Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2014cv03948
Date Filed2014-06-03
Date Closed2015-10-28
JudgeJudge Vernon S. Broderick
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharles Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for a number of specific documents concerning the government's surveillance activities and the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court. The National Security Division of the Justice Department acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-06-031CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (js) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-032COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401096628)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charles Savage.(js) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-03SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (js) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-03Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (js) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-03Case Designated ECF. (js) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-07-073ANSWER to 2 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Justice.(Daughtry, Emily) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
2014-07-084ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/8/2014 at 12:45 PM in Courtroom 518 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/8/2014) (mro) Modified on 7/9/2014 (mro). (Entered: 07/08/2014)
2014-07-095NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Dalton Clopper on behalf of United States Department of Justice. (Clopper, John) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
2014-07-116NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Krause on behalf of United States Department of Justice. (Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
2014-07-297LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from David E. McCraw dated 07/29/2014 re: Date of Initial Conference. Document filed by Charles Savage, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
2014-07-308MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 7 Letter filed by The New York Times Company, Charles Savage. ENDORSEMENT: The August 8 initial conference will be adjourned to September 12, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 9/12/2014 at 10:30 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/30/2014) (mro) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
2014-08-159ORDER: The Initial Conference previously scheduled for September 12, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby rescheduled to October 17, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 518 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Initial Conference set for 10/17/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/15/2014) (mro) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
2014-09-2310NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Alexander Kutner on behalf of Charles Savage, The New York Times Company. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
2014-10-0911JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Andrew E. Krause dated October 9, 2014 re: joint initial pre-trial conference submission (in accordance with Dkt. No. 4). Document filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
2014-10-17Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/17/2014. (msa) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
2014-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: DOJ's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 5/1/2015. Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 6/1/2015; DOJ's Reply/Opposition brief due by 7/1/2015. Plaintiffs' Reply brief due by 7/15/2015. (msa) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
2014-12-0512LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to transmit first release of documents addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Andrew E. Krause dated December 5, 2014. Document filed by United States Department of Justice.(Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
2014-12-0813ORDER granting 12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/8/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2015-03-2014LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Proposed Schedule addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from David E. McCraw dated 03/20/2015. Document filed by Charles Savage, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
2015-03-2315ORDER granting 14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time for Proposed Schedule addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from David E. McCraw dated 03/20/2015. APPLICATION GRANTED. The deadline to submit a proposed production schedule is adjourned until March 30, 2015. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/23/2015) (kko) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
2015-03-3016LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Emily E. Daughtry dated March 30, 2015 re: Proposed Stipulation and Order. Document filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Additional Processing and Briefing)(Daughtry, Emily) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
2015-04-0117MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 16 Letter, filed by United States Department of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered., ( Cross Motions due by 12/14/2015., Motions due by 11/9/2015., Responses due by 1/19/2016., Replies due by 2/9/2016.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/1/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
2015-10-2718DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Plaintiffs and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charles Savage.(McCraw, David) Modified on 10/28/2015 (km). (Entered: 10/27/2015)
2015-10-28***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney David McCraw Document 18 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was referred to Judge Vernon S. Broderick for approval. (km) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
2015-10-2819STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii): The Complaint shall be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) without costs and without attorneys' fees or conferral of prevailing party status pursuant to FOIA of any other federal statue. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/28/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff