Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGREEN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityNewark
Case Number2:2014cv03698
Date Filed2014-06-09
Date Closed2014-09-25
JudgeJudge Esther Salas
PlaintiffVANCE GREEN
Case DescriptionVance Green, a researcher and producer for a local cable news program, sent a FOIA request in 2012 to the Justice Department for all records concerning defendants who were arrested in response to the government's Sept. 11, 2001 lookout bulletin. Green reminded the agency that he was renewing a request originally submitted in 2009. The agency informed Green that it had found 2606 pages of records as well as 14 CDs and would disclose them if Green paid $275 in estimated fees. Green told the agency that since it had missed the time limit for responding it could no longer charge fees. He also sent a request for expedited processing. Green also submitted similar FOIA requests to the Federal Aviation Administration and the Department of Defense. After the agencies failed to provide records, Green filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantFEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
Complaint attachment 33
Complaint attachment 34
Complaint attachment 35
Complaint attachment 36
Complaint attachment 37
Complaint attachment 38
Complaint attachment 39
Complaint attachment 40
Complaint attachment 41
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-06-091Complaint Received. (Attachments: # 1 exh a 1, # 2 exh a 2, # 3 exh a 3, # 4 exh a 4, # 5 exh a 5, # 6 exh a 6, # 7 exh 4 a, # 8 exh f 1, # 9 exh f 2, # 10 exh f 3, # 11 exh f 4, # 12 exh f 5)(dr, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2014: # 13 exh f 6, # 14 exh f 7, # 15 exh f 8, # 16 exh f 9, # 17 exh f 9-2, # 18 exh f 9-a, # 19 exh f 11, # 20 exh f 12, # 21 exh f 13, # 22 exh f 15, # 23 exh f 16, # 24 exh f 17, # 25 exh f 18, # 26 exh f 19) (dr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2014: # 27 exh w 1, # 28 exh w 2, # 29 exh w 3, # 30 exh w 4, # 31 exh w 5, # 32 exh w 5b, # 33 exh w 6, # 34 exh w 7, # 35 IFP Appl) (dr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2014: # 36 Proposed IFP Order) (dr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2014: # 37 Affv of Vance Green, # 38 Memo In Support of Pltf's Motion For a Vaughn Index) (dr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2014: # 39 exh f 10, # 40 exh f 14, # 41 Civil Cover Sheet) (dr). (Entered: 06/11/2014)
2014-09-242ORDER denying pltf's application to proceed in forma pauperis and closing case; directing the pltf. to submit the filing fee or the proper application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/24/2014. (nr, ) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
2014-09-25***Civil Case Terminated. (nr, ) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff