Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv01988
Date Filed2014-11-24
Date Closed2016-03-25
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to EOUSA for records concerning the Justice Department's prosecution of the HSBC Bank litigation supervised by the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Loretta Lynch, who has been nominated by President Obama to become Attorney General. Leopold asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-11-241COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3916306) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
2014-11-24Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (rd) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
2014-11-252SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and U.S. Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Consent Form, # 3 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
2014-11-263REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by JASON LEOPOLD filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
2014-11-264STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/26/2014. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
2014-12-015SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (znmw, ) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
2014-12-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2015. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-087RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/04/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-188MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Borum, Marian) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
2014-12-189Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
2014-12-18MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendant shall have up to and including 2/4/2015 in which to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/18/2014. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
2014-12-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/4/2015. (tb, ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
2014-12-2210AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
2014-12-2211WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 4/23/2015..... MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Expedited Processing by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - FedEx delivery record, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's FOIA request, # 3 Exhibit 3 - White House press release, # 4 Declaration Jason Leopold, # 5 Text of Proposed Order, # 6 Statement of Facts)(Light, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/24/2015 (znmw, ). (Entered: 12/22/2014)
2014-12-2912NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2015-01-0213MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Expedited Processing by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 01/02/2015)
2015-01-0614Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Expedited Processing filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
2015-01-0715NOTICE by JASON LEOPOLD re 14 Memorandum in Opposition, (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
2015-01-08MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendant's response to plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than February 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/8/2015. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
2015-01-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 2/4/2015. (tb, ) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
2015-01-2016WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 4/23/2015.....Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/24/2015 (znmw, ). (Entered: 01/20/2015)
2015-01-26Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/27/2015 05:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (tb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
2015-01-2717Memorandum in opposition to re 16 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vinay Jolly, EOUSA, # 2 Declaration of Carol Federighi, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Federighi Decl - Order, Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Justice, No. 06-1773 (D.D.C. Sept. 27, 2007), # 4 Exhibit 2 to Federighi Decl - Order, Electronic Privacy Information Center v. Department of Justice, No. 03-2078 (D.D.C. Oct. 20, 2003), # 5 Exhibit 3 to Federighi Decl - Order, Judicial Watch v. Department of Justice, No. 00-1396 (D.D.C. June 27, 2000), # 6 Exhibit 4 to Federighi Decl - Order, Electronic Privacy Information Center v. Department of Justice, No. 06-0096 (D.D.C. Mar. 24, 2006), # 7 Exhibit 5 to Federighi Decl - Governments Memorandum in Support of the Deferred Prosecution Agreement, United States v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A., No. 1:12-cr-00763 (E.D.N.Y.)., # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
2015-01-2718REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
2015-01-27Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 1/27/2015 before Judge Richard J. Leon: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/6/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.. (Court Reporter Catherine Jones) (tb, ) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
2015-02-0419Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Expedited Processing filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vinay Jolly)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
2015-02-0420Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Vinay Jolly, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
2015-02-0421ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: 10 Amended Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
2015-02-06Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/6/2015 before Judge Richard J. Leon: re 16 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JASON LEOPOLD ; heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace) (tb, ) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
2015-02-1222TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on 02-06-15; Page Numbers: (1-22). Date of Issuance:2-11-15. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Court Reporter Email Address : scott_l_wallace@dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 3/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2015.(Wallace, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
2015-02-1823REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Expedited Processing filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Lynch responses to written questions from Senators, # 2 Exhibit Senator Vitter press release, # 3 Exhibit NOLA story on Senator Vitter's statement)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
2015-02-1824Memorandum in opposition to re 20 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Lynch responses to written questions from Senators, # 2 Exhibit Senator Vitter press release, # 3 Exhibit NOLA story on Senator Vitter's statement, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
2015-02-2525REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
2015-04-2326NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by JASON LEOPOLD re 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Expedited Processing , 16 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-07-0627MEMORANDUM ORDER that the Government's 20 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/6/2015. (jth) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
2016-03-2428Consent MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
2016-03-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's 28 Consent Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED and that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/25/16. (lcrjl3, ) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff