Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv01760
Date Filed2014-10-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionReporter Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the State Department for any records indicating that any of five Guantanamo detainees were considered for release in exchange for Sgt. Bowe Bergdahl. Leopold also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, denied Leopold's request for expedited processing, and granted his request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-10-211COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3878680) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons AG, # 3 Summons USAO, # 4 Summons State)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-10-21Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (kb) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-10-212SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(kb) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-10-213REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE State Department by JASON LEOPOLD filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-10-224SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(rdj) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
2014-11-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/29/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/28/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/4/2014) (td, ). (Entered: 11/03/2014)
2014-11-036RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/29/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
2014-11-057NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Interrante on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Interrante, John) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
2014-11-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/3/2014 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
2014-11-259Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
2014-11-26MINUTE ORDER: Granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint not later than December 12, 2014. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/14. (DJS) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
2014-11-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/12/2014. (sm) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
2014-11-2810NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Frances Thurston on behalf of All Defendants (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 11/28/2014)
2014-12-0411NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Attorney John G. Interrante terminated. (Interrante, John) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
2014-12-1112NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Steven James on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (James, Ryan) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2014-12-1213ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
2014-12-14MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and order not later than December 29, 2014. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/14/14. (DJS) (Entered: 12/14/2014)
2014-12-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/29/2014. (sm) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
2014-12-2914STATUS REPORT Jointly filed by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2015-01-13MINUTE ORDER; Upon consideration of the parties Joint Status Report 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule is adopted for the above-captioned matter: Defendant shall make its first production of documents to Plaintiff by February 27, 2015, and shall produce documents on a rolling basis thereafter. Defendant shall make these productions every four weeks. The productions will be based on a review of at least 700 pages of potentially responsive records per month by Defendant. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT NOT LATER THAN April 1, 2015 and every 60 days thereafter during production of the documents. Within 14 days after the final production of documents, the parties shall meet and confer, and shall file a status report identifying whether any further issues remain in the case. The status report shall include a proposed schedule and a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/13/15. (DJS) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-01-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2015. (sm) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-04-0115STATUS REPORT JOINT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
2015-06-0116STATUS REPORT JOINT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-07-3117STATUS REPORT JOINT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
2015-08-03MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Status Report filed by the parties 17 , a Status Conference is hereby set for 8/18/15 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 2. Counsel from the Department of State (DOS) or another DOS employee with personal knowledge of the agency's search and production efforts shall personally appear at the status conference. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/3/15. (DJS) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
2015-08-03Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/18/2015 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
2015-08-0418Consent MOTION for Order Permitting Plaintiff's Counsel to Appear Telephonically at Status Conference by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(James, Ryan) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
2015-08-04MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion for leave to appear telephonically. Ryan James may appear at the August 18, 2015 status conference by telephone. All other persons required to attend the conference shall do so in person. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/4/15. (lctsc3) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
2015-08-0719Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to for Status Conference by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-08-08MINUTE ORDER: Granting 19 Consent Motion to Continue. The status conference previously set for 8/18/15 is hereby rescheduled for 8/25/15 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/8/15. (DJS) (Entered: 08/08/2015)
2015-08-10Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/25/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
2015-08-25Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Status Conference held on 8/25/2015. Parties advised the Court of the status of this matter. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (zsm) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
2015-09-0320NOTICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-0421NOTICE of Court Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-2922Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
2015-11-3023Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2016-01-2924Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-02-2425Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Make Production of Documents by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
2016-02-26MINUTE ORDER: Granting 25 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Documents. The deadline for Defendant's upcoming production of documents is hereby extended from February 29, 2016 to March 4, 2016. All other deadlines in the case shall remain the same. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/26/16. (DJS) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
2016-03-2926Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-06-1027Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-07-2228NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Leon Drezner on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-08-0929Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (James, Ryan) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-10-1130Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (James, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-12-1231Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2017-02-0932Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-04-1133Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-06-1234Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff