Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCABAN v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv01919
Date Filed2014-11-14
Date Closed2015-04-08
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJENNIFER CABAN
Case DescriptionJennifer Caban, a free-lance journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records on herself. The agency responded that it had found 3,205 responsive pages and asked Caban if she wanted the records in hard-copy or on a CD. She asked for a CD as well as an estimated completion date. The agency provided an estimated date of completion of June 23, 2014. After that date came without receipt of the records, she asked for a new completion date and the agency told her it would be finished by Dec. 31, 2014. She then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-11-141COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3905376) filed by JENNIFER CABAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons USAO)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
2014-11-14Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (kb) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
2014-11-142SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(kb) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
2014-11-173SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JENNIFER CABAN (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order granting motion for leave to seal, # 2 Exhibit Motion, # 3 Exhibit Proposed order granting motion to redact home address, # 4 Exhibit Redacted complaint)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
2014-11-194SEALED ORDER granting 3 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JENNIFER CABAN (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by JENNIFER CABAN. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/18/14.(zmac) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-11-195SEALED ORDER To Redact Home Address. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/18/14.(zmac) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-11-196NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED COMPLAINT to 1 Complaint by JENNIFER CABAN (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (zjf, ) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
2014-11-267REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE US Attorney for DC by JENNIFER CABAN filed by JENNIFER CABAN.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
2014-12-018SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney.(jf, ) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
2014-12-089RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2015. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-0810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/04/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-1811NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
2015-01-0512ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
2015-01-0613ORDER FOR MEET AND CONFER REPORT. Attorney Meet and Confer Conference by 1/28/2015. Meet & Confer Statement due by 2/11/2015. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/06/15. (mac) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
2015-01-1414NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Rhonda L. Campbell (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
2015-02-1115STATUS REPORT Joint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-02-11MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed 15 the joint status report filed by the parties. In the joint status report, the parties agreed to a "rolling production of documents," with the last production occurring on or about November 20, 2015. The parties further agreed that they will meet and confer by no later than February 1, 2016, and "subsequently file a status report informing the Court on what (if any) issues remain to be litigated." Accordingly, the parties are hereby directed to file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than February 1, 2016. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 11, 2015. (lcegs4) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-02-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report or Individual Recommendation due by 2/1/2016. (mac) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-04-0716STIPULATION of Dismissal by JENNIFER CABAN. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff