Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of Defense
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2014cv03593
Date Filed2014-05-20
Date Closed2014-09-08
JudgeJudge Sidney H. Stein
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage made a FOIA request to the Southern Command of the Department of Defense for records concerning any legal advice received by Southern Command pertaining to its options for treating Guantanamo Bay detainees at another location if their medical condition required such an action. Savage also asked for expedited processing. Southern Command acknowledged receipt of the request but said it was unable to respond within the statutory time limit. The newspaper then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-05-201CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (lcu) (lcu). (Entered: 05/21/2014)
2014-05-202COMPLAINT against United States Department of Defense. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401095271)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(lcu) (lcu). (jd). (Entered: 05/21/2014)
2014-05-20SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Defense. (lcu) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
2014-05-20Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (lcu) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
2014-05-20Case Designated ECF. (lcu) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
2014-05-303ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/7/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 23A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/30/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
2014-06-304NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Stuart Jones on behalf of United States Department of Defense. (Jones, David) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
2014-06-305ANSWER to 2 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Defense.(Jones, David) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
2014-08-046LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from David E. McCraw dated 08/04/2104 re: Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
2014-08-057MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 6 Letter filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. ENDORSEMENT: The August 7 conference is cancelled. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/3/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
2014-08-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 10/3/2014. Motions due by 9/12/2014. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/24/2014. (kgo) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
2014-09-058DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) Modified on 9/8/2014 (km). (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-08***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney David McCraw Document 8 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was referred to Judge Sidney H. Stein for approval. (km) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
2014-09-089STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the patties, as follows: 1. The document produced by DOD fully settles any and all claims Plaintiffs now have or may hereafter acquire against DOD or the United States of America ("United States"), or any department, agency, officer, or employee of DOD and/or the United States, related to or arising out of Plaintiffs' FOIA request at issue in this action. 2. DOD shall pay to Plaintiffs the sum of $1,400.00 in attorneys' fees and litigation costs, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(E), which sum Plaintiffs agree to accept as full payment of any attorneys i fees and costs Plaintiffs have incurred or will incur in this action for services performed up to the date of this stipulation and order. 3. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, provided that the Court shall retain jurisdiction over any issues that may arise relating to this Stipulation and Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/08/2014) (ama) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff