Homeland Security, as well as the FBI, the National Security Agency, the CIA, and the State Department for records pertaining to Michael Benham, a computer researcher who has been critical of NSA surveillance. Bauer provided a Privacy Act waiver signed by Benham for each request. He asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. However, after the agencies failed to respond to his requests, Bauer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-05-201COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3721855) filed by SHANE BAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
2014-05-20Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (kb) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
2014-05-272SUMMONS (6) ISSUED ELECTRONICALLY as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(md, ) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
2014-05-273RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/27/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/26/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/27/2014., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/27/2014 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
2014-06-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/4/2014 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-105NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
2014-06-246Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
2014-06-30MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint. Defendants shall have to, and including, July 25, 2014 to respond to the Complaint in this case. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/30/2014. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
2014-07-177RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/7/2014 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
2014-07-188NOTICE of Appearance by Dionne S. Shy on behalf of All Defendants (Shy, Dionne) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
2014-07-259ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY.(Shy, Dionne) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
2014-07-2510Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Shy, Dionne) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
2014-07-28MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Consent Motion for Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before December 5, 2014; Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before January 7, 2015; Defendants' Reply and Opposition is due on or before January 21, 2015; and Plaintiff's Reply is due on or before February 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/28/2014. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
2014-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross Motions due by 1/7/2015. Response to Cross Motions due by 1/21/2015. Reply to Cross Motions due by 2/4/2015. Defendants' Summary Judgment motion due by 12/5/2014. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/7/2015. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/21/2014. (dot ) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
2014-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment due by 12/5/2014. Plaintiff's Opposition And Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 1/7/2015. Defendant's Reply And Opposition to Motion due by 1/21/2015. Plaintiff's Reply is due by 2/4/2015. (mac) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
2014-08-2911NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. Attorney Dionne S. Shy terminated. (Shy, Dionne) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
2014-11-2412Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion and Amend Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
2014-11-25MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File dispositive motions. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before January 15, 2015; Plaintiff's opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before February 18, 2015; Defendants' Reply and Opposition is due March 18, 2015; Plaintiff's Reply is due April 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/25/2014. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
2014-11-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross Motions due by 2/18/2015. Response to Cross Motions due by 3/18/2015. Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/8/2015. Defendants' Summary Judgment motions due by 1/15/2015. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/18/2015. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/18/2015. (dot ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
2015-01-0213Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/02/2015)
2015-01-06MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before February 27, 2015; Plaintiff's opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before March 27, 2015; Defendants' Reply and Opposition is due April 27, 2015; Plaintiff's Reply is due May 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/6/2014. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
2015-02-2414Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
2015-03-03MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before March 20, 2015; Plaintiff's opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before April 17, 2015; Defendants' Reply and Opposition is due May 18, 2015; Plaintiff's Reply is due June 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/3/2015. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
2015-03-1615Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
2015-03-16MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before March 31, 2015; Plaintiff's opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before April 28, 2015; Defendants' Reply and Opposition is due May 29, 2015; Plaintiff's Reply is due June 19, 2015. Further requests for extensions of time will be viewed with disfavor. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/16/2015. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
2015-03-3016Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
2015-04-06MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before April 7, 2015; Plaintiff's opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before May 5, 2015; Defendants' Reply and Opposition is due June 4, 2015; Plaintiff's Reply is due June 26, 2015. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/6/2014. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
2015-04-0717Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
2015-04-10MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before April 14, 2015; Plaintiff's opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before May 12, 2015; Defendants' Reply and Opposition is due June 4, 2015; Plaintiff's Reply is due June 26, 2015. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/10/2015. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
2015-04-1418MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Holzer Declaration, # 2 Blair Declaration, # 3 Hardy Declaration, # 4 Hackett Declaration, # 5 Lutz Declaration, # 6 Sherman Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
2015-04-1719NOTICE (Notice of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
2015-05-2920NOTICE of Settlement by SHANE BAUER (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
2015-09-2521STIPULATION (Voluntary Stipulation of Settlement and Order of Dismissal) by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
2015-09-2922VOLUNTARY STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/29/2015. (tcr) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
2015-09-30MINUTE ORDER: In light of 21 the parties' Voluntary Stipulation of Settlement and Order of Dismissal, this case is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/30/15. (lccrc1) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff