Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv01989
Date Filed2014-11-24
Date Closed2015-11-30
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for an Inspector General's report concerning the agency's use of drugs for purposes of interrogation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but Leopold heard nothing further from the agency pertaining to his request. He submitted a second FOIA request for 21 unclassified IG reports. He also asked for a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of his second FOIA request and granted his request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-11-241COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3916316) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
2014-11-24Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (rd) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
2014-11-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
2014-12-083RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2015. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/04/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-225ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 12/16/2014 (Light, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/23/2014 (td, ). (Entered: 12/22/2014)
2014-12-23NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to jeffrey.light@yahoo.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document, 3. Please refile in the correct case number. (td, ) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
2014-12-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
2015-01-127MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
2015-01-13MINUTE ORDER: If Plaintiff opposes Defendant's Motion for Extension, the Court ORDERS that he shall file such opposition by January 15, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-01-13Set/Reset Deadline: If Plaintiff opposes Defendant's Motion for Extension, he shall file such opposition by 1/15/2015. (kt) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-01-138RESPONSE re 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-01-13MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response by January 15, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-01-13Set/Reset Deadline: The Defendant shall file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response by 1/15/2015. (kt) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-01-159REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Ross, Carl) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-15MINUTE ORDER: Given Defendant's representations regarding processing in its Reply, the Court ORDERS that its 7 Motion for Extension is GRANTED, and it shall have until February 2, 2015, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/15/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-15Set/Reset Deadline: The Defendant shall have until 2/2/2015 to respond to the Complaint. (kt) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-02-0210Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
2015-02-02MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's Consent 10 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before March 4, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/2/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
2015-02-04Set/Reset Deadline: The Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before 3/4/2015. (ad) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
2015-03-0411Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
2015-03-06MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's Consent 11 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a status report by May 4, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/6/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
2015-03-06Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall file a status report by 5/4/2015. (ad) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
2015-05-0412STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Ross, Carl) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
2015-05-05MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 12 Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they shall file a further Status Report by June 19, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/5/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
2015-05-05Set/Reset Deadline: A further Status Report is due by 6/19/2015. (ad) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
2015-06-1913STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Ross, Carl) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
2015-06-22MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they file a further Joint Status Report by August 6, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/22/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
2015-06-22Set/Reset Deadline: The Parties Joint Status Report due by 8/6/2015. (ad) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
2015-08-0714STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Ross, Carl) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-08-10MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they file a further Joint Status Report by September 10, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/10/15. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
2015-08-10Set/Reset Deadline: Parties shall file a joint status report by 9/10/2015. (ad) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
2015-09-1015Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
2015-09-10MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they file a further Joint Status Report by October 13, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/10/2015. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
2015-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/13/2015. (tg) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
2015-10-1316Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Ross, Carl) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
2015-10-13MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they file a further Joint Status Report by November 13, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/13/2015.(lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
2015-10-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2015. (tg) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
2015-11-1317STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Ross, Carl) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-16MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they file a further Joint Status Report or Notice of Dismissal by November 27, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/16/2015. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
2015-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report or Notice of Dismissal ue by 11/27/2015. (tg) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
2015-11-2718STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Settlement by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Ross, Carl) (Entered: 11/27/2015)
2015-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 18 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/30/2015. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff