Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv02034
Date Filed2014-12-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
PlaintiffARAM ROSTON
Case DescriptionAram Roston, a reporter for Buzzfeed, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Central Command, a component of the Department of Defense, for records concerning complaints or allegations of misuse of force or brutality against detainees. The agency acknowledged Roston's request and told him it was placed in the media category, but that at present it was too broad to process. After hearing nothing further from Central Command, Buzzfeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-12-021COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3922564) filed by BUZZFEED, INC., ARAM ROSTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Department of Defense, # 4 Summons US Attorneys Office)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
2014-12-022LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
2014-12-02Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (rd) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
2014-12-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
2014-12-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2015. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/04/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-30Case reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr, ) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
2015-02-066ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Plaintiff may address the Order to Show Cause by seeking entry of default under Fed. R. Civ. P. 55 on or before February 25, 2015. Please see the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/06/2015. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
2015-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Show Cause order due by 2/25/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
2015-02-197NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary John Corey on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Corey, Zachary) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
2015-02-238AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE filed by BUZZFEED, INC., ARAM ROSTON.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-02-259RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 6 Order, filed by BUZZFEED, INC., ARAM ROSTON. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
2015-02-27MINUTE ORDER: The Order to Show Cause entered on February 6, 2015, is hereby discharged. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/27/2015. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
2015-03-0910ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Related document: 8 Amended Complaint filed by BUZZFEED, INC., ARAM ROSTON.(Corey, Zachary) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-03-0911ORDER. Both a complaint and an answer are now before the Court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report on or before March 24, 2015. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 03/09/3015. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/24/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
2015-03-2412STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corey, Zachary) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
2015-03-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' March 24, 2015 joint status report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 23, 2015. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/25/2015. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
2015-03-25Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/23/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
2015-04-2313NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Pezzoli on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pezzoli, Timothy) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-04-2314STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corey, Zachary) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-04-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' April 23, 2015, joint status report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 18, 2015. The status report shall indicate the number of potentially responsive documents resulting from Plaintiffs' narrowed request and an estimated date of completing production of non-exempt documents. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/24/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
2015-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/18/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
2015-06-1815STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Corey, Zachary) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
2015-07-08MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear before Judge Mehta for a Status Conference on July 22, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10. The court is concerned about the breadth of Plaintiffs' FOIA requests and the corresponding amount of time Defendant estimates will be required to complete its production of responsive records. At the Status Conference, the parties should be prepared to address: (1) whether Plaintiffs' FOIA requests can be further narrowed and (2) steps the parties have agreed to, and can agree to, to reduce the time required to produce the responsive records, such as using search terms or other electronic means to identify such records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/08/2015. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-08Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/22/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
2015-07-22Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 7/22/2015. (Court Reporter: Barbara DeVico) (cdw) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
2015-07-22MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 2, 2015, which addresses: (1) the status of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request, including the number of potentially responsive documents resulting from Plaintiff's narrowed request and an estimated date of completion of Defendant's production of non-exempt documents; (2) the steps the parties have agreed to with the aim of reducing the time required to produce the responsive records; and (3) any other information that the parties believe the court should be aware of. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/22/2015. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
2015-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/2/2015. (zmm) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
2015-09-0216STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Corey, Zachary) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
2015-09-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' September 2, 2015, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to meet and confer and file another Joint Status Report on or before October 14, 2015, which addresses: (1) the status of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request and (2) any other information that the parties believe the court should be aware of. The court is greatly appreciative of the parties' efforts to narrow the scope of the search at issue in this case. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/03/2015. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-03Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-10-1417Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Corey, Zachary) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
2015-10-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' October 14, 2015, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to meet and confer and file another Joint Status Report on or before December 8, 2015, which addresses: (1) the status of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request and (2) any other information that the parties believe the court should be aware of. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/15/2015. (lcapm2) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
2015-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/8/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
2015-11-2318NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by James J. Schwartz on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Zachary J. Corey (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
2015-12-0719Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
2015-12-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the parties' December 7, 2015, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to meet and confer and file another Joint Status Report on or before February 8, 2016, which addresses: (1) the status of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request and (2) any other information that the parties believe the court should be aware of. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/08/2015. (lcapm2) Modified on 12/8/2015 (cdw). (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2015-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2016-02-0820Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' February 8, 2016, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to meet and confer and file another Joint Status Report on or before April 8, 2016, which addresses: (1) the status of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request and (2) any other information that the parties believe the court should be aware of. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/09/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2016. (zmm) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-04-0821Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 21 the parties' April 8, 2016, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to meet and confer and file another Joint Status Report on or before June 1, 2016, which addresses: (1) the status of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request and (2) any other information that the parties believe the court should be aware of. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/11/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-06-0122Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 22 the parties' June 1, 2016, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to meet and confer and file another Joint Status Report on or before August 5, 2016, which addresses: (1) the status of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request and (2) any other information that the parties believe the court should be aware of. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/02/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/5/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-07-0723NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BUZZFEED, INC., ARAM ROSTON. Attorney Timothy J. Pezzoli terminated. (Pezzoli, Timothy) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
2016-08-0524Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-08MINUTE ORDER: In light of 24 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report advising the court of progress and suggesting next steps on or before October 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/08/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-08Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-10-0725Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-10-12VACATED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER OF 12/6/2016............MINUTE ORDER: In light of 25 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report advising the court of progress and suggesting next steps on or before December 10, 2016. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/12/2016. Modified on 12/6/2016 (cdw). (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-12Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2016 (cdw) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-12-06MINUTE ORDER resetting the deadline for the parties' Joint Status Report. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report advising the court of progress and suggesting next steps on or before December 12, 2016. The court's previous minute order setting a deadline of December 10, 2016 is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/06/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-1226Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-13MINUTE ORDER: In light of 26 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report advising the court of progress and suggesting next steps on or before February 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/13/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-13Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2017-02-0727Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-07MINUTE ORDER: In light of 27 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report advising the court of progress and suggesting next steps on or before April 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/07/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-07Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/7/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-04-0628Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-06MINUTE ORDER: In light of 28 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report advising the court of progress and suggesting next steps on or before June 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/06/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/5/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 04/09/2017)
2017-04-2529NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marcia Kay Sowles on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Substituting for attorney James J. Schwartz (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-06-0530Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of 30 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report advising the court of progress and suggesting next steps on or before August 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/05/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/4/2017. (mac) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-08-0431Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-07MINUTE ORDER. In light of 31 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report advising the court of progress and suggesting next steps on or before October 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/07/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-07Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-10-0532Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-10MINUTE ORDER. In light of 32 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report advising the court of progress and suggesting next steps on or before December 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/10/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-12-1133Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff