Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2014cv09149
Date Filed2014-11-19
Date Closed2015-01-22
JudgeJudge Jesse M. Furman
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
Case DescriptionThe New York Times submitted a FOIA request to the Justice Department's Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records of attorney's fees paid to prevailing plaintiffs in FOIA law suits in the Southern District of New York since 2009. Although the Times made numerous attempts to contact EOUSA concerning the status of its request, after hearing nothing from the agency it filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-11-18SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice. (jvs) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-11-18Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. (jvs) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-11-18Case Designated ECF. (jvs) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-11-183CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jvs) (moh). (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-11-181COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1100996)Document filed by The New York Times Company.(laq) (moh). (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-11-192RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-12-184LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from AUSA Sarah S. Normand dated 12/18/14. Document filed by United States Department of Justice.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
2014-12-185ORDER granting 4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Department of Justice answer due 1/21/2015. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
2014-12-196NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/2/2015 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/19/2014) (tn) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
2015-01-217LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from AUSA Sarah Normand dated January 21, 2015 re: New York Times Co. v. Department of Justice, 14 Civ. 9149 (JMF). Document filed by United States Department of Justice.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
2015-01-228STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL: The documents produced by DOJ fully settle any and all claims Plaintiff now has or may hereafter require against DOJ or the United States of America, or any department, agency, officer or employee of DOJ and/or the United States, related to or arising out of Plaintiff's FOIA Request; DOJ shall pay to Plaintiff the sum of $1,200.00 in attorneys' fees and litigation costs, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552(a) (4)(E), which sum Plaintiff agrees to accept as full payment of any attorneys' fees and costs Plaintiffs have incurred or will incur in this action for services performed up to the date of this stipulation and order. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, provided that this Court shall retain jurisdiction over any issues that may arise relating to this Stipulation and Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. All conferences are cancelled. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/22/2015) (tn) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff