Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv01771
Date Filed2014-10-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionReporter Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's role in trying to find countries willing to take detainees housed at Guantanamo Bay. The agency denied his request for expedited processing, but granted his request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-10-231COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3880511) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons State, # 3 Summons USAO, # 4 Summons USAG)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
2014-10-23Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (kb) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
2014-10-232SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(kb) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
2014-11-033RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/29/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/28/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
2014-11-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/29/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
2014-11-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/3/2014 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
2014-12-016Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siple, Adam) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
2014-12-02MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer is due on or before December 5, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/2/2014. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
2014-12-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is now due by 12/5/2014. (jth) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
2014-12-057ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Siple, Adam) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
2014-12-088ORDER. Defendant shall file on or before January 5, 2015 a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule according to which it will complete its production of documents to plaintiff. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/8/2014. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule according to which it will complete its production of documents to plaintiff by 1/5/2015. (jth) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-119NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Steven James on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (James, Ryan) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2014-12-2910Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siple, Adam) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2014-12-30MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Report. Defendant shall file on or before January 21, 2015 a report setting forth the schedule according to which it will complete its production of documents to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/30/2014. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
2014-12-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Status Report setting forth the schedule according to which it will complete the production of documents to plaintiffis now due by 1/21/2015. (jth) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
2015-01-2111STATUS REPORT RE FOIA Production by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Records Request, # 2 Exhibit Stipulation Re FOIA Processing)(Siple, Adam) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
2015-01-22MINUTE ORDER. In light of 11 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that: (1) defendant shall process documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA records request on a rolling basis at an average of 700 pages per month; (2) defendant shall provide interim releases of any responsive, non-exempt records to plaintiff on or around the last business day of each month; (3) defendant shall provide the first interim release of responsive, non-exempt records to plaintiff on or before March 31, 2015; and (4) defendant shall file a report with the Court on the status of the production on or before April 22, 2015, and in 90-day intervals after that date unless otherwise ordered. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/22/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
2015-01-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a Report with the Court on the Status of the Production of Documents by 4/22/2015. (jth) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
2015-04-2212STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
2015-04-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of 12 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff on July 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/23/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to file another Status Report on the Production of Documents to Plaintiff by 7/21/2015. (jth) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
2015-07-2113STATUS REPORT Re Production of Documents by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
2015-07-22MINUTE ORDER. In light of 13 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff on October 19, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/22/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
2015-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to file another Status Report on the Production of Documents to Plaintiff by 10/19/2015. (jth) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
2015-10-1914STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of 14 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff on November 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/20/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
2015-10-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to file another Status Report on the Production of Documents to Plaintiff by 11/30/2015. (jth) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
2015-11-3015STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-12-01MINUTE ORDER. In light of 15 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff on December 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/1/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
2015-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to file another Status Report on the Production of Documents to Plaintiff by 12/30/2015. (jth) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
2015-12-3016STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
2016-01-04MINUTE ORDER. In light of 16 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff on or before March 31, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/4/2016. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-01-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/31/2016. (tb) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-02-2617Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce FOIA Records by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siple, Adam) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
2016-02-26MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall make its next production of documents to plaintiff on or before March 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/26/2016. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
2016-03-3118Quarterly STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-04-01MINUTE ORDER. In light of 18 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff by June 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/1/2016. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
2016-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to file another Status Report on the Production of Documents to Plaintiff by 6/30/2016. (jth) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-06-3019STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-07-07MINUTE ORDER. In light of 19 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff by September 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/7/2016. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
2016-07-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to file another Status Report on the Production of Documents to Plaintiff by 9/30/2016. (jth) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
2016-09-3020Quarterly STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-04MINUTE ORDER. In light of defendant's status report 20 , it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff by December 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/4/2016. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-12-2221Quarterly STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of 21 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff by March 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/23/2016. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2016-12-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to file another Status Report on the Production of Documents to Plaintiff by 3/30/2017. (jth) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
2017-03-3022STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-30MINUTE ORDER. In light of 22 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff by June 30, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/30/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to file another Status Report on the Production of Documents to Plaintiff by 6/30/2017. (jth) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-06-3023STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-03MINUTE ORDER. In light of 23 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff by September 29, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/3/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-09-2924STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-02MINUTE ORDER. In light of 24 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant shall file another report on the status of the production of documents to plaintiff by December 29, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/2/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff